Universitas Education v. Avon Capital, et al
Petitioner: UNIVERSITAS EDUCATION, LLC
Respondent: AVON CAPITAL, LLC, ASSET SERVICING GROUP, LLC, NOVA GROUP, INC. and SDM HOLDINGS, LLC
Intervenor: AVON CAPITAL, LLC, a Wyoming limited liability company
Receiver: RYAN LEONARD, Esq.
Case Number: 22-6038
Filed: March 2, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
December 21, 2022 Universitas Education v. Avon Capital, et al.
July 13, 2023 Universitas Education v. Avon Capital, et al.

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2022 [10909225] Response filed by Universitas Education, LLC to Appellant's Motion to Stay. Served on 04/27/2022. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required privacy and virus certifications: Yes. [22-6038] TFC [Entered: 04/27/2022 12:37 PM]
April 26, 2022 [10908803] Order filed by Clerk of the Court referring appellant's motion for leave to file a jurisdictional reply brief to the panel of judges that will later be assigned to consider this caseon the merits (no ruling will issue at this time). [ # 10908585-2 ] Served on 04/26/2022. [22-6038] [Entered: 04/26/2022 09:49 AM]
April 25, 2022 [10908585] Motion filed by Appellant SDM Holdings, LLC for leave to file reply to Order of March 11, 2022 regarding jurisdiction of the Court. Served on: 04/25/2022. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required privacy and virus certifications: Yes. [22-6038] JRS [Entered: 04/25/2022 01:45 PM]
April 14, 2022 [10906342] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 04/14/2022. [22-6038] [Entered: 04/14/2022 09:14 AM]
April 13, 2022 [10906031] Order filed by Clerk of the Court referring the jurisdictional issue in the court's 3/11/22 order to the panel of judges that will later be assigned to consider this case on the merits; directing appellant to file an opening brief within 40 days (05/23/2022) of the date of this order; directing any response to the motion for stay be filed within 14 days (04/27/2022) of the date of this order. Served on 04/13/2022. (See the attachment for the order.) [22-6038] [Entered: 04/13/2022 09:19 AM]
April 13, 2022 [10906178] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 04/20/2022 for Carmelita Reeder Shinn. (Text Only - No Attachment) [22-6038] [Entered: 04/13/2022 02:18 PM]
April 8, 2022 [10905238] Appellee/Respondent's jurisdictional memorandum brief filed by Universitas Education, LLC. Served on 04/08/2022. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required privacy and virus certifications: Yes. [22-6038] TFC [Entered: 04/08/2022 11:54 AM]
April 7, 2022 [10904864] Transcript order form filed by Ms. Cassy Kerr and Transcript due 03/11/2022 for Cassy Kerr. Transcript is on file. [22-6038] [Entered: 04/07/2022 08:39 AM]
April 6, 2022 [10904698] Transcript order form letter sent. Transcript order form now due 04/18/2022 for Cassy Kerr. [22-6038] [Entered: 04/06/2022 01:43 PM]
March 25, 2022 [10901806] Minute order filed - Pursuant to the 3/11/22 Order, Appellee's response brief re jurisdiction shall be filed on or before 04/08/2022 for Universitas Education, LLC. (Text Only - No Attachment) [22-6038] [Entered: 03/25/2022 10:09 AM]
March 25, 2022 [10901798] Appellant/Petitioner's jurisdictional memorandum brief filed by SDM Holdings, LLC. Served on 03/25/2022. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required privacy and virus certifications: Yes. [22-6038] JRS [Entered: 03/25/2022 09:59 AM]
March 11, 2022 [10898469] Order filed by Clerk of the Court. Within 14 days, appellant shall file a jurisdictional memorandum brief as set forth in the attached order. (Appellant's memorandum brief due 03/25/2022 for SDM Holdings, LLC.) A response brief shall be filed within 14 days after appellant's memorandum brief is filed. Briefing on the merits is suspended. Consideration of appellant's motion to stay is abated. Served on 03/11/2022. [22-6038] [Entered: 03/11/2022 03:25 PM]
March 4, 2022 [10896763] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Timothy F. Campbell for Universitas Education, LLC and Mr. Joshua Greenhaw for Universitas Education, LLC. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n (parties not listed in document). Served on 03/04/2022. Manner of Service: email [22-6038] [Entered: 03/04/2022 09:37 AM]
March 4, 2022 [10896752] Entry of appearance submitted by Joshua C. Greenhaw and Timothy F. Campbell for Appellee Universitas Education, LLC for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 03/04/2022. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 03/04/2022 by MLB to remove pdf from docket; entry filed on 03/04/22][22-6038] TFC [Entered: 03/04/2022 09:12 AM]
March 3, 2022 [10896598] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Jeffrey R. Sandberg for SDM Holdings, LLC. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 03/03/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-6038] [Entered: 03/03/2022 12:15 PM]
March 3, 2022 [10896596] Entry of appearance submitted by Jeffrey R. Sandberg for Appellant SDM Holdings, LLC for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 03/03/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-6038] --[Edited 03/03/2022 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] JRS [Entered: 03/03/2022 12:06 PM]
March 3, 2022 [10896592] Docketing statement filed by SDM Holdings, LLC. Served on 03/03/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-6038] JRS [Entered: 03/03/2022 11:58 AM]
March 3, 2022 [10896609] Motion filed by Appellant SDM Holdings, LLC for stay of district court order. Served on: 03/03/2022. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required privacy and virus certifications: Yes. [22-6038] JRS [Entered: 03/03/2022 12:42 PM]
March 3, 2022 [10896707] Minute order filed - Transcript order form (12/21/2021 hearing) due 03/17/2022 for Cassy Kerr. (Text Only - No Attachment) [22-6038] [Entered: 03/03/2022 04:25 PM]
March 3, 2022 [10896704] Acknowledgment of transcript order filed by SDM Holdings, LLC. Transcript ordered: Hearing on 12/21/2021. Served on: 03/03/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-6038] JRS [Entered: 03/03/2022 04:17 PM]
March 3, 2022 [10896708] Fee paid. Date paid in District Court on 03/03/2022. Text only entry; no document attached. [22-6038] [Entered: 03/03/2022 04:26 PM]
March 2, 2022 [10896277] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 03/02/2022. Fee is due by 03/16/2022 for SDM Holdings, LLC. Transcript order form and docketing statement due 03/16/2022 for SDM Holdings, LLC. Notice of appearance due on 03/16/2022 for SDM Holdings, LLC and Universitas Education, LLC. [22-6038] [Entered: 03/02/2022 11:02 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Universitas Education v. Avon Capital, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: UNIVERSITAS EDUCATION, LLC
Represented By: Timothy F. Campbell
Represented By: Joshua Greenhaw
Represented By: Joseph L. Manson III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: AVON CAPITAL, LLC
Represented By: Alan L. Rupe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ASSET SERVICING GROUP, LLC
Represented By: Clayton D. Ketter
Represented By: Melvin R. McVay Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: NOVA GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: SDM HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By: Joseph H. Bocock
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Sandberg
Represented By: John Douglas Stiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: AVON CAPITAL, LLC, a Wyoming limited liability company
Represented By: Alan L. Rupe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Receiver: RYAN LEONARD, Esq.
Represented By: Ryan Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?