United States v. Hohn
Plaintiff / Appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant / Appellant: STEVEN M. HOHN
Case Number: 22-3009
Filed: January 24, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions -Vacate Sentence
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2022 [10899049] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting appellant's motion to extend time to file brief. Appellant's brief due on 04/20/2022 for Steven M. Hohn. No further extensions of time will be granted on the clerk's authority. Served on 03/15/2022. Text only entry - no attachment. [22-3009] [Entered: 03/15/2022 10:00 AM]
March 15, 2022 [10899008] Motion filed by Appellant Mr. Steven M. Hohn to extend time to file appellant/petitioner's brief until 04/20/2022. Served on: 03/15/2022. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required privacy and virus certifications: Yes. [22-3009] LHK [Entered: 03/15/2022 08:52 AM]
February 9, 2022 [10891839] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 4. Volume I - Pleadings/Transcripts from 12-cr-20003 & 16-cr-20032; Volume II - Pleadings/Transcripts from 19-cv-2082; Volume III - Pleadings/Transcripts from 19-cv-2491; and Volume IV - Sealed Pleading. Appellant's brief due on 03/21/2022 for Steven M. Hohn. [22-3009] [Entered: 02/09/2022 09:34 AM]
February 7, 2022 [10891231] Designation of record filed by Appellant Mr. Steven M. Hohn. Served on 02/07/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-3009] LHK [Entered: 02/07/2022 10:33 AM]
February 7, 2022 [10891235] Notice filed that the transcript is already on file in the district court filed by Mr. Steven M. Hohn. Served on: 02/07/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-3009] LHK [Entered: 02/07/2022 10:38 AM]
February 7, 2022 [10891250] Minute order filed - Record on appeal due district court 02/28/2022. (Text Only - No Attachment) [22-3009] [Entered: 02/07/2022 11:25 AM]
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order [10891397] Order filed by Judge Tymkovich granting Attorney's motion to continue appointment. Served on 02/07/2022. [22-3009] [Entered: 02/07/2022 03:25 PM]
February 7, 2022 [10891227] Docketing statement filed by Mr. Steven M. Hohn. Served on 02/07/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-3009] LHK [Entered: 02/07/2022 10:29 AM]
February 7, 2022 [10891226] Motion filed by Appellant Mr. Steven M. Hohn to continue appointment. Served on: 02/07/2022. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required privacy and virus certifications: Yes. [22-3009] LHK [Entered: 02/07/2022 10:27 AM]
February 7, 2022 [10891139] Entry of appearance submitted by Lydia Krebs for Appellant Mr. Steven M. Hohn for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 02/07/2022. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 02/07/2022 by MLB to remove pdf from docket; entry filed on 02/07/22][22-3009] LHK [Entered: 02/07/2022 08:15 AM]
February 7, 2022 [10891148] Entry of appearance filed by Lydia Hazel Krebs and Melody Brannon for Mr. Steven M. Hohn. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y (some parties previously disclosed). Served on 02/07/2022. Manner of Service: email [22-3009] [Entered: 02/07/2022 08:22 AM]
January 25, 2022 [10888162] Entry of appearance submitted by James A. Brown for Appellee United States of America for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 01/25/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-3009] --[Edited 01/25/2022 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] JAB [Entered: 01/25/2022 09:59 AM]
January 25, 2022 [10888164] Entry of appearance submitted by Carrie N. Capwell for Appellee United States of America for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 01/25/2022. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 01/25/2022 by MLB to remove pdf from docket; entry filed on 01/25/22][22-3009] CNC [Entered: 01/25/2022 10:01 AM]
January 25, 2022 [10888168] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Carrie N. Capwell for United States of America. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 01/25/2022. Manner of Service: email [22-3009] [Entered: 01/25/2022 10:06 AM]
January 25, 2022 [10888166] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. James A. Brown for United States of America. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 01/25/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-3009] [Entered: 01/25/2022 10:05 AM]
January 24, 2022 [10887951] Prisoner case docketed. DATE RECEIVED: 01/24/2022. Docketing statement, transcript order form, designation of record, appointment motion and notice of appearance due on 02/07/2022 for Steven M. Hohn; notice of appearance due on 2/7/22 for United States of America. [22-3009] [Entered: 01/24/2022 01:51 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: United States v. Hohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: James A. Brown
Represented By: Carrie N. Capwell
Represented By: Annette B. Gurney
Represented By: Terra Morehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: STEVEN M. HOHN
Represented By: Melody Brannon
Represented By: Kirk C. Redmond
Represented By: Lydia Hazel Krebs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?