Cox v. Caley, et al
Respondent / Appellee: ED CALEY, Warden of the Colorado Territorial Correctional Facility and THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF COLORADO
Petitioner / Appellant: KENNETH J. COX
Case Number: 21-1201
Filed: June 2, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2021 [10844443] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 1. Comment: One volume containing pleadings. [21-1201] [Entered: 07/19/2021 10:08 AM]
July 15, 2021 [10843861] Jurisdictional review complete. Fee or ifp forms and appellant brief due by 08/24/2021 for Kenneth J. Cox. Record on appeal 10th circuit due 08/05/2021 [21-1201] [Entered: 07/15/2021 08:37 AM]
June 14, 2021 [10836493] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Ellen E Michaels for The Attorney General of the State of Colorado and Ed Caley. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served (mailed) on 06/13/2021. Manner of Service: US mail. [21-1201] [Entered: 06/14/2021 06:56 AM]
June 13, 2021 [10836491] Entry of appearance submitted by Ellen Michaels for Appellees Ed Caley and The Attorney General of the State of Colorado for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 06/13/2021. Manner of Service: US mail. [21-1201] --[Edited 06/14/2021 by AT to remove PDF as pleading wsa filed on 6/14/2021.] EEM [Entered: 06/13/2021 03:03 PM]
June 10, 2021 [10835972] Entry of appearance filed by Kenneth J. Cox. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 06/07/2021. Manner of Service: US mail [21-1201] [Entered: 06/10/2021 11:23 AM]
June 2, 2021 [10834001] Prisoner case docketed. DATE RECEIVED: 06/02/2021. Fee is due by 07/02/2021 for Kenneth J. Cox. Notice of appearance due on 06/16/2021 for Ed Caley and The Attorney General of the State of Colorado, and Notice of appearance due on 07/02/2021 for Kenneth J. Cox. [21-1201] [Entered: 06/02/2021 01:24 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Cox v. Caley, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: ED CALEY, Warden of the Colorado Territorial Correctional Facility
Represented By: Ellen E. Michaels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF COLORADO
Represented By: Ellen E. Michaels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: KENNETH J. COX
Represented By: Kenneth J. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?