Ward v. Pruitt, et al
Petitioner / Appellant: JAWAUN WARD
Respondent / Appellee: SEAN PRUITT and THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF COLORADO
Case Number: 21-1260
Filed: July 22, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2021 [10854364] Fee paid. Date paid in District Court on 08/31/2021. [21-1260] [Entered: 08/31/2021 09:47 AM]
August 17, 2021 [10851035] Entry of appearance filed by Jawaun Ward. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 08/12/2021. Manner of Service: US mail [21-1260] [Entered: 08/17/2021 12:09 PM]
August 17, 2021 [10851079] Order filed by Clerk of the Court - This matter is before the court on review of appellant's combined opening brief and application for certificate of appealability. The appellant included 164 pages of attachments with the brief. The court will accept only a portion of the attachments for filing (please see order for further details). Served on 08/17/2021. [21-1260] [Entered: 08/17/2021 02:10 PM]
August 17, 2021 [10851082] Attachments submitted with the brief but not accepted for filing - received from Jawaun Ward but not filed. Served on 08/12/2021. Manner of Service: US mail. [21-1260] [Entered: 08/17/2021 02:13 PM]
August 17, 2021 [10851081] Appellant brief and application for certificate of appealability filed by Jawaun Ward. Original and 4 copies. Served on 08/12/2021 by email. [21-1260] [Entered: 08/17/2021 02:12 PM]
August 10, 2021 [10849536] Order filed by Clerk of the Court. This matter is before the court on correspondence received by the appellant, which the court construes as a motion for extension of time. The motion is granted. Appellant's brief/COA, and entry of appearance due on 09/30/2021 for Jawaun Ward. See order for additional details. Served on 08/10/2021. [21-1260] [Entered: 08/10/2021 02:11 PM]
August 9, 2021 [10849156] Appellant's motion filed by Jawaun Ward to extend time to file appellant's brief/coa and entry of appearance until unspecified date and to exempt appellant from serving the appellee. Served on 08/05/2021. Manner of Service: US mail. [21-1260] [Entered: 08/09/2021 12:44 PM]
July 23, 2021 [10845560] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 1. Comments: One volume containing pleadings plus 3 cd's of the state court record in hard copy only. [21-1260]--[Edited 07/26/2021 by LG to add receipt of the state court record cd's] [Entered: 07/23/2021 08:17 AM]
July 22, 2021 [10845328] Entry of appearance submitted by Elizabeth Fraser Rohrbough for Appellees Sean Pruitt and The Attorney General of the State of Colorado for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 07/22/2021. Manner of Service: US mail.--[Edited 07/22/2021 by JJH to remove pdf as pleading filed 07/22/2021] [21-1260] EFR [Entered: 07/22/2021 09:36 AM]
July 22, 2021 [10845331] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Elizabeth Fraser Rohrbough for The Attorney General of the State of Colorado and Sean Pruitt. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 07/22/2021. Manner of Service: US mail [21-1260] [Entered: 07/22/2021 09:41 AM]
July 22, 2021 [10845447] Jurisdictional review complete. Fee or ifp form, notice of appearance and Appellant's brief and Certificate of Appealability due 08/31/2021 for Jawaun Ward. Record on appeal 10th Circuit due 08/12/2021 [21-1260] [Entered: 07/22/2021 01:52 PM]
July 22, 2021 [10845293] Prisoner case docketed. DATE RECEIVED: 07/21/2021. Notice of appearance due on 08/05/2021 for Sean Pruitt and The Attorney General of the State of Colorado, and Notice of appearance due on 08/23/2021 for Jawaun Ward. Fee or ifp forms due 08/23/2021 for Jawaun Ward. [21-1260] [Entered: 07/22/2021 08:37 AM]
July 22, 2021 [10845441] District court order denying leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. [21-1260] [Entered: 07/22/2021 01:50 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Ward v. Pruitt, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: JAWAUN WARD
Represented By: Jawaun Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: SEAN PRUITT
Represented By: Elizabeth Fraser Rohrbough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF COLORADO
Represented By: Elizabeth Fraser Rohrbough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?