Rywelski v. Biden, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: JOSEPH MARION RYWELSKI
Defendant / Appellee: JOSEPH R. BIDEN, JR., President, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES ATTORNEY GENERAL MERRICK GARLAND and BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS AND EXPLOSIVES
Case Number: 23-5099
Filed: September 7, 2023
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2023 [11039429] Appellant's opening brief filed by Joseph Marion Rywelski. Original (clerk made 4 copies). Served on 10/20/2023 by US mail. Required 10th Cir. R. 28.2 Attachments Included? n. [23-5099] [Entered: 10/26/2023 12:16 PM]
October 11, 2023 [11036015] Consent to electronic service filed by filed by Joseph Marion Rywelski. Served on 10/06/2023. Manner of Service: US mail. [23-5099] [Entered: 10/12/2023 07:56 AM]
October 11, 2023 [11036014] Entry of appearance filed by Joseph Marion Rywelski. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 10/06/2023. Manner of Service: US mail [23-5099] [Entered: 10/12/2023 07:54 AM]
September 11, 2023 [11027068] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 1, Comments: One volume containing pleadings. [23-5099] [Entered: 09/11/2023 08:15 AM]
September 11, 2023 [11027063] Jurisdictional review complete. Appellant/Petitioner's brief due on 10/23/2023 for Joseph Marion Rywelski. Record on appeal 10th circuit due 10/02/2023 [23-5099] [Entered: 09/11/2023 07:58 AM]
September 7, 2023 [11026669] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 09/07/2023 Notice of appearance due on 10/10/2023 for Joseph Marion Rywelski. [23-5099] [Entered: 09/07/2023 02:07 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Rywelski v. Biden, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOSEPH MARION RYWELSKI
Represented By: Joseph Marion Rywelski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOSEPH R. BIDEN, JR., President
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES ATTORNEY GENERAL MERRICK GARLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS AND EXPLOSIVES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?