South Wind Women's Center, et al v. Stitt, et al
Defendant / Appellant: J. KEVIN STITT, in his official capacity as Governor of Oklahoma, DAVID PRATER, in his official capacity as District Attorney for Oklahoma County, GARY COX, in his official capacity as Oklahoma Commissioner of Health, MARK GOWER, in his official capacity as Director of the Oklahoma Department of Emergency Management, GREG MASHBURN, in his official capacity as District Attorney for Cleveland County and MICHAEL HUNTER, in his official capacity as Attorney General of Oklahoma
Plaintiff / Appellee: LARRY A. BURNS, D.O, on behalf of himself and his staff and his patients, COMPREHENSIVE HEALTH OF PLANNED PARENTHOOD GREAT PLAINS INC., on behalf of itself, its physicians and staff, and its patients and SOUTH WIND WOMEN'S CENTER LLC, on behalf of itself, its physicians and staff, and its patients, DBA Trust Women Oklahoma City
Amicus Curiae: DEBORAH ALLEN, RONALD BAYER, MITCHELL KATZ, MARIA GALLO, THE AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE, SUSAN COHN, SIXTY-TWO MEMBERS OF THE OKLAHOMA SENATE AND OKLAHOMA HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES, MICHAEL MINA, JENNIFER NUZZO, KELLI HALL, ELIZABETH JANIAK, NANCY PADIAN, DEBORAH KAPLAN, OXIRIS BARBOT, GINA NOVICK, WAFAA EL-SADR, SAMANTHA GARBERS, OKLAHOMA FAITH LEADERS, JANET TURAN, ANTHONY D. SO, ARCHDIOCESE OF OKLAHOMA CITY, NICOLE LURIE, AMERICAN PUBLIC HEALTH ASSOCIATION, ANDREW GOODMAN, DEBORAH A. BARTZ, GREGG GONSALVES, STEN H. VERMUND, LINDA FRIED, JUDITH N. WASSERHEIT, MARC LIPSITCH, OKLAHOMA BAPTISTS, MARK LURIE, NATHAN D. GRUBAUGH, CAROLINE BUCKEE, HEIDI JONES, MARY ANN CHIASSON, JODIE L. GUEST, KIMBERLY POWERS, CHRIS BEYRER, LESLIE ROBERTS, SAAD B. OMER, POOJA MEHTA, DEBORAH COTTON, JOSHUA SALOMON, ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESE OF TULSA, ROGER ROCHAT, MARGARET A. HAMBURG, JULIE WOMACK, CELINE R. GOUNDER, ALICE CHEN, EVA HARRIS, CATHOLIC CONFERENCE OF OKLAHOMA, SANDRO GALEA, JONATHAN FIELDING, NANCY KRIEGER, BARBARA FERRER and ANDREA SWARTZENDRUBER
Case Number: 20-6055
Filed: April 21, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
August 18, 2020 South Wind Women's Center v. Stitt

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2020 [10747976] Minute order filed - the brief submitted by appellees is accepted for filing. Per the Court's General Order of March 16, 2020, paper copies are not required at this time. Parties may be directed to file paper copies at a later date. Appellant's optional reply brief now due 06/23/2020 for Gary Cox, Mark Gower, Michael Hunter, Greg Mashburn, David Prater and J. Kevin Stitt. (Text Only - No Attachment) [20-6055] [Entered: 06/17/2020 08:02 AM]
June 16, 2020 [10747932] Appellee/Respondent's brief filed by Larry A. Burns, Comprehensive Health of Planned Parenthood Great Plains Inc. and South Wind Women's Center LLC. Served on: 06/16/2020. Manner of service: email, US mail. Oral argument requested? No. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes.--[Edited 06/17/2020 by MLB correct parties in docket text] [20-6055] LCG [Entered: 06/16/2020 05:03 PM]
May 28, 2020 [10743254] Minute order filed - Appellants' opening brief and the joint appendix are accepted for filing. Per the Court's General Order of March 16, 2020, paper copies are not required at this time. Parties may be directed to file paper copies at a later date. Appellees' response brief due 06/16/2020 for Larry A. Burns, Comprehensive Health of Planned Parenthood Great Plains Inc. and South Wind Women's Center LLC., per the 5/7/20 order. (Text Only - No Attachment) [20-6055] [Entered: 05/28/2020 07:59 AM]
May 27, 2020 [10743204] Appellant's appendix filed by Gary Cox, Mr. Mark Gower, Michael Hunter, Greg Mashburn, David Prater and J. Kevin Stitt. Total number of volumes filed: 4. Served on 05/27/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-6055] ZPW [Entered: 05/27/2020 07:35 PM]
May 27, 2020 [10743203] Appellant/Petitioner's brief filed by Gary Cox, Mr. Mark Gower, Michael Hunter, Greg Mashburn, David Prater and J. Kevin Stitt. Served on 05/27/2020 by email. Oral argument requested? No. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-6055] ZPW [Entered: 05/27/2020 07:31 PM]
May 14, 2020 [10740472] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 05/14/2020. [20-6055] [Entered: 05/14/2020 03:04 PM]
May 7, 2020 [10738556] Order filed by Clerk of the Court - Appellants have filed a transcript order form indicating that the transcripts are already on file. Accordingly, briefing can begin. Appellants opening brief and appendix due on 05/27/2020. Appellees brief due 06/16/2020. Appellants optional reply brief due 06/23/2020. See order for details. Served on 05/07/2020. [20-6055] [Entered: 05/07/2020 08:59 AM]
May 5, 2020 [10738150] Docketing statement filed by Gary Cox, Mr. Mark Gower, Michael Hunter, Greg Mashburn, David Prater and J. Kevin Stitt. Served on 05/05/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-6055] ZPW [Entered: 05/05/2020 08:40 PM]
May 5, 2020 [10738080] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 05/12/2020 for Carmelita Reeder Shinn. (Text Only - No Attachment) [20-6055] [Entered: 05/05/2020 03:24 PM]
May 5, 2020 [10738075] Notice filed that the transcript is already on file in the district court filed by Gary Cox, Mr. Mark Gower, Michael Hunter, Greg Mashburn, David Prater and J. Kevin Stitt. Served on: 05/05/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-6055] BC [Entered: 05/05/2020 03:16 PM]
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order [10736191] Order filed by Judges Lucero, Bacharach and Moritz. Appellants' emergency motion for stay pending appeal is denied, as is the motion to expedite the appeal. filed by Mr. Mark Gower, Greg Mashburn, David Prater, Gary Cox, J. Kevin Stitt and Michael Hunter. Served on 04/27/2020. [20-6055] [Entered: 04/27/2020 05:27 PM]
April 27, 2020 [10736135] Entry of appearance filed by Kevin H. Theriot for Roman Catholic Diocese of Tulsa, Archdiocese of Oklahoma City, Catholic Conference of Oklahoma, Oklahoma Baptists and Oklahoma Faith Leaders. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 04/24/2020. Manner of Service: email [20-6055] [Entered: 04/27/2020 03:37 PM]
April 25, 2020 [10735784] Reply filed by Gary Cox, Mr. Mark Gower, Michael Hunter, Greg Mashburn, David Prater and J. Kevin Stitt to in Support of Appellants' Emergency Motion to Stay. Served on 04/25/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-6055] ZPW [Entered: 04/25/2020 06:19 PM]
April 25, 2020 [10735776] Supplemental authority filed by Larry A. Burns and South Wind Women's Center LLC. Served on 04/25/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-6055] LCG [Entered: 04/25/2020 09:01 AM]
April 24, 2020 [10736214] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. John J. Bursch for Roman Catholic Diocese of Tulsa, Archdiocese of Oklahoma City, Catholic Conference of Oklahoma, Oklahoma Baptists and Oklahoma Faith Leaders. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Parties listed have been previously disclosed to the court. Served on 04/24/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-6055] [Entered: 04/28/2020 07:34 AM]
April 24, 2020 [10735756] Entry of appearance submitted by John J. Bursch for The Roman Catholic Diocese of Tulsa, Archdiocese of Oklahoma City, Catholic Conference of Oklahoma, Oklahoma Baptists, and Oklahoma Faith Leaders for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 04/24/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-6055]--[Edited 04/28/2020 by JM PDF removed filed by the court on 4/24/20. ] JJB [Entered: 04/24/2020 05:24 PM]
April 24, 2020 [10735754] Amicus Curiae brief filed by The Roman Catholic Diocese of Tulsa, Archdiocese of Oklahoma City, Catholic Conference of Oklahoma, Oklahoma Baptists, and Oklahoma Faith Leaders. Served on 04/24/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-6055]--[Edited 04/28/2020 by JM to note brief has been filed.] KHT [Entered: 04/24/2020 05:20 PM]
April 24, 2020 [10735753] Motion submitted by The Roman Catholic Diocese of Tulsa, Archdiocese of Oklahoma City, Catholic Conference of Oklahoma, Oklahoma Baptists, and Oklahoma Faith Leaders for leave to file an amicus brief. Served on: 04/24/2020 Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-6055] KHT [Entered: 04/24/2020 05:18 PM]
April 24, 2020 [10735750] Entry of appearance submitted by Kevin H. Theriot for Roman Catholic Diocese of Tulsa, Archdiocese of Oklahoma City, Catholic Conference of Oklahoma, Oklahoma Baptists, and Oklahoma Faith Leaders for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 04/24/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-6055]--[Edited 04/27/2020 by DJD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 4/27/20] KHT [Entered: 04/24/2020 05:13 PM]
April 24, 2020 [10735610] Entry of appearance filed by Lisa Simpson for American Public Health Association and Julie Womack, Judith N. Wasserheit, Sten H. Vermund, Janet Turan, Andrea Swartzendruber, Anthony D. So, Joshua Salomon, Roger Rochat, Leslie Roberts, Kimberly Powers, Nancy Padian, Saad B. Omer, Jennifer Nuzzo, Gina Novick, Michael Mina, Pooja Mehta, Nicole Lurie, Mark Lurie, Marc Lipsitch, Nancy Krieger, Mitchell Katz, Deborah Kaplan, Heidi Jones, Elizabeth Janiak, Eva Harris, Margaret A. Hamburg, Kelli Hall, Jodie L. Guest, Nathan D. Grubaugh, Celine R. Gounder, Andrew Goodman, Gregg Gonsalves, Samantha Garbers, Maria Gallo, Sandro Galea, Linda Fried, Jonathan Fielding, Barbara Ferrer, Wafaa El-Sadr, Deborah Cotton, Susan Cohn, Mary Ann Chiasson, Alice Chen, Caroline Buckee, Commander Chris Beyrer, Ronald Bayer, Deborah A. Bartz, Oxiris Barbot, and Deborah Allen. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 04/24/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-6055] [Entered: 04/24/2020 01:12 PM]
April 24, 2020 [10735583] Response filed by Larry A. Burns and South Wind Women's Center LLC to Appellants' Motion for Stay (Correcting Table of Contents). Served on 04/24/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-6055] LCG [Entered: 04/24/2020 12:16 PM]
April 24, 2020 [10735576] Entry of appearance submitted by Lisa T. Simpson for American Public Health Association and Public Health Experts ( for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 04/24/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-6055] --[Edited 04/24/2020 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] MRS [Entered: 04/24/2020 12:09 PM]
April 24, 2020 [10735570] Response filed by Larry A. Burns and South Wind Women's Center LLC to Motion to Expedite. Served on 04/24/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-6055] LCG [Entered: 04/24/2020 12:00 PM]
April 24, 2020 [10735569] Amicus Curiae brief filed by American Public Health Association and Public Health Experts. Served on 04/24/2020. Manner of Service: email, US mail. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-6055]--[Edited 04/24/2020 by KLP to change the brief to filed.] MRS [Entered: 04/24/2020 11:59 AM]
April 24, 2020 [10735568] Response filed by Larry A. Burns and South Wind Women's Center LLC to Motion to Stay. Served on 04/24/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-6055] LCG [Entered: 04/24/2020 11:58 AM]
April 24, 2020 [10735548] Entry of appearance filed by J. Blake Patton for South Wind Women's Center LLC, Comprehensive Health of Planned Parenthood Great Plains Inc., Larry A. Burns, Larry A. Burns and South Wind Women's Center LLC. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y (previously reported/already listed). Served on 04/24/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-6055] [Entered: 04/24/2020 11:28 AM]
April 24, 2020 [10735504] Entry of appearance submitted by J. Blake Patton for Appellees Larry A. Burns, Comprehensive Health of Planned Parenthood Great Plains Inc. and South Wind Women's Center LLC for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 04/24/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-6055]--[Edited 04/24/2020 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] TJT [Entered: 04/24/2020 09:51 AM]
April 24, 2020 [10735434] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Jay Sekulow, Mr. Jordan Sekulow, Mr. Stuart J. Roth and Mr. Benjamin P. Sisney for The American Center for Law and Justice and Sixty-Two Members of the Oklahoma Senate and Oklahoma House of Representatives. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 04/24/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-6055] [Entered: 04/24/2020 08:12 AM]
April 23, 2020 [10735394] Entry of appearance submitted by Jay Alan Sekulow, Stuart J. Roth, Jordan Sekulow, and Benjamin P. Sisney for Amici Curiae The American Center for Law and Justice and 62 Members of the Oklahoma Senate and Oklahoma House of Representatives for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 04/23/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-6055]--[Edited 04/24/2020 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] BPS [Entered: 04/23/2020 04:56 PM]
April 23, 2020 [10735370] Amicus Curiae brief filed by Amici Curiae the American Center for Law and Justice and 62 Members of the Oklahoma Senate and Oklahoma House of Representatives. Served on 04/23/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-6055]--[Edited 04/24/2020 by JM to note that brief has been filed.] BPS [Entered: 04/23/2020 04:31 PM]
April 23, 2020 [10735365] Entry of appearance filed by Diana O. Salgado for Comprehensive Health of Planned Parenthood Great Plains Inc.. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y.(Previously disclosed.) Served on 04/23/2020. Manner of Service: email [20-6055] [Entered: 04/23/2020 04:20 PM]
April 23, 2020 [10735356] Entry of appearance submitted by Diana O. Salgado for Appellee Comprehensive Health of Planned Parenthood Great Plains Inc. for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 04/23/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-6055]--[Edited 04/23/2020 by DJD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 4/23/20] DOS [Entered: 04/23/2020 04:09 PM]
April 23, 2020 [10735216] Entry of appearance filed by Travis J. Tu for Larry A. Burns and South Wind Women's Center LLC. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 04/23/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-6055] [Entered: 04/23/2020 12:11 PM]
April 23, 2020 [10735191] Entry of appearance filed by Kathryn E. Barrett, Alyssa Clark, Linda C. Goldstein and Samantha N. Rosa for Larry A. Burns and South Wind Women's Center LLC. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. (Previously disclosed) Served on 04/23/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-6055]--[Edited 04/23/2020 by JM] [Entered: 04/23/2020 11:21 AM]
April 23, 2020 [10735174] Entry of appearance submitted by Travis J. Tu for Appellees Larry A. Burns and South Wind Women's Center LLC for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 04/23/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-6055]--[Edited 04/23/2020 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] TJT [Entered: 04/23/2020 10:51 AM]
April 23, 2020 [10735142] Order filed by Clerk of the Court directing Appellees to file a response by 4/24/20 at 12:00 noon, MDT to the Emergency Motion to Stay Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal and, Alternatively, for a Temporary Administrative Stay Pending Consideration of this Motion. Appellants may file an optional reply by 4/26/20 at 5:00 p.m., MDT. Appellees are also directed to file a response to Appellants Emergency Motion to Expedite Appeal by 4/24/20 at 12:00 noon, MDT. Served on 04/23/2020. [20-6055] [Entered: 04/23/2020 10:18 AM]
April 23, 2020 [10735133] Entry of appearance submitted by Linda C. Goldstein, Kathryn Barrett, Samantha Rosa, and Alyssa Clark for Appellees South Wind Women's Center LLC and Larry A. Burns for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 04/23/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-6055] LCG [Entered: 04/23/2020 09:59 AM]
April 22, 2020 [10734944] Motion filed by Appellants Gary Cox, Mr. Mark Gower, Michael Hunter, Greg Mashburn, David Prater and J. Kevin Stitt to expedite case. Served on: 04/22/2020. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-6055] ZPW [Entered: 04/22/2020 03:36 PM]
April 22, 2020 [10734943] Entry of appearance filed by Bryan Cleveland, Mithun Mansinghani and Zachary Paul West for Mark Gower, Greg Mashburn, David Prater, Gary Cox, J. Kevin Stitt and Michael Hunter. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 04/22/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-6055] [Entered: 04/22/2020 03:36 PM]
April 22, 2020 [10734941] Motion filed by Appellants Gary Cox, Mr. Mark Gower, Michael Hunter, Greg Mashburn, David Prater and J. Kevin Stitt for stay of Preliminary Injunction pending Appeal. Served on: 04/22/2020. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-6055] ZPW [Entered: 04/22/2020 03:29 PM]
April 22, 2020 [10734938] Entry of appearance submitted by Zach West; Mithun Mansinghani; Bryan Cleveland for Appellants Gary Cox, Mr. Mark Gower, Michael Hunter, Greg Mashburn, David Prater and J. Kevin Stitt for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 04/22/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-6055] --[Edited 04/22/2020 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] ZPW [Entered: 04/22/2020 03:25 PM]
April 21, 2020 [10734646] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 04/21/2020. Docketing statement due 05/05/2020 for Gary Cox, Mark Gower, Michael Hunter, Greg Mashburn, David Prater and J. Kevin Stitt. Transcript order form due 05/05/2020 for Gary Cox, Mark Gower, Michael Hunter, Greg Mashburn, David Prater and J. Kevin Stitt. Notice of appearance due on 05/05/2020 for Larry A. Burns, Comprehensive Health of Planned Parenthood Great Plains Inc., Gary Cox, Mark Gower, Michael Hunter, Greg Mashburn, David Prater, South Wind Women's Center LLC and J. Kevin Stitt [20-6055] [Entered: 04/21/2020 03:39 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: South Wind Women's Center, et al v. Stitt, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: J. KEVIN STITT, in his official capacity as Governor of Oklahoma
Represented By: Mithun Mansinghani
Represented By: Zachary Paul West
Represented By: Bryan Cleveland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: DAVID PRATER, in his official capacity as District Attorney for Oklahoma County
Represented By: Mithun Mansinghani
Represented By: Zachary Paul West
Represented By: Bryan Cleveland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: GARY COX, in his official capacity as Oklahoma Commissioner of Health
Represented By: Mithun Mansinghani
Represented By: Zachary Paul West
Represented By: Bryan Cleveland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MARK GOWER, in his official capacity as Director of the Oklahoma Department of Emergency Management
Represented By: Mithun Mansinghani
Represented By: Zachary Paul West
Represented By: Bryan Cleveland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: GREG MASHBURN, in his official capacity as District Attorney for Cleveland County
Represented By: Mithun Mansinghani
Represented By: Zachary Paul West
Represented By: Bryan Cleveland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MICHAEL HUNTER, in his official capacity as Attorney General of Oklahoma
Represented By: Mithun Mansinghani
Represented By: Zachary Paul West
Represented By: Bryan Cleveland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LARRY A. BURNS, D.O, on behalf of himself and his staff and his patients
Represented By: Travis J. Tu
Represented By: Samantha N. Rosa
Represented By: Kirby B. Tyrrell
Represented By: Ezra U. Cukor
Represented By: J. Blake Patton
Represented By: Jiaman Wang
Represented By: Linda C. Goldstein
Represented By: Kathryn E. Barrett
Represented By: Alyssa Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: COMPREHENSIVE HEALTH OF PLANNED PARENTHOOD GREAT PLAINS INC., on behalf of itself, its physicians and staff, and its patients
Represented By: Diana O. Salgado
Represented By: J. Blake Patton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SOUTH WIND WOMEN'S CENTER LLC, on behalf of itself, its physicians and staff, and its patients, DBA Trust Women Oklahoma City
Represented By: Travis J. Tu
Represented By: Samantha N. Rosa
Represented By: Kirby B. Tyrrell
Represented By: Ezra U. Cukor
Represented By: J. Blake Patton
Represented By: Jiaman Wang
Represented By: Linda C. Goldstein
Represented By: Kathryn E. Barrett
Represented By: Alyssa Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DEBORAH ALLEN
Represented By: Lisa Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: RONALD BAYER
Represented By: Lisa Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MITCHELL KATZ
Represented By: Lisa Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MARIA GALLO
Represented By: Lisa Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: THE AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE
Represented By: Jordan A. Sekulow
Represented By: Stuart J. Roth
Represented By: Jay Sekulow
Represented By: Olivia Summers
Represented By: Edward Lawrence White
Represented By: Christina A. Stierhoff
Represented By: Benjamin P. Sisney
Represented By: Erik Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SUSAN COHN
Represented By: Lisa Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SIXTY-TWO MEMBERS OF THE OKLAHOMA SENATE AND OKLAHOMA HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
Represented By: Jordan A. Sekulow
Represented By: Stuart J. Roth
Represented By: Jay Sekulow
Represented By: Olivia Summers
Represented By: Edward Lawrence White
Represented By: Christina A. Stierhoff
Represented By: Benjamin P. Sisney
Represented By: Erik Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MICHAEL MINA
Represented By: Lisa Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JENNIFER NUZZO
Represented By: Lisa Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: KELLI HALL
Represented By: Lisa Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ELIZABETH JANIAK
Represented By: Lisa Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NANCY PADIAN
Represented By: Lisa Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DEBORAH KAPLAN
Represented By: Lisa Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: OXIRIS BARBOT
Represented By: Lisa Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GINA NOVICK
Represented By: Lisa Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: WAFAA EL-SADR
Represented By: Lisa Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SAMANTHA GARBERS
Represented By: Lisa Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: OKLAHOMA FAITH LEADERS
Represented By: Kevin H. Theriot
Represented By: John J. Bursch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JANET TURAN
Represented By: Lisa Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ANTHONY D. SO
Represented By: Lisa Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ARCHDIOCESE OF OKLAHOMA CITY
Represented By: Kevin H. Theriot
Represented By: John J. Bursch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NICOLE LURIE
Represented By: Lisa Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN PUBLIC HEALTH ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Matthew R. Shahabian
Represented By: Lisa Simpson
Represented By: Rochelle Swartz
Represented By: Monica Haymond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ANDREW GOODMAN
Represented By: Lisa Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DEBORAH A. BARTZ
Represented By: Lisa Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GREGG GONSALVES
Represented By: Lisa Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STEN H. VERMUND
Represented By: Lisa Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LINDA FRIED
Represented By: Lisa Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JUDITH N. WASSERHEIT
Represented By: Lisa Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MARC LIPSITCH
Represented By: Lisa Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: OKLAHOMA BAPTISTS
Represented By: Kevin H. Theriot
Represented By: John J. Bursch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MARK LURIE
Represented By: Lisa Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATHAN D. GRUBAUGH
Represented By: Lisa Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CAROLINE BUCKEE
Represented By: Lisa Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: HEIDI JONES
Represented By: Lisa Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MARY ANN CHIASSON
Represented By: Lisa Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JODIE L. GUEST
Represented By: Lisa Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: KIMBERLY POWERS
Represented By: Lisa Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CHRIS BEYRER
Represented By: Lisa Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LESLIE ROBERTS
Represented By: Lisa Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SAAD B. OMER
Represented By: Lisa Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: POOJA MEHTA
Represented By: Lisa Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DEBORAH COTTON
Represented By: Lisa Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JOSHUA SALOMON
Represented By: Lisa Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESE OF TULSA
Represented By: Kevin H. Theriot
Represented By: John J. Bursch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ROGER ROCHAT
Represented By: Lisa Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MARGARET A. HAMBURG
Represented By: Lisa Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JULIE WOMACK
Represented By: Lisa Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CELINE R. GOUNDER
Represented By: Lisa Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ALICE CHEN
Represented By: Lisa Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: EVA HARRIS
Represented By: Lisa Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CATHOLIC CONFERENCE OF OKLAHOMA
Represented By: Kevin H. Theriot
Represented By: John J. Bursch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SANDRO GALEA
Represented By: Lisa Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JONATHAN FIELDING
Represented By: Lisa Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NANCY KRIEGER
Represented By: Lisa Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BARBARA FERRER
Represented By: Lisa Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ANDREA SWARTZENDRUBER
Represented By: Lisa Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?