ClearOne v. Chiang, et al
Defendant: LONNY BOWERS, WIDEBAND SOLUTIONS, INC., a Massachusetts corporation, JUN YANG, an individual, BIAMP SYSTEMS, an Oregon corporation, ANDREW CHIANG, an individual and VERSATILE DSP, a Massachusetts corporation
Plaintiff / Appellee: CLEARONE, INC., FKA ClearOne Communications, Inc., a Utah corporation
Interested Party: DONALD BOWERS
Intervenor: DAVID SULLIVAN
Case Number: 20-4105
Filed: October 6, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2020 [10789035] Reply to ClearOne's Opposition to Motion for Stay filed by Donald Bowers. Served on 11/20/2020. Manner of Service: US mail. [20-4105, 20-4108] [Entered: 11/25/2020 02:14 PM]
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order [10788186] Order filed by Judges Briscoe and Phillips denying Appellant's Emergency Motion for Stay filed by Mr. Donald Bowers. Served on 11/23/2020. [20-4105, 20-4108] [Entered: 11/23/2020 04:06 PM]
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order [10787421] Order filed by Judge Tymkovich denying Appellant's motion to appoint attorney filed by Donald Bowers. Served on 11/19/2020. [20-4105, 20-4108] [Entered: 11/19/2020 12:14 PM]
November 19, 2020 [10787390] Appellant's motion filed by Donald Bowers to appoint counsel. Served on 11/17/2020. Manner of Service: US mail. [20-4105, 20-4108] [Entered: 11/19/2020 11:25 AM]
November 17, 2020 [10786818] Response filed by ClearOne, Inc. in 20-4105, 20-4108 to Appellant Donald Bowers' Emergency Motion for Stay. Served on 11/17/2020. Manner of Service: email, US mail. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-4105, 20-4108] JFP [Entered: 11/17/2020 09:24 PM]
November 4, 2020 [10783702] Order filed by Clerk of the Court - Appellee is ordered to respond to the motion for stay on or before 11/17/2020. Served on 11/04/2020. [20-4105, 20-4108] [Entered: 11/04/2020 02:23 PM]
November 4, 2020 [10783647] Exhibit 1 with Emergency Motion for Stay filed by Donald Bowers. Served on 11/02/2020. Manner of Service: US mail. [20-4105, 20-4108] [Entered: 11/04/2020 11:51 AM]
November 3, 2020 [10783374] Appellant's Emergency Motion for Stay filed by Mr. Donald Bowers in 20-4105, 20-4108. Served on 11/02/2020. Manner of Service: US mail. [20-4105, 20-4108] [Entered: 11/03/2020 12:37 PM]
October 22, 2020 [10780755] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 1. Volume I - Pleadings. [20-4105, 20-4108] [Entered: 10/22/2020 02:05 PM]
October 21, 2020 [10780421] Jurisdictional review complete. Record on appeal 10th circuit due 11/12/2020. Appellant's brief due on 11/30/2020 for Donald Bowers. [20-4105, 20-4108] [Entered: 10/21/2020 03:50 PM]
October 21, 2020 [10780415] District court order granting leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. [20-4105, 20-4108] [Entered: 10/21/2020 03:47 PM]
October 15, 2020 [10778752] Order filed by Clerk of the Court consolidating appeal Nos. 20-4105 and 20-4108 for procedural purposes including briefing and submission to the court. See order for additional information. Served on 10/15/2020. [20-4105, 20-4108] [Entered: 10/15/2020 01:19 PM]
October 7, 2020 [10776517] Entry of appearance filed by James E. Magleby and Jennifer Fraser Parrish for ClearOne, Inc.. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 10/06/2020. Manner of Service: US mail [20-4105] [Entered: 10/07/2020 07:00 AM]
October 6, 2020 [10776512] Entry of appearance submitted by James E. Magleby and Jennifer Fraser Parrish for Appellee ClearOne, Inc. for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 10/06/2020. Manner of Service: US mail. [20-4105]--[Edited 10/07/2020 by DJD. PDF removed as pleading filed 10/7/20] JFP [Entered: 10/06/2020 05:22 PM]
October 6, 2020 [10776285] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 10/05/2020. Fee or IFP forms due in district court 11/05/2020 for Donald Bowers. Notice of appearance due on 11/05/2020 for Donald Bowers. Notice of appearance due on 10/20/2020 for ClearOne, Inc. [20-4105] [Entered: 10/06/2020 09:31 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: ClearOne v. Chiang, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LONNY BOWERS
Represented By: Robb B. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WIDEBAND SOLUTIONS, INC., a Massachusetts corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUN YANG, an individual
Represented By: Jun Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BIAMP SYSTEMS, an Oregon corporation
Represented By: Jacob Daniel Koering
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Fitzgerald
Represented By: E. Scott Savage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW CHIANG, an individual
Represented By: Andrew Chiang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VERSATILE DSP, a Massachusetts corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CLEARONE, INC., FKA ClearOne Communications, Inc., a Utah corporation
Represented By: Jason A. McNeill
Represented By: Jennifer Fraser Parrish
Represented By: James E. Magleby
Represented By: Christine T. Greenwood
Represented By: Richard D. Burbidge
Represented By: Benjamin W. Lieberman
Represented By: Jefferson Wright Gross
Represented By: Christopher M. Von Maack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: DONALD BOWERS
Represented By: Donald Bowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: DAVID SULLIVAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?