Nixon v. Woodman of the World, et al
Plaintiff: TRACY NIXON
Defendant: WOODMAN OF THE WORLD, ASSURED LIFE ASSOCIATION, RICKEY B. FERGUSON and DRASILLA C. FERGUSON
Case Number: 24-1003
Filed: January 4, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Real Property Actions

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
June 17, 2024 Nixon v. Woodman of the World, et al.

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2024 [11066261] Returned mail filed. Addressed To: apet. Reason Returned: attempted - not known, unable to forward. Document Returned: 1/23/24 letter and form. Action Taken: none. [24-1003] [Entered: 02/09/2024 03:19 PM]
January 31, 2024 Opinion or Order [11063470] Order filed by Judge Holmes denying Appellant's motion to appoint attorney filed by Tracy Nixon. Served on 01/31/2024. [24-1003] [Entered: 01/31/2024 09:11 AM]
January 30, 2024 [11063378] Appellant's motion filed by Tracy Nixon to appoint attorney. [24-1003] [Entered: 01/30/2024 04:43 PM]
January 24, 2024 [11061629] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 2, Comments: Vol. 1-pleadings; Vol. 2-sealed pleading. [24-1003] [Entered: 01/24/2024 08:10 AM]
January 23, 2024 [11061429] Jurisdictional review complete. Record on appeal 10th circuit due 02/13/2024. Appellant's brief due on 03/04/2024 for Tracy Nixon [24-1003] [Entered: 01/23/2024 01:02 PM]
January 23, 2024 [11061420] Entry of appearance filed by Tracy Nixon. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on. Manner of Service: [24-1003] [Entered: 01/23/2024 12:49 PM]
January 23, 2024 [11061422] Docketing statement filed by Tracy Nixon. [24-1003] [Entered: 01/23/2024 12:50 PM]
January 23, 2024 [11061424] Appellant's motion filed by Tracy Nixon for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. [24-1003] [Entered: 01/23/2024 12:53 PM]
January 4, 2024 [11056891] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 01/04/2024. Notice of appearance due on 02/05/2024 for Tracy Nixon. Fee or ifp forms due 02/05/2024 for Tracy Nixon. [24-1003] [Entered: 01/04/2024 03:10 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Nixon v. Woodman of the World, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRACY NIXON
Represented By: Tracy Nixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WOODMAN OF THE WORLD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASSURED LIFE ASSOCIATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICKEY B. FERGUSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DRASILLA C. FERGUSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?