Kellogg, et al v. Watts Guerra, et al
Defendant / Appellee: MAURO, ARCHER & ASSOCIATES, LLC, HOVLAND AND RASMUS, PLLC, JOHN DOES, 1-250, VANDERGINST LAW, P.C., PATTON HOVERSTEN & BERG, PA, WAGNER REESE, LLP, FRANCISCO GUERRA, DEWALD DEAVER, P.C., LLO, JOHNSON LAW GROUP, MIKAL C. WATTS, LAW OFFICE OF MICHAEL MILLER, DANIEL HOMOLKA, PAGEL WEIKUM, PLLP, GIVENS LAW, LLC, YIRA LAW OFFICE, LTD, WOJTALEWICZ LAW FIRM, LTD., WATTS GUERRA LLP, CROSS LAW FIRM, LLC, LOWE EKLUND WAKEFIELD CO., LPA and DANIEL M. HOMOLKA, P.A.
Plaintiff / Appellant: BROMLEY RANCH, LLC, CHARLES BLAKE STRINGER, GARTH KRUGER, RACHEL KELLOGG, KENNETH P. KELLOGG, ROLAND B. BROMLEY, KELLOGG FARMS, INC., JOHN F. HEITKAMP, STRINGER FARMS, INC. and DEAN HOLTORF
Case Number: 20-3172
Filed: August 24, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order [10780813] Order filed by Judges Matheson and Bacharach granting Appellants' motion to file oversized opening brief not to exceed 14,800 words. Served on 10/22/2020. [20-3172] [Entered: 10/22/2020 03:36 PM]
October 22, 2020 [10780572] Motion filed by Appellants Bromley Ranch, LLC, Roland B. Bromley, John F. Heitkamp, Dean Holtorf, Kellogg Farms, Inc., Kenneth P. Kellogg, Rachel Kellogg, Garth Kruger, Stringer Farms, Inc. and Charles Blake Stringer to file an oversize brief 14800 words long. Served on: 10/22/2020. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-3172] DJN [Entered: 10/22/2020 09:26 AM]
October 20, 2020 [10779971] Amended notice of appeal filed. [20-3172] [Entered: 10/20/2020 03:11 PM]
October 1, 2020 [10775226] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting appellants' unopposed motion for extension of time to file the opening brief to 11/18/2020 for Roland B. Bromley, Bromley Ranch, LLC, John F. Heitkamp, Dean Holtorf, Kenneth P. Kellogg, Rachel Kellogg, Kellogg Farms, Inc., Garth Kruger, Charles Blake Stringer and Stringer Farms, Inc. No further extensions will be granted on the clerk's authority. Served on 10/01/2020. Text only entry - no attachment. [20-3172] [Entered: 10/01/2020 09:00 AM]
October 1, 2020 [10775215] Motion filed by Appellants Bromley Ranch, LLC, Roland B. Bromley, John F. Heitkamp, Dean Holtorf, Kellogg Farms, Inc., Kenneth P. Kellogg, Rachel Kellogg, Garth Kruger, Stringer Farms, Inc. and Charles Blake Stringer to extend time to file appellant/petitioner's brief until 11/18/2020. Served on: 10/01/2020. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-3172] DJN [Entered: 10/01/2020 08:45 AM]
September 14, 2020 [10770169] Entry of appearance filed by Christopher L. Goodman for Mikal C. Watts, Francisco Guerra and Watts Guerra LLP. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y (previously disclosed). Served on 09/14/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-3172] [Entered: 09/14/2020 03:38 PM]
September 14, 2020 [10770155] Entry of appearance submitted by Christopher L. Goodman for Appellees Francisco Guerra, Watts Guerra LLP and Mikal C. Watts for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 09/14/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-3172] --[Edited 09/14/2020 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] CLG [Entered: 09/14/2020 03:18 PM]
September 11, 2020 [10769862] Entry of appearance filed by Blake H. Butner and Daniel F. Church for Cross Law Firm, LLC. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 09/11/2020. Manner of Service: email [20-3172] [Entered: 09/11/2020 04:13 PM]
September 11, 2020 [10769857] Entry of appearance submitted by Daniel F. Church and Blake H. Butner for Appellee Cross Law Firm, LLC for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 09/11/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-3172]--[Edited 09/11/2020 by DJD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 9/11/20] DFC [Entered: 09/11/2020 04:07 PM]
September 10, 2020 [10769420] Deficiency notice issued. Notice of appearance due on 09/14/2020 for Francisco Guerra, Mikal C. Watts and Watts Guerra LLP. [20-3172] [Entered: 09/10/2020 12:48 PM]
September 9, 2020 [10768825] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Arthur G. Boylan and Mr. Philip Kaplan for Mauro, Archer & Associates, LLC, Johnson Law Group, Wagner Reese, LLP, VanDerGinst Law, P.C., and Law Office of Michael Miller. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 09/09/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-3172] [Entered: 09/09/2020 08:46 AM]
September 9, 2020 [10768791] Entry of appearance submitted by Arthur G. Boylan and Philip J. Kaplan for Appellees Johnson Law Group, Law Office of Michael Miller, Mauro, Archer & Associates, LLC, VanDerGinst Law, P.C. and Wagner Reese, LLP for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 09/09/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-3172]--[Edited 09/09/2020 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] AGB [Entered: 09/09/2020 08:08 AM]
September 8, 2020 [10768664] Entry of appearance filed by Adam Gregory Chandler and John M. Degnan for Hovland and Rasmus, PLLC, Dewald Deaver, P.C., LLO, Patton Hoversten & Berg, PA and Wojtalewicz Law Firm, Ltd. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y (previously disclosed). Served on 08/25/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-3172] [Entered: 09/08/2020 04:21 PM]
September 8, 2020 [10768630] Entry of appearance submitted by John M. Degnan and Adam G. Chandler for Appellees Dewald Deaver, P.C., LLO, Hovland and Rasmus, PLLC, Patton Hoversten & Berg, PA and Wojtalewicz Law Firm, Ltd. for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 09/08/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-3172] --[Edited 09/08/2020 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] AGC [Entered: 09/08/2020 03:54 PM]
September 8, 2020 [10768598] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 09/08/2020. Appellants' brief and appendix due on 10/19/2020 for Roland B. Bromley, Bromley Ranch, LLC, John F. Heitkamp, Dean Holtorf, Kenneth P. Kellogg, Rachel Kellogg, Kellogg Farms, Inc., Garth Kruger, Charles Blake Stringer and Stringer Farms, Inc. [20-3172] [Entered: 09/08/2020 03:28 PM]
September 8, 2020 [10768553] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Teresa M. Young for Lowe Eklund Wakefield Co., LPA. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Parties listed have been previously disclosed to the court. Served on 09/08/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-3172] [Entered: 09/08/2020 02:39 PM]
September 8, 2020 [10768511] Entry of appearance submitted by Teresa M. Young for Appellee Lowe Eklund Wakefield Co., LPA for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 09/08/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-3172]--[Edited 09/08/2020 by JM PDF removed filed by the court on 9/8/20.] TMY [Entered: 09/08/2020 01:47 PM]
September 8, 2020 [10768356] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Douglas J Nill for Kenneth P. Kellogg, et al., Plaintiffs-Appellants. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. All parties listed have been previously disclosed to the court. Served on 09/07/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-3172] [Entered: 09/08/2020 09:44 AM]
September 8, 2020 [10768275] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 09/15/2020 for Timothy M. O'Brien, Clerk of Court (oclk). (Text Only - No Attachment) [20-3172] [Entered: 09/08/2020 06:50 AM]
September 7, 2020 [10768273] Docketing statement filed by Bromley Ranch, LLC, Roland B. Bromley, John F. Heitkamp, Dean Holtorf, Kellogg Farms, Inc., Kenneth P. Kellogg, Rachel Kellogg, Garth Kruger, Stringer Farms, Inc. and Charles Blake Stringer. Served on 09/07/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-3172] DJN [Entered: 09/07/2020 02:57 PM]
September 7, 2020 [10768272] Entry of appearance submitted by Douglas J. Nill for Appellants Bromley Ranch, LLC, Roland B. Bromley, Kellogg Farms, Inc., Kenneth P. Kellogg, Rachel Kellogg, Garth Kruger, Stringer Farms, Inc., Charles Blake Stringer, Dean Holtorf and John F. Heitkamp for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 09/07/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-3172]--[Edited 09/08/2020 by JM PDF removed filed by the court on 9/8/20.] DJN [Entered: 09/07/2020 02:51 PM]
September 7, 2020 [10768271] Acknowledgment of transcript order filed by Bromley Ranch, LLC, Roland B. Bromley, John F. Heitkamp, Dean Holtorf, Kellogg Farms, Inc., Kenneth P. Kellogg, Rachel Kellogg, Garth Kruger, Stringer Farms, Inc. and Charles Blake Stringer. Transcript ordered: none. Served on: 09/07/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-3172] DJN [Entered: 09/07/2020 02:45 PM]
August 25, 2020 [10765387] Entry of appearance filed by Kelly A. Ricke for Pagel Weikum, PLLP. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 08/25/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-3172] [Entered: 08/25/2020 03:22 PM]
August 25, 2020 [10765373] Entry of appearance submitted by Kelly A. Ricke for Appellee Pagel Weikum, PLLP for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 08/25/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-3172] --[Edited 08/25/2020 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] KAR [Entered: 08/25/2020 03:06 PM]
August 25, 2020 [10765307] Entry of appearance filed by William L. Davidson and Joao Medeiros for Yira Law Office, Ltd and Daniel M. Homolka, P.A. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 08/25/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-3172] [Entered: 08/25/2020 12:57 PM]
August 25, 2020 [10765303] Entry of appearance submitted by William L. Davidson and Joao C.J.G. de Medeiros for Appellees Daniel Homolka and Yira Law Office, Ltd for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 08/25/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-3172] --[Edited 08/25/2020 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] JM [Entered: 08/25/2020 12:46 PM]
August 24, 2020 [10765121] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 08/24/2020 Docketing statement, transcript order form and notice of appearance due 09/08/2020 for Roland B. Bromley, Bromley Ranch, LLC, John F. Heitkamp, Dean Holtorf, Kenneth P. Kellogg, Rachel Kellogg, Kellogg Farms, Inc., Garth Kruger, Charles Blake Stringer and Stringer Farms, Inc. Notice of appearance due on 09/08/2020 for Charles R. Breyer, William B. Chaney, Dewald Deaver, P.C., LLO, Don M. Downing, William P. Ferranti, Francisco Guerra, Dan Gustafson, Patrick Haney, Daniel Homolka, Hovland and Rasmus, PLLC, Ellen Segal Huvelle, Johnson Law Group, Jeffrey A. Lamken, Law Office of Michael Miller, Lowe Eklund Wakefield Co., LPA, Mauro, Archer & Associates, LLC, Minnesota Lawyers Mutual Insurance Company, Eric R. Nitz, James P. O'Hara, Pagel Weikum, PLLP, Michael Pattillo Jr., Patton Hoversten & Berg, PA, Catherine D. Perry, Scott Powell, David Proctor, Marjorie O. Rendell, Christopher Adam Seeger, William Sieben, Leslie Smith, Patrick Joseph Stueve, VanDerGinst Law, P.C., Sarah S. Vance, Wagner Reese, LLP, Mikal C. Watts, Watts Guerra LLP, Wojtalewicz Law Firm, Ltd., Markus C. Yira and Yira Law Office, Ltd [20-3172] [Entered: 08/24/2020 03:40 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Kellogg, et al v. Watts Guerra, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MAURO, ARCHER & ASSOCIATES, LLC
Represented By: Arthur G. Boylan
Represented By: Philip Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HOVLAND AND RASMUS, PLLC
Represented By: John M. Degnan
Represented By: Adam Gregory Chandler
Represented By: Kathryn Mary Short
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN DOES, 1-250
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: VANDERGINST LAW, P.C.
Represented By: Arthur G. Boylan
Represented By: Philip Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PATTON HOVERSTEN & BERG, PA
Represented By: John M. Degnan
Represented By: Adam Gregory Chandler
Represented By: Kathryn Mary Short
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WAGNER REESE, LLP
Represented By: Arthur G. Boylan
Represented By: Philip Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FRANCISCO GUERRA
Represented By: Christopher L. Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DEWALD DEAVER, P.C., LLO
Represented By: John M. Degnan
Represented By: Adam Gregory Chandler
Represented By: Kathryn Mary Short
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHNSON LAW GROUP
Represented By: Arthur G. Boylan
Represented By: Philip Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MIKAL C. WATTS
Represented By: Christopher L. Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LAW OFFICE OF MICHAEL MILLER
Represented By: Arthur G. Boylan
Represented By: Philip Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DANIEL HOMOLKA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PAGEL WEIKUM, PLLP
Represented By: Kelly A. Ricke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GIVENS LAW, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: YIRA LAW OFFICE, LTD
Represented By: Joao Medeiros
Represented By: William L. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WOJTALEWICZ LAW FIRM, LTD.
Represented By: John M. Degnan
Represented By: Adam Gregory Chandler
Represented By: Kathryn Mary Short
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WATTS GUERRA LLP
Represented By: Christopher L. Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CROSS LAW FIRM, LLC
Represented By: Blake H. Butner
Represented By: Daniel F. Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LOWE EKLUND WAKEFIELD CO., LPA
Represented By: Teresa M. Young
Represented By: Matthew George Koehler
Represented By: Steven H. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DANIEL M. HOMOLKA, P.A.
Represented By: Joao Medeiros
Represented By: William L. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BROMLEY RANCH, LLC
Represented By: Douglas J. Nill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CHARLES BLAKE STRINGER
Represented By: Douglas J. Nill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GARTH KRUGER
Represented By: Douglas J. Nill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RACHEL KELLOGG
Represented By: Douglas J. Nill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KENNETH P. KELLOGG
Represented By: Douglas J. Nill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROLAND B. BROMLEY
Represented By: Douglas J. Nill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KELLOGG FARMS, INC.
Represented By: Douglas J. Nill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOHN F. HEITKAMP
Represented By: Douglas J. Nill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: STRINGER FARMS, INC.
Represented By: Douglas J. Nill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DEAN HOLTORF
Represented By: Douglas J. Nill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?