Maxfield, et al v. Cox
Plaintiff / Appellee: STEVEN G. MAXFIELD, MORRIS MAXFIELD and DANIEL NEWBY
Defendant / Appellant: SPENCER COX, in his official capacity as Lieutenant Governor of Utah
Case Number: 20-4079
Filed: August 5, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order [10770556] Order filed by Judges Bacharach and Phillips granting Appellant's motion to extend time to file the opening brief and appendix until 10/28/2020 for Spencer Cox. Served on 09/15/2020. [20-4079] [Entered: 09/15/2020 03:56 PM]
September 15, 2020 [10770391] Motion filed by Appellant Spencer Cox to extend time to file appellant/petitioner's brief until 10/28/2020. Served on: 09/15/2020. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-4079] ETM [Entered: 09/15/2020 11:33 AM]
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order [10767466] Order filed by Judges Tymkovich and Kelly granting appellant Lieutenant Governor Coxs motion for a stay of district court proceedings pending this courts decision in this interlocutory appeal. Served on 09/02/2020. [20-4079] [Entered: 09/02/2020 02:00 PM]
August 27, 2020 [10766070] Reply filed by Spencer Cox to Reply in Support of Motion for Stay Pending Interlocutory Appeal. Served on 08/27/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-4079] CJ [Entered: 08/27/2020 01:36 PM]
August 20, 2020 [10764335] Entry of appearance submitted by David N. Wolf, Lance Sorenson for Appellant Spencer Cox for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 08/20/2020. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 08/20/2020 by MLB to remove pdf from docket; entry filed on 8/20/20][20-4079] CJ [Entered: 08/20/2020 10:26 AM]
August 20, 2020 [10764341] Entry of appearance filed by Lance Sorenson and Mr. David N. Wolf for Spencer Cox. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n (all parties previously disclosed). Served on 08/20/2020. Manner of Service: email [20-4079] [Entered: 08/20/2020 10:33 AM]
August 20, 2020 [10764457] Response filed by Morris Maxfield, Steven G. Maxfield and Daniel Newby to Utah Lieutenant Governor Spencer Cox's Motion for Stay Pending Interlocutory Appeal. Served on 08/20/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-4079] TJL [Entered: 08/20/2020 03:02 PM]
August 19, 2020 [10764200] Entry of appearance filed by Trevor J Lee and Mr. Brent V. Manning for Daniel Newby, Steven G. Maxfield and Morris Maxfield. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 08/19/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-4079] [Entered: 08/19/2020 05:25 PM]
August 19, 2020 [10764114] Entry of appearance submitted by Brent V. Manning and Trevor J. Lee for Appellees Morris Maxfield, Steven G. Maxfield and Daniel Newby for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 08/19/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-4079]--[Edited 08/19/2020 by JM PDF removed filed by the court on 8/19/20.] TJL [Entered: 08/19/2020 02:29 PM]
August 19, 2020 [10763994] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 08/19/2020. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 09/28/2020 for Spencer Cox. [20-4079] [Entered: 08/19/2020 11:13 AM]
August 14, 2020 [10762942] Entry of appearance filed by Catherine Jordan and Erin T. Middleton for Spencer Cox. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 08/13/2020. Manner of Service: email [20-4079] [Entered: 08/14/2020 10:15 AM]
August 14, 2020 [10762884] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 08/21/2020 for D. Mark Jones, Clerk of Court. (Text Only - No Attachment) [20-4079] [Entered: 08/14/2020 07:54 AM]
August 13, 2020 [10762868] Entry of appearance submitted by Erin T. Middleton and Catherine F, Jordan for Appellant Spencer Cox for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 08/13/2020. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 08/14/2020 by MLB to remove pdf from docket; entry filed on 8/14/20][20-4079] ETM [Entered: 08/13/2020 08:41 PM]
August 13, 2020 [10762869] Notice filed that the transcript is already on file in the district court filed by Spencer Cox. Served on: 08/13/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-4079] ETM [Entered: 08/13/2020 08:56 PM]
August 13, 2020 [10762870] Docketing statement filed by Spencer Cox. Served on 08/13/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-4079] ETM [Entered: 08/13/2020 09:00 PM]
August 10, 2020 [10761650] Motion filed by Appellant Spencer Cox for stay of Motion for Stay Pending Interlocutory Appeal. Served on: 08/10/2020. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-4079] CJ [Entered: 08/10/2020 12:08 PM]
August 5, 2020 [10760690] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 08/05/2020. Transcript order form and docketing statement due 08/19/2020 for Spencer Cox. Notice of appearance due on 08/19/2020 for Spencer Cox, Morris Maxfield, Steven G. Maxfield and Daniel Newby. [20-4079] [Entered: 08/05/2020 03:19 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Maxfield, et al v. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STEVEN G. MAXFIELD
Represented By: Brent V. Manning
Represented By: Trevor J. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MORRIS MAXFIELD
Represented By: Brent V. Manning
Represented By: Trevor J. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DANIEL NEWBY
Represented By: Brent V. Manning
Represented By: Trevor J. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: SPENCER COX, in his official capacity as Lieutenant Governor of Utah
Represented By: Catherine Jordan
Represented By: David N. Wolf
Represented By: Erin T. Middleton
Represented By: Lance Sorenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?