Frazier v. Crow
Respondent / Appellee: SCOTT CROW, Director (DOC)
Petitioner / Appellant: ARCHIE LEWIS FRAZIER, JR.
Case Number: 20-6124
Filed: August 20, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 [10776424] Mandate issued. [20-6124] [Entered: 10/06/2020 01:53 PM]
October 6, 2020 [10776423] Frap 42; Procedural termination without judicial action. [20-6124] [Entered: 10/06/2020 01:53 PM]
October 6, 2020 [10776421] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting Appellant's motion to dismiss case. Served on 10/06/2020. Text only entry - no attachment. See order for case termination to follow. [20-6124] [Entered: 10/06/2020 01:51 PM]
October 5, 2020 [10776113] Appellant's motion filed by Archie Lewis Frazier, Jr. to dismiss case. Manner of Service: US mail. [20-6124] [Entered: 10/05/2020 03:26 PM]
September 23, 2020 [10772664] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 1, Comments: Vol I - Pleadings. [20-6124] [Entered: 09/23/2020 08:05 AM]
September 22, 2020 [10772255] Jurisdictional review complete. Appellant's Combined Opening Brief/Certificate of appealability and notice of appearance due 11/02/2020 for Archie Lewis Frazier Jr. Record on appeal 10th circuit due 10/13/2020. [20-6124] [Entered: 09/22/2020 09:14 AM]
September 21, 2020 [10772253] Appellant's motion filed by Archie Lewis Frazier, Jr. for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Served on 09/10/2020. Manner of Service: US mail. [20-6124] [Entered: 09/22/2020 09:11 AM]
September 3, 2020 [10769369] Motion to construe brief as a request for authorization to file a second or successive 2254 petition received from Archie Lewis Frazier, Jr. but not filed. Served on 08/26/2020 on court only. Manner of Service: US mail. [20-6124] [Entered: 09/10/2020 11:36 AM]
September 1, 2020 [10767001] Miscellaneous correspondence regarding fees received from Archie Lewis Frazier, Jr. but not filed. Response letter sent. Manner of Service: US mail. --[Edited 09/02/2020 by MLB to include response letter][20-6124] [Entered: 09/01/2020 11:34 AM]
August 21, 2020 [10764602] Entry of appearance filed by Jennifer B. Miller for Scott Crow. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 08/21/2020. Manner of Service: US mail [20-6124] [Entered: 08/21/2020 10:06 AM]
August 21, 2020 [10764597] Entry of appearance submitted by Jennifer B. Miller for Appellee Scott Crow for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 08/21/2020. Manner of Service: US mail. [20-6124]--[Edited 08/21/2020 by DJD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 8/21/20] JBM [Entered: 08/21/2020 09:57 AM]
August 20, 2020 [10764310] Prisoner case docketed. DATE RECEIVED: 08/19/2020. Fee or ifp forms and notice of appearance due 09/21/2020 for Archie Lewis Frazier Jr. Notice of appearance due on 09/03/2020 for Scott Crow. [20-6124] [Entered: 08/20/2020 09:26 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Frazier v. Crow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: SCOTT CROW, Director (DOC)
Represented By: Caroline E.J. Hunt
Represented By: Jennifer B. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: ARCHIE LEWIS FRAZIER, JR.
Represented By: Archie Lewis Frazier Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?