Moral, et al v. PHH Mortgage Corporation, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: CARLOS E. MORAL and JULIE K. MORAL
Defendant / Appellee: PHH MORTGAGE CORPORATION, OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC and BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON TRUST COMPANY, THE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Case Number: 23-3123
Filed: July 6, 2023
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Real Property Actions

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
June 14, 2024 Moral, et al. v. PHH Mortgage Corporation, et al.

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2023 [11020526] On the court's own motion and pursuant to 10th Cir. R. 33.1, order filed by (CLK) extending time to file appellants brief and appendix until 09/08/2023 for Carlos E. Moral and Julie K. Moral [23-3123] [Entered: 08/11/2023 02:07 PM]
July 25, 2023 [11015937] Notice of Mediation Conference filed by the Tenth Circuit Mediation Office. ZOOMGOV conference scheduled for 08/08/2023 at 10:00 am (MT). The mediation contact form must be completed and returned to the Mediation Office within four days of the date of this notice. [Please open the Notice for important information.] [23-3123] [Entered: 07/25/2023 09:10 AM]
July 20, 2023 [11015015] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 07/27/2023 for Skyler O'Hara, Clerk of Court. (Text Only - No Attachment) [23-3123] [Entered: 07/20/2023 01:33 PM]
July 20, 2023 [11015024] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Randall K. Rathbun and Mr. Dylan Patrick Wheeler for Mr. Carlos E. Moral and Ms. Julie K. Moral. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 07/20/2023. Manner of Service: email. [23-3123] [Entered: 07/20/2023 01:41 PM]
July 20, 2023 [11015089] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 07/20/2023. Appellants' opening brief and appendix due on 08/29/2023 for Carlos E. Moral and Julie K. Moral [23-3123] [Entered: 07/20/2023 03:38 PM]
July 20, 2023 [11015014] Docketing statement filed by Mr. Carlos E. Moral and Ms. Julie K. Moral. Served on 07/20/2023. Manner of Service: email. [23-3123] RKR [Entered: 07/20/2023 01:27 PM]
July 20, 2023 [11015013] Notice received from Mr. Carlos E. Moral and Ms. Julie K. Moral that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. Served on: 07/20/2023. Manner of Service: email [23-3123] RKR [Entered: 07/20/2023 01:26 PM]
July 20, 2023 [11015012] Rule 26 Disclosure Statement filed by Mr. Carlos E. Moral and Ms. Julie K. Moral. More than 50 parties disclosed: no. Served on 07/20/2023. Manner of Service: email. [23-3123] RKR [Entered: 07/20/2023 01:22 PM]
July 20, 2023 [11015009] Entry of appearance submitted by Randall K. Rathbun and Dylan P. Wheeler for Appellants Mr. Carlos E. Moral and Ms. Julie K. Moral for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 07/20/2023. Manner of Service: email. [23-3123] --[Edited 07/20/2023 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] RKR [Entered: 07/20/2023 01:20 PM]
July 19, 2023 [11014570] Entry of appearance submitted by Justin M. Nichols for Appellees PHH Mortgage Corporation and Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 07/19/2023. Manner of Service: email. [23-3123] --[Edited 07/19/2023 by AT to remove PDF as pleading was filed on 7/19/2023.] JN [Entered: 07/19/2023 11:59 AM]
July 19, 2023 [11014572] Rule 26 Disclosure Statement filed by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC and PHH Mortgage Corporation. More than 50 parties disclosed: no. Served on 07/19/2023. Manner of Service: email. [23-3123] JN [Entered: 07/19/2023 12:02 PM]
July 19, 2023 [11014576] Entry of appearance filed by Justin Nichols for Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, and PHH Mortgage Corporation. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 07/19/2023. Manner of Service: email. [23-3123] [Entered: 07/19/2023 12:12 PM]
July 6, 2023 [11010957] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 07/05/2023 Docketing statement, transcript order form, and notice of appearance due 07/20/2023 for Carlos E. Moral and Julie K. Moral. Disclosure and notice of appearance statement due on 07/20/2023 for Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, The National Association, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC and PHH Mortgage Corporation [23-3123] [Entered: 07/06/2023 07:02 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Moral, et al v. PHH Mortgage Corporation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CARLOS E. MORAL
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Represented By: Dylan Patrick Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JULIE K. MORAL
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Represented By: Dylan Patrick Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PHH MORTGAGE CORPORATION
Represented By: Justin Nichols
Represented By: Isaac William Straub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC
Represented By: Isaac William Straub
Represented By: Justin Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON TRUST COMPANY, THE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Justin Nichols
Represented By: Isaac William Straub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?