Copeland, et al v. C.A.A.I.R., et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: IKAIKA KAMAI, NATHAN TAYLOR, TRAVIS OWENS, JOHNNY GILMORE, JOSH FORAN, RAPHAEL GRAJEDA, PABLO ANGELES, PATRICK DOYLE, MARQUIS LUCKEY, CLINTON MEYER, CHARLES GREENHAW, CALEB BYRD, DAVID BRANDON SPURGIN, TERRY MCCRACKEN, JASON MIQUELI, MICHAEL WELGE, NATHAN TURNER, DE'UNDRE WOODARD, CALEB KLEIER, MICHAEL WYCHE, CRAIGORY BLUE, SHANE O'NEAL, MICHAEL HARPER, JERRY WALL, BOBBY NICHOLES, CODY BUMPAS, JOE COTRONE, KEITH ALSPAUGH, JACKIE JOHNSON, MICHAEL MCCARTNEY, STEVE COOK, MICHAEL HARRELL, TITUS STATON, THOMAS RICO, DANIEL WEST, CLINTON HARMS, BRANDON MILLS, MICHAEL GREENHAW, KENNETH GENTRY, JESSE BROWN, STANLEY SHANE ALEXANDER, JASON BAKER, RYAN COLE, ROBERT NASHERT, DWAYNE MOSS, BRAD MCGAHEY, CHARLES RICKMAN, RYAN DORLAND, ARTHUR COPELAND, JASON VALLANDINGHAM, JARRET JONES, BRIAN PEARSON and DAVID BANKS
Defendant / Appellee: JANET WILKERSON, JIM LOVELL, C.A.A.I.R., a domestic not for profit corporation, LOUISE DUNHAM, DON WILKERSON, SIMMONS FOODS, INC., a foreign for profit business corporation and SIMMONS PET FOOD, INC.
Case Number: 21-5024
Filed: March 23, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2021 [10827890] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. John Henry Rule, II for Simmons Pet Food, Inc. and Simmons Foods, Inc.. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 05/06/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-5024] [Entered: 05/06/2021 10:55 AM]
May 6, 2021 [10827816] Entry of appearance submitted by John Henry Rule for Appellees Simmons Foods, Inc. and Simmons Pet Food, Inc. for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 05/06/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-5024]--[Edited 05/06/2021 by JM PDF removed filed by the court on 5/6/21.] JHR [Entered: 05/06/2021 09:05 AM]
May 5, 2021 [10827553] On the court's own motion and pursuant to 10th Cir. R. 33.1, order filed by (CLK) extending time to file appellants' brief and appendix until 06/18/2021 for Stanley Shane Alexander, Keith Alspaugh, Pablo Angeles, Jason Baker, David Banks, Craigory Blue, Jesse Brown, Cody Bumpas, Caleb Byrd, Ryan Cole, Steve Cook, Arthur Copeland, Joe Cotrone, Ryan Dorland, Patrick Doyle, Josh Foran, Kenneth Gentry, Johnny Gilmore, Raphael Grajeda, Charles Greenhaw, Michael Greenhaw, Clinton Harms, Michael Harper, Michael Harrell, Jackie Johnson, Jarret Jones, Ikaika Kamai, Caleb Kleier, Marquis Luckey, Michael McCartney, Terry McCracken, Brad McGahey, Clinton Meyer, Brandon Mills, Jason Miqueli, Dwayne Moss, Robert Nashert, Bobby Nicholes, Shane O'Neal, Travis Owens, Brian Pearson, Charles Rickman, Thomas Rico, David Brandon Spurgin, Titus Staton, Nathan Taylor, Nathan Turner, Jason Vallandingham, Jerry Wall, Michael Welge, Daniel West, De'Undre Woodard and Michael Wyche. [21-5024] [Entered: 05/05/2021 11:07 AM]
May 4, 2021 [10827297] Notice filed by C.A.A.I.R., Jim Lovell, Don Wilkerson and Ms. Janet Wilkerson. Served on 05/04/2021 by email. [21-5024] REL [Entered: 05/04/2021 12:47 PM]
April 20, 2021 [10823900] Order filed by Clerk of the Court directing counsel for Appellants and counsel for appellee Jim Lovell to confer and provide additional information to the court as to whether another person (e.g., Mr. Lovells successor in his position or his personal representative) will be substituted for Mr. Lovell. See order for details. Response(s) due on 05/04/2021 for C.A.A.I.R., Arthur Copeland and Jim Lovell. Served on 04/20/2021. [21-5024] [Entered: 04/20/2021 03:34 PM]
April 20, 2021 [10823833] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Nicholas James Foster, Mr. Randall Edwin Long and Ms. Denelda L. Richardson for Janet Wilkerson and Don Wilkerson. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 04/20/2021. Manner of Service: email [21-5024] [Entered: 04/20/2021 01:53 PM]
April 20, 2021 [10823827] Notice filed by C.A.A.I.R., Ms. Janet Wilkerson and Don Wilkerson. Served on 04/20/2021 by email. [21-5024] REL [Entered: 04/20/2021 01:48 PM]
April 20, 2021 [10823820] Entry of appearance submitted by Randall E. Long, Denelda L. Richardson, Nicholas J. Foster for Appellees Ms. Janet Wilkerson and Don Wilkerson for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 04/20/2021. Manner of Service: email.--[Edited 04/20/2021 by MLB to remove pdf from docket; entry filed on 04/20/21] [21-5024] REL [Entered: 04/20/2021 01:40 PM]
April 20, 2021 [10823618] Deficiency notice issued. Type of deficiency: no entry of appearance has been filed for Don and Janet Wilkerson or Jim Lovell. Notice of appearance due on 04/23/2021 for Jim Lovell, and Don and Janet Wilkerson. [21-5024] [Entered: 04/20/2021 08:24 AM]
April 19, 2021 [10823328] Notice of Mediation Conference filed by the Tenth Circuit Mediation Office. Telephone conference scheduled for 05/05/2021 at 9:00 am (MT). The mediation contact form must be completed and returned to the Mediation Office within four days of the date of this notice. [Please open the Notice for important information.] [21-5024] [Entered: 04/19/2021 09:38 AM]
April 15, 2021 [10822598] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 04/15/2021. Appellants' opening brief and appendix due on 05/25/2021 for Stanley Shane Alexander, Keith Alspaugh, Pablo Angeles, Jason Baker, David Banks, Craigory Blue, Jesse Brown, Cody Bumpas, Caleb Byrd, Ryan Cole, Steve Cook, Arthur Copeland, Joe Cotrone, Ryan Dorland, Patrick Doyle, Josh Foran, Kenneth Gentry, Johnny Gilmore, Raphael Grajeda, Charles Greenhaw, Michael Greenhaw, Clinton Harms, Michael Harper, Michael Harrell, Jackie Johnson, Jarret Jones, Ikaika Kamai, Caleb Kleier, Marquis Luckey, Michael McCartney, Terry McCracken, Brad McGahey, Clinton Meyer, Brandon Mills, Jason Miqueli, Dwayne Moss, Robert Nashert, Bobby Nicholes, Shane O'Neal, Travis Owens, Brian Pearson, Charles Rickman, Thomas Rico, David Brandon Spurgin, Titus Staton, Nathan Taylor, Nathan Turner, Jason Vallandingham, Jerry Wall, Michael Welge, Daniel West, De'Undre Woodard and Michael Wyche. [21-5024] [Entered: 04/15/2021 10:32 AM]
April 14, 2021 [10822211] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 04/21/2021 for Mark C. McCartt, Clerk of Court. (Text Only - No Attachment) [21-5024] [Entered: 04/14/2021 09:05 AM]
April 14, 2021 [10822199] Docketing statement filed by Mr. Stanley Shane Alexander, Mr. Keith Alspaugh, Pablo Angeles, Mr. Jason Baker, Mr. David Banks, Mr. Craigory Blue, Jesse Brown, Mr. Cody Bumpas, Mr. Caleb Byrd, Mr. Ryan Cole, Mr. Steve Cook, Mr. Arthur Copeland, Mr. Joe Cotrone, Mr. Ryan Dorland, Mr. Patrick Doyle, Mr. Josh Foran, Mr. Kenneth Gentry, Mr. Johnny Gilmore, Mr. Raphael Grajeda, Mr. Charles Greenhaw, Mr. Michael Greenhaw, Mr. Clinton Harms, Mr. Michael Harper, Michael Harrell, Jackie Johnson, Jarret Jones, Ikaika Kamai, Mr. Caleb Kleier, Mr. Marquis Luckey, Mr. Michael McCartney, Terry McCracken, Mr. Brad McGahey, Clinton Meyer, Mr. Brandon Mills, Mr. Jason Miqueli, Mr. Dwayne Moss, Mr. Robert Nashert, Mr. Bobby Nicholes, Mr. Shane O'Neal, Mr. Travis Owens, Mr. Brian Pearson, Mr. Charles Rickman, Mr. Thomas Rico, David Brandon Spurgin, Titus Staton, Mr. Nathan Taylor, Mr. Nathan Turner, Mr. Jason Vallandingham, Jerry Wall, Mr. Michael Welge, Mr. Daniel West, De'Undre Woodard and Mr. Michael Wyche. Served on 04/14/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-5024] DES [Entered: 04/14/2021 08:51 AM]
April 14, 2021 [10822196] Notice received from Mr. Stanley Shane Alexander, Mr. Keith Alspaugh, Pablo Angeles, Mr. Jason Baker, Mr. David Banks, Mr. Craigory Blue, Jesse Brown, Mr. Cody Bumpas, Mr. Caleb Byrd, Mr. Ryan Cole, Mr. Steve Cook, Mr. Arthur Copeland, Mr. Joe Cotrone, Mr. Ryan Dorland, Mr. Patrick Doyle, Mr. Josh Foran, Mr. Kenneth Gentry, Mr. Johnny Gilmore, Mr. Raphael Grajeda, Mr. Charles Greenhaw, Mr. Michael Greenhaw, Mr. Clinton Harms, Mr. Michael Harper, Michael Harrell, Jackie Johnson, Jarret Jones, Ikaika Kamai, Mr. Caleb Kleier, Mr. Marquis Luckey, Mr. Michael McCartney, Terry McCracken, Mr. Brad McGahey, Clinton Meyer, Mr. Brandon Mills, Mr. Jason Miqueli, Mr. Dwayne Moss, Mr. Robert Nashert, Mr. Bobby Nicholes, Mr. Shane O'Neal, Mr. Travis Owens, Mr. Brian Pearson, Mr. Charles Rickman, Mr. Thomas Rico, David Brandon Spurgin, Titus Staton, Mr. Nathan Taylor, Mr. Nathan Turner, Mr. Jason Vallandingham, Jerry Wall, Mr. Michael Welge, Mr. Daniel West, De'Undre Woodard and Mr. Michael Wyche that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. Served on: 04/14/2021. Manner of Service: email [21-5024] DES [Entered: 04/14/2021 08:49 AM]
April 13, 2021 [10822085] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Robert M. Blakemore and Mr. Daniel E. Smolen for Jesse Brown, Mr. Arthur Copeland, David Brandon Spurgin, Mr. Brad McGahey, Mr. David Banks, Mr. Ryan Dorland, Mr. Kenneth Gentry, Jarret Jones, Mr. Jason Miqueli, Mr. Travis Owens, Mr. Charles Rickman, Mr. Thomas Rico, Mr. Nathan Turner, Mr. Daniel West, De'Undre Woodard, Mr. Caleb Byrd, Mr. Charles Greenhaw, Mr. Keith Alspaugh, Mr. Bobby Nicholes, Michael Harrell, Titus Staton, Mr. Caleb Kleier, Mr. Dwayne Moss, Mr. Steve Cook, Mr. Michael Greenhaw, Mr. Patrick Doyle, Mr. Michael Welge, Mr. Michael McCartney, Jerry Wall, Mr. Robert Nashert, Mr. Cody Bumpas, Pablo Angeles, Clinton Meyer, Mr. Craigory Blue, Mr. Marquis Luckey, Mr. Stanley Shane Alexander, Mr. Brandon Mills, Mr. Joe Cotrone, Mr. Nathan Taylor, Mr. Jason Vallandingham, Mr. Ryan Cole, Jackie Johnson, Mr. Johnny Gilmore, Mr. Raphael Grajeda, Mr. Brian Pearson, Mr. Josh Foran, Terry McCracken, Mr. Michael Harper, Mr. Michael Wyche, Ikaika Kamai, Mr. Jason Baker, Mr. Clinton Harms and Mr. Shane O'Neal. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 04/13/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-5024] [Entered: 04/13/2021 04:19 PM]
April 13, 2021 [10822074] Entry of appearance submitted by Daniel E. Smolen and Robert M.Blakemore for Appellants Mr. Stanley Shane Alexander, Mr. Keith Alspaugh, Pablo Angeles, Mr. Jason Baker, Mr. David Banks, Mr. Craigory Blue, Jesse Brown, Mr. Cody Bumpas, Mr. Caleb Byrd, Mr. Ryan Cole, Mr. Steve Cook, Mr. Arthur Copeland, Mr. Joe Cotrone, Mr. Ryan Dorland, Mr. Patrick Doyle, Mr. Josh Foran, Mr. Kenneth Gentry, Mr. Johnny Gilmore, Mr. Raphael Grajeda, Mr. Charles Greenhaw, Mr. Michael Greenhaw, Mr. Clinton Harms, Mr. Michael Harper, Michael Harrell, Jackie Johnson, Jarret Jones, Ikaika Kamai, Mr. Caleb Kleier, Mr. Marquis Luckey, Mr. Michael McCartney, Terry McCracken, Mr. Brad McGahey, Clinton Meyer, Mr. Brandon Mills, Mr. Jason Miqueli, Mr. Dwayne Moss, Mr. Robert Nashert, Mr. Bobby Nicholes, Mr. Shane O'Neal, Mr. Travis Owens, Mr. Brian Pearson, Mr. Charles Rickman, Mr. Thomas Rico, David Brandon Spurgin, Titus Staton, Mr. Nathan Taylor, Mr. Nathan Turner, Mr. Jason Vallandingham, Jerry Wall, Mr. Michael Welge, Mr. Daniel West, De'Undre Woodard and Mr. Michael Wyche for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 04/13/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-5024] --[Edited 04/13/2021 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] DES [Entered: 04/13/2021 04:01 PM]
April 13, 2021 [10822047] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Nicholas James Foster for C.A.A.I.R. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 04/13/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-5024] [Entered: 04/13/2021 03:21 PM]
April 13, 2021 [10822008] Entry of appearance submitted by Nicholas J. Foster for Appellee C.A.A.I.R. for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 04/13/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-5024]--[Edited 04/13/2021 by JM PDF removed filed by the court on 4/13/21.] NJF [Entered: 04/13/2021 01:46 PM]
April 7, 2021 [10820717] Entry of appearance filed by Justin A Lollman, John David Russell, Amy Melissa Stipe and Christopher S. Thrutchley for Simmons Foods, Inc. and Simmons Pet Food, Inc. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 04/07/2021. Manner of Service: email [21-5024] [Entered: 04/07/2021 03:22 PM]
April 7, 2021 [10820710] Entry of appearance submitted by Christopher S. Thrutchley, Amy M. Stipe, John D. Russell and Justin A. Lollman for Appellees Simmons Foods, Inc. and Simmons Pet Food, Inc. for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 04/07/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-5024]--[Edited 04/07/2021 by DJD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 4/7/21] CST [Entered: 04/07/2021 03:12 PM]
April 7, 2021 [10820651] Entry of appearance filed by Randall Edwin Long and Denelda L. Richardson for C.A.A.I.R.. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 04/07/2021. Manner of Service: US mail [21-5024] [Entered: 04/07/2021 01:44 PM]
April 7, 2021 [10820643] Entry of appearance submitted by Randall E. Long, Denelda L. Richardson for Appellee C.A.A.I.R. for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 04/07/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-5024]--[Edited 04/07/2021 by DJD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 4/7/21] REL [Entered: 04/07/2021 01:34 PM]
March 24, 2021 [10817345] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 03/23/2021 Docketing statement due 04/07/2021 for Stanley Shane Alexander, Keith Alspaugh, Pablo Angeles, Jason Baker, David Banks, Craigory Blue, Jesse Brown, Cody Bumpas, Caleb Byrd, Ryan Cole, Steve Cook, Arthur Copeland, Joe Cotrone, Ryan Dorland, Patrick Doyle, Josh Foran, Kenneth Gentry, Johnny Gilmore, Raphael Grajeda, Charles Greenhaw, Michael Greenhaw, Clinton Harms, Michael Harper, Michael Harrell, Jackie Johnson, Jarret Jones, Ikaika Kamai, Caleb Kleier, Marquis Luckey, Michael McCartney, Terry McCracken, Brad McGahey, Clinton Meyer, Brandon Mills, Jason Miqueli, Dwayne Moss, Robert Nashert, Bobby Nicholes, Shane O'Neal, Travis Owens, Brian Pearson, Charles Rickman, Thomas Rico, David Brandon Spurgin, Titus Staton, Nathan Taylor, Nathan Turner, Jason Vallandingham, Jerry Wall, Michael Welge, Daniel West, De'Undre Woodard and Michael Wyche. Transcript order form due 04/07/2021 for Stanley Shane Alexander, Keith Alspaugh, Pablo Angeles, Jason Baker, David Banks, Craigory Blue, Jesse Brown, Cody Bumpas, Caleb Byrd, Ryan Cole, Steve Cook, Arthur Copeland, Joe Cotrone, Ryan Dorland, Patrick Doyle, Josh Foran, Kenneth Gentry, Johnny Gilmore, Raphael Grajeda, Charles Greenhaw, Michael Greenhaw, Clinton Harms, Michael Harper, Michael Harrell, Jackie Johnson, Jarret Jones, Ikaika Kamai, Caleb Kleier, Marquis Luckey, Michael McCartney, Terry McCracken, Brad McGahey, Clinton Meyer, Brandon Mills, Jason Miqueli, Dwayne Moss, Robert Nashert, Bobby Nicholes, Shane O'Neal, Travis Owens, Brian Pearson, Charles Rickman, Thomas Rico, David Brandon Spurgin, Titus Staton, Nathan Taylor, Nathan Turner, Jason Vallandingham, Jerry Wall, Michael Welge, Daniel West, De'Undre Woodard and Michael Wyche. Notice of appearance due on 04/07/2021 for Stanley Shane Alexander, Keith Alspaugh, Pablo Angeles, Jason Baker, David Banks, Craigory Blue, Jesse Brown, Cody Bumpas, Caleb Byrd, C.A.A.I.R., Ryan Cole, Steve Cook, Arthur Copeland, Joe Cotrone, Ryan Dorland, Patrick Doyle, Louise Dunham, Josh Foran, Kenneth Gentry, Johnny Gilmore, Raphael Grajeda, Charles Greenhaw, Michael Greenhaw, Clinton Harms, Michael Harper, Michael Harrell, Jackie Johnson, Jarret Jones, Ikaika Kamai, Caleb Kleier, Jim Lovell, Marquis Luckey, Michael McCartney, Terry McCracken, Brad McGahey, Clinton Meyer, Brandon Mills, Jason Miqueli, Dwayne Moss, Robert Nashert, Bobby Nicholes, Shane O'Neal, Travis Owens, Brian Pearson, Charles Rickman, Thomas Rico, Simmons Foods, Inc., Simmons Pet Food, Inc., David Brandon Spurgin, Titus Staton, Nathan Taylor, Nathan Turner, Jason Vallandingham, Jerry Wall, Michael Welge, Daniel West, Don Wilkerson, Janet Wilkerson, De'Undre Woodard and Michael Wyche [21-5024] [Entered: 03/24/2021 07:38 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Copeland, et al v. C.A.A.I.R., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: IKAIKA KAMAI
Represented By: David Arthur Warta
Represented By: Daniel E. Smolen
Represented By: Megan Lambert
Represented By: Robert M. Blakemore
Represented By: Mark Allen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: NATHAN TAYLOR
Represented By: David Arthur Warta
Represented By: Daniel E. Smolen
Represented By: Megan Lambert
Represented By: Robert M. Blakemore
Represented By: Mark Allen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TRAVIS OWENS
Represented By: David Arthur Warta
Represented By: Daniel E. Smolen
Represented By: Megan Lambert
Represented By: Robert M. Blakemore
Represented By: Mark Allen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOHNNY GILMORE
Represented By: David Arthur Warta
Represented By: Daniel E. Smolen
Represented By: Megan Lambert
Represented By: Robert M. Blakemore
Represented By: Mark Allen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOSH FORAN
Represented By: David Arthur Warta
Represented By: Daniel E. Smolen
Represented By: Megan Lambert
Represented By: Robert M. Blakemore
Represented By: Mark Allen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RAPHAEL GRAJEDA
Represented By: David Arthur Warta
Represented By: Daniel E. Smolen
Represented By: Megan Lambert
Represented By: Robert M. Blakemore
Represented By: Mark Allen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PABLO ANGELES
Represented By: David Arthur Warta
Represented By: Daniel E. Smolen
Represented By: Megan Lambert
Represented By: Robert M. Blakemore
Represented By: Mark Allen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PATRICK DOYLE
Represented By: David Arthur Warta
Represented By: Daniel E. Smolen
Represented By: Megan Lambert
Represented By: Robert M. Blakemore
Represented By: Mark Allen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARQUIS LUCKEY
Represented By: David Arthur Warta
Represented By: Daniel E. Smolen
Represented By: Megan Lambert
Represented By: Robert M. Blakemore
Represented By: Mark Allen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CLINTON MEYER
Represented By: David Arthur Warta
Represented By: Daniel E. Smolen
Represented By: Megan Lambert
Represented By: Robert M. Blakemore
Represented By: Mark Allen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CHARLES GREENHAW
Represented By: David Arthur Warta
Represented By: Daniel E. Smolen
Represented By: Megan Lambert
Represented By: Robert M. Blakemore
Represented By: Mark Allen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CALEB BYRD
Represented By: David Arthur Warta
Represented By: Daniel E. Smolen
Represented By: Megan Lambert
Represented By: Robert M. Blakemore
Represented By: Mark Allen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DAVID BRANDON SPURGIN
Represented By: David Arthur Warta
Represented By: Daniel E. Smolen
Represented By: Megan Lambert
Represented By: Robert M. Blakemore
Represented By: Mark Allen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TERRY MCCRACKEN
Represented By: David Arthur Warta
Represented By: Daniel E. Smolen
Represented By: Megan Lambert
Represented By: Robert M. Blakemore
Represented By: Mark Allen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JASON MIQUELI
Represented By: David Arthur Warta
Represented By: Daniel E. Smolen
Represented By: Megan Lambert
Represented By: Robert M. Blakemore
Represented By: Mark Allen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MICHAEL WELGE
Represented By: David Arthur Warta
Represented By: Daniel E. Smolen
Represented By: Megan Lambert
Represented By: Robert M. Blakemore
Represented By: Mark Allen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: NATHAN TURNER
Represented By: David Arthur Warta
Represented By: Daniel E. Smolen
Represented By: Megan Lambert
Represented By: Robert M. Blakemore
Represented By: Mark Allen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DE'UNDRE WOODARD
Represented By: David Arthur Warta
Represented By: Daniel E. Smolen
Represented By: Megan Lambert
Represented By: Robert M. Blakemore
Represented By: Mark Allen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CALEB KLEIER
Represented By: David Arthur Warta
Represented By: Daniel E. Smolen
Represented By: Megan Lambert
Represented By: Robert M. Blakemore
Represented By: Mark Allen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MICHAEL WYCHE
Represented By: David Arthur Warta
Represented By: Daniel E. Smolen
Represented By: Megan Lambert
Represented By: Robert M. Blakemore
Represented By: Mark Allen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CRAIGORY BLUE
Represented By: David Arthur Warta
Represented By: Daniel E. Smolen
Represented By: Megan Lambert
Represented By: Robert M. Blakemore
Represented By: Mark Allen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SHANE O'NEAL
Represented By: David Arthur Warta
Represented By: Daniel E. Smolen
Represented By: Megan Lambert
Represented By: Robert M. Blakemore
Represented By: Mark Allen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MICHAEL HARPER
Represented By: David Arthur Warta
Represented By: Daniel E. Smolen
Represented By: Megan Lambert
Represented By: Robert M. Blakemore
Represented By: Mark Allen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JERRY WALL
Represented By: David Arthur Warta
Represented By: Daniel E. Smolen
Represented By: Megan Lambert
Represented By: Robert M. Blakemore
Represented By: Mark Allen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BOBBY NICHOLES
Represented By: David Arthur Warta
Represented By: Daniel E. Smolen
Represented By: Megan Lambert
Represented By: Robert M. Blakemore
Represented By: Mark Allen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CODY BUMPAS
Represented By: David Arthur Warta
Represented By: Daniel E. Smolen
Represented By: Megan Lambert
Represented By: Robert M. Blakemore
Represented By: Mark Allen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOE COTRONE
Represented By: David Arthur Warta
Represented By: Daniel E. Smolen
Represented By: Megan Lambert
Represented By: Robert M. Blakemore
Represented By: Mark Allen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KEITH ALSPAUGH
Represented By: David Arthur Warta
Represented By: Daniel E. Smolen
Represented By: Megan Lambert
Represented By: Robert M. Blakemore
Represented By: Mark Allen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JACKIE JOHNSON
Represented By: David Arthur Warta
Represented By: Daniel E. Smolen
Represented By: Megan Lambert
Represented By: Robert M. Blakemore
Represented By: Mark Allen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MICHAEL MCCARTNEY
Represented By: David Arthur Warta
Represented By: Daniel E. Smolen
Represented By: Megan Lambert
Represented By: Robert M. Blakemore
Represented By: Mark Allen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: STEVE COOK
Represented By: David Arthur Warta
Represented By: Daniel E. Smolen
Represented By: Megan Lambert
Represented By: Robert M. Blakemore
Represented By: Mark Allen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MICHAEL HARRELL
Represented By: David Arthur Warta
Represented By: Daniel E. Smolen
Represented By: Megan Lambert
Represented By: Robert M. Blakemore
Represented By: Mark Allen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TITUS STATON
Represented By: David Arthur Warta
Represented By: Daniel E. Smolen
Represented By: Megan Lambert
Represented By: Robert M. Blakemore
Represented By: Mark Allen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: THOMAS RICO
Represented By: David Arthur Warta
Represented By: Daniel E. Smolen
Represented By: Megan Lambert
Represented By: Robert M. Blakemore
Represented By: Mark Allen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DANIEL WEST
Represented By: David Arthur Warta
Represented By: Daniel E. Smolen
Represented By: Megan Lambert
Represented By: Robert M. Blakemore
Represented By: Mark Allen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CLINTON HARMS
Represented By: David Arthur Warta
Represented By: Daniel E. Smolen
Represented By: Megan Lambert
Represented By: Robert M. Blakemore
Represented By: Mark Allen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BRANDON MILLS
Represented By: David Arthur Warta
Represented By: Daniel E. Smolen
Represented By: Megan Lambert
Represented By: Robert M. Blakemore
Represented By: Mark Allen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MICHAEL GREENHAW
Represented By: David Arthur Warta
Represented By: Daniel E. Smolen
Represented By: Megan Lambert
Represented By: Robert M. Blakemore
Represented By: Mark Allen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KENNETH GENTRY
Represented By: David Arthur Warta
Represented By: Daniel E. Smolen
Represented By: Megan Lambert
Represented By: Robert M. Blakemore
Represented By: Mark Allen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JESSE BROWN
Represented By: David Arthur Warta
Represented By: Daniel E. Smolen
Represented By: Megan Lambert
Represented By: Robert M. Blakemore
Represented By: Mark Allen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: STANLEY SHANE ALEXANDER
Represented By: David Arthur Warta
Represented By: Daniel E. Smolen
Represented By: Megan Lambert
Represented By: Robert M. Blakemore
Represented By: Mark Allen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JASON BAKER
Represented By: David Arthur Warta
Represented By: Daniel E. Smolen
Represented By: Megan Lambert
Represented By: Robert M. Blakemore
Represented By: Mark Allen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RYAN COLE
Represented By: David Arthur Warta
Represented By: Daniel E. Smolen
Represented By: Megan Lambert
Represented By: Robert M. Blakemore
Represented By: Mark Allen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROBERT NASHERT
Represented By: David Arthur Warta
Represented By: Daniel E. Smolen
Represented By: Megan Lambert
Represented By: Robert M. Blakemore
Represented By: Mark Allen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DWAYNE MOSS
Represented By: David Arthur Warta
Represented By: Daniel E. Smolen
Represented By: Megan Lambert
Represented By: Robert M. Blakemore
Represented By: Mark Allen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BRAD MCGAHEY
Represented By: David Arthur Warta
Represented By: Daniel E. Smolen
Represented By: Megan Lambert
Represented By: Robert M. Blakemore
Represented By: Mark Allen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CHARLES RICKMAN
Represented By: David Arthur Warta
Represented By: Daniel E. Smolen
Represented By: Megan Lambert
Represented By: Robert M. Blakemore
Represented By: Mark Allen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RYAN DORLAND
Represented By: David Arthur Warta
Represented By: Daniel E. Smolen
Represented By: Megan Lambert
Represented By: Robert M. Blakemore
Represented By: Mark Allen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ARTHUR COPELAND
Represented By: David Arthur Warta
Represented By: Daniel E. Smolen
Represented By: Megan Lambert
Represented By: Robert M. Blakemore
Represented By: Mark Allen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JASON VALLANDINGHAM
Represented By: David Arthur Warta
Represented By: Daniel E. Smolen
Represented By: Megan Lambert
Represented By: Robert M. Blakemore
Represented By: Mark Allen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JARRET JONES
Represented By: David Arthur Warta
Represented By: Daniel E. Smolen
Represented By: Megan Lambert
Represented By: Robert M. Blakemore
Represented By: Mark Allen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BRIAN PEARSON
Represented By: David Arthur Warta
Represented By: Daniel E. Smolen
Represented By: Megan Lambert
Represented By: Robert M. Blakemore
Represented By: Mark Allen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DAVID BANKS
Represented By: David Arthur Warta
Represented By: Daniel E. Smolen
Represented By: Megan Lambert
Represented By: Robert M. Blakemore
Represented By: Mark Allen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JANET WILKERSON
Represented By: Nicholas James Foster
Represented By: Denelda L. Richardson
Represented By: Randall Edwin Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JIM LOVELL
Represented By: Nicholas James Foster
Represented By: Denelda L. Richardson
Represented By: Randall Edwin Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: C.A.A.I.R., a domestic not for profit corporation
Represented By: Nicholas James Foster
Represented By: Denelda L. Richardson
Represented By: Randall Edwin Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LOUISE DUNHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DON WILKERSON
Represented By: Nicholas James Foster
Represented By: Denelda L. Richardson
Represented By: Randall Edwin Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SIMMONS FOODS, INC., a foreign for profit business corporation
Represented By: John Russell Elrod
Represented By: Amy Melissa Stipe
Represented By: Christopher S. Thrutchley
Represented By: Justin A. Lollman
Represented By: John David Russell
Represented By: John Henry Rule II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SIMMONS PET FOOD, INC.
Represented By: John Russell Elrod
Represented By: Amy Melissa Stipe
Represented By: Christopher S. Thrutchley
Represented By: Justin A. Lollman
Represented By: John David Russell
Represented By: Philip D. Hixon
Represented By: John Henry Rule II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?