McCall, et al v. WestCare, et al
Plaintiff: ELMER PETERSEN and DEON A. LEONARD
Defendant / Appellee: DOUG CHAMBERLAIN, PETER K. MICHAEL, M. OBERST, ED WRIGHT, MARY K. WALKER, VICK STEINBERG, WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH, JIM SCHUMACHER, GEORGE ROSS, SUSAN G. O'BRIEN, C. WAGNER, WYOMING BOARD OF PAROLE, KAYLA OPDAHL, R. SCOTT GAULKE, SCOTT LEEVER, LORIE MILLIN, WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH DIRECTOR, ROBERT LAMPERT, BRIDGET HILL, CARL VOIGTSBERGER, JON CONRAD, SCOTT ABBOTT, WESTCARE, INC., JOHN LEE, WESTERN REGION, WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS MEDIUM CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION GRIEVANCE MANAGER, M. SEELEY, N. PETERSON, S. HATTAN, TINA COLEMAN, THOMAS O. FORSLUND, DREW ROMERO, STEVE LINDLY, DAN SHANNON, MATT MEAD, BARBRA TUTTLE, DAVE GRAY, EDDIE WILSON, WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH INSPECTOR/COMPLIANCE OFFICER, LORI GARRISON, MARGRET A.R. SCHWARTZ, SAM BORBLEY, C. BECKER, GARY MITCHELL, WESTCARE WYOMING, INC., PHIL DONOHO, LISA V. HUNT, WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH BOARD OF PHARMACY, WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH ADVISORY BOARD, ON DRUGS AND SUBSTANCES CONTROL MEMBERS, MARK GORDON, KATHY WRIGHT and JOHN G. KNEPPER
Plaintiff / Appellant: PAUL MILLER, KELVIN WILLIAMS, CODY SMITH, KEVIN MCCALL and EARL DIMAS
Case Number: 20-8002
Filed: January 7, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2020 [10720244] Appellant's motion filed by Kevin McCall for leave to proceed without prepayment of costs and fees. Served on 02/18/2020. Manner of Service: US mail. [20-8002] [Entered: 02/25/2020 11:01 AM]
February 25, 2020 [10720174] Appellant's motion filed by Cody Smith for leave to proceed without prepayment of costs and fees and complete certified trust account statement. Served on 02/18/2020. Manner of Service: US mail. [20-8002] [Entered: 02/25/2020 09:25 AM]
February 19, 2020 [10719082] Certificate of Penal Institution trust fund account received from Kevin McCall but not filed. Served on 02/18/2020. Manner of Service: US mail. Per the court's 2/18/2020 jurisdictional review letter, appellant's compliant complete 1915 form is due 3/30/2020. [20-8002] [Entered: 02/20/2020 10:57 AM]
February 19, 2020 [10718614] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 2, Comments: Volumes 1 & 2 pleadings. [20-8002] [Entered: 02/19/2020 08:45 AM]
February 18, 2020 [10718301] Jurisdictional review complete. Appellants brief due on 03/30/2020 for Earl Dimas, Kevin McCall, Paul Miller, Cody Smith and Kelvin Williams. Fee or 1915 forms due 03/30/2020 for Earl Dimas, Kevin McCall, Cody Smith, Paul Miller and Kelvin Williams. Record on appeal 10th circuit due 03/10/2020 [20-8002] [Entered: 02/18/2020 09:13 AM]
February 11, 2020 [10716993] Order filed by Clerk of the Court. This matter is before the court as a follow-up to its orders dated 1/9/20 and 1/23/20, each of which advised appellant Leonard of the tasks he needed to complete if he wished to pursue this appeal. Mr. Leonard has not completed any of the necessary tasks. Accordingly, the court dismisses Mr. Leonard as an appellant. Please see order for additional detailed information. Served on 02/11/2020. [20-8002] [Entered: 02/11/2020 08:59 AM]
February 10, 2020 [10716874] Order filed by Clerk of the Court denying Appellant Cody Smith's motion to appoint attorney filed by Appellant Cody Smith. Served on 02/10/2020. [20-8002] See order for additional information. [Entered: 02/10/2020 03:46 PM]
February 10, 2020 [10716848] Appellant's motion filed by Cody Smith to appoint attorney. Served on 02/05/2020. Manner of Service: US mail. [20-8002] [Entered: 02/10/2020 03:08 PM]
February 10, 2020 [10716810] Deficient appellant 1915 forms received. Certified trust account statement due 02/18/2020 for Cody Smith. [20-8002] [Entered: 02/10/2020 02:24 PM]
February 10, 2020 [10716798] Deficient appellant 1915 forms received. Certified trust account statement due 02/18/2020 for Kevin McCall. [20-8002] [Entered: 02/10/2020 02:09 PM]
February 4, 2020 [10715526] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting Appellant Elmer Petersen's "Motion to Dismiss Appeal," requesting that he be removed from the appeal. Upon consideration, the motion is construed as a motion to voluntarily dismiss the appeal as to Appellant Elmer Petersen, and, so, construed the motion is granted. Served on 02/04/2020. [20-8002] [Entered: 02/04/2020 03:55 PM]
February 4, 2020 [10715514] Order filed by Clerk of the Court denying Appellant Cody L. Smith's motion for temporary restraining order filed by Appellant Cody Smith. Served on 02/04/2020. [20-8002] See order for additional information. [Entered: 02/04/2020 03:38 PM]
February 3, 2020 [10715148] Appellant's motion filed by Cody Smith for temporary restraining order and protetion from retalliation. Served on 01/27/2020. Manner of Service: US mail. [20-8002] [Entered: 02/03/2020 04:02 PM]
February 3, 2020 [10715107] Motion to Dismiss Appeal filed by Elmer Petersen. Served on 01/30/2020. Manner of Service: US mail. [20-8002] [Entered: 02/03/2020 03:13 PM]
January 23, 2020 [10712324] Order filed by Clerk of the Court denying Appellant Deon A. Leonard's Motion to Dismiss Appellant Deon A. Leonard from Case #19-cv-240 and Motion to Vacate. See attached order for further information. Served on 01/23/2020. [20-8002] [Entered: 01/23/2020 01:07 PM]
January 23, 2020 [10712250] Appellant's motion filed by Mr. Deon A. Leonard to dismiss Deon A. Leonard as a party. Served on 01/23/2020. Manner of Service: submitted to this court from the district court. [20-8002] [Entered: 01/23/2020 11:02 AM]
January 21, 2020 [10711376] Entry of appearance and change of address within the same form filed by Elmer Petersen. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 01/16/2020. Manner of Service: US mail [20-8002] [Entered: 01/21/2020 01:00 PM]
January 16, 2020 [10710462] Order filed by Clerk of the Court - This matter is before the court on a document transmitted here by the district court titled Motion to Vacate. We have construed this document as a motion to dismiss the appeal voluntarily. The motion appears to be filed on behalf of all seven appellants. But only appellant Leonard personally signed the motion. On or before 01/30/2020 the appellants shall file an amended motion to dismiss or appellant Leonard must file a notice that only he will be as a party to the appeal [ # 10710442-2 ]. Served on 01/16/2020. [20-8002] [Entered: 01/16/2020 01:17 PM]
January 16, 2020 [10710442] Appellant's Motion to Vacate filed by Mr. Deon A. Leonard. Served on 01/16/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-8002] [Entered: 01/16/2020 12:41 PM]
January 15, 2020 [10710030] Entry of appearance filed by Earl Dimas, Mr. Deon A. Leonard, Kevin McCall, Paul Miller, Elmer Petersen, Cody Smith and Kelvin Williams. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on the court 01/10/2020 by US mail. [20-8002] [Entered: 01/15/2020 11:57 AM]
January 9, 2020 [10708562] Order filed by Clerk of the Court - briefing on the merits is suspended pending further order of this court. Appellant Leonard shall show cause in writing why: (1) the court should not dismiss him as an appellant in this appeal for failure to prepay the entire appellate filing fee; or (2) the provisions of the Prison Litigation Reform Act do not apply to this proceeding. Alternatively, Mr. Leonard (or any one or more of the remaining appellants) may prepay the appellate filing fee to the district court on or before 01/30/2020. Response due on 01/30/2020 for Deon A. Leonard. See order for additional information. Served on 01/09/2020. [20-8002] [Entered: 01/09/2020 01:54 PM]
January 7, 2020 [10707963] Prisoner case docketed. DATE RECEIVED: 01/07/2019. Fee or 1915 forms due 02/06/2020 for Earl Dimas, Deon A. Leonard, Kevin McCall, Paul Miller, Elmer Petersen, Cody Smith and Kelvin Williams. Notice of appearance due on 02/06/2020 for Earl Dimas, Deon A. Leonard, Kevin McCall, Paul Miller, Elmer Petersen, Cody Smith and Kelvin Williams. [20-8002] [Entered: 01/07/2020 03:32 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: McCall, et al v. WestCare, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DOUG CHAMBERLAIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PETER K. MICHAEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: M. OBERST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ED WRIGHT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARY K. WALKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: VICK STEINBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JIM SCHUMACHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GEORGE ROSS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SUSAN G. O'BRIEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: C. WAGNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WYOMING BOARD OF PAROLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KAYLA OPDAHL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: R. SCOTT GAULKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SCOTT LEEVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LORIE MILLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH DIRECTOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROBERT LAMPERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRIDGET HILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CARL VOIGTSBERGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JON CONRAD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SCOTT ABBOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WESTCARE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN LEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WESTERN REGION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS MEDIUM CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION GRIEVANCE MANAGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: M. SEELEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: N. PETERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: S. HATTAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TINA COLEMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THOMAS O. FORSLUND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DREW ROMERO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STEVE LINDLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAN SHANNON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MATT MEAD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BARBRA TUTTLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVE GRAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: EDDIE WILSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH INSPECTOR/COMPLIANCE OFFICER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LORI GARRISON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARGRET A.R. SCHWARTZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SAM BORBLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: C. BECKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GARY MITCHELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WESTCARE WYOMING, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PHIL DONOHO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LISA V. HUNT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH BOARD OF PHARMACY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH ADVISORY BOARD, ON DRUGS AND SUBSTANCES CONTROL MEMBERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARK GORDON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KATHY WRIGHT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN G. KNEPPER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PAUL MILLER
Represented By: Paul Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KELVIN WILLIAMS
Represented By: Kelvin Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CODY SMITH
Represented By: Cody Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KEVIN MCCALL
Represented By: Kevin McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: EARL DIMAS
Represented By: Earl Dimas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELMER PETERSEN
Represented By: Elmer Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEON A. LEONARD
Represented By: Deon A. Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?