Davis v. Core Civic, et al
Defendant / Appellee: SERENA BREWER, Nurse Practitioner - DCF, RHODA SHIVLEY, Nurse, RAY LARIMER, Health Service Administrator, SUSAN BURKHALTER, Nurse Practitioner Mississippi, MIKE CARPENTER, OSP Warden, DOC, General Counsel, CPL. BOSWELL, Correctional Officer, MARK KNUTSON, DOC Director Designee, SGT. ROBINSON, Disciplinary Supervisor, FRED SANDERS, DCF Medical Doctor, MR. PRICE, Chief of Security, YVONNE NEAN, Dir., Correctional Medical Associates (CMA), AKA Yvonne Neau, Dr., SAM SAM HASSAN, Law Library Supervisor, MARGARET GREEN, C Unit Manager, MR. KEY, Disciplinary Investigator Supervisor, LT. THORP, Supervisory Officer, MRS. BOGGS, Counselor, Max Unit, JOE ALLBAUGH, Director Oklahoma Department of Corrections, JOHNNY BLEVINS, DOC Inspector General, JERRY PERRY, H Block Unit Manager, MR. GENTRY, Assistant Warden, KENT GOODYEAR, C Unit Case Manager, JOSHUA PHILLIPS, Correctional Officer, MR. PEREZ, Assistant Warden, SGT. KELLY, Correctional Officer, AKA Sgt. Kelley, CPL. BRANSON, DR. MARLAR, OSP Medical Doctor, LISA WILLIAMS, H Block Case Manager, BUDDY HONAKER, DOC Medical Service Administrator, MARIA MARTINEZ, Mailroom Clerk, DR. DEAKINS, Medical Doctor - OSP, CORE CIVIC, INC., TERRY UNDERWOOD, Grievance/Misconduct Coordinator, MR. COLLINS, Correctional Officer, DIANA JONES, Manager Operations Finance DCF, TIFFANY ADE, Max - Unit Manager, KEITH IVANS, Dr., Director of Correctional Medical Associates (CMA), MR. PFAFF, Case Manager Max Unit, WAYDA STAMEY, Correctional Officer, T. CLELLEN, Captain Correctional Officer, KEVIN BROWN, Chief of Security, J. MORALES, Mailroom Supervisor, J. DORMAN, Chief, SGT. GRAHAM, Correctional Officer and JAMES YATES
Plaintiff / Appellant: EZEKIEL DAVIS
Case Number: 21-7020
Filed: May 6, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2021 [10838684] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 7 - pleadings. [21-7020] [Entered: 06/23/2021 07:40 AM]
June 22, 2021 [10838650] Jurisdictional review complete. Record on appeal due for 10th circuit 07/13/2021. [21-7020] [Entered: 06/22/2021 03:31 PM]
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order [10838647] Order filed by Judges Matheson and Bacharach referring the PLRA issue (order) [ # 10828170-2 ] and appellant's response [ # 10835530-2 ] to the panel of judges that will later be assigned to consider this case on the merits (no ruling will issue at this time). Suspension of briefing on the merits is lifted. Fee or 1915 forms and appellant's brief due on 08/02/2021 for Ezekiel Davis. Served on 06/22/2021. [21-7020] [Entered: 06/22/2021 03:30 PM]
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order [10835540] Order filed by Judge Tymkovich denying appellant's motion to appoint counsel filed by Appellant Mr. Ezekiel Davis. Served on 06/09/2021. [21-7020] [Entered: 06/09/2021 07:04 AM]
June 8, 2021 [10835532] Appellant's motion filed by Mr. Ezekiel Davis to appoint counsel. Served on 06/02/2021. Manner of Service: US mail. [21-7020] [Entered: 06/08/2021 04:26 PM]
June 8, 2021 [10835530] Response filed by Mr. Ezekiel Davis to the court's show cause order. Served on 06/02/2021. Manner of Service: US mail. [21-7020] [Entered: 06/08/2021 04:25 PM]
June 1, 2021 [10833554] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting Appellant's motion to extend time to file response to the court's 5/7/21 order. Appellant's response now due on or before 6/28/21 for Ezekiel Davis. Served on 06/01/2021. [21-7020] [Entered: 06/01/2021 10:28 AM]
May 28, 2021 [10833338] Appellant's motion filed by Ezekiel Davis to extend time to file response to order to show cause. Served on 05/20/2021. Manner of Service: US mail. [21-7020] [Entered: 05/28/2021 02:01 PM]
May 28, 2021 [10833327] Entry of appearance filed by Ezekiel Davis. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 05/19/2021. Manner of Service: US mail [21-7020] [Entered: 05/28/2021 01:48 PM]
May 21, 2021 [10831707] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Darrell L. Moore for Diana Jones, Mr. Collins, Mr. James Yates, Mr. Fred Sanders, Kevin Brown, Ms. Maria Martinez, Doctor Terry Underwood, Mr. Ray Larimer, Tiffany Ade, Core Civic, Inc., Serena Brewer, Mr. Keith Ivans, J. Dorman, Mr. Perez, Mr. Gentry, Mr. Pfaff, Mrs. Boggs, Wayda Stamey, Joshua Phillips, Rhoda Shivley, Sam Sam Hassan, J. Morales, Sgt. Robinson, Mr. Key, Ms. Susan Burkhalter and Yvonne Nean. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 05/21/2021. Manner of Service: email [21-7020] [Entered: 05/21/2021 01:42 PM]
May 21, 2021 [10831695] Entry of appearance submitted by Darrell L. Moore for Appellees Core Civic, Inc., Mr. Keith Ivans, Ms. Susan Burkhalter, Yvonne Nean, Mr. James Yates, Kevin Brown, J. Dorman, Mr. Gentry, Tiffany Ade, Mr. Ray Larimer, Mr. Fred Sanders, Mr. Pfaff, Mrs. Boggs, Joshua Phillips, Rhoda Shivley, Sam Sam Hassan, J. Morales, Mr. Collins, Ms. Maria Martinez, Sgt. Robinson, Wayda Stamey, Mr. Key, Serena Brewer, Diana Jones and Doctor Terry Underwood for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 05/21/2021. Manner of Service: US mail. --[Edited 05/21/2021 by MLB to remove pdf from docket; entry filed on 05/21/21][21-7020] DLM [Entered: 05/21/2021 01:26 PM]
May 21, 2021 [10831571] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Kari Hawkins for Mr. Mike Carpenter, Buddy Honaker, Johnny Blevins, Margaret Green, Ms. Lisa Williams, Mark Knutson, Jerry Perry, Mr. Joe Allbaugh, Sgt. Graham, DOC, T. Clellen, Dr. Marlar, Kent Goodyear, Sgt. Kelly, Cpl. Boswell, Cpl. Branson, Lt. Thorp, Mr. Price and Dr. Deakins. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 05/21/2021. Manner of Service: US mail [21-7020] [Entered: 05/21/2021 08:56 AM]
May 21, 2021 [10831565] Entry of appearance submitted by Kari Yvonne Hawkins for Appellees Mr. Joe Allbaugh, Johnny Blevins, Mark Knutson, DOC, Mr. Mike Carpenter, Buddy Honaker, T. Clellen, Dr. Marlar, Margaret Green, Jerry Perry, Ms. Lisa Williams, Kent Goodyear, Sgt. Graham, Sgt. Kelly, Cpl. Boswell, Cpl. Branson, Lt. Thorp, Mr. Price and Dr. Deakins for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 05/21/2021. Manner of Service: US mail. --[Edited 05/21/2021 by MLB to remove pdf from docket; entry filed on 05/21/21][21-7020] KH [Entered: 05/21/2021 08:43 AM]
May 7, 2021 [10828170] Order filed by Clerk of the Court. The appellant is directed to show cause in writing why he should not be required to prepay the entire appellate filing fee as 28 U.S.C. 1915(g) requires. Response due on 05/27/2021 for Ezekiel Davis. Served on 05/07/2021. [21-7020] [Entered: 05/07/2021 08:37 AM]
May 6, 2021 [10827924] Prisoner case docketed. DATE RECEIVED: 05/06/2021. Fee or 1915 forms due 06/07/2021 for Ezekiel Davis. Notice of appearance due on 05/20/2021 for Tiffany Ade, Joe Allbaugh, Johnny Blevins, Mrs. Boggs, Cpl. Boswell, Cpl. Branson, Serena Brewer, Kevin Brown, Susan Burkhalter, Mike Carpenter, T. Clellen, Mr. Collins, Core Civic, Inc., DOC, Dr. Deakins, J. Dorman, Mr. Gentry, Kent Goodyear, Sgt. Graham, Margaret Green, Sam Sam Hassan, Buddy Honaker, Keith Ivans, Diana Jones, Sgt. Kelly, Mr. Key, Mark Knutson, Ray Larimer, Dr. Marlar, Maria Martinez, J. Morales, Yvonne Nean, Mr. Perez, Jerry Perry, Mr. Pfaff, Joshua Phillips, Mr. Price, Sgt. Robinson, Fred Sanders, Rhoda Shivley, Wayda Stamey, Lt. Thorp, Terry Underwood, Lisa Williams and James Yates. Notice of appearance due on 06/07/2021 for Ezekiel Davis. [21-7020] [Entered: 05/06/2021 11:50 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Davis v. Core Civic, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SERENA BREWER, Nurse Practitioner - DCF
Represented By: Darrell L. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RHODA SHIVLEY, Nurse
Represented By: Darrell L. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RAY LARIMER, Health Service Administrator
Represented By: Darrell L. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SUSAN BURKHALTER, Nurse Practitioner Mississippi
Represented By: Darrell L. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MIKE CARPENTER, OSP Warden
Represented By: Kari Y. Hawkins
Represented By: Kari Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DOC, General Counsel
Represented By: Kari Y. Hawkins
Represented By: Kari Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CPL. BOSWELL, Correctional Officer
Represented By: Kari Y. Hawkins
Represented By: Kari Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARK KNUTSON, DOC Director Designee
Represented By: Kari Y. Hawkins
Represented By: Kari Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SGT. ROBINSON, Disciplinary Supervisor
Represented By: Darrell L. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FRED SANDERS, DCF Medical Doctor
Represented By: Darrell L. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MR. PRICE, Chief of Security
Represented By: Kari Y. Hawkins
Represented By: Kari Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: YVONNE NEAN, Dir., Correctional Medical Associates (CMA), AKA Yvonne Neau, Dr.
Represented By: Darrell L. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SAM SAM HASSAN, Law Library Supervisor
Represented By: Darrell L. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARGARET GREEN, C Unit Manager
Represented By: Kari Y. Hawkins
Represented By: Kari Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MR. KEY, Disciplinary Investigator Supervisor
Represented By: Darrell L. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LT. THORP, Supervisory Officer
Represented By: Kari Y. Hawkins
Represented By: Kari Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MRS. BOGGS, Counselor, Max Unit
Represented By: Darrell L. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOE ALLBAUGH, Director Oklahoma Department of Corrections
Represented By: Kari Y. Hawkins
Represented By: Kari Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHNNY BLEVINS, DOC Inspector General
Represented By: Kari Y. Hawkins
Represented By: Kari Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JERRY PERRY, H Block Unit Manager
Represented By: Kari Y. Hawkins
Represented By: Kari Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MR. GENTRY, Assistant Warden
Represented By: Darrell L. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KENT GOODYEAR, C Unit Case Manager
Represented By: Kari Y. Hawkins
Represented By: Kari Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOSHUA PHILLIPS, Correctional Officer
Represented By: Darrell L. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MR. PEREZ, Assistant Warden
Represented By: Darrell L. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SGT. KELLY, Correctional Officer, AKA Sgt. Kelley
Represented By: Kari Y. Hawkins
Represented By: Kari Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CPL. BRANSON
Represented By: Kari Y. Hawkins
Represented By: Kari Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DR. MARLAR, OSP Medical Doctor
Represented By: Kari Y. Hawkins
Represented By: Kari Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LISA WILLIAMS, H Block Case Manager
Represented By: Kari Y. Hawkins
Represented By: Kari Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BUDDY HONAKER, DOC Medical Service Administrator
Represented By: Kari Y. Hawkins
Represented By: Kari Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARIA MARTINEZ, Mailroom Clerk
Represented By: Darrell L. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DR. DEAKINS, Medical Doctor - OSP
Represented By: Kari Y. Hawkins
Represented By: Kari Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CORE CIVIC, INC.
Represented By: Darrell L. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TERRY UNDERWOOD, Grievance/Misconduct Coordinator
Represented By: Darrell L. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MR. COLLINS, Correctional Officer
Represented By: Darrell L. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DIANA JONES, Manager Operations Finance DCF
Represented By: Darrell L. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TIFFANY ADE, Max - Unit Manager
Represented By: Darrell L. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KEITH IVANS, Dr., Director of Correctional Medical Associates (CMA)
Represented By: Darrell L. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MR. PFAFF, Case Manager Max Unit
Represented By: Darrell L. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WAYDA STAMEY, Correctional Officer
Represented By: Darrell L. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: T. CLELLEN, Captain Correctional Officer
Represented By: Kari Y. Hawkins
Represented By: Kari Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KEVIN BROWN, Chief of Security
Represented By: Darrell L. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: J. MORALES, Mailroom Supervisor
Represented By: Darrell L. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: J. DORMAN, Chief
Represented By: Darrell L. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SGT. GRAHAM, Correctional Officer
Represented By: Kari Y. Hawkins
Represented By: Kari Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JAMES YATES
Represented By: Darrell L. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: EZEKIEL DAVIS
Represented By: Ezekiel Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?