Schell v. Gurich, et al
Defendant / Appellee: MARK E. FIELDS, member, Oklahoma Bar Association Board of Governors, JUSTICE JAMES E. EDMONDSON, Associate Justice of the Oklahoma Supreme Court, JOHN MORRIS WILLIAMS, Executive Director, Oklahoma Bar Association and Secretary/Treasurer, Oklahoma Bar Association Board of Governors, BRANDI N. NOWAKOWSKI, Member, Oklahoma Bar Association Board of Governors, BRIAN K. MORTON, Member, Oklahoma Bar Association Board of Governors, BRYON J. WILL, Member, Oklahom Bar Association Board of Governors, KIMBERLY HAYES, Past President Oklahoma Bar Association Board of Governors, LANE R. NEAL, Vice President, Oklahom Bar Association Board of Governors, MATTHEW C. BEESE, member, Oklahoma Bar Association Board of Governors, JUSTICE TOM COLBERT, Associate Justice of the Oklahoma Supreme Court, CHIEF JUSTICE NOMA D. GURICH, Chief Justice of the Oklahoma Supreme Court, JIMMY D. OLIVER, Member, Oklahoma Bar Association Board of Governors, CHARLES W CHESNUT, President, Oklahoma Bar Association Board of Governors, BRIAN T. HERMANSON, member Oklahoma Bar Association Board of Governors, D. KENYON WILLIAMS, JR., Member, Oklahoma Bar Association Board of Governors, JOHN DOE, successor to Patrick Wyrick as AssociateJustice of the Oklahoam Supreme Court, MILES T. PRINGLE, Member, Oklahoma Bar Association Board of Governors, JANE DOE, successor to John Reif as Associate Justice of the Oklahoma Surpeme Court, JUSTICE RICHARD DARBY, Associate Justice of the Oklahoma Supreme Court, TIMOTHY E. DECLERCK, member, Oklahoma Bar Association Board of Governors, JUSTICE YVONEE KAUGER, Associate Justice of the Oklahoma Supreme Court, DAVID T. MCKENZIE, Member, Oklahoma Bar Association Board of Governors, SUSAN B. SHIELDS, President-Elect, Oklahoma Bar Association Board of Governors, JAMES R. HICKS, member Oklahoma Bar Association board of Governors, ANDREW E. HUTTER, Member Oklahoma Bar Association Board of Governors, JUSTICE DOUG COMBS, Associate Justice of the Oklahoma Supreme Court, JUSTICE JAMES R. WINCHESTER, Associate Justice of the Oklahoma Supreme Court, JAMES E. EDMONDSON, Justice of the Oklahoma Supreme Court, NOMA D. GURICH, Chief Justice of the Oklahoma Supreme Court, CHARLES W. CHESNUT, Member, Oklahoma Bar Association Board of Governors, YVONNE KAUGER, Justice of the Oklahoma Supreme Court, JOSHUA A. EDWARDS, Member, Oklahoma Bar Association Board of Governors, SUSAN B. SHIELDS, Member, Oklahoma Bar Association Board of Governors, AMBER PECKIO GARRETT, Member, Oklahoma Bar Association Board of Governors, ANDREW E. HUTTER, Member, Oklahoma Bar Association Board of Governors, BRIAN T. HERMANSON, Member, Oklahoma Bar Association Board of Governors, MICHAEL J. DAVIS, Member, Oklahoma Bar Association Board of Governors, JAMES R. WINCHESTER, Justice of the Oklahoma Supreme Court, JOHN MORRIS WILLIAMS, Executive Director, Oklahoma Bar Association, DOUG COMBS, Justice of the Oklahoma Supreme Court, ROBIN L. ROCHELLE, Member, Oklahoma Bar Association Board of Governors, MICHAEL C. MORDY, Member, Oklahoma Bar Association Board of Governors, JANE DOE, successor to John Reif as Associate Justice of the Oklahoma Supreme Court, M. JOHN KANE, IV, Justice of the Oklahoma Supreme Court, DUSTIN ROWE, Justice of the Oklahoma Supreme Court, JOHN M. WILLIAMS, Executive Director, Oklahoma Bar Association, JORDAN L. HAYGOOD, Member, Oklahoma Bar Association Board of Governors, BRYON J. WILL, Member, Oklahoma Bar Association Board of Governors, RICHARD DARBY, Justice of the Oklahoma Supreme Court, TOM COLBERT, Justice of the Oklahoma Supreme Court, LANE R. NEAL, Vice President, Oklahoma Bar Association Board of Governors and JOHN DOE, Successor to Patrick Wyrick as Associate Justice of the Oklahoma Supreme Court
Plaintiff / Appellant: MARK E. SCHELL
Case Number: 20-6044
Filed: April 2, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2020 [10741328] Minute order filed - the brief and appendix submitted by appellant are accepted for filing. Per the Court's General Order of March 16, 2020, paper copies are not required at this time. Parties may be directed to file paper copies at a later date. Appellees' brief now due 06/18/2020 for Brian K. Morton, D. Kenyon Williams Jr., Matthew C. Beese, Richard Darby, Robin L. Rochelle, Amber Peckio Garrett, Jordan L. Haygood, Michael C. Mordy, Michael J. Davis, Joshua A. Edwards, James R. Winchester, M. John Kane IV, Dustin Rowe, Noma D. Gurich, Tom Colbert, David T. McKenzie, Doug Combs, Timothy E. DeClerck, James E. Edmondson, Charles W. Chesnut, John M. Williams, Brandi N. Nowakowski, Miles T. Pringle, Susan B. Shields, Brian T. Hermanson, Andrew E. Hutter and Yvonne Kauger. (Text Only - No Attachment) [20-6044] [Entered: 05/19/2020 02:16 PM]
May 19, 2020 [10741304] Appellant/Petitioner's brief filed by Mark E. Schell. Served on 05/19/2020 by email. Oral argument requested? Yes. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-6044] AJD [Entered: 05/19/2020 01:15 PM]
May 19, 2020 [10741153] Notice of appellant's deficient brief received from Mark E. Schell. See attached letter for specifics. Appellant's corrected brief due on 05/22/2020 for Mark E. Schell. [20-6044] [Entered: 05/19/2020 07:46 AM]
May 18, 2020 [10741080] Appellant's appendix filed by Mark E. Schell. Total number of volumes filed: 1. Served on 05/18/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-6044] AJD [Entered: 05/18/2020 03:31 PM]
May 18, 2020 This entry has been removed from the docket. A corrected brief was filed on 05/19/2020. [SLS]. [10741078] Appellant/Petitioner's brief filed by Mark E. Schell. Served on 05/18/2020 by email. Oral argument requested? Yes. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-6044] --[Edited 05/19/2020 by SLS to note the brief has been cited as deficient.] AJD [Entered: 05/18/2020 03:30 PM]
April 30, 2020 [10736921] Order filed by Clerk of the Court clarifying the appellees on appeal and amending the official caption. See order for details. Served on 04/30/2020. [20-6044] [Entered: 04/30/2020 10:33 AM]
April 27, 2020 [10736170] Response filed by Mark E. Schell, All Defendants-Appellees to April 17, 2020 Court Order. Served on 04/27/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-6044] JHH [Entered: 04/27/2020 04:26 PM]
April 17, 2020 [10734066] Order filed by Clerk of the Court directing the attorneys in this appeal to file a joint response to items set forth in the attached order by 04/27/2020. (Response due for Jacob H Huebert, Timothy Sandefur, Charles Stephen Rogers, Anthony J. Dick, Kieran D. Maye, Jr., Leslie M. Maye, Michael Burrage, Heather L. Hintz and Thomas Gilmer Wolfe.) Served on 04/17/2020. (See the attachment for the order.) [20-6044] [Entered: 04/17/2020 04:34 PM]
April 17, 2020 [10734040] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Heather L. Hintz and Mr. Thomas G. Wolfe for Susan B. Shields, Michael C. Mordy, Charles W. Chesnut, Brian T. Hermanson, Michael J. Davis, David T. McKenzie, Timothy E. DeClerck, Andrew E. Hutter, D. Kenyon Williams, Jr., Matthew C. Beese, Joshua A. Edwards, Robin L. Rochelle, Amber Peckio Garrett, Brian K. Morton, Miles T. Pringle, Brandi N. Nowakowski, and Jordan L. Haygood, and John M. Williams. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 04/17/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-6044] [Entered: 04/17/2020 03:36 PM]
April 16, 2020 [10733709] Entry of appearance submitted by Heather L. Hintz and Thomas G. Wolfe for Appellees Matthew C. Beese, Charles W Chesnut, Timothy E. DeClerck, Brian T. Hermanson, Andrew E. Hutter, Mr. David T. McKenzie, Brian K. Morton, Brandi N. Nowakowski, Miles T. Pringle, Susan B. Shields, D. Kenyon Williams, Jr. and John Morris WilliamsMichael C. Mordy; Michael J. Davis; Joshua A. Edwards; Robin L. Rochelle; Amber Peckio Garrett; Jordan L. Haygood for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 04/16/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-6044]--[Edited 04/17/2020 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] HLH [Entered: 04/16/2020 03:58 PM]
April 16, 2020 [10733706] Entry of appearance filed by Michael Burrage for Susan B. Shields, Michael C. Mordy, Charles W. Chesnut, Brian T. Hermanson, Michael J. Davis, David T. McKenzie, Andrew E. Hutter, D. Kenyon Williams, Jr., Matthew C. Beese, Joshua A. Edwards, Robin L. Rochelle, Amber Peckio Garrett, Brian K. Morton, Miles T. Pringle, Brandi N. Nowakowski, Jordan L. Haygood and John M. Williams. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 04/16/2020. Manner of Service: email [20-6044] --[Edited 04/20/2020 by SLS to add parties to docket text.] [Entered: 04/16/2020 03:58 PM]
April 16, 2020 [10733696] Entry of appearance filed by Leslie M. Maye and Kieran D. Maye, Jr. for Richard Darby, Tom Colbert, James R. Winchester, Noma D. Gurich, Doug Combs, James E. Edmondson, Yvonne Kauger, M. John Kane, IV and Dustin Rowe. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 04/16/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-6044] --[Edited docket text 04/17/2020 by SLS to add parties.] [Entered: 04/16/2020 03:37 PM]
April 16, 2020 [10733692] Entry of appearance submitted by Michael Burrage for Appellees Susan B. Shields, Charles W Chesnut, Brian T. Hermanson, Mr. David T. McKenzie, Andrew E. Hutter, D. Kenyon Williams, Jr., Matthew C. Beese, Brian K. Morton, Miles T. Pringle and Brandi N. NowakowskiMichael C. Mordy; Michael J. Davis; Joshua A. Edwards; Robin L. Rochelle; Amber Peckio Garrett; Jordan L. Haygood; John M. Williams, in his official capacity as the Executive Director of the Oklahoma Bar Association for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 04/16/2020. Manner of Service: email.--[Edited 04/16/2020 by MLB to remove pdf from docket; entry filed on 4/16/20] [20-6044] MB [Entered: 04/16/2020 03:24 PM]
April 16, 2020 [10733450] Entry of appearance submitted by Kieran D. Maye, Jr. and Leslie M. Maye for Appellees Tom Colbert, Doug Combs, James E. Edmondson, Noma D. Gurich, Yvonne Kauger, James R. Winchester and Mr. Richard DarbyM. John Kane, IV and Dustin P. Rowe for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 04/16/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-6044] --[Edited 04/16/2020 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] KDM [Entered: 04/16/2020 09:19 AM]
April 8, 2020 [10731594] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 04/08/2020. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 05/18/2020 for Mark E. Schell. [20-6044] [Entered: 04/08/2020 02:37 PM]
April 8, 2020 [10731524] Entry of appearance filed by Anthony J. Dick for Mark E. Schell. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y (parties named previously disclosed). Served on 04/08/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-6044] [Entered: 04/08/2020 12:01 PM]
April 8, 2020 [10731521] Entry of appearance submitted by Anthony John Dick for Appellant Mark E. Schell for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 04/08/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-6044] --[Edited 04/08/2020 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] AJD [Entered: 04/08/2020 11:38 AM]
April 6, 2020 [10730666] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Charles Stephen Rogers for Mark E. Schell. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Parties listed have previously been disclosed to the court. Served on 04/04/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-6044] [Entered: 04/06/2020 07:51 AM]
April 4, 2020 [10730633] Entry of appearance submitted by Charles S. Rogers for Appellant Mark E. Schell for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 04/04/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-6044]--[Edited 04/06/2020 by JM PDF removed filed by the court on 4/6/20.] CSR [Entered: 04/04/2020 04:21 PM]
April 3, 2020 [10730521] Entry of appearance filed by Jacob H Huebert and Timothy Sandefur for Mark E. Schell. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 04/03/2020. Manner of Service: email [20-6044] [Entered: 04/03/2020 12:57 PM]
April 3, 2020 [10730516] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 04/10/2020 for Carmelita Reeder Shinn. (Text Only - No Attachment) [20-6044] [Entered: 04/03/2020 12:50 PM]
April 3, 2020 [10730513] Docketing statement filed by Mark E. Schell. Served on 04/03/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-6044] JHH [Entered: 04/03/2020 12:44 PM]
April 3, 2020 [10730511] Notice received from Mark E. Schell that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. Served on: 04/03/2020. Manner of Service: email [20-6044] JHH [Entered: 04/03/2020 12:43 PM]
April 3, 2020 [10730508] Entry of appearance submitted by Jacob Huebert; Timothy Sandefur for Appellant Mark E. Schell for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 04/03/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-6044]--[Edited 04/03/2020 by DJD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 4/3/20] JHH [Entered: 04/03/2020 12:42 PM]
April 2, 2020 [10730202] Amended notice of appeal filed. [20-6044] [Entered: 04/02/2020 01:53 PM]
April 2, 2020 [10730200] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 04/02/2020 Docketing statement due 04/16/2020 for Mark E. Schell. Transcript order form due 04/16/2020 for Mark E. Schell. Notice of appearance due on 04/16/2020 for Matthew C. Beese, Charles W Chesnut, Tom Colbert, Doug Combs, Richard Darby, Timothy E. DeClerck, Jane Doe, John Doe, James E. Edmondson, Mark E. Fields, Noma D. Gurich, Kimberly Hayes, Brian T. Hermanson, James R. Hicks, Andrew E. Hutter, Yvonee Kauger, David T. McKenzie, Brian K. Morton, Lane R. Neal, Brandi N. Nowakowski, Jimmy D. Oliver, Miles T. Pringle, Mark E. Schell, Susan B. Shields, Bryon J. Will, D. Kenyon Williams Jr., John Morris Williams and James R. Winchester. [20-6044] [Entered: 04/02/2020 01:49 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Schell v. Gurich, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARK E. FIELDS, member, Oklahoma Bar Association Board of Governors
Represented By: Thomas Gilmer Wolfe
Represented By: Heather L. Hintz
Represented By: Michael Burrage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JUSTICE JAMES E. EDMONDSON, Associate Justice of the Oklahoma Supreme Court
Represented By: Thomas Gilmer Wolfe
Represented By: Heather L. Hintz
Represented By: Kieran D. Maye Jr.
Represented By: Michael Burrage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN MORRIS WILLIAMS, Executive Director, Oklahoma Bar Association and Secretary/Treasurer, Oklahoma Bar Association Board of Governors
Represented By: Thomas Gilmer Wolfe
Represented By: Heather L. Hintz
Represented By: Michael Burrage
Represented By: Patricia Ann Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRANDI N. NOWAKOWSKI, Member, Oklahoma Bar Association Board of Governors
Represented By: Thomas Gilmer Wolfe
Represented By: Heather L. Hintz
Represented By: Michael Burrage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRIAN K. MORTON, Member, Oklahoma Bar Association Board of Governors
Represented By: Thomas Gilmer Wolfe
Represented By: Heather L. Hintz
Represented By: Michael Burrage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRYON J. WILL, Member, Oklahom Bar Association Board of Governors
Represented By: Thomas Gilmer Wolfe
Represented By: Heather L. Hintz
Represented By: Michael Burrage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KIMBERLY HAYES, Past President Oklahoma Bar Association Board of Governors
Represented By: Thomas Gilmer Wolfe
Represented By: Heather L. Hintz
Represented By: Michael Burrage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LANE R. NEAL, Vice President, Oklahom Bar Association Board of Governors
Represented By: Thomas Gilmer Wolfe
Represented By: Heather L. Hintz
Represented By: Michael Burrage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MATTHEW C. BEESE, member, Oklahoma Bar Association Board of Governors
Represented By: Thomas Gilmer Wolfe
Represented By: Heather L. Hintz
Represented By: Michael Burrage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JUSTICE TOM COLBERT, Associate Justice of the Oklahoma Supreme Court
Represented By: Thomas Gilmer Wolfe
Represented By: Heather L. Hintz
Represented By: Kieran D. Maye Jr.
Represented By: Michael Burrage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHIEF JUSTICE NOMA D. GURICH, Chief Justice of the Oklahoma Supreme Court
Represented By: Thomas Gilmer Wolfe
Represented By: Heather L. Hintz
Represented By: Kieran D. Maye Jr.
Represented By: Michael Burrage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JIMMY D. OLIVER, Member, Oklahoma Bar Association Board of Governors
Represented By: Thomas Gilmer Wolfe
Represented By: Heather L. Hintz
Represented By: Michael Burrage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHARLES W CHESNUT, President, Oklahoma Bar Association Board of Governors
Represented By: Thomas Gilmer Wolfe
Represented By: Heather L. Hintz
Represented By: Michael Burrage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRIAN T. HERMANSON, member Oklahoma Bar Association Board of Governors
Represented By: Thomas Gilmer Wolfe
Represented By: Heather L. Hintz
Represented By: Michael Burrage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: D. KENYON WILLIAMS, JR., Member, Oklahoma Bar Association Board of Governors
Represented By: Thomas Gilmer Wolfe
Represented By: Heather L. Hintz
Represented By: Michael Burrage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN DOE, successor to Patrick Wyrick as AssociateJustice of the Oklahoam Supreme Court
Represented By: Heather L. Hintz
Represented By: Michael Burrage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MILES T. PRINGLE, Member, Oklahoma Bar Association Board of Governors
Represented By: Thomas Gilmer Wolfe
Represented By: Heather L. Hintz
Represented By: Michael Burrage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JANE DOE, successor to John Reif as Associate Justice of the Oklahoma Surpeme Court
Represented By: Heather L. Hintz
Represented By: Michael Burrage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JUSTICE RICHARD DARBY, Associate Justice of the Oklahoma Supreme Court
Represented By: Thomas Gilmer Wolfe
Represented By: Heather L. Hintz
Represented By: Kieran D. Maye Jr.
Represented By: Michael Burrage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TIMOTHY E. DECLERCK, member, Oklahoma Bar Association Board of Governors
Represented By: Thomas Gilmer Wolfe
Represented By: Heather L. Hintz
Represented By: Michael Burrage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JUSTICE YVONEE KAUGER, Associate Justice of the Oklahoma Supreme Court
Represented By: Thomas Gilmer Wolfe
Represented By: Heather L. Hintz
Represented By: Kieran D. Maye Jr.
Represented By: Michael Burrage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID T. MCKENZIE, Member, Oklahoma Bar Association Board of Governors
Represented By: Thomas Gilmer Wolfe
Represented By: Heather L. Hintz
Represented By: Michael Burrage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SUSAN B. SHIELDS, President-Elect, Oklahoma Bar Association Board of Governors
Represented By: Thomas Gilmer Wolfe
Represented By: Heather L. Hintz
Represented By: Michael Burrage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JAMES R. HICKS, member Oklahoma Bar Association board of Governors
Represented By: Thomas Gilmer Wolfe
Represented By: Heather L. Hintz
Represented By: Michael Burrage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANDREW E. HUTTER, Member Oklahoma Bar Association Board of Governors
Represented By: Thomas Gilmer Wolfe
Represented By: Heather L. Hintz
Represented By: Michael Burrage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JUSTICE DOUG COMBS, Associate Justice of the Oklahoma Supreme Court
Represented By: Thomas Gilmer Wolfe
Represented By: Heather L. Hintz
Represented By: Kieran D. Maye Jr.
Represented By: Michael Burrage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JUSTICE JAMES R. WINCHESTER, Associate Justice of the Oklahoma Supreme Court
Represented By: Thomas Gilmer Wolfe
Represented By: Heather L. Hintz
Represented By: Kieran D. Maye Jr.
Represented By: Michael Burrage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JAMES E. EDMONDSON, Justice of the Oklahoma Supreme Court
Represented By: Kieran D. Maye Jr.
Represented By: Leslie M. Maye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NOMA D. GURICH, Chief Justice of the Oklahoma Supreme Court
Represented By: Kieran D. Maye Jr.
Represented By: Leslie M. Maye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHARLES W. CHESNUT, Member, Oklahoma Bar Association Board of Governors
Represented By: Thomas Gilmer Wolfe
Represented By: Heather L. Hintz
Represented By: Michael Burrage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: YVONNE KAUGER, Justice of the Oklahoma Supreme Court
Represented By: Kieran D. Maye Jr.
Represented By: Leslie M. Maye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOSHUA A. EDWARDS, Member, Oklahoma Bar Association Board of Governors
Represented By: Thomas Gilmer Wolfe
Represented By: Heather L. Hintz
Represented By: Michael Burrage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SUSAN B. SHIELDS, Member, Oklahoma Bar Association Board of Governors
Represented By: Thomas Gilmer Wolfe
Represented By: Heather L. Hintz
Represented By: Michael Burrage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMBER PECKIO GARRETT, Member, Oklahoma Bar Association Board of Governors
Represented By: Thomas Gilmer Wolfe
Represented By: Heather L. Hintz
Represented By: Michael Burrage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANDREW E. HUTTER, Member, Oklahoma Bar Association Board of Governors
Represented By: Thomas Gilmer Wolfe
Represented By: Heather L. Hintz
Represented By: Michael Burrage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRIAN T. HERMANSON, Member, Oklahoma Bar Association Board of Governors
Represented By: Thomas Gilmer Wolfe
Represented By: Heather L. Hintz
Represented By: Michael Burrage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHAEL J. DAVIS, Member, Oklahoma Bar Association Board of Governors
Represented By: Thomas Gilmer Wolfe
Represented By: Heather L. Hintz
Represented By: Michael Burrage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JAMES R. WINCHESTER, Justice of the Oklahoma Supreme Court
Represented By: Kieran D. Maye Jr.
Represented By: Leslie M. Maye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN MORRIS WILLIAMS, Executive Director, Oklahoma Bar Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DOUG COMBS, Justice of the Oklahoma Supreme Court
Represented By: Kieran D. Maye Jr.
Represented By: Leslie M. Maye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROBIN L. ROCHELLE, Member, Oklahoma Bar Association Board of Governors
Represented By: Thomas Gilmer Wolfe
Represented By: Heather L. Hintz
Represented By: Michael Burrage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHAEL C. MORDY, Member, Oklahoma Bar Association Board of Governors
Represented By: Thomas Gilmer Wolfe
Represented By: Heather L. Hintz
Represented By: Michael Burrage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JANE DOE, successor to John Reif as Associate Justice of the Oklahoma Supreme Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: M. JOHN KANE, IV, Justice of the Oklahoma Supreme Court
Represented By: Kieran D. Maye Jr.
Represented By: Leslie M. Maye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DUSTIN ROWE, Justice of the Oklahoma Supreme Court
Represented By: Kieran D. Maye Jr.
Represented By: Leslie M. Maye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN M. WILLIAMS, Executive Director, Oklahoma Bar Association
Represented By: Thomas Gilmer Wolfe
Represented By: Heather L. Hintz
Represented By: Michael Burrage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JORDAN L. HAYGOOD, Member, Oklahoma Bar Association Board of Governors
Represented By: Thomas Gilmer Wolfe
Represented By: Heather L. Hintz
Represented By: Michael Burrage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRYON J. WILL, Member, Oklahoma Bar Association Board of Governors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RICHARD DARBY, Justice of the Oklahoma Supreme Court
Represented By: Kieran D. Maye Jr.
Represented By: Leslie M. Maye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TOM COLBERT, Justice of the Oklahoma Supreme Court
Represented By: Kieran D. Maye Jr.
Represented By: Leslie M. Maye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LANE R. NEAL, Vice President, Oklahoma Bar Association Board of Governors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN DOE, Successor to Patrick Wyrick as Associate Justice of the Oklahoma Supreme Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARK E. SCHELL
Represented By: Timothy Sandefur
Represented By: Anthony J. Dick
Represented By: Charles Stephen Rogers
Represented By: Jacob H. Huebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?