St. Francis Hospital, et al v. Azar
Plaintiff / Appellant: ST. JOHN MEDICAL CENTER, AHS HILLCREST MEDICAL CENTER, LLC and ST. FRANCIS HOSPITAL, INC.
Defendant / Appellee: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Case Number: 20-5097
Filed: October 6, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2020 [10787791] Attorney Ms. Juliet M. McBride for St. John Medical Center, AHS Hillcrest Medical Center, LLC and St. Francis Hospital, Inc. admitted to the bar of this court. [20-5097] [Entered: 11/20/2020 02:59 PM]
November 12, 2020 [10785355] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting the parties' Joint Motion to Govern Future Proceedings and to Use a Deferred Joint Appendix. Appellants uncited opening brief is due on 01/15/2021 for AHS Hillcrest Medical Center, LLC, St. Francis Hospital, Inc. and St. John Medical Center. See order for additional briefing dates. Requests to extend this briefing schedule will not be viewed favorably. See order for additional instructions. Served on 11/12/2020. [20-5097] [Entered: 11/12/2020 10:00 AM]
November 10, 2020 [10785105] Motion filed by Appellants AHS Hillcrest Medical Center, LLC, St. Francis Hospital, Inc. and St. John Medical Center to extend time to file appellant/petitioner's brief until 01/15/2021, to extend time to file appellee/respondent's brief until 03/01/2021, to extend time to file a reply brief until 03/22/2021, to defer filing the appendix until 03/29/2021. Served on: 11/10/2020. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-5097] DJH [Entered: 11/10/2020 03:17 PM]
October 22, 2020 [10780567] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 10/22/2020. Appellants' brief and appendix due on 12/01/2020 for AHS Hillcrest Medical Center, LLC, St. Francis Hospital, Inc. and St. John Medical Center. [20-5097] [Entered: 10/22/2020 09:21 AM]
October 20, 2020 [10779980] Entry of appearance filed by Kyle T. Edwards for Mr. Alex M. Azar, II. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 10/20/2020. Manner of Service: email [20-5097] [Entered: 10/20/2020 03:21 PM]
October 20, 2020 [10779973] Entry of appearance submitted by Kyle T. Edwards for Appellee Mr. Alex M. Azar, II for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 10/20/2020. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 10/20/2020 by MLB to remove pdf from docket; entry filed on 10/20/20][20-5097] KTE [Entered: 10/20/2020 03:13 PM]
October 20, 2020 [10779753] Admissions letter sent. Response date set to 11/19/2020 for Juliet M. McBride. [20-5097] [Entered: 10/20/2020 09:57 AM]
October 20, 2020 [10779640] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Abby Christine Wright for Mr. Alex M. Azar, II. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 10/20/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-5097] [Entered: 10/20/2020 07:30 AM]
October 19, 2020 [10779600] Entry of appearance submitted by Abby C. Wright for Appellee Mr. Alex M. Azar, II for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 10/19/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-5097]--[Edited 10/20/2020 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] ACW [Entered: 10/19/2020 05:11 PM]
October 19, 2020 [10779536] Entry of appearance filed by Daniel John Hettich and Juliet M. McBride for St. John Medical Center, AHS Hillcrest Medical Center, LLC and St. Francis Hospital, Inc. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. (Previously disclosed.) Served on 10/19/2020. Manner of Service: email [20-5097] [Entered: 10/19/2020 03:28 PM]
October 19, 2020 [10779513] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 10/26/2020 for Mark C. McCartt, Clerk of Court (oclk). (Text Only - No Attachment) [20-5097] [Entered: 10/19/2020 03:03 PM]
October 19, 2020 [10779493] Entry of appearance submitted by Daniel J. Hettich; Juliet M. McBride for Appellants AHS Hillcrest Medical Center, LLC, St. Francis Hospital, Inc. and St. John Medical Center for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 10/19/2020. Manner of Service: email, US mail. [20-5097]--[Edited 10/19/2020 by DJD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 10/19/20] DJH [Entered: 10/19/2020 02:46 PM]
October 19, 2020 [10779487] Notice received from AHS Hillcrest Medical Center, LLC, St. Francis Hospital, Inc. and St. John Medical Center that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. Served on: 10/19/2020. Manner of Service: email, US mail [20-5097] DJH [Entered: 10/19/2020 02:41 PM]
October 19, 2020 [10779484] Docketing statement filed by AHS Hillcrest Medical Center, LLC, St. Francis Hospital, Inc. and St. John Medical Center. Served on 10/19/2020. Manner of Service: email, US mail. [20-5097] DJH [Entered: 10/19/2020 02:37 PM]
October 6, 2020 [10776340] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 10/06/2020. Docketing statement due 10/20/2020 for AHS Hillcrest Medical Center, LLC, St. Francis Hospital, Inc., and St. John Medical Center. Transcript order form due 10/20/2020 for AHS Hillcrest Medical Center, LLC, St. Francis Hospital, Inc., and St. John Medical Center. Notice of appearance due on 10/20/2020 for AHS Hillcrest Medical Center, LLC, Alex M. Azar II, St. Francis Hospital, Inc., and St. John Medical Center. [20-5097] [Entered: 10/06/2020 11:04 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: St. Francis Hospital, et al v. Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ST. JOHN MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Juliet M. McBride
Represented By: Daniel John Hettich
Represented By: Kristen Pence Evans
Represented By: Steven William Soule
Represented By: John W. Dowdell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: AHS HILLCREST MEDICAL CENTER, LLC
Represented By: Juliet M. McBride
Represented By: Daniel John Hettich
Represented By: Kristen Pence Evans
Represented By: Steven William Soule
Represented By: John W. Dowdell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ST. FRANCIS HOSPITAL, INC.
Represented By: Juliet M. McBride
Represented By: Daniel John Hettich
Represented By: Kristen Pence Evans
Represented By: Steven William Soule
Represented By: John W. Dowdell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Represented By: Cathryn Dawn McClanahan
Represented By: Jonathan Claude Brumer
Represented By: Kyle T. Edwards
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?