Thomas v. Hormel, et al
Defendant / Appellee: JOE ALLBAUGH, Individually, DOC Director, JEFFERY TROUT, Individually, Doctor, RICK WHITTEN, Individually, Warden, W. CLAY, Individually, C.O., C. PAYNE, Individually, C.O. 3 (Captain), FNU BOYNSTON, Individually, Sergeant, C.O., DAN GROGAN, Individually, Unit Manager #5, WILLIENELL BRYANT-PITTS, Individually, Doctor, DIRECTOR DOC SCOTT CROW and BETSY HORMEL, Individually, Facility Health Services Administrator
Plaintiff / Appellant: JONATHAN THOMAS
Case Number: 20-6047
Filed: April 9, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
February 16, 2021 Thomas v. Hormel

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2020 [10745513] Order filed by Clerk of the Court assessing costs and fees in the amount of $505. Served on 06/05/2020. [20-6047] [Entered: 06/05/2020 01:46 PM]
June 5, 2020 [10745489] Appellant's motion filed by Jonathan Thomas for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Served on 06/05/2020. Manner of Service: Clerk via email. [20-6047] [Entered: 06/05/2020 01:04 PM]
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order [10745484] Order filed by Judge Tymkovich denying appellant's motion for appointment of counsel. Served on 06/05/2020. (See the attachment for the entire order.) [20-6047] [Entered: 06/05/2020 12:56 PM]
June 5, 2020 [10745465] Opening Brief (supplemental) Motion for Appointment of Counsel filed by Jonathan Thomas. Original and 4 copies. Served on 06/01/2020. Manner of Service: US mail. [20-6047]--[Edited 06/05/2020 by KLP to attach a corrected attachment (removes the 1915 motion and place under seal.)] [Entered: 06/05/2020 12:26 PM]
June 3, 2020 [10744760] Entry of appearance filed by Jonathan Thomas. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 05/27/2020. Manner of Service: US mail [20-6047] [Entered: 06/03/2020 11:47 AM]
June 1, 2020 [10744190] Appellant's brief filed by Jonathan Thomas. Original and 4 copies. Served on 05/27/2020 by US mail. Required 10th Cir. R. 28.2 Attachments Included? n. Appellees' brief due 06/29/2020 for Betsy Hormel, Rick Whitten, Jeffery Trout, Joe Allbaugh, Willienell Bryant-Pitts, C. Payne, FNU Boynston, Dan Grogan and W. Clay [20-6047] [Entered: 06/01/2020 03:35 PM]
June 1, 2020 [10744156] Entry of appearance filed by Jonathan Thomas. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 05/26/2020. Manner of Service: US mail [20-6047] [Entered: 06/01/2020 02:42 PM]
May 13, 2020 [10739981] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 2, Comments: Vol I - Pleadings; Vol II - Sealed Pleadings. [20-6047] [Entered: 05/13/2020 11:29 AM]
May 12, 2020 [10739668] Jurisdictional review complete. Fee or 1915 forms, notice of appearance and appellant's opening brief due on 06/22/2020 for Jonathan Thomas. Record on appeal due for 10th circuit 06/02/2020. [20-6047] [Entered: 05/12/2020 12:11 PM]
May 12, 2020 [10739666] District court order denying 1915(b) motion. [20-6047] [Entered: 05/12/2020 12:09 PM]
May 12, 2020 [10739663] Copy of opposing counsel's entry of appearance received from Jonathan Thomas but not filed. [20-6047] [Entered: 05/12/2020 12:05 PM]
April 30, 2020 [10736974] Notice appellant will order transcripts filed by Jonathan Thomas. Served on 04/21/2020. Manner of Service: US mail. [20-6047] [Entered: 04/30/2020 11:47 AM]
April 20, 2020 [10734199] Entry of appearance filed by Desiree Singer for Rick Whitten, Betsy Hormel, Mr. Joe Allbaugh, Dan Grogan, Jeffery Trout, Willienell Bryant-Pitts, C. Payne, FNU Boynston and W. Clay. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 04/20/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-6047] [Entered: 04/20/2020 11:09 AM]
April 20, 2020 [10734192] Entry of appearance submitted by Desiree D. Singer for Appellees Mr. Joe Allbaugh, FNU Boynston, Willienell Bryant-Pitts, W. Clay, Scott Crow, Dan Grogan, Betsy Hormel, C. Payne and Jeffery Trout for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 04/20/2020. Manner of Service: US mail. [20-6047]--[Edited 04/20/2020 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] DS [Entered: 04/20/2020 10:55 AM]
April 9, 2020 [10731756] Prisoner case docketed. DATE RECEIVED: 04/09/2020. Fee or 1915 forms and notice of appearance due 05/11/2020 for Jonathan Thomas. Notice of appearance due on 04/23/2020 for Joe Allbaugh, FNU Boynston, Willienell Bryant-Pitts, W. Clay, Dan Grogan, Betsy Hormel, C. Payne, Jeffery Trout and Rick Whitten [20-6047] [Entered: 04/09/2020 09:47 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Thomas v. Hormel, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOE ALLBAUGH, Individually, DOC Director
Represented By: Desiree Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JEFFERY TROUT, Individually, Doctor
Represented By: Desiree Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RICK WHITTEN, Individually, Warden
Represented By: Desiree Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: W. CLAY, Individually, C.O.
Represented By: Desiree Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: C. PAYNE, Individually, C.O. 3 (Captain)
Represented By: Desiree Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FNU BOYNSTON, Individually, Sergeant, C.O.
Represented By: Desiree Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAN GROGAN, Individually, Unit Manager #5
Represented By: Desiree Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WILLIENELL BRYANT-PITTS, Individually, Doctor
Represented By: Desiree Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DIRECTOR DOC SCOTT CROW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BETSY HORMEL, Individually, Facility Health Services Administrator
Represented By: Desiree Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JONATHAN THOMAS
Represented By: Jonathan Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?