Denver Homeless Out Loud, et al v. Denver, Colorado, et al
Defendant / Appellant: CHRISTOPHER RANDALL, Officer, DAVID DINKEL, Trooper, KRISTIN M. BRONSON, in her individual and official capacity, BRIAN CONOVER, Sergeant, DAVID MARTINEZ, Officer, DARREN ULRICH, Officer, in his individual capacity, UMAIR CHEEMA, Trooper, ANTHONY MARTINEZ, Sergeant, PATRICK WILLIAMS, Trooper, CHRISTOPHER GONZALES, Trooper, SEAN MCCALL, Trooper, ANDREW GASPAROVIC, Corporal, TY SIMCOX, Trooper, ENVIRONMENTAL HAZMAT SERVICES, DAVID HUNTER, Officer, ALEC W. BARKLEY, Trooper, KEVIN RAE, Trooper, J.P. BURT, Trooper, THANARAT PHUVHAPISALKIJ, Officer, HAAS E. PRATT, Trooper, BRYAN LARREAU, Trooper, BRANDON NOVY, Trooper, GREGORY DAVEY, Trooper, JONATHAN STRICKLAND, Trooper, CRYSTAL CRENSHAW, Trooper, VICTOR SARGEN, Trooper, GEOFFREY KEELING, Trooper, WILLIAM CALDWELL, Trooper, MURPHY ROBINSON, in his individual and official capacity, TOBY WILSON, Officer, NATHAN HARDY, Trooper, JOSEPH DIRNBERGER, Trooper, RUSTY SANCHEZ, Trooper, DENVER, COLORADO, JARED POLIS, Governor, in his official capacity, ROP MONTHATHONG, Officer, MALLORY LUTKIN, Officer, in her individual capacity, JAMES D. HARVEY, Officer, in his individual capacity, HEIDI JEWETT, Trooper, BOB MCDONALD, in his individual capacity, NICHOLAS TRUJILLO, Trooper, JON UDLAND, Officer, COLIN DAUGHERTY, Trooper, DOUG KLINE, Trooper, A. MARTINEZ, Sergeant; in her/his individual capacity, MICHAEL HANCOCK, Mayor, in his individual capacity, MARK MOORE, Corporal, JEREMY HARRINGTON, Trooper, RYAN A. VOSS, Trooper, MIKE CODY, Lieutenant, in his individual capacity, KYLE ROSS, Trooper, THOMAS MAJOR, Trooper, JACOB CLEVELAND, Trooper and DARCE WEIL, Trooper
Plaintiff / Appellee: SHARRON MEITZEN, NATHANIEL WARNER, on behalf of themselves and all others similary situated, GREGORY COSTIGAN, STEVE OLSEN, LISA MASARO, CHARLES DAVIS, MICHAEL LAMB, RICK MEITZEN, JR., SEAN MARTINEZ, TOMASA DOGTRAIL and DENVER HOMELESS OUT LOUD
Case Number: 21-1025
Filed: January 26, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2021 [10818023] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 03/26/2021. Appellants' brief and appendix due on 05/05/2021 for Alec W. Barkley, Kristin M. Bronson, J.P. Burt, William Caldwell, Umair Cheema, Jacob Cleveland, Mike Cody, Brian Conover, Crystal Crenshaw, Colin Daugherty, Gregory Davey, Denver, Colorado, David Dinkel, Joseph Dirnberger, Environmental Hazmat Services, Andrew Gasparovic, Christopher Gonzales, Michael Hancock, Nathan Hardy, Jeremy Harrington, James D. Harvey, David Hunter, Heidi Jewett, Geoffrey Keeling, Doug Kline, Bryan Larreau, Mallory Lutkin, Thomas Major, A. Martinez, Anthony Martinez, David Martinez, Sean McCall, Bob McDonald, Rop Monthathong, Mark Moore, Brandon Novy, Thanarat Phuvhapisalkij, Jared Polis, Haas E. Pratt, Kevin Rae, Christopher Randall, Murphy Robinson, Kyle Ross, Rusty Sanchez, Victor Sargen, Ty Simcox, Jonathan Strickland, Nicholas Trujillo, Jon Udland, Darren Ulrich, Ryan A. Voss, Darce Weil, Patrick Williams and Toby Wilson. [21-1025] [Entered: 03/26/2021 11:40 AM]
March 25, 2021 [10817734] Upon review of the district court docket the transcript was filed by Mary George on 03/10/2021. Notice due that record is complete by 04/01/2021 for Jeffrey P. Colwell, Clerk of Court (oclk). (Text Only - No Attachment) [21-1025] [Entered: 03/25/2021 09:38 AM]
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order [10811079] Order filed by Judges Holmes, Lucero, dissenting, and Phillips denying motion for stay filed by Appellants Mr. Mike Cody, Mr. A. Martinez, Mr. David Martinez, Mr. James D. Harvey, Mark Moore, Anthony Martinez, Michael Hancock, Denver, Colorado, Bob McDonald, Murphy Robinson, Kristin M. Bronson, Darren Ulrich, Mallory Lutkin, Brian Conover, Thanarat Phuvhapisalkij, Rop Monthathong, Christopher Randall, David Hunter, Toby Wilson and Jon Udland. Served on 03/01/2021. [21-1025] [Entered: 03/01/2021 10:10 AM]
February 19, 2021 [10809161] Transcript order form filed by Ms. Mary J. George (trial proceedings 12/15/20-12/16/20 and 1/11/21). Transcript due 03/18/2021 for Mary J. George. [21-1025] [Entered: 02/19/2021 04:17 PM]
February 12, 2021 [10807595] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Conor Daniel Farley and Wendy Jean Shea for Mr. Mike Cody, Mr. A. Martinez, Mr. David Martinez, Mark Moore, Michael Hancock, Denver, Colorado, Bob McDonald, Murphy Robinson, Kristin M. Bronson, Darren Ulrich, Mallory Lutkin, Brian Conover, Thanarat Phuvhapisalkij, Rop Monthathong, Christopher Randall, David Hunter, Toby Wilson, Jon Udland and Andrew Gasparovic. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 02/12/2021. Manner of Service: email [21-1025] [Entered: 02/12/2021 04:04 PM]
February 12, 2021 [10807572] Minute order filed - Transcript order form due 02/26/2021 for Mary J. George. Transcript ordered: Preliminary Injunction Hearing, December 15-16, 2020, and January 11, 2021. (Text Only - No Attachment) [21-1025] [Entered: 02/12/2021 03:31 PM]
February 12, 2021 [10807542] Reply filed by Kristin M. Bronson, Mr. Mike Cody, Brian Conover, Denver, Colorado, Michael Hancock, Mr. James D. Harvey, David Hunter, Mallory Lutkin, Mr. A. Martinez, Anthony Martinez, Mr. David Martinez, Bob McDonald, Rop Monthathong, Mark Moore, Thanarat Phuvhapisalkij, Christopher Randall, Murphy Robinson, Jon Udland, Darren Ulrich and Toby Wilson to Appellants-Defendants' Emergency Motion for Stay of District Court's Preliminary Injunction Order Pending Appeal. Served on 02/12/2021. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [21-1025] GK [Entered: 02/12/2021 02:45 PM]
February 12, 2021 [10807540] Acknowledgment of transcript order filed by Kristin M. Bronson, Mr. Mike Cody, Brian Conover, Denver, Colorado, Michael Hancock, Mr. James D. Harvey, David Hunter, Mallory Lutkin, Mr. A. Martinez, Anthony Martinez, Mr. David Martinez, Bob McDonald, Rop Monthathong, Mark Moore, Thanarat Phuvhapisalkij, Christopher Randall, Murphy Robinson, Jon Udland, Darren Ulrich and Toby Wilson. Transcript ordered: Preliminary Injunction Hearing, December 15-16, 2020 and January 11, 2021. Served on: 02/12/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-1025] GK [Entered: 02/12/2021 02:43 PM]
February 12, 2021 [10807538] Entry of appearance submitted by Wendy J. Shea, Conor D. Farley, Geoffrey C. Klingsporn for Appellants Denver, Colorado, Michael Hancock, Bob McDonald, Murphy Robinson, Kristin M. Bronson, Mr. Mike Cody, Anthony Martinez, Brian Conover, Mark Moore, Thanarat Phuvhapisalkij, Rop Monthathong, Christopher Randall, David Hunter, Toby Wilson, Jon Udland, Mr. David Martinez, Mr. James D. Harvey, Darren Ulrich and Mallory Lutkin for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 02/12/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-1025]--[Edited 02/12/2021 by LG to remove PDF from entry as pleading was filed on 2/12/2021] GK [Entered: 02/12/2021 02:41 PM]
February 12, 2021 [10807331] Deficiency notice issued. Type of deficiency: not filed. Notice of appearance and transcript order due 02/16/2021 for Appellants. [21-1025] [Entered: 02/12/2021 07:35 AM]
February 9, 2021 [10806591] Docketing statement filed by Kristin M. Bronson, Mr. Mike Cody, Brian Conover, Denver, Colorado, Michael Hancock, Mr. James D. Harvey, David Hunter, Mallory Lutkin, Mr. A. Martinez, Anthony Martinez, Mr. David Martinez, Bob McDonald, Rop Monthathong, Mark Moore, Thanarat Phuvhapisalkij, Christopher Randall, Murphy Robinson, Jon Udland, Darren Ulrich and Toby Wilson. Served on 02/09/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-1025] GK [Entered: 02/09/2021 09:53 PM]
February 9, 2021 [10806383] Notice of non-participation filed by Stephanie L. Scoville, Kathleen Spalding, Emely Garcia for Colorado State Patrol Defendants. Date of Service: 02/09/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-1025] SLS [Entered: 02/09/2021 11:19 AM]
February 8, 2021 [10806031] Notice of non-participation filed by Timothy R Gablehouse, Melanie J Granberg for Environmental Hazmat Services. Date of Service: 02/08/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-1025] TRG [Entered: 02/08/2021 12:39 PM]
February 8, 2021 [10806002] Entry of appearance filed by Reid R. Allison, Darold W. Killmer, David A. Lane, and Andy McNulty for Mr. Charles Davis, Michael Lamb, Denver Homeless Out Loud, Sharron Meitzen, Rick Meitzen, Jr., Tomasa Dogtrail, Steve Olsen, Gregory Costigan, Sean Martinez, Lisa Masaro and Nathaniel Warner. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 02/08/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-1025] [Entered: 02/08/2021 11:51 AM]
February 8, 2021 [10805984] Response filed by Gregory Costigan, Mr. Charles Davis, Denver Homeless Out Loud, Tomasa Dogtrail, Michael Lamb, Sean Martinez, Lisa Masaro, Rick Meitzen, Jr., Sharron Meitzen, Steve Olsen and Nathaniel Warner to Emergency Motion for Stay of District Court's Preliminary Injunction Order Pending Appeal. Served on 02/08/2021. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [21-1025] AM [Entered: 02/08/2021 11:20 AM]
February 8, 2021 [10805978] Entry of appearance submitted by Andy McNulty, David A. Lane, Darold W. Killmer, Reid R. Allison for Appellees Gregory Costigan, Mr. Charles Davis, Denver Homeless Out Loud, Tomasa Dogtrail, Michael Lamb, Sean Martinez, Lisa Masaro, Rick Meitzen, Jr., Sharron Meitzen, Steve Olsen and Nathaniel Warner for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 02/08/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-1025] --[Edited 02/08/2021 by AT to remove PDF as pleading was filed on 2/8/2021.] AM [Entered: 02/08/2021 11:13 AM]
January 28, 2021 [10803706] Order filed by Clerk of the Court - This matter is before the court on Defendants-Appellants' Motion for Stay of District Court's Preliminary Injunction Order Pending Appeal (the "Motion"). Plaintiffs-Appellees' must file a response to the Motion by 3:00 p.m. MST, on 2/8/2021 as directed in the attached order. Any optional reply by Defendants-Appellants must be filed by 9:00 a.m., MST, on 02/15/2021. See attached order for details. Served on 01/28/2021. [21-1025] [Entered: 01/28/2021 02:41 PM]
January 26, 2021 [10802958] Motion filed by Appellants Kristin M. Bronson, Denver, Colorado, Michael Hancock, Bob McDonald, Murphy Robinson, Rop Monthathong, Thanarat Phuvhapisalkij, Darren Ulrich, Toby Wilson, Jon Udland, Mr. A. Martinez, Mr. David Martinez, Mr. Mike Cody, Mark Moore, Christopher Randall, Brian Conover, Mr. James D. Harvey, David Hunter, Mallory Lutkin and Anthony Martinez for stay of preliminary injunction pending appeal. Served on: 01/26/2021. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [21-1025] GK [Entered: 01/26/2021 04:39 PM]
January 26, 2021 [10802892] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 01/26/2021. Docketing statement due 02/09/2021 for Alec W. Barkley, Kristin M. Bronson, J.P. Burt, William Caldwell, Umair Cheema, Jacob Cleveland, Mike Cody, Brian Conover, Crystal Crenshaw, Colin Daugherty, Gregory Davey, Denver, Colorado, David Dinkel, Joseph Dirnberger, Environmental Hazmat Services, Andrew Gasparovic, Christopher Gonzales, Michael Hancock, Nathan Hardy, Jeremy Harrington, James D. Harvey, David Hunter, Heidi Jewett, Geoffrey Keeling, Doug Kline, Bryan Larreau, Mallory Lutkin, Thomas Major, A. Martinez, Anthony Martinez, David Martinez, Sean McCall, Bob McDonald, Rop Monthathong, Mark Moore, Brandon Novy, Thanarat Phuvhapisalkij, Jared Polis, Haas E. Pratt, Kevin Rae, Christopher Randall, Murphy Robinson, Kyle Ross, Rusty Sanchez, Victor Sargen, Ty Simcox, Jonathan Strickland, Nicholas Trujillo, Jon Udland, Darren Ulrich, Ryan A. Voss, Darce Weil, Patrick Williams and Toby Wilson. Transcript order form due 02/09/2021 for Alec W. Barkley, Kristin M. Bronson, J.P. Burt, William Caldwell, Umair Cheema, Jacob Cleveland, Mike Cody, Brian Conover, Crystal Crenshaw, Colin Daugherty, Gregory Davey, Denver, Colorado, David Dinkel, Joseph Dirnberger, Environmental Hazmat Services, Andrew Gasparovic, Christopher Gonzales, Michael Hancock, Nathan Hardy, Jeremy Harrington, James D. Harvey, David Hunter, Heidi Jewett, Geoffrey Keeling, Doug Kline, Bryan Larreau, Mallory Lutkin, Thomas Major, A. Martinez, Anthony Martinez, David Martinez, Sean McCall, Bob McDonald, Rop Monthathong, Mark Moore, Brandon Novy, Thanarat Phuvhapisalkij, Jared Polis, Haas E. Pratt, Kevin Rae, Christopher Randall, Murphy Robinson, Kyle Ross, Rusty Sanchez, Victor Sargen, Ty Simcox, Jonathan Strickland, Nicholas Trujillo, Jon Udland, Darren Ulrich, Ryan A. Voss, Darce Weil, Patrick Williams and Toby Wilson. Notice of appearance due on 02/09/2021 for Alec W. Barkley, Kristin M. Bronson, J.P. Burt, William Caldwell, Umair Cheema, Jacob Cleveland, Mike Cody, Brian Conover, Gregory Costigan, Crystal Crenshaw, Colin Daugherty, Gregory Davey, Charles Davis, Denver Homeless Out Loud, Denver, Colorado, David Dinkel, Joseph Dirnberger, Tomasa Dogtrail, Environmental Hazmat Services, Andrew Gasparovic, Christopher Gonzales, Michael Hancock, Nathan Hardy, Jeremy Harrington, James D. Harvey, David Hunter, Heidi Jewett, Geoffrey Keeling, Doug Kline, Michael Lamb, Bryan Larreau, Mallory Lutkin, Thomas Major, A. Martinez, Anthony Martinez, David Martinez, Sean Martinez, Lisa Masaro, Sean McCall, Bob McDonald, Rick Meitzen Jr., Sharron Meitzen, Rop Monthathong, Mark Moore, Brandon Novy, Steve Olsen, Thanarat Phuvhapisalkij, Jared Polis, Haas E. Pratt, Kevin Rae, Christopher Randall, Murphy Robinson, Kyle Ross, Rusty Sanchez, Victor Sargen, Ty Simcox, Jonathan Strickland, Nicholas Trujillo, Jon Udland, Darren Ulrich, Ryan A. Voss, Nathaniel Warner, Darce Weil, Patrick Williams and Toby Wilson [21-1025] [Entered: 01/26/2021 01:58 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Denver Homeless Out Loud, et al v. Denver, Colorado, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: CHRISTOPHER RANDALL, Officer
Represented By: Conor Daniel Farley
Represented By: Geoffrey Klingsporn
Represented By: Wendy Jean Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: DAVID DINKEL, Trooper
Represented By: Stephanie Lindquist Scoville
Represented By: Conor Daniel Farley
Represented By: Emely Yessiel Garcia
Represented By: Kathleen Spalding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: KRISTIN M. BRONSON, in her individual and official capacity
Represented By: Conor Daniel Farley
Represented By: Geoffrey Klingsporn
Represented By: Wendy Jean Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: BRIAN CONOVER, Sergeant
Represented By: Conor Daniel Farley
Represented By: Geoffrey Klingsporn
Represented By: Wendy Jean Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: DAVID MARTINEZ, Officer
Represented By: Conor Daniel Farley
Represented By: Geoffrey Klingsporn
Represented By: Wendy Jean Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: DARREN ULRICH, Officer, in his individual capacity
Represented By: Conor Daniel Farley
Represented By: Geoffrey Klingsporn
Represented By: Wendy Jean Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: UMAIR CHEEMA, Trooper
Represented By: Stephanie Lindquist Scoville
Represented By: Conor Daniel Farley
Represented By: Kathleen Spalding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ANTHONY MARTINEZ, Sergeant
Represented By: Conor Daniel Farley
Represented By: Geoffrey Klingsporn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: PATRICK WILLIAMS, Trooper
Represented By: Stephanie Lindquist Scoville
Represented By: Conor Daniel Farley
Represented By: Emely Yessiel Garcia
Represented By: Kathleen Spalding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: CHRISTOPHER GONZALES, Trooper
Represented By: Stephanie Lindquist Scoville
Represented By: Conor Daniel Farley
Represented By: Emely Yessiel Garcia
Represented By: Kathleen Spalding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: SEAN MCCALL, Trooper
Represented By: Stephanie Lindquist Scoville
Represented By: Conor Daniel Farley
Represented By: Emely Yessiel Garcia
Represented By: Kathleen Spalding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ANDREW GASPAROVIC, Corporal
Represented By: Conor Daniel Farley
Represented By: Geoffrey Klingsporn
Represented By: Wendy Jean Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: TY SIMCOX, Trooper
Represented By: Stephanie Lindquist Scoville
Represented By: Conor Daniel Farley
Represented By: Emely Yessiel Garcia
Represented By: Kathleen Spalding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ENVIRONMENTAL HAZMAT SERVICES
Represented By: Evan Chenault Singleton
Represented By: Ashley Lynne Zurkan
Represented By: Timothy R. Gablehouse
Represented By: Melanie Joy Granberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: DAVID HUNTER, Officer
Represented By: Conor Daniel Farley
Represented By: Geoffrey Klingsporn
Represented By: Wendy Jean Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ALEC W. BARKLEY, Trooper
Represented By: Stephanie Lindquist Scoville
Represented By: Conor Daniel Farley
Represented By: Kathleen Spalding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: KEVIN RAE, Trooper
Represented By: Stephanie Lindquist Scoville
Represented By: Conor Daniel Farley
Represented By: Emely Yessiel Garcia
Represented By: Kathleen Spalding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: J.P. BURT, Trooper
Represented By: Stephanie Lindquist Scoville
Represented By: Conor Daniel Farley
Represented By: Kathleen Spalding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: THANARAT PHUVHAPISALKIJ, Officer
Represented By: Conor Daniel Farley
Represented By: Geoffrey Klingsporn
Represented By: Wendy Jean Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: HAAS E. PRATT, Trooper
Represented By: Stephanie Lindquist Scoville
Represented By: Conor Daniel Farley
Represented By: Emely Yessiel Garcia
Represented By: Kathleen Spalding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: BRYAN LARREAU, Trooper
Represented By: Stephanie Lindquist Scoville
Represented By: Conor Daniel Farley
Represented By: Emely Yessiel Garcia
Represented By: Kathleen Spalding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: BRANDON NOVY, Trooper
Represented By: Stephanie Lindquist Scoville
Represented By: Conor Daniel Farley
Represented By: Emely Yessiel Garcia
Represented By: Kathleen Spalding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: GREGORY DAVEY, Trooper
Represented By: Stephanie Lindquist Scoville
Represented By: Conor Daniel Farley
Represented By: Emely Yessiel Garcia
Represented By: Kathleen Spalding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JONATHAN STRICKLAND, Trooper
Represented By: Stephanie Lindquist Scoville
Represented By: Conor Daniel Farley
Represented By: Emely Yessiel Garcia
Represented By: Kathleen Spalding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: CRYSTAL CRENSHAW, Trooper
Represented By: Stephanie Lindquist Scoville
Represented By: Conor Daniel Farley
Represented By: Emely Yessiel Garcia
Represented By: Kathleen Spalding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: VICTOR SARGEN, Trooper
Represented By: Stephanie Lindquist Scoville
Represented By: Conor Daniel Farley
Represented By: Emely Yessiel Garcia
Represented By: Kathleen Spalding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: GEOFFREY KEELING, Trooper
Represented By: Stephanie Lindquist Scoville
Represented By: Conor Daniel Farley
Represented By: Emely Yessiel Garcia
Represented By: Kathleen Spalding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: WILLIAM CALDWELL, Trooper
Represented By: Stephanie Lindquist Scoville
Represented By: Conor Daniel Farley
Represented By: Kathleen Spalding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MURPHY ROBINSON, in his individual and official capacity
Represented By: Conor Daniel Farley
Represented By: Geoffrey Klingsporn
Represented By: Wendy Jean Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: TOBY WILSON, Officer
Represented By: Conor Daniel Farley
Represented By: Geoffrey Klingsporn
Represented By: Wendy Jean Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: NATHAN HARDY, Trooper
Represented By: Stephanie Lindquist Scoville
Represented By: Conor Daniel Farley
Represented By: Emely Yessiel Garcia
Represented By: Kathleen Spalding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JOSEPH DIRNBERGER, Trooper
Represented By: Stephanie Lindquist Scoville
Represented By: Conor Daniel Farley
Represented By: Emely Yessiel Garcia
Represented By: Kathleen Spalding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: RUSTY SANCHEZ, Trooper
Represented By: Stephanie Lindquist Scoville
Represented By: Conor Daniel Farley
Represented By: Emely Yessiel Garcia
Represented By: Kathleen Spalding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: DENVER, COLORADO
Represented By: Conor Daniel Farley
Represented By: Geoffrey Klingsporn
Represented By: Wendy Jean Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JARED POLIS, Governor, in his official capacity
Represented By: Stephanie Lindquist Scoville
Represented By: Conor Daniel Farley
Represented By: Emely Yessiel Garcia
Represented By: Kathleen Spalding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ROP MONTHATHONG, Officer
Represented By: Conor Daniel Farley
Represented By: Geoffrey Klingsporn
Represented By: Wendy Jean Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MALLORY LUTKIN, Officer, in her individual capacity
Represented By: Conor Daniel Farley
Represented By: Geoffrey Klingsporn
Represented By: Wendy Jean Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JAMES D. HARVEY, Officer, in his individual capacity
Represented By: Conor Daniel Farley
Represented By: Geoffrey Klingsporn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: HEIDI JEWETT, Trooper
Represented By: Stephanie Lindquist Scoville
Represented By: Conor Daniel Farley
Represented By: Emely Yessiel Garcia
Represented By: Kathleen Spalding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: BOB MCDONALD, in his individual capacity
Represented By: Conor Daniel Farley
Represented By: Geoffrey Klingsporn
Represented By: Wendy Jean Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: NICHOLAS TRUJILLO, Trooper
Represented By: Stephanie Lindquist Scoville
Represented By: Conor Daniel Farley
Represented By: Emely Yessiel Garcia
Represented By: Kathleen Spalding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JON UDLAND, Officer
Represented By: Conor Daniel Farley
Represented By: Geoffrey Klingsporn
Represented By: Wendy Jean Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: COLIN DAUGHERTY, Trooper
Represented By: Stephanie Lindquist Scoville
Represented By: Conor Daniel Farley
Represented By: Emely Yessiel Garcia
Represented By: Kathleen Spalding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: DOUG KLINE, Trooper
Represented By: Stephanie Lindquist Scoville
Represented By: Conor Daniel Farley
Represented By: Emely Yessiel Garcia
Represented By: Kathleen Spalding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: A. MARTINEZ, Sergeant; in her/his individual capacity
Represented By: Conor Daniel Farley
Represented By: Geoffrey Klingsporn
Represented By: Wendy Jean Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MICHAEL HANCOCK, Mayor, in his individual capacity
Represented By: Conor Daniel Farley
Represented By: Geoffrey Klingsporn
Represented By: Wendy Jean Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MARK MOORE, Corporal
Represented By: Conor Daniel Farley
Represented By: Geoffrey Klingsporn
Represented By: Wendy Jean Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JEREMY HARRINGTON, Trooper
Represented By: Stephanie Lindquist Scoville
Represented By: Conor Daniel Farley
Represented By: Emely Yessiel Garcia
Represented By: Kathleen Spalding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: RYAN A. VOSS, Trooper
Represented By: Stephanie Lindquist Scoville
Represented By: Conor Daniel Farley
Represented By: Emely Yessiel Garcia
Represented By: Kathleen Spalding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MIKE CODY, Lieutenant, in his individual capacity
Represented By: Conor Daniel Farley
Represented By: Geoffrey Klingsporn
Represented By: Wendy Jean Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: KYLE ROSS, Trooper
Represented By: Stephanie Lindquist Scoville
Represented By: Conor Daniel Farley
Represented By: Emely Yessiel Garcia
Represented By: Kathleen Spalding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: THOMAS MAJOR, Trooper
Represented By: Stephanie Lindquist Scoville
Represented By: Conor Daniel Farley
Represented By: Emely Yessiel Garcia
Represented By: Kathleen Spalding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JACOB CLEVELAND, Trooper
Represented By: Stephanie Lindquist Scoville
Represented By: Conor Daniel Farley
Represented By: Kathleen Spalding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: DARCE WEIL, Trooper
Represented By: Stephanie Lindquist Scoville
Represented By: Conor Daniel Farley
Represented By: Emely Yessiel Garcia
Represented By: Kathleen Spalding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SHARRON MEITZEN
Represented By: Andrew McNulty
Represented By: David A. Lane Esq.
Represented By: Reid R. Allison
Represented By: Darold W. Killmer Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: NATHANIEL WARNER, on behalf of themselves and all others similary situated
Represented By: Andrew McNulty
Represented By: David A. Lane Esq.
Represented By: Reid R. Allison
Represented By: Darold W. Killmer Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GREGORY COSTIGAN
Represented By: Andrew McNulty
Represented By: David A. Lane Esq.
Represented By: Reid R. Allison
Represented By: Darold W. Killmer Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STEVE OLSEN
Represented By: Andrew McNulty
Represented By: David A. Lane Esq.
Represented By: Reid R. Allison
Represented By: Darold W. Killmer Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LISA MASARO
Represented By: Andrew McNulty
Represented By: David A. Lane Esq.
Represented By: Reid R. Allison
Represented By: Darold W. Killmer Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CHARLES DAVIS
Represented By: Andrew McNulty
Represented By: David A. Lane Esq.
Represented By: Reid R. Allison
Represented By: Darold W. Killmer Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MICHAEL LAMB
Represented By: Andrew McNulty
Represented By: David A. Lane Esq.
Represented By: Reid R. Allison
Represented By: Darold W. Killmer Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RICK MEITZEN, JR.
Represented By: Andrew McNulty
Represented By: David A. Lane Esq.
Represented By: Reid R. Allison
Represented By: Darold W. Killmer Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SEAN MARTINEZ
Represented By: Andrew McNulty
Represented By: David A. Lane Esq.
Represented By: Reid R. Allison
Represented By: Darold W. Killmer Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: TOMASA DOGTRAIL
Represented By: Andrew McNulty
Represented By: David A. Lane Esq.
Represented By: Reid R. Allison
Represented By: Darold W. Killmer Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DENVER HOMELESS OUT LOUD
Represented By: Andrew McNulty
Represented By: David A. Lane Esq.
Represented By: Reid R. Allison
Represented By: Darold W. Killmer Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?