Lynn v. Wilkerson-Rodriguez, et al
Defendant / Appellee: BARRY LEWIS-HARRIS, Chief Medical Director, Corizon Health, Inc., in his individual and official capacity, WENDY WASINGER, Med Tech, Corizon Health, Inc. @ Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in her individual and official capacity, JERRY KIPP, Captain, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in his individual and official capacity, CLAY VAN HOOSE, Major/Chief of Security, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in his individual and official capacity, STEPHEN R. MCALLISTER, Kansas U.S. Attorney, in his individual and official capacity, DOUG BURRIS, CM1, Kansas Department of Corrections, in his individual and official capacity, GENE MILLER, RN, Corizon Health, Inc. @ Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in his individual and official capacity, TOMMY WILLIAMS, Deputy Warden, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in his individual and official capacity, KARLA SCHROEDER, Mental Health Counselor, Corizon Health, Inc. @ Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in her individual and official capacity, (FNU) SCHROEDER, Reno County District Attorney, in their individual and official capacity, MISTY KEOLAVONE, Mental Health Supervisor, Corizon Health, Inc. @ Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in her individual and official capacity, STEVE FOSTER, Captain, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in his individual and official capacity, CORIZON, INC., DAN SCHNURR, Warden, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in his individual and official capacity, DEREK SCHMIDT, Kansas Attorney General, in his individual and official capacity, LAURA KELLY, Governor, in her individual and official capacity, HOLLY POOLE, Mental Health Counselor, Corizon Health, Inc. @ Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in her individual and official capacity, JOHN MARKUS, EAI Supervisor, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in his individual and official capacity, RAYMOND STIGGINS, Lieutenant, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in his individual and official capacity, RUSSELL JENNINGS, Representative, in his individual and official capacity, CHRISTINA WISE, Grievance and Property/Injury Claims Officer, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in her individual and official capacity, RICHARD GOLDEN, CO1/Segregation Officer, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in his individual and official capacity, JEREMY WILKERSON-RODRIGUEZ, Master Sergeant, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in his individual and official capacity, MARTHA MILLER, RN, Corizon Health, Inc. @ Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in her individual and official capacity, JEFFREY PETTIJOHN, Unit Counselor, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in his individual and official capacity, MARCI CHAMIDILING, EIA Director, Lansing Correctional Facility, in her individual and official capacity, MARCUS DAWES, Unit Counselor, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in his individual and official capacity, THOMAS JACKSON, CO1/Segregation Officer, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in his individual and official capacity, (FNU) DIAZ, CO1, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in their individual and official capacity, JESSICA ZAGER, CO1/Segregation Officer, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in her individual and official capacity, ROGER WERHOLTZ, Secretary of Corrections, Kansas Department of Corrections, in his individual and official capacity, MIKE NICKLES, Unit Manager, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in his individual and official capacity, LEO DELPERGANG, Representative, in his individual and official capacity, TERRY WEBSTER, RN, Corizon Health, Inc. @ Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in his individual and official capacity, (FNU) HENDERSON, Reno County Sheriff, in his individual and official capacity, (FNU) HUSEL, RN, Corizon Health, Inc. @ Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in their individual and official capacity, DOUGLAS SHERWOOD, CO1/Segregation Officer, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in his individual and official capacity, JOHN DOE, Kansas FBI/SAIC, in his individual and official capacity, DEBRA LUNDRY, Health Services Administrator, Corizon Health, Inc. @ Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in her individual and official capacity, RUSSELL COOK, CO1/Segregation Officer, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in his individual and official capacity, MACKIE DICK, Reno County Judge, in his individual and official capacity, KANSAS DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, CURTIS PRICE, Captain, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in his individual and official capacity, (FNU) MCCARVILLE, Reno County Judge, in his individual and official capacity, CARMEN BAYNHAM, HCP, Corizon Health, Inc. @ Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in her individual and official capacity, JASON KRAMER, EAI Special Agent, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in his individual and official capacity, JOHNNIE GODDARD, Deputy Secretary of Corrections, in his individual and official capacity, KEVIN STANSBURY, Mental Health Counselor, Corizon Health, Inc. @ Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in his individual and official capacity and DEVIN CARPENTER, EAI Special Agent, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in his individual and official capacity
Plaintiff / Appellant: PATRICK C. LYNN
Case Number: 20-3178
Filed: September 1, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2020 [10780713] Dismissed; Procedural termination after other judicial action; Written, unsigned, unpublished; Judges Lucero, Holmes and Phillips. The Prison Litigation Reform Act applies to this appeal and the appellant must pay the appellate filing fees in full. 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). [20-3178] [Entered: 10/22/2020 12:30 PM]
October 8, 2020 [10777046] Response to jurisdictional show cause order of 9/2/20 filed by Patrick C. Lynn. Manner of Service: US mail. [20-3178] [Entered: 10/08/2020 02:03 PM]
September 22, 2020 [10772247] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting as modified Appellant's motion to extend time to file response. Appellant's response is now due on or before October 7. 2020. No further extensions of time will be granted on the clerk's authority. Served on 09/22/2020. [20-3178] [Entered: 09/22/2020 09:03 AM]
September 21, 2020 [10772092] Appellant's motion filed by Patrick C. Lynn to extend time to file a response until 10/23/2020. Manner of Service: US mail. [20-3178] [Entered: 09/21/2020 04:01 PM]
September 14, 2020 [10770198] Entry of appearance filed by Patrick C. Lynn. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Manner of Service: US mail [20-3178] [Entered: 09/14/2020 04:16 PM]
September 2, 2020 [10767551] Order filed by Clerk of Court regarding jurisdictional defects and finding that section 1915(g) applies to this appeal. Appellant is directed to file one document of no more than 7 pages addressing the issues as set forth in the attached order on or before 09/23/2020. Proceedings in this appeal are suspended. [20-3178] [Entered: 09/02/2020 04:20 PM]
September 1, 2020 [10767099] Prisoner case docketed. DATE RECEIVED: 09/01/2020. Fee or 1915 forms due in district court 10/01/2020 for Patrick C. Lynn. Notice of appearance due on 10/01/2020 for Patrick C. Lynn. [20-3178] [Entered: 09/01/2020 02:48 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Lynn v. Wilkerson-Rodriguez, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BARRY LEWIS-HARRIS, Chief Medical Director, Corizon Health, Inc., in his individual and official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WENDY WASINGER, Med Tech, Corizon Health, Inc. @ Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in her individual and official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JERRY KIPP, Captain, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in his individual and official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CLAY VAN HOOSE, Major/Chief of Security, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in his individual and official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STEPHEN R. MCALLISTER, Kansas U.S. Attorney, in his individual and official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DOUG BURRIS, CM1, Kansas Department of Corrections, in his individual and official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GENE MILLER, RN, Corizon Health, Inc. @ Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in his individual and official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TOMMY WILLIAMS, Deputy Warden, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in his individual and official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KARLA SCHROEDER, Mental Health Counselor, Corizon Health, Inc. @ Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in her individual and official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: (FNU) SCHROEDER, Reno County District Attorney, in their individual and official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MISTY KEOLAVONE, Mental Health Supervisor, Corizon Health, Inc. @ Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in her individual and official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STEVE FOSTER, Captain, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in his individual and official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CORIZON, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAN SCHNURR, Warden, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in his individual and official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DEREK SCHMIDT, Kansas Attorney General, in his individual and official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LAURA KELLY, Governor, in her individual and official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HOLLY POOLE, Mental Health Counselor, Corizon Health, Inc. @ Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in her individual and official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN MARKUS, EAI Supervisor, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in his individual and official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RAYMOND STIGGINS, Lieutenant, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in his individual and official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RUSSELL JENNINGS, Representative, in his individual and official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHRISTINA WISE, Grievance and Property/Injury Claims Officer, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in her individual and official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RICHARD GOLDEN, CO1/Segregation Officer, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in his individual and official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JEREMY WILKERSON-RODRIGUEZ, Master Sergeant, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in his individual and official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARTHA MILLER, RN, Corizon Health, Inc. @ Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in her individual and official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JEFFREY PETTIJOHN, Unit Counselor, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in his individual and official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARCI CHAMIDILING, EIA Director, Lansing Correctional Facility, in her individual and official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARCUS DAWES, Unit Counselor, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in his individual and official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THOMAS JACKSON, CO1/Segregation Officer, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in his individual and official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: (FNU) DIAZ, CO1, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in their individual and official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JESSICA ZAGER, CO1/Segregation Officer, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in her individual and official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROGER WERHOLTZ, Secretary of Corrections, Kansas Department of Corrections, in his individual and official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MIKE NICKLES, Unit Manager, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in his individual and official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LEO DELPERGANG, Representative, in his individual and official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TERRY WEBSTER, RN, Corizon Health, Inc. @ Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in his individual and official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: (FNU) HENDERSON, Reno County Sheriff, in his individual and official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: (FNU) HUSEL, RN, Corizon Health, Inc. @ Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in their individual and official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DOUGLAS SHERWOOD, CO1/Segregation Officer, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in his individual and official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN DOE, Kansas FBI/SAIC, in his individual and official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DEBRA LUNDRY, Health Services Administrator, Corizon Health, Inc. @ Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in her individual and official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RUSSELL COOK, CO1/Segregation Officer, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in his individual and official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MACKIE DICK, Reno County Judge, in his individual and official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KANSAS DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Represented By: Joni S. Cole
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Cowger
Represented By: Jon D. Graves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CURTIS PRICE, Captain, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in his individual and official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: (FNU) MCCARVILLE, Reno County Judge, in his individual and official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CARMEN BAYNHAM, HCP, Corizon Health, Inc. @ Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in her individual and official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JASON KRAMER, EAI Special Agent, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in his individual and official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHNNIE GODDARD, Deputy Secretary of Corrections, in his individual and official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KEVIN STANSBURY, Mental Health Counselor, Corizon Health, Inc. @ Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in his individual and official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DEVIN CARPENTER, EAI Special Agent, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in his individual and official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PATRICK C. LYNN
Represented By: Patrick C. Lynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?