Payton v. Kelly, et al
Defendant / Appellee: NATHANAEL S. TIMM, Mailroom Clerk/Officer, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in his official professional and non-professional individual capacities, HUTCHINSON CORRECTIONAL FACILITY, Mailroom, in its official professional and non-professional capacities, D. CLAY VANHOOSE, Major, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in his official professional and non-professional individual capacities, JEFF ZMUDA, Secretary of Corrections, in his official professional and non-professional individual capacities, JESSICA L. BROCK, Unit Team, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in her official professional and non-professional individual capacities, JEFFREY N. PETTIJOHN, Unit Team Supervisor, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in his official professional and non-professional individual capacities, WILLIAM SEYMOUR, JR., East Unit Team, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, East Unit Manager of the East Unit Unit Teams, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in his official professional and non-professional individual capacities, SEGREGATION REVIEW BOARD, All Unknown/Unnamed Members, in their official professional and non-professional individual capacities, CHARLES G. PARKS, East Unit Manager ofthe East Unit - Unit Teams, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in his official professional and non-professional capacities, DEREK SCHMIDT, Kansas Attorney General, in his official professional and non-professional individual capacities, TREVA KOOB, East Unit Supervisor over East Unit - Unit Teams, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in her official professional and non-professional individual capacities, CHERYL SCHLICKEISER, East Unit Team, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in her official professional and non-professional capacities, AKA Cheryl L. Schlicker, PATTI KEEN, Senior Administrative Assistant and Mailroom Supervisor, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in her official professional and non-professional individual capacities, BRANDON G. RUIZ, Unit Team Manager, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in his official professional and non-professional individual capacities, DAN SCHNURR, Warden, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in his official professional and non-professional individual capacities, LAURA KELLY, Governor, in her official professional and non-professional individual capacities, SCOTT L. HAMBRICK, III, Unit Team, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in his official professional and non-professional individual capacities, HUTCHINSON CORRECTIONAL FACILITY, in its official professional and non-professional capacities, ALEC R. WILSON, Sergeant, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in his official professional and non-professional capacities, JORDAN C. BELL, Segregation Unit Team Manager, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, East Unit Manager of the East Unit Unit Teams, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in his official professional and non-professional individual capacities, JON D. GRAVES, Facility Attorney at Law, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, East Unit Manager of the East Unit Unit Teams, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in his official professional and non-professional individual capacities, MISTI D. KROEKER, Administrative Assistant, Hutchinson Correctional Facility East Unit and South Unit, in her official professional and non-professional individual capacities, ELIZABETH ALLAN, East Unit Team, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in her official professional and non-professional individual capacities, NATHAN T. RUSH, Unit Team, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, East Unit Manager of the East Unit Unit Teams, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in his official professional and non-professional individual capacities and AMANDA STONE, Former Corporal/Current Administrative Assistant, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in her official professional and non-professional individual capacities
Plaintiff / Appellant: WALTER ALMON PAYTON, AKA Walter Peyton, Inc.
Case Number: 21-3088
Filed: May 18, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2021 [10842615] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting appellant's motion to extend time to file corrected 1915 forms. Addendum to 1915 motion now due 08/05/2021 for Walter Almon Payton. Served on 07/09/2021. [21-3088] [Entered: 07/09/2021 12:39 PM]
July 9, 2021 [10842590] Appellant's motion filed by Mr. Walter Almon Payton for continuance (construed as a motion to extend time to file corrected 1915 motion). Served on 07/06/2021. Manner of Service: US mail. [21-3088] [Entered: 07/09/2021 12:06 PM]
June 28, 2021 [10839899] Notice of deficient motion received from Appellant Walter Almon Payton. The motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is missing the Addendum to Financial Declaration and Authorization pages. Served on 06/22/2021. Manner of Service: US mail. Corrected motion due 07/08/2021 for Walter Almon Payton. [21-3088] [Entered: 06/28/2021 03:09 PM]
June 28, 2021 [10839863] Order filed by Clerk of the Court assessing costs and fees in the amount of $505.00. Served on 06/28/2021. [21-3088] [Entered: 06/28/2021 02:03 PM]
June 28, 2021 [10839851] Appellant's motion filed by Walter Almon Payton for leave to proceed without prepayment of costs and fees. Served on 06/22/2021. Manner of Service: US mail. [21-3088] --[Edited 07/09/2021 by SLS to note the motion has been cited as deficient per the notice dated 06/28/2021.] [Entered: 06/28/2021 01:49 PM]
June 28, 2021 [10839848] Appellant brief filed by Walter Almon Payton. Original - Clerk made 4 copies. Served on 06/22/2021 by.. Required 10th Cir. R. 28.2 Attachments Included? n. [21-3088] [Entered: 06/28/2021 01:44 PM]
June 9, 2021 [10835611] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Walter Almon Payton. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 06/02/2021. Manner of Service: US mail [21-3088] [Entered: 06/09/2021 10:35 AM]
May 26, 2021 [10832665] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 1, Comments: Volume I - Pleadings. [21-3088] [Entered: 05/26/2021 10:02 AM]
May 24, 2021 [10832023] Amended notice of appeal filed. [21-3088] [Entered: 05/24/2021 01:54 PM]
May 24, 2021 [10831814] Jurisdictional review complete. Appellant's brief and fee or 1915 forms due 07/06/2021 for Walter Almon Payton. Record on appeal 10th circuit due 06/14/2021 [21-3088] [Entered: 05/24/2021 08:03 AM]
May 18, 2021 [10830765] Prisoner case docketed. DATE RECEIVED: 05/18/2021. Notice of appearance due on 06/17/2021 for Walter Almon Payton [21-3088] [Entered: 05/18/2021 10:31 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Payton v. Kelly, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NATHANAEL S. TIMM, Mailroom Clerk/Officer, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in his official professional and non-professional individual capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HUTCHINSON CORRECTIONAL FACILITY, Mailroom, in its official professional and non-professional capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: D. CLAY VANHOOSE, Major, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in his official professional and non-professional individual capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JEFF ZMUDA, Secretary of Corrections, in his official professional and non-professional individual capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JESSICA L. BROCK, Unit Team, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in her official professional and non-professional individual capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JEFFREY N. PETTIJOHN, Unit Team Supervisor, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in his official professional and non-professional individual capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WILLIAM SEYMOUR, JR., East Unit Team, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, East Unit Manager of the East Unit Unit Teams, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in his official professional and non-professional individual capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SEGREGATION REVIEW BOARD, All Unknown/Unnamed Members, in their official professional and non-professional individual capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHARLES G. PARKS, East Unit Manager ofthe East Unit - Unit Teams, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in his official professional and non-professional capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DEREK SCHMIDT, Kansas Attorney General, in his official professional and non-professional individual capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TREVA KOOB, East Unit Supervisor over East Unit - Unit Teams, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in her official professional and non-professional individual capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHERYL SCHLICKEISER, East Unit Team, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in her official professional and non-professional capacities, AKA Cheryl L. Schlicker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PATTI KEEN, Senior Administrative Assistant and Mailroom Supervisor, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in her official professional and non-professional individual capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRANDON G. RUIZ, Unit Team Manager, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in his official professional and non-professional individual capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAN SCHNURR, Warden, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in his official professional and non-professional individual capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LAURA KELLY, Governor, in her official professional and non-professional individual capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SCOTT L. HAMBRICK, III, Unit Team, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in his official professional and non-professional individual capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HUTCHINSON CORRECTIONAL FACILITY, in its official professional and non-professional capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALEC R. WILSON, Sergeant, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in his official professional and non-professional capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JORDAN C. BELL, Segregation Unit Team Manager, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, East Unit Manager of the East Unit Unit Teams, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in his official professional and non-professional individual capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JON D. GRAVES, Facility Attorney at Law, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, East Unit Manager of the East Unit Unit Teams, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in his official professional and non-professional individual capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MISTI D. KROEKER, Administrative Assistant, Hutchinson Correctional Facility East Unit and South Unit, in her official professional and non-professional individual capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ELIZABETH ALLAN, East Unit Team, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in her official professional and non-professional individual capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NATHAN T. RUSH, Unit Team, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, East Unit Manager of the East Unit Unit Teams, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in his official professional and non-professional individual capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMANDA STONE, Former Corporal/Current Administrative Assistant, Hutchinson Correctional Facility, in her official professional and non-professional individual capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WALTER ALMON PAYTON, AKA Walter Peyton, Inc.
Represented By: Walter Almon Payton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?