Federal Trade Commission, et al v. Zurixx, et al
Plaintiff: FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION and UTAH DIVISION OF CONSUMER PROTECTION
Defendant: ZURIXX, CARLSON DEVELOPMENT GROUP UTAH, CJ SEMINAR HOLDINGS, ZURIXX FINANCIAL UTAH, CHRISTOPHER A. CANNON, JAMES M. CARLSON, JEFFREY D. SPANGLER, BRAND MANAGEMENT HOLDINGS, CAC INVESTMENT VENTURES, CARLSON DEVELOPMENT GROUP PUERTO RICO, DORADO MARKETING AND MANAGEMENT, JSS INVESTMENT VENTURES, JSS TRUST, ZURIXX FINANCIAL PUERTO RICO and GERALD D. SPANGLER
Interested Party: DAVID EFRON and EFRON DORADO SE
Receiver: DAVID K. BROADBENT
Case Number: 22-4042
Filed: May 13, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
March 31, 2023 Federal Trade Commission, et al. v. Zurixx, LLC, et al.

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2022 [10925801] Response filed by David K. Broadbent to Interested Parties/Appellants' Motion Requesting Stay Pending Appeal. Served on 07/11/2022. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required privacy and virus certifications: Yes. [22-4042] MQ [Entered: 07/11/2022 02:36 PM]
June 30, 2022 [10923475] Motion filed by Appellants Efron Dorado SE and David Efron to extend time to file appellant/petitioner's brief until 08/10/2022. Served on: 06/30/2022. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required privacy and virus certifications: Yes. [22-4042] DE [Entered: 06/30/2022 01:54 PM]
June 30, 2022 [10923478] Motion filed by Appellants Efron Dorado SE and David Efron for stay of Execution of the District Court Judgment of fees and costs (USDC Doc. No. 368) pending the resolution of the current appeal.. Served on: 06/30/2022. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required privacy and virus certifications: Yes. [22-4042] DE [Entered: 06/30/2022 01:59 PM]
June 30, 2022 [10923485] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting appellants' motion for 30-day extension of time to file brief. Appellants' brief and appendix now due on 08/10/2022 for David Efron and Efron Dorado SE. No further extensions will be granted on the clerk's authority. Served on 06/30/2022. Text only entry - no attachment. [22-4042] [Entered: 06/30/2022 02:10 PM]
May 31, 2022 [10916709] Notice that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal filed by Efron Dorado SE and David Efron. Served on: 05/31/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-4042] --[Edited 06/14/2022 by SLS to correct docket event and text.] DE [Entered: 05/31/2022 02:11 PM]
May 31, 2022 [10916719] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 06/07/2022 for Kimberly A. Free, Clerk of Court. (Text Only - No Attachment) [22-4042] [Entered: 05/31/2022 02:33 PM]
May 31, 2022 [10916762] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 05/31/2022. Appellants' brief and appendix due on 07/11/2022 for David Efron and Efron Dorado SE. [22-4042] [Entered: 05/31/2022 03:26 PM]
May 27, 2022 [10916438] Deficiency notice issued. Corrected transcript order form due 05/31/2022 for David Efron and Efron Dorado SE. [22-4042] [Entered: 05/27/2022 03:13 PM]
May 27, 2022 [10916435] Entry of appearance filed by David Efron for Efron Dorado SE and David Efron. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 05/27/2022. Manner of Service: email [22-4042] [Entered: 05/27/2022 03:09 PM]
May 27, 2022 [10916219] Fee paid in District Court on 05/26/2022. [22-4042] [Entered: 05/27/2022 09:33 AM]
May 27, 2022 This entry has been removed from the docket. Incomplete; must be corrected and refiled. [SLS] [10916416] Acknowledgment of transcript order filed by Efron Dorado SE and David Efron in 22-4042. Transcript ordered: Served on: 05/27/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-4042, 20-4090, 21-4141] --[Edited 05/27/2022 by SLS to remove docket entry from 20-4090 & 21-4141.] DE [Entered: 05/27/2022 02:46 PM]
May 27, 2022 [10916414] Docketing statement filed by Efron Dorado SE and David Efron in 22-4042. Served on 05/27/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-4042]--[Edited 05/27/2022 by KLP to remove the filing from 20-4090 and 21-4141.] DE [Entered: 05/27/2022 02:41 PM]
May 27, 2022 [10916417] Entry of appearance submitted by David Efron, Pro Se for Appellants Efron Dorado SE and David Efron in 22-4042 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 05/27/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-4042]--[Edited 05/27/2022 by DJD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 5/27/22] DE [Entered: 05/27/2022 02:49 PM]
May 26, 2022 [10915985] Entry of appearance submitted by Doyle S. Byers, Cory A. Talbot, Michelle Quist for Appellee David K. Broadbent for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 05/26/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-4042]--[Edited 05/26/2022 by DJD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 5/26/22] MQ [Entered: 05/26/2022 02:57 PM]
May 26, 2022 [10916001] Entry of appearance filed by Doyle S. Byers, Michelle Quist and Cory Alan Talbot for David K. Broadbent. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 05/26/2022. Manner of Service: email [22-4042] [Entered: 05/26/2022 03:08 PM]
May 13, 2022 [10913060] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 05/12/2022. Fee is due in district court by 05/27/2022 for David Efron and Efron Dorado SE. Docketing statement and transcript order form due 05/27/2022 for David Efron and Efron Dorado SE. Notice of appearance due on 05/27/2022 for David K. Broadbent, David Efron and Efron Dorado SE. [22-4042] [Entered: 05/13/2022 11:01 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Federal Trade Commission, et al v. Zurixx, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UTAH DIVISION OF CONSUMER PROTECTION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZURIXX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARLSON DEVELOPMENT GROUP UTAH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CJ SEMINAR HOLDINGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZURIXX FINANCIAL UTAH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER A. CANNON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES M. CARLSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFREY D. SPANGLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRAND MANAGEMENT HOLDINGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAC INVESTMENT VENTURES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARLSON DEVELOPMENT GROUP PUERTO RICO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DORADO MARKETING AND MANAGEMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JSS INVESTMENT VENTURES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JSS TRUST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZURIXX FINANCIAL PUERTO RICO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GERALD D. SPANGLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: DAVID EFRON
Represented By: David Efron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: EFRON DORADO SE
Represented By: David Efron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Receiver: DAVID K. BROADBENT
Represented By: Doyle S. Byers
Represented By: Michelle Quist
Represented By: Cory Alan Talbot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?