CNSP v. Webber, et al
Defendant: CITY OF SANTA FE
Plaintiff / Appellant: CNSP, INC., DBA NMSURF
Defendant / Appellee: ALAN WEBBER, RENEE VILLAREAL, SIGNE LINDELL, CAROL ROMERO-WIRTH, CHRIS RIVERA, MICHAEL GARCIA, LEE GARCIA, JAMIE CASSUT, AMANDA CHAVEZ, in their official capacities as Mayor and city councilors of the City of Santa Fe, ALAN WEBBER, in his official capacity as Mayor of the City of Sante Fe, RENEE VILLAREAL, in her official capacity as counsel council member of the City of Sante Fe, SIGNE LINDELL, in her official capacity as counsel council member of the City of Sante Fe, CHRIS RIVERA, in his official capacity as counsel council member of the City of Sante Fe, MICHAEL GARCIA, in his official capacity as counsel council member of the City of Sante Fe, LEE GARCIA, in his official capacity as counsel council member of the City of Sante Fe, JAMIE CASSUT, in her official capacity as counsel council member of the City of Sante Fe and AMANDA CHAVEZ, in her official capacity as counsel council member of the City of Sante Fe
Case Number: 22-2131
Filed: October 31, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2022 [10964236] Order filed by Clerk of the Court - Response to appellant's Notice of Plaintiff-Appellant's Change of Name notice due on 01/04/2023 for Jamie Cassut, Amanda Chavez, Lee Garcia, Michael Garcia, Signe Lindell, Chris Rivera, Carol Romero-Wirth, Renee Villareal and Alan Webber. Appellant's brief and appendix remain due on 1/17/2023. Served on 12/21/2022. Text only entry - no attachment. [22-2131] [Entered: 12/21/2022 09:25 AM]
December 20, 2022 [10964058] Motion filed by Appellant CNSP, Inc., d/b/a NMSURF to extend time to file appellant/petitioner's brief until 01/17/2023. Served on: 12/20/2022. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required privacy and virus certifications: Yes. [22-2131] RSG [Entered: 12/20/2022 03:01 PM]
December 20, 2022 [10964064] Notice of name change filed by CNSP, Inc. Served on 12/20/2022 by email. [22-2131] RSG [Entered: 12/20/2022 03:05 PM]
December 20, 2022 [10964059] Rule 26 Disclosure Statement filed by CNSP, Inc.. More than 50 parties disclosed: no. Served on 12/20/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-2131] RSG [Entered: 12/20/2022 03:03 PM]
December 20, 2022 [10964066] Order filed by Clerk of the Court, -granting appellant's second motion to extend time to file apet brief and appendix (7 days). Appellant's brief and appendix due on 01/17/2023 for CNSP, Inc. Served on 12/20/2022. Text only entry - no attachment. [22-2131] [Entered: 12/20/2022 03:08 PM]
December 14, 2022 [10962241] This matter is before the court sua sponte in preparation for the January 1, 2023 implementation of Tenth Circuit Rule 26.1, which requires Fed. R. App. P. 26.1 disclosures to be made via a separately filed Tenth Circuit Form 4 instead of in the parties' briefs. Within 7 days of the date of this order, all non-governmental corporate entities in civil appeals (including movants, intervenors, and amici), and the government and any corporate defendants in criminal appeals, shall complete and e-file Form 4, which is available on the forms page of the court's website. The aforementioned parties must file Form 4 even if they already filed a brief that includes Fed. R. App. P. 26.1 disclosures and/or have nothing to disclose. Counsel representing more than one party may file one Form 4 for all represented parties. Form 4 should be filed using the Rule 26 Disclosure Statement event in CM/ECF. Disclosure statement due on 12/21/2022 for CNSP, Inc.. [22-2131] [Entered: 12/14/2022 07:52 AM]
December 1, 2022 [10959078] Motion filed by Appellant CNSP, Inc. to extend time to file appellant/petitioner's brief until 01/09/2023. Served on: 12/01/2022. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required privacy and virus certifications: Yes. [22-2131] RSG [Entered: 12/01/2022 01:40 PM]
December 1, 2022 [10959084] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting Attorney motion to extend time to file appellant's brief. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 01/09/2023 for CNSP, Inc. Served on 12/01/2022. Text only entry - no attachment. [22-2131] [Entered: 12/01/2022 02:08 PM]
November 17, 2022 [10956120] Order filed by Clerk of the Court. On 11/15/2022, the court abated this appeal pending the district court's disposition of a motion for reconsideration. The district court has now issued an order denying the motion. Accordingly, the abatement of this appeal is lifted. The United States District court certified that the record was complete on Novemer 15, 2022. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 12/27/2022 for CNSP, Inc.. Served on 11/17/2022. [22-2131] [Entered: 11/17/2022 09:20 AM]
November 16, 2022 [10955995] District Court memorandum opinion and order denying motion to reconsider filed. [22-2131] [Entered: 11/16/2022 03:40 PM]
November 15, 2022 [10955381] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 11/15/2022. [22-2131] [Entered: 11/15/2022 11:36 AM]
November 15, 2022 [10955328] Order filed by Clerk of the Court abating case. FRAP 4(a)(4) or 4(b) order due 12/15/2022. See attached order for details. Served on 11/15/2022. [22-2131] [Entered: 11/15/2022 10:33 AM]
November 14, 2022 [10955125] Entry of appearance submitted by Richard S. Glassman for Appellant CNSP, Inc.d/b/a NMSURF for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 11/14/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-2131] RSG [Entered: 11/14/2022 03:31 PM]
November 14, 2022 [10955099] Entry of appearance submitted by Richard S. Glassman for Appellant CNSP, Inc.d/b/a NMSURF for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 11/14/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-2131]--[Edited 11/14/2022 by LG to remove PDF from entry, as pleading was filed on 11/14/2022] RSG [Entered: 11/14/2022 03:07 PM]
November 14, 2022 [10955129] Docketing statement filed by CNSP, Inc.. Served on 11/14/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-2131] RSG [Entered: 11/14/2022 03:37 PM]
November 14, 2022 [10955138] Acknowledgment of transcript order filed by CNSP, Inc.. Transcript ordered: None. Served on: 11/14/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-2131] RSG [Entered: 11/14/2022 03:45 PM]
November 14, 2022 [10955151] Minute order filed - No transcript is necessary for this appeal. Notice due that record is complete by 11/21/2022 for Mitchell R. Elfers, Clerk of Court (oclk). (Text Only - No Attachment) [22-2131] [Entered: 11/14/2022 03:50 PM]
November 14, 2022 [10955160] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Richard S. Glassman for CNSP, Inc.. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 11/14/2022. Manner of Service: email [22-2131] [Entered: 11/14/2022 04:04 PM]
November 4, 2022 [10952825] Entry of appearance submitted by Marcos D. Martinez for Appellees Jamie Cassut, Amanda Chavez, Lee Garcia, Michael Garcia, Signe Lindell, Chris Rivera, Carol Romero-Wirth, Renee Villareal and Alan Webber for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 11/04/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-2131] --[Edited 11/04/2022 by AT to remove PDF as pleading was filed on 11/4/2022.] MDM [Entered: 11/04/2022 09:47 AM]
November 4, 2022 [10952862] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Marcos D. Martinez for Michael Garcia, Alan Webber, Renee Villareal, Signe Lindell, Carol Romero-Wirth, Chris Rivera, Lee Garcia, Jamie Cassut, and Amanda Chavez. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 11/04/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-2131] [Entered: 11/04/2022 10:33 AM]
October 31, 2022 [10951276] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 10/31/2022 Docketing statement due 11/14/2022 for CNSP, Inc.. Transcript order form due 11/14/2022 for CNSP, Inc.. Notice of appearance due on 11/14/2022 for CNSP, Inc., Jamie Cassut, Amanda Chavez, Lee Garcia, Michael Garcia, Signe Lindell, Chris Rivera, Carol Romero-Wirth, Renee Villareal, and Alan Webber. [22-2131] [Entered: 10/31/2022 11:18 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: CNSP v. Webber, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CNSP, INC., DBA NMSURF
Represented By: Richard S. Glassman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALAN WEBBER
Represented By: Marcos D. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RENEE VILLAREAL
Represented By: Marcos D. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SIGNE LINDELL
Represented By: Marcos D. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CAROL ROMERO-WIRTH
Represented By: Marcos D. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHRIS RIVERA
Represented By: Marcos D. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHAEL GARCIA
Represented By: Marcos D. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LEE GARCIA
Represented By: Marcos D. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JAMIE CASSUT
Represented By: Marcos D. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMANDA CHAVEZ, in their official capacities as Mayor and city councilors of the City of Santa Fe
Represented By: Marcos D. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALAN WEBBER, in his official capacity as Mayor of the City of Sante Fe
Represented By: Marcos D. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RENEE VILLAREAL, in her official capacity as counsel council member of the City of Sante Fe
Represented By: Marcos D. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SIGNE LINDELL, in her official capacity as counsel council member of the City of Sante Fe
Represented By: Marcos D. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHRIS RIVERA, in his official capacity as counsel council member of the City of Sante Fe
Represented By: Marcos D. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHAEL GARCIA, in his official capacity as counsel council member of the City of Sante Fe
Represented By: Marcos D. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LEE GARCIA, in his official capacity as counsel council member of the City of Sante Fe
Represented By: Marcos D. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JAMIE CASSUT, in her official capacity as counsel council member of the City of Sante Fe
Represented By: Marcos D. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMANDA CHAVEZ, in her official capacity as counsel council member of the City of Sante Fe
Represented By: Marcos D. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF SANTA FE
Represented By: Marcos D. Martinez
Represented By: R. Alfred Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?