Emrit v. Combs, et al
Plaintiff: RONALD SATISH EMRIT
Defendant: SEAN COMBS, AKA P. Diddy, BAD BOY ENTERTAIMENT and ATLANTIC RECORDS
Case Number: 24-5043
Filed: April 9, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury - Product Liability
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2024 [11090986] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 1, Comments: Volume I - Pleadings. [24-5043] [Entered: 05/17/2024 07:35 AM]
May 16, 2024 [11090894] Jurisdictional review complete. Appellant's opening brief, Notice of appearance, and Fee or ifp forms due by 06/25/2024 for Ronald Satish Emrit. Record on appeal 10th circuit due 06/06/2024. [24-5043] [Entered: 05/16/2024 03:04 PM]
April 9, 2024 [11080782] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 04/09/2024 Notice of appearance and feee or ifp forms due 05/09/2024 for Ronald Satish Emrit. [24-5043] [Entered: 04/09/2024 12:41 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Emrit v. Combs, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONALD SATISH EMRIT
Represented By: Ronald Satish Emrit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEAN COMBS, AKA P. Diddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAD BOY ENTERTAIMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATLANTIC RECORDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?