Turlington v. Connor, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: EDWIN HARDEE TURLINGTON, II
Defendant / Appellee: WINSTON H. CONNOR, II, STOCKWELL & CONNOR, PLLC, DELAWARE COUNTY, OKLAHOMA, DELAWARE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE, HARLAN MAX MOORE, Sheriff, MELVIN GAYLE WELLS, EDDIE JAMES WYANT, WYANT LAW FIRM, PLLC, KENNETH EARL WRIGHT, III, OFFICE OF THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY FOR THE 13TH DISTRICT, NICHOLAS LELECAS, GROVE OKLAHOMA POLICE DEPARTMENT, SGT. JERRY BOHANNON, JEFF STOUT, MICHAEL STEVEN REED, CITY OF GROVE OK. FIRE DEPT., REUBEN HERNANDEZ, OKLAHOMA HIGHWAY PATROL, Troop L, BILL HOBBS, HAYLEY LNU, Grove Verizon Store Employee, GROVE VERIZON AUTHORIZED RETAILER and VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, INC.
Case Number: 22-5001
Filed: January 5, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Civil (RICO)

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
October 4, 2022 Turlington v. Connor, et al.

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2022 [10895940] Paper copies of appellant's brief received from Edwin Hardee Turlington II. [22-5001] [Entered: 03/01/2022 10:41 AM]
February 14, 2022 This entry has been removed from the docket. [KLP] This was attached to the opening brief. [10892815] Appellant's supplemental memorandum brief filed by Mr. Edwin Hardee Turlington, II. Served on 02/14/2022. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required privacy and virus certifications: Yes. [22-5001] EHT [Entered: 02/14/2022 01:01 PM]
February 14, 2022 [10892847] Minute order filed - Appellant's opening is accepted for filing. Seven paper copies shall be filed with the court by 2/22/22. All copies must be exact replicas of the electronic filing, including all attachments. (Please note that this filing was corrected by the clerk.) Appellee's brief due 03/16/2022 for Delaware County, Oklahoma, Grove Verizon Communications, Delaware County Sheriff's Office, Harlan Max Moore, Melvin Gayle Wells, Stockwell & Connor, PLLC, Nicholas Lelecas, Grove Oklahoma Police Department, Jerry Bohannon, Eddie James Wyant, Wyant Law Firm, PLLC, Kenneth Earl Wright III, Office of the District Attorney for the 13th District, Michael Steven Reed, City of Grove OK. Fire Dept., Reuben Hernandez, Oklahoma Highway Patrol and Bill Hobbs. (Text Only - No Attachment) [22-5001] [Entered: 02/14/2022 02:03 PM]
February 14, 2022 [10892810] Appellant/Petitioner's brief filed by Mr. Edwin Hardee Turlington, II. Served on 02/14/2022 by email. Oral argument requested? No. Word/page count: 4. This pleading complies with all required privacy and virus certifications: Yes. [22-5001]--[Edited 02/14/2022 by KLP to attach a corrected attachment (combines the brief and "supplmental memorandum."] EHT [Entered: 02/14/2022 12:54 PM]
January 25, 2022 [10888132] Order filed by Clerk of the Court. Appellant's motion to file electornic is granted. Served on 01/25/2022. [22-5001] [Entered: 01/25/2022 09:08 AM]
January 24, 2022 [10887943] Entry of appearance filed by Edwin Hardee Turlington, II. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Party listed has been disclosed to the court. Served on 01/18/2022. Manner of Service: US mail. [22-5001] [Entered: 01/24/2022 01:37 PM]
January 24, 2022 [10887945] Request to file electronic, filed by Edwin Hardee Turlington, II (Document captioned for the district court.) Served on 01/18/2022. Manner of Service: US mail. [22-5001]--[Edited 01/25/2022 by JM to edit docket text and event.] [Entered: 01/24/2022 01:40 PM]
January 19, 2022 [10886746] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Allison Maynard for Verizon Communications, Inc.. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 01/19/2022. Manner of Service: US mail, email [22-5001] [Entered: 01/19/2022 09:38 AM]
January 19, 2022 [10886765] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Devan Pederson for Oklahoma Highway Patrol, Eddie James Wyant, Kenneth Earl Wright, III, Office of the District Attorney for the 13th District, Nicholas Lelecas and Reuben Hernandez. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 01/19/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-5001] [Entered: 01/19/2022 10:10 AM]
January 19, 2022 [10886960] Entry of appearance filed by Keith A. Wilkes for Grove Oklahoma Police Department, Jerry Bohannon, Michael Steven Reed, City of Grove OK. Fire Dept. and Bill Hobbs. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 01/19/2022. Manner of Service: US mail, email [22-5001] [Entered: 01/19/2022 02:58 PM]
January 19, 2022 [10886743] Entry of appearance submitted by Allison J. Maynard for Appellee Verizon Communications, Inc. for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 01/19/2022. Manner of Service: email, US mail. --[Edited 01/19/2022 by MLB to remove pdf from docket; entry filed on 01/19/22][22-5001] AM [Entered: 01/19/2022 09:33 AM]
January 19, 2022 [10886948] Entry of appearance submitted by Keith A. Wilkes for Appellees Grove Oklahoma Police Department, City of Grove OK. Fire Dept., Jerry Bohannon, Michael Steven Reed and Bill Hobbs for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 01/19/2022. Manner of Service: email, US mail. [22-5001]--[Edited 01/19/2022 by DJD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 1/19/22] KAW [Entered: 01/19/2022 02:44 PM]
January 19, 2022 [10886672] Entry of appearance filed by David Robert Ross for Winston H. Connor, II and Stockwell & Connor, PLLC. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 01/19/2022. Manner of Service: email, US mail [22-5001] [Entered: 01/19/2022 08:25 AM]
January 19, 2022 [10886642] Entry of appearance submitted by David R. Ross for Appellees Winston H. Connor, II and Stockwell & Connor, PLLC for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 01/19/2022. Manner of Service: email, US mail. [22-5001]--[Edited 01/19/2022 by DJD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 1/19/22] DR [Entered: 01/19/2022 07:25 AM]
January 18, 2022 [10886303] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Andrew A. Artus, Mr. Justin P. Ashlock and Alison B. Levine for Delaware County, Oklahoma, Delaware County Sheriff's Office, Harlan Max Moore and Melvin Gayle Wells. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 01/18/2022. Manner of Service: email [22-5001] [Entered: 01/18/2022 09:38 AM]
January 18, 2022 [10886298] Entry of appearance submitted by Alison B. Levine, Andy A. Artus, and Justin P. Ashlock for Appellees Delaware County Sheriff's Office, Delaware County, Oklahoma, Harlan Max Moore and Melvin Gayle Wells for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 01/18/2022. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 01/18/2022 by MLB to remove pdf from docket; entry filed on 01/18/22][22-5001] ABL [Entered: 01/18/2022 09:29 AM]
January 18, 2022 [10886512] Entry of appearance submitted by David B. Donchin; Katherine T. Loy for Appellee Wyant Law Firm, PLLC for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 01/18/2022. Manner of Service: email, US mail. [22-5001]--[Edited 01/18/2022 by DJD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 1/18/22] DBD [Entered: 01/18/2022 02:51 PM]
January 18, 2022 [10886546] Entry of appearance filed by Katherine Loy and David B. Donchin for Wyant Law Firm, PLLC. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 01/18/2022. Manner of Service: US mail, email [22-5001] [Entered: 01/18/2022 03:33 PM]
January 18, 2022 [10886571] Entry of appearance submitted by David R. Ross for Appellees Winston H. Connor, II and Stockwell & Connor, PLLC for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 01/18/2022. Manner of Service: US mail. [22-5001] --[Edited 01/18/2022 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] DR [Entered: 01/18/2022 04:02 PM]
January 18, 2022 [10886573] Entry of appearance filed by David Robert Ross for Winston H. Connor, II and Stockwell & Connor, PLLC. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 01/18/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-5001] [Entered: 01/18/2022 04:09 PM]
January 18, 2022 [10886561] Entry of appearance submitted by Devan A. Pederson for Appellees Reuben Hernandez, Nicholas Lelecas, Office of the District Attorney for the 13th District, Oklahoma Highway Patrol, Kenneth Earl Wright, III and Eddie James Wyant for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 01/18/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-5001]--[Edited 01/19/2022 by JM PDF removed filed 1/19/22] DP [Entered: 01/18/2022 03:53 PM]
January 12, 2022 [10885160] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 1, Comments: Vol I - Pleadings.. [22-5001] [Entered: 01/12/2022 07:26 AM]
January 10, 2022 [10884542] Jurisdictional review complete. Record on appeal 10th circuit due 01/31/2022. Appellant's brief due on 02/22/2022 for Edwin Hardee Turlington II [22-5001] [Entered: 01/10/2022 08:02 AM]
January 5, 2022 [10883906] Supplemental notice of appeal filed. Transmitted by the district court. [22-5001] [Entered: 01/05/2022 03:27 PM]
January 5, 2022 [10883887] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 01/05/2021 Notice of appearance due on 01/19/2022 for Jerry Bohannon, City of Grove OK. Fire Dept., Winston H. Connor II, Delaware County Sheriff's Office, Delaware County, Oklahoma, Grove Oklahoma Police Department, Reuben Hernandez, Bill Hobbs, Nicholas Lelecas, Harlan Max Moore, Office of the District Attorney for the 13th District, Oklahoma Highway Patrol, Michael Steven Reed, Stockwell & Connor, PLLC, Verizon Communications, Inc., Melvin Gayle Wells, Kenneth Earl Wright III, Eddie James Wyant and Wyant Law Firm, PLLC, and Notice of appearance due on 02/04/2022 for Edwin Hardee Turlington II. [22-5001] [Entered: 01/05/2022 02:56 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Turlington v. Connor, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: EDWIN HARDEE TURLINGTON, II
Represented By: Edwin Hardee Turlington II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WINSTON H. CONNOR, II
Represented By: David Robert Ross
Represented By: David Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STOCKWELL & CONNOR, PLLC
Represented By: David Robert Ross
Represented By: David Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DELAWARE COUNTY, OKLAHOMA
Represented By: Andrew A. Artus
Represented By: Justin P. Ashlock
Represented By: Alison B. Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DELAWARE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE
Represented By: Andrew A. Artus
Represented By: Justin P. Ashlock
Represented By: Alison B. Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HARLAN MAX MOORE, Sheriff
Represented By: Andrew A. Artus
Represented By: Justin P. Ashlock
Represented By: Alison B. Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MELVIN GAYLE WELLS
Represented By: Andrew A. Artus
Represented By: Justin P. Ashlock
Represented By: Alison B. Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: EDDIE JAMES WYANT
Represented By: Devan Pederson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WYANT LAW FIRM, PLLC
Represented By: David B. Donchin
Represented By: Katherine Loy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KENNETH EARL WRIGHT, III
Represented By: Devan Pederson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OFFICE OF THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY FOR THE 13TH DISTRICT
Represented By: Devan Pederson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NICHOLAS LELECAS
Represented By: Devan Pederson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GROVE OKLAHOMA POLICE DEPARTMENT
Represented By: Keith A. Wilkes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SGT. JERRY BOHANNON
Represented By: Keith A. Wilkes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JEFF STOUT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHAEL STEVEN REED
Represented By: Keith A. Wilkes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CITY OF GROVE OK. FIRE DEPT.
Represented By: Keith A. Wilkes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: REUBEN HERNANDEZ
Represented By: Devan Pederson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OKLAHOMA HIGHWAY PATROL, Troop L
Represented By: Devan Pederson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BILL HOBBS
Represented By: Keith A. Wilkes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HAYLEY LNU, Grove Verizon Store Employee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GROVE VERIZON AUTHORIZED RETAILER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, INC.
Represented By: Allison Maynard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?