Arndt v. Hatfield, et al
Defendant / Appellee: BARBARA HATFIELD, individually and in her official capacity as Special District Judge for Canadian County, OK, YWCAOKC, STACY DILLARD, individually and in her official capacity as an attorney for the Department of Human Services for the State of Oklahoma, JASON DAVIS, individually and in his official capacity as Department of Human Services Child Welfare Supervisor, MICHAEL FIELDS, individually and in his official capacity as District Attorney for Canadian County, Oklahoma, CARMEN FLORES, individually and in her official capacity as Department of Human Services Child Welfare Supervisor, KEVIN WEST, individually and in his official capacity as Representative for District 54 for the State of Oklahoma, MICHAEL FIGGINS, individually and in his official capacity as Executive Director with Legal Aid Services of Oklahoma, Inc., DENISE BREWER, individually and in her official capacity as House Representative for District 71, SHANNON MALLAM, individually and in her official capacity as Department of Human Services Child Welfare Investigator, CANDICE SHULTZ, individually and in her official capacity as legal secretary for David Halley, JON ECHOLS, individually and in his official capacity as Majority Floor Leader/Representative for District 90 for the State of Oklahoma, JACK MCCURDY, individually and in his official capacity as Elected Judge for Canadian County, Oklahoma, TAYLOR HENDERSON, individually and in her official capacity as Director of Council on Judicial Complaints for the State of Oklahoma, NATHAN DAHM, individually and in his official capacity as Senator for District 33 for the State of Oklahoma, JANET PEERY, individually and in her official capacity as Chief Executive Officer of the YWCAOKC, RHONDA BAKER, individually and in her official capacity as House Representative for District 60, MARILYN STARK, individually and in her official capacity as Representative for District 100 for the State of Oklahoma, MARK HIXSON, individually and in his official capacity as attorney, CHARLES MCCALL, individually and in his official capacity as Speaker of the House/Representative for District 22 for the State of Oklahoma, ANGELA BERRY, individually and in her official capacity as an attorney for the Department of Human Services for the State of Oklahoma, JUSTIN BROWN, individually and in his official capacity as Director of the Department of Human Services for the State of Oklahoma, MARK LAWSON, individually and in his official capacity as Representative for District 30 for the State of Oklahoma, GREG TREAT, individually and in his official capacity as President Pro Tempore/Senator for District 47 for the State of Oklahoma, LONNIE PAXTON, individually and in his official capacity as Senator for District 23, TIFFANY MONTE, individually and in her official capacity as Department of Human Services Child Welfare Investigator, KEVIN STITT, individually and in his official capacity as Governor for the State of Oklahoma, JUSTIN KEMP, individually and in his official capacity as Assistant District Attorney for Canadian County, Oklahoma, BOB HUGHEY, individually and in his official capacity as Elected Judge for Canadian County, Oklahoma, DAVID HALLEY, individually and in his official capacity as attorney, LEGAL AID SERVICES OF OKLAHOMA, INC., KIM GARRETT, individually and in her official capacity as CEO and Founder of Palomar, MIKE HUNTER, individually and in his official capacity as Attorney General for the State of Oklahoma, JERAMY JARMAN, individually and in his official capacity as attorney, MARIE HIRST, individually and in her official capacity as Court Clerk for Canadian County, OK, PAUL HESSE, individually and in his official capacity as Elected Judge for Canadian County, Oklahoma and MICHAEL J. HUNTER, individually and in his official capacity as Attorney General for the State of Oklahoma
Plaintiff / Appellant: DAVID ARNDT, individually and as representative of all persons similarly situated
Case Number: 20-6128
Filed: August 26, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2020 [10780818] Deficiency notice issued. Type of deficiency: Appellant's brief past due. Appellant/Petitioner's brief due on 10/29/2020 for David Arndt [20-6128] [Entered: 10/22/2020 03:41 PM]
October 19, 2020 [10779346] Notice of non-participation filed by Matthew B. Free for Michael Figgins, in his Official Capacity as Executive Director with Legal Aid Services of Oklahoma, Inc.. Date of Service: 10/19/2020. Manner of Service: email, US mail. [20-6128] MBF [Entered: 10/19/2020 11:01 AM]
October 16, 2020 [10779023] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. David Arndt. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 10/12/2020. Manner of Service: US mail [20-6128] [Entered: 10/16/2020 12:39 PM]
October 7, 2020 [10776797] Attorney Mr. William D. Tharp for Mark Hixson admitted to the bar of this court. [20-6128] [Entered: 10/07/2020 04:22 PM]
October 5, 2020 [10775915] Deficiency notice issued. Notice of appearance past due from Mr. Arndt. Notice of appearance due on 10/13/2020 for David Arndt [20-6128] [Entered: 10/05/2020 10:14 AM]
September 21, 2020 [10772058] Admissions letter sent. Response date set to 10/21/2020 for William D. Tharp. [20-6128] [Entered: 09/21/2020 03:33 PM]
September 18, 2020 [10771412] Entry of appearance filed by William D. Tharp for Mark Hixson. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 09/18/2020. Manner of Service: US mail [20-6128] [Entered: 09/18/2020 09:24 AM]
September 18, 2020 [10771403] Entry of appearance submitted by William D. Tharp, OBA 13620 for Appellee Mark Hixson for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 09/18/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-6128]--[Edited 09/18/2020 by DJD. Removed PDf as pleading filed 9/18/20] WDT [Entered: 09/18/2020 09:08 AM]
September 18, 2020 [10771373] Second deficiency notice issued. Type of deficiency: Notice of appearance past due for Mark Hixson. Notice of appearance due on 09/21/2020 for Mark Hixson [20-6128] [Entered: 09/18/2020 08:17 AM]
September 15, 2020 [10770464] Notice of non-participation filed by Robert A. Nance for Kim Garrett. Date of Service: 09/15/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-6128] RAN [Entered: 09/15/2020 01:29 PM]
September 11, 2020 [10769773] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Tracy Ella Neel and Mr. Martin Daniel Weitman for Jason Davis, Mr. Justin Brown, Stacy Dillard, Angela Berry, Tiffany Monte, Shannon Mallam and Carmen Flores. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 09/11/2020. Manner of Service: US mail, email [20-6128] [Entered: 09/11/2020 01:40 PM]
September 11, 2020 [10769725] Entry of appearance submitted by M. Daniel Weitman; Tracy E. Neel for Appellees Mr. Justin Brown, Angela Berry, Stacy Dillard, Carmen Flores, Tiffany Monte, Shannon Mallam and Jason Davis for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 09/11/2020. Manner of Service: email, US mail. --[Edited 09/11/2020 by MLB to remove pdf from docket; entry filed on 9/11/20][20-6128] MDW [Entered: 09/11/2020 12:18 PM]
September 10, 2020 [10769221] Deficiency notice issued. Notices of appearance are past due. Notice of appearance due on 09/14/2020 for Angela Berry, Justin Brown, Jason Davis, Stacy Dillard, Carmen Flores, Kim Garrett, Mark Hixson, Shannon Mallam and Tiffany Monte [20-6128] [Entered: 09/10/2020 08:27 AM]
September 10, 2020 [10769185] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Erin Morgan Moore for Ms. Barbara Hatfield, Jack McCurdy, Paul Hesse and Bob Hughey. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 09/10/2020. Manner of Service: email, US mail. [20-6128] [Entered: 09/10/2020 07:32 AM]
September 9, 2020 [10769155] Entry of appearance submitted by Erin Morgan Moore for Appellees Ms. Barbara Hatfield, Paul Hesse, Bob Hughey and Jack McCurdy for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 09/09/2020. Manner of Service: email, US mail. [20-6128]--[Edited 09/10/2020 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] EMM [Entered: 09/09/2020 06:28 PM]
September 9, 2020 [10769147] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Jefferson I. Rust for Janet Peery. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 09/09/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-6128] [Entered: 09/09/2020 05:15 PM]
September 9, 2020 [10768959] Entry of appearance submitted by Jefferson Rust for Appellees Janet Peery and YWCAOKC for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 09/09/2020. Manner of Service: email, US mail. [20-6128]--[Edited 09/09/2020 by JM PDF removed field by the court on 9/9/20.] JIR [Entered: 09/09/2020 12:07 PM]
September 1, 2020 [10767129] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 1. Volume I - Pleadings. [20-6128] [Entered: 09/01/2020 03:43 PM]
August 31, 2020 [10766534] Jurisdictional review complete. Appellant's brief due on 10/13/2020 for David Arndt. Record on appeal due for 10th circuit 09/21/2020. [20-6128] [Entered: 08/31/2020 09:12 AM]
August 26, 2020 [10765576] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 08/26/2020. Notice of appearance due on 09/25/2020 for Appellant David Arndt. Notice of appearance due on 09/09/2020 for Appellees Barbara Hatfield, et al. [20-6128] [Entered: 08/26/2020 09:53 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Arndt v. Hatfield, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BARBARA HATFIELD, individually and in her official capacity as Special District Judge for Canadian County, OK
Represented By: Erin Morgan Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: YWCAOKC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STACY DILLARD, individually and in her official capacity as an attorney for the Department of Human Services for the State of Oklahoma
Represented By: Tracy Ella Neel
Represented By: Martin Daniel Weitman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JASON DAVIS, individually and in his official capacity as Department of Human Services Child Welfare Supervisor
Represented By: Tracy Ella Neel
Represented By: Martin Daniel Weitman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHAEL FIELDS, individually and in his official capacity as District Attorney for Canadian County, Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CARMEN FLORES, individually and in her official capacity as Department of Human Services Child Welfare Supervisor
Represented By: Tracy Ella Neel
Represented By: Martin Daniel Weitman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KEVIN WEST, individually and in his official capacity as Representative for District 54 for the State of Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHAEL FIGGINS, individually and in his official capacity as Executive Director with Legal Aid Services of Oklahoma, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Benjamin Free
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DENISE BREWER, individually and in her official capacity as House Representative for District 71
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SHANNON MALLAM, individually and in her official capacity as Department of Human Services Child Welfare Investigator
Represented By: Tracy Ella Neel
Represented By: Martin Daniel Weitman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CANDICE SHULTZ, individually and in her official capacity as legal secretary for David Halley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JON ECHOLS, individually and in his official capacity as Majority Floor Leader/Representative for District 90 for the State of Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JACK MCCURDY, individually and in his official capacity as Elected Judge for Canadian County, Oklahoma
Represented By: Erin Morgan Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TAYLOR HENDERSON, individually and in her official capacity as Director of Council on Judicial Complaints for the State of Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NATHAN DAHM, individually and in his official capacity as Senator for District 33 for the State of Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JANET PEERY, individually and in her official capacity as Chief Executive Officer of the YWCAOKC
Represented By: Maggie M. Logan
Represented By: Jefferson I. Rust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RHONDA BAKER, individually and in her official capacity as House Representative for District 60
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARILYN STARK, individually and in her official capacity as Representative for District 100 for the State of Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARK HIXSON, individually and in his official capacity as attorney
Represented By: William D. Tharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHARLES MCCALL, individually and in his official capacity as Speaker of the House/Representative for District 22 for the State of Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANGELA BERRY, individually and in her official capacity as an attorney for the Department of Human Services for the State of Oklahoma
Represented By: Tracy Ella Neel
Represented By: Martin Daniel Weitman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JUSTIN BROWN, individually and in his official capacity as Director of the Department of Human Services for the State of Oklahoma
Represented By: Tracy Ella Neel
Represented By: Martin Daniel Weitman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARK LAWSON, individually and in his official capacity as Representative for District 30 for the State of Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GREG TREAT, individually and in his official capacity as President Pro Tempore/Senator for District 47 for the State of Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LONNIE PAXTON, individually and in his official capacity as Senator for District 23
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TIFFANY MONTE, individually and in her official capacity as Department of Human Services Child Welfare Investigator
Represented By: Tracy Ella Neel
Represented By: Martin Daniel Weitman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KEVIN STITT, individually and in his official capacity as Governor for the State of Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JUSTIN KEMP, individually and in his official capacity as Assistant District Attorney for Canadian County, Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BOB HUGHEY, individually and in his official capacity as Elected Judge for Canadian County, Oklahoma
Represented By: Erin Morgan Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID HALLEY, individually and in his official capacity as attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LEGAL AID SERVICES OF OKLAHOMA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KIM GARRETT, individually and in her official capacity as CEO and Founder of Palomar
Represented By: Robert A. Nance Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MIKE HUNTER, individually and in his official capacity as Attorney General for the State of Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JERAMY JARMAN, individually and in his official capacity as attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARIE HIRST, individually and in her official capacity as Court Clerk for Canadian County, OK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PAUL HESSE, individually and in his official capacity as Elected Judge for Canadian County, Oklahoma
Represented By: Erin Morgan Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHAEL J. HUNTER, individually and in his official capacity as Attorney General for the State of Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DAVID ARNDT, individually and as representative of all persons similarly situated
Represented By: David Arndt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?