USSEC v. Young, et al
Defendant: DCC ISLANDS FOUNDATION, MEDIATRIX CAPITAL PR LLC, HANNA OHONKOVA SEWALL, VICTORIA M. STEWART, MICHAEL C. BAKER, BRYANT E. SEWALL, BLUE ISLE MARKETS, LTD, ARUAL LP, ISLAND TECHNOLOGIES LLC, MEDIATRIX CAPITAL, LLC, THE 1989 FOUNDATION, MEDIATRIX CAPITAL INC., BLUE ISLE MARKETS, INC., St. Vincent & the Grenadines, MEDIATRIX CAPITAL FUND LTD., WALTER C. YOUNG, III, WEINZEL, LLC, MICHAEL S. STEWART, BLUE ISLE MARKETS INC., Cayman Islands and KEYSTONE BUSINESS TRUST
Defendant / Appellant: HASE HAUS, LLC, TF ALLIANCE, LLC, WEST BEACH LLC, CASA CONEJO LLC, MARIA C. YOUNG, SALVE REGINA TRUST and MICHAEL S. YOUNG
Plaintiff / Appellee: UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Receiver: BRICK KANE OF ROBB EVANS & ASSOCIATES LLC
Case Number: 21-1061
Filed: February 23, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order [10822904] Order filed by Judges Matheson and Bacharach denying without prejudice the motion for limited remand filed by Appellee USSEC (please see order for further details). Order granting the request to abate proceeding. Status report due 05/17/2021 by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. The deadline for Appellants to file their opening brief and joint appendix is vacated. If the district court enters a ruling that impacts these proceedings, the SEC shall file a status report within 5 days thereof. Served on 04/15/2021. [21-1061, 21-1075] [Entered: 04/15/2021 04:19 PM]
April 14, 2021 [10822278] Supplement filed by USSEC in 21-1061, 21-1075 to Expedited Motion by Appellee Securities and Exchange Commission for a Limited Remand and a Stay of Briefing. Served on 04/14/2021. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [21-1061, 21-1075] DDL [Entered: 04/14/2021 11:28 AM]
April 13, 2021 [10821798] Order filed by Clerk of the Court. These matters are before the court on appellee's expedited motion for a limited remand and a stay of briefing. Accordingly, the motion for remand is taken under advisement, and appellee is directed to file a supplement to the motion. Supplemental motion due 04/19/2021 for United States Securities and Exchange Commission. See order for detailed information. Served on 04/13/2021. [21-1061, 21-1075] [Entered: 04/13/2021 08:25 AM]
April 12, 2021 [10821482] Response filed by Maria C. Young and Michael S. Young in 21-1061 to Appellee's Motion for a Limited Remand and a Stay of Briefing. Served on 04/12/2021. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [21-1061, 21-1075] TA [Entered: 04/12/2021 08:57 AM]
April 9, 2021 [10821304] Motion filed by Appellee USSEC in 21-1061, 21-1075 to remand case, for stay of appellate briefing pending a ruling by the district court on remand. Served on: 04/09/2021. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [21-1061, 21-1075] DDL [Entered: 04/09/2021 01:24 PM]
March 22, 2021 [10816941] Filed notice record is complete - in appeal no. 21-1075 - Served on 03/22/2021. Appellants' briefs and joint appendix are due on 05/03/2021 for Casa Conejo LLC, Hase Haus, LLC, Salve Regina Trust, TF Alliance, LLC, West Beach LLC, Maria C. Young, Michael S. Young, Bryant E. Sewall, Hanna Ohonkova Sewall, Michael S. Stewart, and Victoria M. Stewart. See the court's 3/10/2021 order regarding briefing. [21-1075, 21-1061] [Entered: 03/22/2021 03:52 PM]
March 10, 2021 [10813739] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Gary Owen Caris for Brick Kane of Robb Evans & Associates LLC. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 03/09/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-1061] [Entered: 03/10/2021 06:58 AM]
March 10, 2021 [10813988] Order filed by Clerk of the Court - The consolidated-briefing schedule set by this court on 03/04/2021 is vacated and modified as follows: Appellants may file separate opening briefs for nos. 21-1061 and 21-1075, but Appellants shall file joint appendix for both appeals. Appellee SEC and Appellee Brick Kane shall each file a single, consolidated response brief for both appeals. Appellants may file separate reply briefs. See order for details and additional information. Served on 03/10/2021. [21-1061] [Entered: 03/10/2021 12:50 PM]
March 9, 2021 [10813615] Entry of appearance submitted by Gary Owen Caris for Not Party Mr. Gary Owen Caris in 21-1061, 21-1075Brick Kane of Robb Evans & Associates LLC, Receiver for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 03/09/2021. Manner of Service: email, US mail. [21-1061] --[Edited 03/10/2021 by AT to remove PDF as pleading was filed on 3/10/2021.] GOC [Entered: 03/09/2021 01:51 PM]
March 8, 2021 [10813164] Notice of Mediation Conference filed by the Tenth Circuit Mediation Office. Telephone conference scheduled for 03/18/2021 at 9:00 am (MT). The mediation contact form must be completed and returned to the Mediation Office within four days of the date of this notice. [Please open the Notice for important information.] [21-1061, 21-1075] [Entered: 03/08/2021 09:59 AM]
March 4, 2021 [10812580] Order filed by Clerk of the Court - cases 21-1061 and 21-1075 are consolidated. The briefing schedule in 21-1061 is vacated. Appellants' opening briefs and appendix in these matters shall be due 40 days from the filing of the notice record complete in 21-1075. See order for details. Served on 03/04/2021. [21-1061, 21-1075] [Entered: 03/04/2021 04:17 PM]
March 3, 2021 [10811875] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Tracy Ashmore for Michael S. Young, Maria C. Young, West Beach LLC, Salve Regina Trust, TF Alliance, LLC, Casa Conejo LLC and Hase Haus, LLC. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 03/03/2021. Manner of Service: email [21-1061] [Entered: 03/03/2021 08:39 AM]
March 3, 2021 [10811870] Entry of appearance submitted by Tracy L. Ashmore for Appellants Casa Conejo LLC, Hase Haus, LLC, Salve Regina Trust, TF Alliance, LLC, West Beach LLC, Maria C. Young and Michael S. Young for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 03/03/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-1061]--[Edited 03/03/2021 by LG to remove PDF from entry, as pleading was filed on 3/3/2021] TA [Entered: 03/03/2021 08:31 AM]
March 3, 2021 [10811942] Acknowledgment of transcript order filed by Casa Conejo LLC, Hase Haus, LLC, Salve Regina Trust, TF Alliance, LLC, West Beach LLC, Maria C. Young and Michael S. Young. Transcript ordered: No transcripts necessary. Served on: 03/03/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-1061] TA [Entered: 03/03/2021 10:12 AM]
March 3, 2021 [10811941] Docketing statement filed by Casa Conejo LLC, Hase Haus, LLC, Salve Regina Trust, TF Alliance, LLC, West Beach LLC, Maria C. Young and Michael S. Young. Served on 03/03/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-1061] TA [Entered: 03/03/2021 10:07 AM]
March 3, 2021 [10811985] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 03/10/2021 for Jeffrey P. Colwell, Clerk of Court (oclk). (Text Only - No Attachment) [21-1061] [Entered: 03/03/2021 11:00 AM]
March 3, 2021 [10812025] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 03/03/2021. Appellants' brief and appendix due on 04/12/2021 for Casa Conejo LLC, Hase Haus, LLC, Salve Regina Trust, TF Alliance, LLC, West Beach LLC, Maria C. Young and Michael S. Young. Text entry only from district court notice. [21-1061] [Entered: 03/03/2021 11:57 AM]
February 24, 2021 [10810284] Entry of appearance submitted by David D. Lisitza for Appellee USSEC for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 02/24/2021. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 02/24/2021 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed] [21-1061] DDL [Entered: 02/24/2021 03:22 PM]
February 24, 2021 [10810291] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. David Darren Lisitza for USSEC. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y (parties previously disclosed). Served on 02/24/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-1061] [Entered: 02/24/2021 03:26 PM]
February 23, 2021 [10809825] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 02/23/2021 Docketing statement due 03/09/2021 for Casa Conejo LLC, Hase Haus, LLC, Salve Regina Trust, TF Alliance, LLC, West Beach LLC, Maria C. Young and Michael S. Young. Transcript order form due 03/09/2021 for Casa Conejo LLC, Hase Haus, LLC, Salve Regina Trust, TF Alliance, LLC, West Beach LLC, Maria C. Young and Michael S. Young. Notice of appearance due on 03/09/2021 for Casa Conejo LLC, Hase Haus, LLC, Mediatrix Capital PR LLC, Salve Regina Trust, TF Alliance, LLC, and United States Securities and Exchange Commission [21-1061] [Entered: 02/23/2021 12:26 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: USSEC v. Young, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DCC ISLANDS FOUNDATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEDIATRIX CAPITAL PR LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HANNA OHONKOVA SEWALL
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Thomas
Represented By: Viivian Rivera Droahn
Represented By: Vivian R. Drohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VICTORIA M. STEWART
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Thomas
Represented By: Viivian Rivera Droahn
Represented By: Vivian R. Drohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL C. BAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRYANT E. SEWALL
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Thomas
Represented By: Viivian Rivera Droahn
Represented By: Vivian R. Drohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLUE ISLE MARKETS, LTD
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Thomas
Represented By: Viivian Rivera Droahn
Represented By: Vivian R. Drohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARUAL LP
Represented By: Thomas Krysa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ISLAND TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEDIATRIX CAPITAL, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE 1989 FOUNDATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEDIATRIX CAPITAL INC.
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Thomas
Represented By: Viivian Rivera Droahn
Represented By: Vivian R. Drohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLUE ISLE MARKETS, INC., St. Vincent & the Grenadines
Represented By: Viivian Rivera Droahn
Represented By: Vivian R. Drohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEDIATRIX CAPITAL FUND LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALTER C. YOUNG, III
Represented By: Tamera D. Westerberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEINZEL, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL S. STEWART
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Thomas
Represented By: Viivian Rivera Droahn
Represented By: Vivian R. Drohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLUE ISLE MARKETS INC., Cayman Islands
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEYSTONE BUSINESS TRUST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: HASE HAUS, LLC
Represented By: Tracy Ashmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: TF ALLIANCE, LLC
Represented By: Tracy Ashmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: WEST BEACH LLC
Represented By: Tracy Ashmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: CASA CONEJO LLC
Represented By: Tracy Ashmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MARIA C. YOUNG
Represented By: Tracy Ashmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: SALVE REGINA TRUST
Represented By: Tracy Ashmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MICHAEL S. YOUNG
Represented By: Tracy Ashmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Represented By: David Darren Lisitza
Represented By: Stephen C. McKenna
Represented By: Mark L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Receiver: BRICK KANE OF ROBB EVANS & ASSOCIATES LLC
Represented By: Gary Owen Caris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?