Graff, et al v. Aberdeen Enterprizes, II, et al
Defendant: P.D. TAYLOR, Sheriff of Oklahoma County
Defendant / Appellee: RODNEY DERRYBERRY, Sheriff of LeFlore County, ABERDEEN ENTERPRIZES, II, INC., ADAM WOODRUFF, Sheriff of Latimer County, VIC REGALADO, Sheriff of Tulsa County, RICK SILVER, Sheriff of Washington County, EDDIE VIRDEN, Sheriff of Osage County, JOE HARPER, Sheriff of Payne County, THOMAS MCCLENDON, Sheriff of Harper County, JUDGE TERRELL S. CROSSON, STEVEN WORLEY, Sheriff of Okfuskee County, STEVE KELLEY, Sheriff of Kay County, HEATH WINFREY, Sheriff of Craig County, MATT BOLEY, Sheriff of Texas County, DENNIS BANTHER, Sheriff of Kingfisher County, TONY HEAD, Sheriff of Atoka County, ROGER REEVE, Sheriff of Washita County, JIM WEIR, Sheriff of Grady County, KIM HENRY, Rogers County Court Clerk, JEREMIE WILSON, Sheriff of Jefferson County, KEVIN MITCHELL, Sheriff of Woodward County, DAVID DEAN, Sheriff of Ottawa County, MARTY GRISHAM, Sheriff of Love County, JUDGE DOUG DRUMMOND, LARRY LANE, Sheriff of Sequoyah County, BRET BOWLING, Sheriff of Creek County, MARCIA MAXWELL, Sheriff of Hughes County, JUDGE DAWN MOODY, ROGER LEVICK, Sheriff of Jackson County, CHRIS AMASON, Sheriff of Cleveland County, JASON RITCHIE, Sheriff of Adair County, SCOTT WALTON, Sheriff of Rogers County, BRIAN SMITH, Sheriff of Roger Mills County, DARRIN RODGERS, Sheriff of Murray County, DARRIN VARNELL, Sheriff of Pawnee County, TRAVIS DAUGHERTY, Sheriff of Blaine County, JASON CHENNAULT, Sheriff of Cherokee County, BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF THE COUNTY OF ROGERS, JASON MCCLAIN, Sheriff of Nowata County, JUDGE WILLIAM J. MUSSEMAN, JR., OKLAHOMA SHERIFFS' ASSOCIATION, B.J. HEDGECOCK, Sheriff of Pushmataha County, KEVIN CLARDY, Sheriff of McCurtain County, DARLENE BAILEY, Tulsa County Cost Administrator, KEVIN LEDBETTER, Sheriff of McIntosh County, EDDY RICE, Sheriff of Okmulgee County, DON NEWBERRY, Tulsa County Court Clerk, RUBEN PARKER, JR., Sheriff of Beaver County, CLAY SANDER, Sheriff of Dewey County, DONALD YOW, Sheriff of Marshall County, CORY RINK, Sheriff of Garfield County, MARK BERRY, Sheriff of Delaware County, THE BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF THE COUNTY OF TULSA, MIKE BOOTH, Sheriff of Pottawatomie County, BRYAN JUMP, Sheriff of Coal County, GARY DODD, Sheriff of Johnston County, SHANNON SMITH, Sheriff of Seminole County, MIKE REED, Sheriff of Mayes County, CHRIS ELLIOT, Sheriff of Wagoner County, ROB SHOFNER, RUDY BRIGGS, JR., Sheriff of Woods County, SCOTT STERLING, Sheriff of Grant County, RICK WALLACE, Sheriff of Alfalfa County, BILL INGRAM, Sheriff of Tillman County, CHRIS BRYANT, Sheriff of Carter County, JIM D. SHOFNER, CHRIS WEST, Sheriff of Canadian County, DARREN ATHA, Former Roger Mills County Sheriff, MIKE WATERS, Former Pawnee County Sheriff, R.B. HAUF, Former Payne County Sheriff, NORMAN FISHER, Former Cherokee County Sheriff, DANNY CRYER, Former Marshall County Sheriff, TONY ALMAGUER, Former Blaine County Sheriff, JEREMY FLOYD, Former Ottawa County Sheriff, TODD GIBSON, Former Cleveland County Sheriff, ROB SEALE, Former LeFlore County Sheriff, JERRY NILES, Former Garfield County Sheriff, BOBBY WHITTINGTON, Former Tillman County Sheriff, SANDY HADLEY, Former Nowata County Sheriff, JON SMITH, Former Johnston County Sheriff, HARLAN MOORE, Former Delaware County Sheriff and JESSE JAMES, Former Latimer County Sheriff
Plaintiff / Appellant: IRA LEE WILKINS, LINDA MEACHUM, DAVID SMITH, KENDALLIA KILLMAN, MELANIE HOLMES, RANDY FRAZIER, CHRISTOPHER CHOATE and CARLY GRAFF
Case Number: 21-5031
Filed: April 9, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2021 [10832531] Attorney admission letter, second notice sent. Attorney admission response date set to 06/04/2021. [21-5031] [Entered: 05/25/2021 04:10 PM]
May 11, 2021 [10828792] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting appellants' unopposed motion for 30-day extension of time to file the opening brief to 07/07/2021 for Christopher Choate, Randy Frazier, Carly Graff, Melanie Holmes, Kendallia Killman, Linda Meachum, David Smith and Ira Lee Wilkins. No further extensions will be granted on the clerk's authority. Served on 05/11/2021. Text only entry - no attachment. [21-5031] [Entered: 05/11/2021 08:48 AM]
May 11, 2021 [10828788] Motion filed by Appellants Christopher Choate, Randy Frazier, Carly Graff, Melanie Holmes, Kendallia Killman, Linda Meachum, David Smith and Ira Lee Wilkins to extend time to file appellant/petitioner's brief until 07/07/2021. Served on: 05/11/2021. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [21-5031] SDW [Entered: 05/11/2021 08:38 AM]
April 26, 2021 [10825030] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 04/26/2021. Appellants' brief and appendix due on 06/07/2021 for Christopher Choate, Randy Frazier, Carly Graff, Melanie Holmes, Kendallia Killman, Linda Meachum, David Smith and Ira Lee Wilkins. [21-5031] [Entered: 04/26/2021 08:46 AM]
April 23, 2021 [10824954] Entry of appearance filed by Michael Shouse for Vic Regalado, Don Newberry, The Board of County Commissioners of the County of Tulsa and Darlene Bailey. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 04/23/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-5031] [Entered: 04/23/2021 04:10 PM]
April 23, 2021 [10824945] Entry of appearance submitted by Michael Shouse for Appellees Darlene Bailey, Don Newberry, Mr. Vic Regalado and The Board of County Commissioners of the County of Tulsa for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 04/23/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-5031] --[Edited 04/23/2021 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] MS [Entered: 04/23/2021 03:58 PM]
April 23, 2021 [10824725] Admissions letter sent. Response date set to 05/24/2021 for William Caleb Jones. [21-5031] [Entered: 04/23/2021 09:32 AM]
April 22, 2021 [10824374] Entry of appearance filed by Jeffrey C. Hendrickson, Robert S. Lafferrandre and Randall James Wood for Jon Smith, Mr. Brian Smith, Mike Reed, Shannon Smith, Mr. Mike Booth, Chris Bryant, Roger Reeve, Norman Fisher, Mr. Dennis Banther, Kevin Mitchell, Mr. Rick Silver, Mike Waters, Scott Sterling, Eddy Rice, Jeremy Floyd, Clay Sander, Jim Weir, Tony Almaguer, Mr. Kevin Ledbetter, Larry Lane, Jason Ritchie, Rick Wallace, Tony Head, Ruben Parker, Jr., Travis Daugherty, Chris West, Jason Chennault, Chris Amason, Bryan Jump, Heath Winfrey, Bret Bowling, Mark Berry, Cory Rink, Thomas McClendon, Marcia Maxwell, Roger Levick, Jeremie Wilson, Gary Dodd, Steve Kelley, Adam Woodruff, Rodney Derryberry, Marty Grisham, Donald Yow, Kevin Clardy, Darrin Rodgers, Jason McClain, Steven Worley, Eddie Virden, David Dean, Darrin Varnell, Joe Harper, B.J. Hedgecock, Matt Boley, Bill Ingram, Chris Elliot, Rudy Briggs, Jr., Todd Gibson, Harlan Moore, Jerry Niles, Jesse James, Rob Seale, Danny Cryer, Sandy Hadley, R.B. Hauf, Darren Atha and Bobby Whittington. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y (some parties previously disclosed). Served on 04/21/2021. Manner of Service: email [21-5031] [Entered: 04/22/2021 08:18 AM]
April 22, 2021 [10824363] Docketing statement filed by Christopher Choate, Randy Frazier, Carly Graff, Melanie Holmes, Kendallia Killman, Linda Meachum, David Smith and Ira Lee Wilkins. Served on 04/22/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-5031] SDW [Entered: 04/22/2021 08:00 AM]
April 21, 2021 [10824281] Entry of appearance submitted by Robert S. Lafferrandre, Randall J. Wood, Jeffrey C. Hendrickson for Appellees Chris Amason, Mr. Dennis Banther, Mark Berry, Matt Boley, Mr. Mike Booth, Bret Bowling, Rudy Briggs, Jr., Jason Chennault, Kevin Clardy, Travis Daugherty, David Dean, Rodney Derryberry, Gary Dodd, Chris Elliot, Marty Grisham, Joe Harper, Tony Head, B.J. Hedgecock, Bill Ingram, Bryan Jump, Steve Kelley, Larry Lane, Mr. Kevin Ledbetter, Roger Levick, Marcia Maxwell, Jason McClain, Thomas McClendon, Kevin Mitchell, Ruben Parker, Jr., Mike Reed, Roger Reeve, Eddy Rice, Cory Rink, Jason Ritchie, Darrin Rodgers, Clay Sander, Mr. Rick Silver, Mr. Brian Smith, Shannon Smith, Scott Sterling, Darrin Varnell, Eddie Virden, Rick Wallace, Jim Weir, Chris West, Jeremie Wilson, Heath Winfrey, Adam Woodruff, Steven Worley, Donald Yow and Chris BryantTony Almaguer, Norman Fisher, Todd Gibson, Harlan Moore, Jerry Niles, Jon Smith, Jesse James, Rob Seale, Danny Cryer, Sandy Hadley, Jeremy Floyd, Mike Waters, R.B. Hauf, Darren Atha, and Bobby Whittington. for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 04/21/2021. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 04/22/2021 by MLB to remove pdf from docket; entry filed on 04/22/21][21-5031] JCH [Entered: 04/21/2021 03:34 PM]
April 21, 2021 [10824253] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 04/28/2021 for Mark C. McCartt, Clerk of Court (oclk). (Text Only - No Attachment) [21-5031] [Entered: 04/21/2021 03:16 PM]
April 21, 2021 [10824243] Entry of appearance filed by Shelby Calambokidis and Seth Daniel Tychsen Wayne for Ira Lee Wilkins, David Smith, Carly Graff, Randy Frazier, Kendallia Killman, Linda Meachum, Christopher Choate and Melanie Holmes. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 04/21/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-5031] [Entered: 04/21/2021 03:07 PM]
April 21, 2021 [10824228] Entry of appearance filed by William Caleb Jones, Jo Lynn Jeter and Joel Wohlgemuth for Vic Regalado, Don Newberry, The Board of County Commissioners of the County of Tulsa and Darlene Bailey. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 04/21/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-5031] [Entered: 04/21/2021 02:53 PM]
April 21, 2021 [10824214] Entry of appearance submitted by Jo Lynn Jeter, Joel L. Wohlgemuth, W. Caleb Jones for Appellees The Board of County Commissioners of the County of Tulsa, Mr. Vic Regalado, Darlene Bailey and Don Newberry for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 04/21/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-5031] --[Edited 04/21/2021 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] JJ [Entered: 04/21/2021 02:33 PM]
April 21, 2021 [10824213] Notice received from Christopher Choate, Randy Frazier, Carly Graff, Melanie Holmes, Kendallia Killman, Linda Meachum, David Smith and Ira Lee Wilkins that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. Served on: 04/21/2021. Manner of Service: email [21-5031] SDW [Entered: 04/21/2021 02:32 PM]
April 21, 2021 [10824206] Entry of appearance submitted by Seth Wayne and Shelby B. Calambokidis for Appellants Christopher Choate, Randy Frazier, Carly Graff, Melanie Holmes, Linda Meachum, Ira Lee Wilkins, Kendallia Killman and David Smith for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 04/21/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-5031]--[Edited 04/21/2021 by JM PDF removed filed by the court on 4/21/21.] SDW [Entered: 04/21/2021 02:22 PM]
April 21, 2021 [10824072] Entry of appearance filed by Stefanie Erin Lawson for Dawn Moody, Doug Drummond, William J. Musseman, Jr. and Terrell S. Crosson. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 04/21/2021. Manner of Service: email [21-5031] [Entered: 04/21/2021 10:03 AM]
April 21, 2021 [10824068] Entry of appearance submitted by Stefanie E. Lawson for Appellees Doug Drummond, Dawn Moody, William J. Musseman, Jr. and Terrell S. Crosson for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 04/21/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-5031]--[Edited 04/21/2021 by DJ. Removed PDF as pleading filed 4/21/21] SEL [Entered: 04/21/2021 09:55 AM]
April 20, 2021 [10823919] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Robert M. Blakemore and Mr. Daniel E. Smolen for Ira Lee Wilkins, David Smith, Carly Graff, Randy Frazier, Kendallia Killman, Linda Meachum, Christopher Choate and Melanie Holmes. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 04/20/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-5031] [Entered: 04/20/2021 04:01 PM]
April 20, 2021 [10823907] Entry of appearance submitted by Daniel E. Smolen and Robert M. Blakemore for Appellants Christopher Choate, Randy Frazier, Carly Graff, Melanie Holmes, Kendallia Killman, Linda Meachum and David Smith for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 04/20/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-5031]--[Edited 04/20/2021 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] DES [Entered: 04/20/2021 03:45 PM]
April 20, 2021 [10823888] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Isaac Robertson Ellis and Mr. Robert D. James for Oklahoma Sheriffs' Association. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n (all parties previously disclosed). Served on 04/20/2021. Manner of Service: email [21-5031] [Entered: 04/20/2021 03:16 PM]
April 20, 2021 [10823878] Entry of appearance submitted by Robert D. James and Isaac R. Ellis for Oklahoma Sheriffs' Association for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 04/20/2021. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 04/20/2021 by MLB to correct docket text and to remove pdf from docket; entry filed on 04/20/21][21-5031] RDJ [Entered: 04/20/2021 03:06 PM]
April 20, 2021 [10823865] Entry of appearance filed by Robert E. Applegate and John R. Woodard for Aberdeen Enterprizes, II, Inc., Jim D. Shofner and Rob Shofner. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 04/20/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-5031] [Entered: 04/20/2021 02:38 PM]
April 20, 2021 [10823856] Entry of appearance submitted by John R. Woodard, III for Appellees Aberdeen Enterprizes, II, Inc., Jim D. Shofner and Rob Shofner for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 04/20/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-5031] --[Edited 04/20/2021 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] JRW [Entered: 04/20/2021 02:24 PM]
April 20, 2021 [10823806] Entry of appearance filed by Thomas A. LeBlanc for Kim Henry, Board of County Commissioners of the County of Rogers and Scott Walton. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 04/19/2021. Manner of Service: email [21-5031] [Entered: 04/20/2021 01:00 PM]
April 20, 2021 [10823706] Entry of appearance filed by Matthew Benjamin Free for Scott Walton, Kim Henry and Board of County Commissioners of the County of Rogers. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 04/20/2021. Manner of Service: email [21-5031] [Entered: 04/20/2021 10:35 AM]
April 20, 2021 [10823691] Entry of appearance submitted by Thomas A. LeBlanc for Appellees Board of County Commissioners of the County of Rogers, Kim Henry and Scott Walton for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 04/20/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-5031]--[Edited 04/20/2021 by JM PDF removed filed by the court on 4/20/21.] TAL [Entered: 04/20/2021 10:19 AM]
April 20, 2021 [10823690] Entry of appearance submitted by Matthew B. Free for Appellees Board of County Commissioners of the County of Rogers, Kim Henry and Scott Walton for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 04/20/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-5031]--[Edited 04/20/2021 by DJD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 4/20/21] MBF [Entered: 04/20/2021 10:16 AM]
April 19, 2021 [10823335] Entry of appearance filed by Scott B. Wood for Kim Henry. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 04/19/2021. Manner of Service: email [21-5031] [Entered: 04/19/2021 09:43 AM]
April 19, 2021 [10823329] Entry of appearance submitted by Scott Boudinot Wood for Appellee Kim Henry for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 04/19/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-5031]--[Edited 04/19/2021 by DJD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 4/19/21] SBW [Entered: 04/19/2021 09:38 AM]
April 19, 2021 [10823255] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Douglas A. Wilson for Mr. Vic Regalado, Don Newberry, The Board of County Commissioners of the County of Tulsa and Darlene Bailey. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y (already listed in the appeal). Served on 04/19/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-5031] [Entered: 04/19/2021 08:04 AM]
April 18, 2021 [10823217] Entry of appearance submitted by Douglas Allen Wilson for Appellees Darlene Bailey, Don Newberry, Mr. Vic Regalado and The Board of County Commissioners of the County of Tulsa for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 04/18/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-5031]--[Edited 04/19/2021 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] DAW [Entered: 04/18/2021 09:25 AM]
April 9, 2021 [10821239] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 04/09/2021. Transcript order form and docketing statement due 04/23/2021 for Christopher Choate, Randy Frazier, Carly Graff, Melanie Holmes, Kendallia Killman, Linda Meachum, David Smith and Ira Lee Wilkins. Notice of appearance due on 04/23/2021 for Aberdeen Enterprizes, II, Inc., Chris Amason, Darlene Bailey, Dennis Banther, Mark Berry, Board of County Commissioners of the County of Rogers, Matt Boley, Mike Booth, Bret Bowling, Rudy Briggs Jr., Chris Bryant, Jason Chennault, Christopher Choate, Kevin Clardy, Terrell S. Crosson, Travis Daugherty, David Dean, Rodney Derryberry, Gary Dodd, Doug Drummond, Chris Elliot, Randy Frazier, Carly Graff, Marty Grisham, Joe Harper, Tony Head, B.J. Hedgecock, Kim Henry, Melanie Holmes, Bill Ingram, Bryan Jump, Steve Kelley, Kendallia Killman, Larry Lane, Kevin Ledbetter, Roger Levick, Marcia Maxwell, Jason McClain, Thomas McClendon, Linda Meachum, Kevin Mitchell, Dawn Moody, William J. Musseman Jr., Don Newberry, Oklahoma Sheriffs' Association, Ruben Parker Jr., Mike Reed, Roger Reeve, Vic Regalado, Eddy Rice, Cory Rink, Jason Ritchie, Darrin Rodgers, Clay Sander, Jim D. Shofner, Rob Shofner, Rick Silver, Brian Smith, David Smith, Shannon Smith, Scott Sterling, P.D. Taylor, The Board of County Commissioners of the County of Tulsa, Darrin Varnell, Eddie Virden, Rick Wallace, Scott Walton, Jim Weir, Chris West, Ira Lee Wilkins, Jeremie Wilson, Heath Winfrey, Adam Woodruff, Steven Worley and Donald Yow. [21-5031] [Entered: 04/09/2021 11:50 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Graff, et al v. Aberdeen Enterprizes, II, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RODNEY DERRYBERRY, Sheriff of LeFlore County
Represented By: Robert L. Betts
Represented By: Robert S. Lafferrandre
Represented By: April Danielle Kelso
Represented By: Randall James Wood
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Hendrickson I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ABERDEEN ENTERPRIZES, II, INC.
Represented By: John R. Woodard III
Represented By: Robert E. Applegate Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ADAM WOODRUFF, Sheriff of Latimer County
Represented By: Robert L. Betts
Represented By: Robert S. Lafferrandre
Represented By: April Danielle Kelso
Represented By: Randall James Wood
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Hendrickson I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: VIC REGALADO, Sheriff of Tulsa County
Represented By: Michael Shouse
Represented By: Joel Wohlgemuth Esq.
Represented By: Douglas A. Wilson
Represented By: Jo Lynn Jeter Esq.
Represented By: William Caleb Jones
Represented By: Joel Wohlgemuth
Represented By: Jo Lynn Jeter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RICK SILVER, Sheriff of Washington County
Represented By: Robert L. Betts
Represented By: Robert S. Lafferrandre
Represented By: April Danielle Kelso
Represented By: Randall James Wood
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Hendrickson I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: EDDIE VIRDEN, Sheriff of Osage County
Represented By: Robert L. Betts
Represented By: Robert S. Lafferrandre
Represented By: April Danielle Kelso
Represented By: Randall James Wood
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Hendrickson I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOE HARPER, Sheriff of Payne County
Represented By: Robert L. Betts
Represented By: Robert S. Lafferrandre
Represented By: April Danielle Kelso
Represented By: Randall James Wood
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Hendrickson I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THOMAS MCCLENDON, Sheriff of Harper County
Represented By: Robert L. Betts
Represented By: Robert S. Lafferrandre
Represented By: April Danielle Kelso
Represented By: Randall James Wood
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Hendrickson I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JUDGE TERRELL S. CROSSON
Represented By: Stefanie Erin Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STEVEN WORLEY, Sheriff of Okfuskee County
Represented By: Robert L. Betts
Represented By: Robert S. Lafferrandre
Represented By: April Danielle Kelso
Represented By: Randall James Wood
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Hendrickson I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STEVE KELLEY, Sheriff of Kay County
Represented By: Robert L. Betts
Represented By: Robert S. Lafferrandre
Represented By: April Danielle Kelso
Represented By: Randall James Wood
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Hendrickson I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HEATH WINFREY, Sheriff of Craig County
Represented By: Robert L. Betts
Represented By: Robert S. Lafferrandre
Represented By: April Danielle Kelso
Represented By: Randall James Wood
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Hendrickson I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MATT BOLEY, Sheriff of Texas County
Represented By: Robert L. Betts
Represented By: Robert S. Lafferrandre
Represented By: April Danielle Kelso
Represented By: Randall James Wood
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Hendrickson I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DENNIS BANTHER, Sheriff of Kingfisher County
Represented By: Robert L. Betts
Represented By: Robert S. Lafferrandre
Represented By: April Danielle Kelso
Represented By: Randall James Wood
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Hendrickson I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TONY HEAD, Sheriff of Atoka County
Represented By: Robert L. Betts
Represented By: Robert S. Lafferrandre
Represented By: April Danielle Kelso
Represented By: Randall James Wood
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Hendrickson I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROGER REEVE, Sheriff of Washita County
Represented By: Robert L. Betts
Represented By: Robert S. Lafferrandre
Represented By: April Danielle Kelso
Represented By: Randall James Wood
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Hendrickson I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JIM WEIR, Sheriff of Grady County
Represented By: Robert L. Betts
Represented By: Robert S. Lafferrandre
Represented By: April Danielle Kelso
Represented By: Randall James Wood
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Hendrickson I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KIM HENRY, Rogers County Court Clerk
Represented By: Scott B. Wood Esq.
Represented By: Thomas A. LeBlanc
Represented By: Matthew Benjamin Free
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JEREMIE WILSON, Sheriff of Jefferson County
Represented By: Robert L. Betts
Represented By: Robert S. Lafferrandre
Represented By: April Danielle Kelso
Represented By: Randall James Wood
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Hendrickson I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KEVIN MITCHELL, Sheriff of Woodward County
Represented By: Robert L. Betts
Represented By: Robert S. Lafferrandre
Represented By: April Danielle Kelso
Represented By: Randall James Wood
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Hendrickson I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID DEAN, Sheriff of Ottawa County
Represented By: Robert L. Betts
Represented By: Robert S. Lafferrandre
Represented By: April Danielle Kelso
Represented By: Randall James Wood
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Hendrickson I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARTY GRISHAM, Sheriff of Love County
Represented By: Robert L. Betts
Represented By: Robert S. Lafferrandre
Represented By: April Danielle Kelso
Represented By: Randall James Wood
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Hendrickson I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JUDGE DOUG DRUMMOND
Represented By: Stefanie Erin Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LARRY LANE, Sheriff of Sequoyah County
Represented By: Robert L. Betts
Represented By: Robert S. Lafferrandre
Represented By: April Danielle Kelso
Represented By: Randall James Wood
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Hendrickson I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRET BOWLING, Sheriff of Creek County
Represented By: Robert L. Betts
Represented By: Robert S. Lafferrandre
Represented By: April Danielle Kelso
Represented By: Randall James Wood
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Hendrickson I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARCIA MAXWELL, Sheriff of Hughes County
Represented By: Robert L. Betts
Represented By: Robert S. Lafferrandre
Represented By: April Danielle Kelso
Represented By: Randall James Wood
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Hendrickson I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JUDGE DAWN MOODY
Represented By: Stefanie Erin Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROGER LEVICK, Sheriff of Jackson County
Represented By: Robert L. Betts
Represented By: Robert S. Lafferrandre
Represented By: April Danielle Kelso
Represented By: Randall James Wood
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Hendrickson I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHRIS AMASON, Sheriff of Cleveland County
Represented By: Robert L. Betts
Represented By: Robert S. Lafferrandre
Represented By: April Danielle Kelso
Represented By: Randall James Wood
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Hendrickson I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JASON RITCHIE, Sheriff of Adair County
Represented By: Robert L. Betts
Represented By: Robert S. Lafferrandre
Represented By: April Danielle Kelso
Represented By: Randall James Wood
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Hendrickson I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SCOTT WALTON, Sheriff of Rogers County
Represented By: William Caleb Jones
Represented By: Thomas A. LeBlanc
Represented By: Matthew Benjamin Free
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRIAN SMITH, Sheriff of Roger Mills County
Represented By: Robert L. Betts
Represented By: Robert S. Lafferrandre
Represented By: April Danielle Kelso
Represented By: Randall James Wood
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Hendrickson I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DARRIN RODGERS, Sheriff of Murray County
Represented By: Robert L. Betts
Represented By: Robert S. Lafferrandre
Represented By: April Danielle Kelso
Represented By: Randall James Wood
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Hendrickson I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DARRIN VARNELL, Sheriff of Pawnee County
Represented By: Robert L. Betts
Represented By: Robert S. Lafferrandre
Represented By: April Danielle Kelso
Represented By: Randall James Wood
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Hendrickson I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TRAVIS DAUGHERTY, Sheriff of Blaine County
Represented By: Robert L. Betts
Represented By: Robert S. Lafferrandre
Represented By: April Danielle Kelso
Represented By: Randall James Wood
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Hendrickson I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JASON CHENNAULT, Sheriff of Cherokee County
Represented By: Robert L. Betts
Represented By: Robert S. Lafferrandre
Represented By: April Danielle Kelso
Represented By: Randall James Wood
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Hendrickson I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF THE COUNTY OF ROGERS
Represented By: William Caleb Jones
Represented By: Thomas A. LeBlanc
Represented By: Matthew Benjamin Free
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JASON MCCLAIN, Sheriff of Nowata County
Represented By: Robert L. Betts
Represented By: Robert S. Lafferrandre
Represented By: April Danielle Kelso
Represented By: Randall James Wood
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Hendrickson I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JUDGE WILLIAM J. MUSSEMAN, JR.
Represented By: Stefanie Erin Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OKLAHOMA SHERIFFS' ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Robert D. James
Represented By: Isaac Robertson Ellis
Represented By: Chris Warzecha
Represented By: Melodie Freeman-Burney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: B.J. HEDGECOCK, Sheriff of Pushmataha County
Represented By: Robert L. Betts
Represented By: Robert S. Lafferrandre
Represented By: April Danielle Kelso
Represented By: Randall James Wood
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Hendrickson I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KEVIN CLARDY, Sheriff of McCurtain County
Represented By: Robert L. Betts
Represented By: Robert S. Lafferrandre
Represented By: April Danielle Kelso
Represented By: Randall James Wood
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Hendrickson I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DARLENE BAILEY, Tulsa County Cost Administrator
Represented By: Michael Shouse
Represented By: Joel Wohlgemuth Esq.
Represented By: Douglas A. Wilson
Represented By: Jo Lynn Jeter Esq.
Represented By: William Caleb Jones
Represented By: Joel Wohlgemuth
Represented By: Jo Lynn Jeter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KEVIN LEDBETTER, Sheriff of McIntosh County
Represented By: Robert L. Betts
Represented By: Robert S. Lafferrandre
Represented By: April Danielle Kelso
Represented By: Randall James Wood
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Hendrickson I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: EDDY RICE, Sheriff of Okmulgee County
Represented By: Robert L. Betts
Represented By: Robert S. Lafferrandre
Represented By: April Danielle Kelso
Represented By: Randall James Wood
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Hendrickson I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DON NEWBERRY, Tulsa County Court Clerk
Represented By: Michael Shouse
Represented By: Joel Wohlgemuth Esq.
Represented By: Douglas A. Wilson
Represented By: Jo Lynn Jeter Esq.
Represented By: William Caleb Jones
Represented By: Joel Wohlgemuth
Represented By: Jo Lynn Jeter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RUBEN PARKER, JR., Sheriff of Beaver County
Represented By: Robert L. Betts
Represented By: Robert S. Lafferrandre
Represented By: April Danielle Kelso
Represented By: Randall James Wood
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Hendrickson I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CLAY SANDER, Sheriff of Dewey County
Represented By: Robert L. Betts
Represented By: Robert S. Lafferrandre
Represented By: April Danielle Kelso
Represented By: Randall James Wood
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Hendrickson I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DONALD YOW, Sheriff of Marshall County
Represented By: Robert L. Betts
Represented By: Robert S. Lafferrandre
Represented By: April Danielle Kelso
Represented By: Randall James Wood
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Hendrickson I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CORY RINK, Sheriff of Garfield County
Represented By: Robert L. Betts
Represented By: Robert S. Lafferrandre
Represented By: April Danielle Kelso
Represented By: Randall James Wood
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Hendrickson I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARK BERRY, Sheriff of Delaware County
Represented By: Robert L. Betts
Represented By: Robert S. Lafferrandre
Represented By: April Danielle Kelso
Represented By: Randall James Wood
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Hendrickson I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THE BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF THE COUNTY OF TULSA
Represented By: Michael Shouse
Represented By: Joel Wohlgemuth Esq.
Represented By: Douglas A. Wilson
Represented By: Jo Lynn Jeter Esq.
Represented By: William Caleb Jones
Represented By: Joel Wohlgemuth
Represented By: Jo Lynn Jeter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MIKE BOOTH, Sheriff of Pottawatomie County
Represented By: Robert L. Betts
Represented By: Robert S. Lafferrandre
Represented By: April Danielle Kelso
Represented By: Randall James Wood
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Hendrickson I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRYAN JUMP, Sheriff of Coal County
Represented By: Robert L. Betts
Represented By: Robert S. Lafferrandre
Represented By: April Danielle Kelso
Represented By: Randall James Wood
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Hendrickson I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GARY DODD, Sheriff of Johnston County
Represented By: Robert L. Betts
Represented By: Robert S. Lafferrandre
Represented By: April Danielle Kelso
Represented By: Randall James Wood
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Hendrickson I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SHANNON SMITH, Sheriff of Seminole County
Represented By: Robert L. Betts
Represented By: Robert S. Lafferrandre
Represented By: April Danielle Kelso
Represented By: Randall James Wood
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Hendrickson I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MIKE REED, Sheriff of Mayes County
Represented By: Robert L. Betts
Represented By: Robert S. Lafferrandre
Represented By: April Danielle Kelso
Represented By: Randall James Wood
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Hendrickson I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHRIS ELLIOT, Sheriff of Wagoner County
Represented By: Robert L. Betts
Represented By: Robert S. Lafferrandre
Represented By: April Danielle Kelso
Represented By: Randall James Wood
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Hendrickson I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROB SHOFNER
Represented By: John R. Woodard III
Represented By: Robert E. Applegate Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RUDY BRIGGS, JR., Sheriff of Woods County
Represented By: Robert L. Betts
Represented By: Robert S. Lafferrandre
Represented By: April Danielle Kelso
Represented By: Randall James Wood
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Hendrickson I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SCOTT STERLING, Sheriff of Grant County
Represented By: Robert L. Betts
Represented By: Robert S. Lafferrandre
Represented By: April Danielle Kelso
Represented By: Randall James Wood
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Hendrickson I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RICK WALLACE, Sheriff of Alfalfa County
Represented By: Robert L. Betts
Represented By: Robert S. Lafferrandre
Represented By: April Danielle Kelso
Represented By: Randall James Wood
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Hendrickson I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BILL INGRAM, Sheriff of Tillman County
Represented By: Robert L. Betts
Represented By: Robert S. Lafferrandre
Represented By: April Danielle Kelso
Represented By: Randall James Wood
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Hendrickson I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHRIS BRYANT, Sheriff of Carter County
Represented By: Robert L. Betts
Represented By: Robert S. Lafferrandre
Represented By: April Danielle Kelso
Represented By: Randall James Wood
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Hendrickson I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JIM D. SHOFNER
Represented By: John R. Woodard III
Represented By: Robert E. Applegate Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHRIS WEST, Sheriff of Canadian County
Represented By: Robert L. Betts
Represented By: Robert S. Lafferrandre
Represented By: April Danielle Kelso
Represented By: Randall James Wood
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Hendrickson I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DARREN ATHA, Former Roger Mills County Sheriff
Represented By: Robert S. Lafferrandre
Represented By: Randall James Wood
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Hendrickson I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MIKE WATERS, Former Pawnee County Sheriff
Represented By: Robert S. Lafferrandre
Represented By: Randall James Wood
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Hendrickson I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: R.B. HAUF, Former Payne County Sheriff
Represented By: Robert S. Lafferrandre
Represented By: Randall James Wood
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Hendrickson I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NORMAN FISHER, Former Cherokee County Sheriff
Represented By: Robert S. Lafferrandre
Represented By: Randall James Wood
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Hendrickson I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DANNY CRYER, Former Marshall County Sheriff
Represented By: Robert S. Lafferrandre
Represented By: Randall James Wood
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Hendrickson I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TONY ALMAGUER, Former Blaine County Sheriff
Represented By: Robert S. Lafferrandre
Represented By: Randall James Wood
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Hendrickson I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JEREMY FLOYD, Former Ottawa County Sheriff
Represented By: Robert S. Lafferrandre
Represented By: Randall James Wood
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Hendrickson I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TODD GIBSON, Former Cleveland County Sheriff
Represented By: Robert S. Lafferrandre
Represented By: Randall James Wood
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Hendrickson I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROB SEALE, Former LeFlore County Sheriff
Represented By: Robert S. Lafferrandre
Represented By: Randall James Wood
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Hendrickson I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JERRY NILES, Former Garfield County Sheriff
Represented By: Robert S. Lafferrandre
Represented By: Randall James Wood
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Hendrickson I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BOBBY WHITTINGTON, Former Tillman County Sheriff
Represented By: Robert S. Lafferrandre
Represented By: Randall James Wood
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Hendrickson I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SANDY HADLEY, Former Nowata County Sheriff
Represented By: Robert S. Lafferrandre
Represented By: Randall James Wood
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Hendrickson I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JON SMITH, Former Johnston County Sheriff
Represented By: Robert S. Lafferrandre
Represented By: Randall James Wood
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Hendrickson I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HARLAN MOORE, Former Delaware County Sheriff
Represented By: Robert S. Lafferrandre
Represented By: Randall James Wood
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Hendrickson I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JESSE JAMES, Former Latimer County Sheriff
Represented By: Robert S. Lafferrandre
Represented By: Randall James Wood
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Hendrickson I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: IRA LEE WILKINS
Represented By: Katherine Hubbard
Represented By: Seth Daniel Tychsen Wayne
Represented By: Ryan C. Downer
Represented By: Robert Friedman
Represented By: Daniel E. Smolen
Represented By: Jill E. Webb
Represented By: Robert M. Blakemore
Represented By: Elizabeth Rossi
Represented By: Tara Mikkilineni
Represented By: Marco Lopez
Represented By: Shelby Calambokidis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LINDA MEACHUM
Represented By: Katherine Hubbard
Represented By: Seth Daniel Tychsen Wayne
Represented By: Ryan C. Downer
Represented By: Robert Friedman
Represented By: Daniel E. Smolen
Represented By: Jill E. Webb
Represented By: Robert M. Blakemore
Represented By: Elizabeth Rossi
Represented By: Tara Mikkilineni
Represented By: Marco Lopez
Represented By: Shelby Calambokidis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DAVID SMITH
Represented By: Katherine Hubbard
Represented By: Seth Daniel Tychsen Wayne
Represented By: Ryan C. Downer
Represented By: Robert Friedman
Represented By: Daniel E. Smolen
Represented By: Jill E. Webb
Represented By: Robert M. Blakemore
Represented By: Elizabeth Rossi
Represented By: Tara Mikkilineni
Represented By: Marco Lopez
Represented By: Shelby Calambokidis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KENDALLIA KILLMAN
Represented By: Katherine Hubbard
Represented By: Seth Daniel Tychsen Wayne
Represented By: Ryan C. Downer
Represented By: Robert Friedman
Represented By: Daniel E. Smolen
Represented By: Jill E. Webb
Represented By: Robert M. Blakemore
Represented By: Elizabeth Rossi
Represented By: Tara Mikkilineni
Represented By: Marco Lopez
Represented By: Shelby Calambokidis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MELANIE HOLMES
Represented By: Katherine Hubbard
Represented By: Seth Daniel Tychsen Wayne
Represented By: Ryan C. Downer
Represented By: Robert Friedman
Represented By: Daniel E. Smolen
Represented By: Jill E. Webb
Represented By: Robert M. Blakemore
Represented By: Elizabeth Rossi
Represented By: Tara Mikkilineni
Represented By: Marco Lopez
Represented By: Shelby Calambokidis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RANDY FRAZIER
Represented By: Katherine Hubbard
Represented By: Seth Daniel Tychsen Wayne
Represented By: Ryan C. Downer
Represented By: Robert Friedman
Represented By: Daniel E. Smolen
Represented By: Jill E. Webb
Represented By: Robert M. Blakemore
Represented By: Elizabeth Rossi
Represented By: Tara Mikkilineni
Represented By: Marco Lopez
Represented By: Shelby Calambokidis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CHRISTOPHER CHOATE
Represented By: Katherine Hubbard
Represented By: Seth Daniel Tychsen Wayne
Represented By: Ryan C. Downer
Represented By: Robert Friedman
Represented By: Daniel E. Smolen
Represented By: Jill E. Webb
Represented By: Robert M. Blakemore
Represented By: Elizabeth Rossi
Represented By: Tara Mikkilineni
Represented By: Marco Lopez
Represented By: Shelby Calambokidis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CARLY GRAFF
Represented By: Katherine Hubbard
Represented By: Seth Daniel Tychsen Wayne
Represented By: Ryan C. Downer
Represented By: Robert Friedman
Represented By: Daniel E. Smolen
Represented By: Jill E. Webb
Represented By: Robert M. Blakemore
Represented By: Elizabeth Rossi
Represented By: Tara Mikkilineni
Represented By: Marco Lopez
Represented By: Shelby Calambokidis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.D. TAYLOR, Sheriff of Oklahoma County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?