Serna v. Denver Police Department, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: FRANCISCO SERNA
Defendant / Appellee: DENVER POLICE DEPARTMENT and ANSELMO JARAMILLO
Case Number: 21-1446
Filed: December 30, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2022 [10891060] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 1. Comments: One volume containing pleadings. [21-1446] [Entered: 02/04/2022 04:07 PM]
January 31, 2022 [10889348] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 02/07/2022 for Jeffrey P. Colwell, Clerk of Court (oclk). (Text Only - No Attachment) [21-1446] [Entered: 01/31/2022 08:19 AM]
January 31, 2022 [10889436] Notice of clerical error [21-1446] The entry for the notice of record complete on 1/31/2022 contained an incorrect brief deadline. The original deadline of 4/1/2022 remains per the court's order of 1/28/2022. [Entered: 01/31/2022 10:32 AM]
January 31, 2022 [10889435] Filed notice record is complete. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. Served on 01/31/2022. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 03/14/2022 for Francisco Serna. [21-1446] [Entered: 01/31/2022 10:30 AM]
January 31, 2022 [10889454] Minute order filed - Record on appeal due district court 02/10/2022. (Text Only - No Attachment) [21-1446] This is a pro bono case, and a designation of record was filed, therefore this court's minute order of 1/31/2022 scheduling an ROA notice was incorrect. The ROA shall be transmitted to this court from the District Court. [Entered: 01/31/2022 11:07 AM]
January 28, 2022 [10889159] Order filed by Clerk of the Court - As an intial matter the 1/14/22 order neglected to set a deadline for Appellant's counsel to file a transcript order form. Transcript order form due 02/07/2022 for Francisco Serna. Appellant's unopposed motion for extended briefing schedule is granted. Appellant's brief due on 04/01/2022 for Francisco Serna. Appellees' brief due 06/03/2022 for Denver Police Department and Anselmo Jaramillo. Appellant's optional reply brief due 06/17/2022 for Francisco Serna. Served on 01/28/2022. [21-1446] [Entered: 01/28/2022 11:29 AM]
January 28, 2022 [10889293] Notice received from Francisco Serna that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. Served on: 01/28/2022. Manner of Service: email [21-1446] MC [Entered: 01/28/2022 06:29 PM]
January 27, 2022 [10889010] Motion filed by Appellant Francisco Serna to extend time to file appellant/petitioner's brief until 04/01/2022. Served on: 01/27/2022. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required privacy and virus certifications: Yes. [21-1446] MC [Entered: 01/27/2022 05:51 PM]
January 27, 2022 [10889009] Designation of record filed by Appellant Francisco Serna. Served on 01/27/2022. Manner of Service: email. [21-1446] MC [Entered: 01/27/2022 05:03 PM]
January 14, 2022 [10886086] Entry of appearance filed by Matthew Cushing for Francisco Serna. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 01/14/2022. Manner of Service: email. [21-1446] [Entered: 01/14/2022 01:51 PM]
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order [10885977] Order filed by Judge Tymkovich appointing attorney Matthew Cushing to represent appellant. Notice of appearance and designation of record due 01/28/2022 for Francisco Serna. Served on 01/14/2022. [21-1446] [Entered: 01/14/2022 12:21 PM]
January 14, 2022 [10886071] Entry of appearance submitted by Matthew Robert Cushing for Appellant Francisco Serna for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 01/14/2022. Manner of Service: email. [21-1446] --[Edited 01/14/2022 by AT to remove PDF as pleading was filed on 1/14/2022.] MC [Entered: 01/14/2022 01:33 PM]
January 13, 2022 [10885733] Entry of appearance submitted by Jennifer Johnson and Conor D. Farley for Appellees Denver Police Department and Anselmo Jaramillo for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 01/13/2022. Manner of Service: US mail. --[Edited 01/13/2022 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed][21-1446] JJ [Entered: 01/13/2022 01:19 PM]
January 13, 2022 [10885742] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Conor Daniel Farley and Ms. Jennifer Johnson for Denver Police Department and Anselmo Jaramillo. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 01/13/2022. Manner of Service: US mail. [21-1446] [Entered: 01/13/2022 01:47 PM]
January 13, 2022 [10885747] Motion for Leave to Proceed on Appeal Without Prepayment of Costs and Fees received from Francisco Serna but not filed. Submitted only for the purpose of determining Appellant's financial eligibility for appointment of counsel under the court's Plan for Appointment of Counsel in Special Civil Appeals. Served on 01/12/2022. Manner of Service: US mail. [21-1446] [Entered: 01/13/2022 01:55 PM]
January 10, 2022 [10884710] Docketing statement filed by Francisco Serna. Served on 01/04/2022. Manner of Service: US mail. [21-1446] [Entered: 01/10/2022 01:04 PM]
January 4, 2022 [10885746] Fee paid. Date paid in District Court on 01/04/2022. [21-1446] [Entered: 01/13/2022 01:52 PM]
December 30, 2021 [10882769] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 12/30/2021 Fee or ifp forms and notice of appearance due 01/31/2022 for Francisco Serna. Notice of appearance due on 01/13/2022 for Denver Police Department and Anselmo Jaramillo. [21-1446] [Entered: 12/30/2021 08:50 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Serna v. Denver Police Department, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: FRANCISCO SERNA
Represented By: Francisco Serna
Represented By: Matthew Cushing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DENVER POLICE DEPARTMENT
Represented By: Conor Daniel Farley
Represented By: Jennifer Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANSELMO JARAMILLO
Represented By: Conor Daniel Farley
Represented By: Jennifer Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?