Blankenship, et al v. Stitt, et al
Plaintiff: JOHN HAYDEN BLANKENSHIP, as Co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Andrea Lynn Blankenship, deceased (DC Grady Co. PB-2021-43), HAYLEE BLANKENSHIP, as Co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Andrea Lynn Blankenship, deceased (DC Grady Co. PB-2021-43), DELSIE MAY PYE, individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Leon W Pye; (DC Grady Co. PB-2022-19), TASHA COLLEEN YATES, as next friends of, with Delsie Mae Pye as Personal Representative of the Estate of K.W.R.P (a/k/a Yates)(DC Okla. Co. PB-2022-171) and TARANZO LENARD PYE, as next friends of, with Delsie Mae Pye as Personal Representative of the Estate of K.W.R.P (a/k/a Yates)(DC Okla. Co. PB-2022-17)
Defendant: JOHN KEVIN STITT, STATE OF OKLAHOMA, EX REL. OKLAHOMA PARDON AND PAROLE BOARD, ADAM LUCK, individually and as former Board Member of Pardon and Parole Board, KELLY DOYLE, individually and as former Board Member of Pardon and Parole Board, C. ALLEN MCCALL, individually and as former Board Member of Pardon and Parole Board, LARRY MORRIS, individually and as former Board Member of Pardon and Parole Board, STATE OF OKLAHOMA, EX REL. OKLAHOMA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, SCOTT CROW, as Director of Oklahoma Department of Corrections, ROSS FISHER, as Chief Medical Officer of the Oklahoma Department of Corrections, JANNA MORGAN, as Chief Mental Health Officer of the Oklahoma Department of Corrections, TOM BATES, EDWARD KONIECZNY, SCOTT WILLIAMS, CATHY STOCKER, RICHARD SMOTHERMON, THE OKLAHOMA MENTAL HEALTH COUNCIL, INC., DBA Red Rock Behavioral Health Services, VIVIAN HASBROOK, LAWRENCE PAUL ANDERSON, ROBERT GILLILAND and JOHN OR JANE DOE
Case Number: 24-6053
Filed: March 25, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
January 7, 2025 Blankenship, et al. v. Stitt, et al.

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2024 [11090743] Order filed by Clerk of the Court abating this appeal pending the district courts resolution of ECF No. 91 and further order of this court. Status report due 06/14/2024 by Appellants. See order for details. Served on 05/16/2024. [24-6053] [Entered: 05/16/2024 11:33 AM]
May 15, 2024 [11090553] Appellant's supplemental memorandum brief filed by Haylee Blankenship and John Hayden Blankenship. Served on 05/15/2024. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required privacy and virus certifications: Yes. [24-6053] TDC [Entered: 05/15/2024 04:18 PM]
May 8, 2024 [11088478] Minute order filed - Appellants may file an optional reply to Appellees' jurisdictional briefs by 05/15/2024 for Haylee Blankenship, John Hayden Blankenship, Delsie May Pye, Taranzo Lenard Pye and Tasha Colleen Yates. (Text Only - No Attachment) [24-6053] [Entered: 05/08/2024 10:10 AM]
May 7, 2024 [11088252] Response filed by Kelly Doyle, Adam Luck, Mr. C. Allen McCall, Larry Morris and Oklahoma Pardon and Parole Board, Oklahoma Department of Corrections, Scott Crow, Ross Fisher, Janna Morgan, Tom Bates, Edward Konieczny, Scott Williams, Richard Smothermon and Cathy Stocker, to Appellants' Joint Memorandum Brief on Finality of District Court Ruling. Served on 05/07/2024. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required privacy and virus certifications: Yes. [24-6053] WBP [Entered: 05/07/2024 02:47 PM]
May 7, 2024 [11088198] Appellee/Respondent's jurisdictional memorandum brief filed by John Kevin Stitt. Served on 05/07/2024. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required privacy and virus certifications: Yes. [24-6053] RGM [Entered: 05/07/2024 01:20 PM]
April 23, 2024 [11084249] Order filed by Clerk of the Court directing Appellees to file a response to Appellants joint memorandum brief and this court's April 9, 2024 Order. Response due on 05/07/2024 for Scott Crow, Kelly Doyle, Ross Fisher, Adam Luck, C. Allen McCall, Janna Morgan, Larry Morris, Oklahoma Department of Corrections, Oklahoma Pardon and Parole Board and John Kevin Stitt. Served on 04/23/2024. [24-6053] [Entered: 04/23/2024 02:25 PM]
April 23, 2024 [11084204] Appellant/Petitioner's jurisdictional memorandum brief filed by Haylee Blankenship and John Hayden Blankenship. Served on 04/23/2024. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required privacy and virus certifications: Yes. [24-6053] TDC [Entered: 04/23/2024 12:50 PM]
April 9, 2024 [11080696] Order filed by Clerk of the Court. Appellants' memorandum brief due 04/23/2024 for Haylee Blankenship, John Hayden Blankenship, Delsie May Pye, Taranzo Lenard Pye and Tasha Colleen Yates. Briefing on the merits is suspended pending further order of this court. Please see Order for additional information. Served on 04/09/2024. [24-6053]--[Edited 04/11/2024 by ART to correct text to reflect the correct date due for the memorandum brief] [Entered: 04/09/2024 10:48 AM]
April 9, 2024 [11080687] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 04/09/2024. [24-6053] [Entered: 04/09/2024 10:42 AM]
April 9, 2024 [11080559] Fee paid. Date paid in District Court on 04/09/2024. [24-6053] [Entered: 04/09/2024 08:34 AM]
April 9, 2024 [11080552] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 04/16/2024 for Carmelita Reeder Shinn. (Text Only - No Attachment) [24-6053] [Entered: 04/09/2024 08:22 AM]
April 8, 2024 [11080517] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Timothy D. Cain for John Hayden Blankenship and Haylee Blankenship. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 04/08/2024. Manner of Service: email [24-6053] [Entered: 04/08/2024 05:02 PM]
April 8, 2024 [11080524] Rule 26 Disclosure Statement filed by Delsie May Pye, Taranzo Lenard Pye and Tasha Colleen Yates. More than 50 parties disclosed: no. Served on 04/08/2024. Manner of Service: email. [24-6053] RJW [Entered: 04/08/2024 05:42 PM]
April 8, 2024 [11080520] Notice received from Haylee Blankenship and John Hayden Blankenship that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. Served on: 04/08/2024. Manner of Service: email. [24-6053]--[Edited 04/09/2024 by ART to correct event and text] TDC [Entered: 04/08/2024 05:09 PM]
April 8, 2024 [11080519] Rule 26 Disclosure Statement filed by Haylee Blankenship and John Hayden Blankenship. More than 50 parties disclosed: no. Served on 04/08/2024. Manner of Service: email. [24-6053] TDC [Entered: 04/08/2024 05:06 PM]
April 8, 2024 [11080514] Docketing statement filed by Haylee Blankenship and John Hayden Blankenship. Served on 04/08/2024. Manner of Service: email. [24-6053] TDC [Entered: 04/08/2024 04:57 PM]
April 8, 2024 [11080513] Entry of appearance submitted by Tim D. Cain for Appellants Haylee Blankenship and John Hayden Blankenship for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 04/08/2024. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 04/08/2024 by MLB to remove pdf from docket; entry filed on 04/08/24][24-6053] TDC [Entered: 04/08/2024 04:55 PM]
April 8, 2024 [11080499] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Robert J. Wagner for Delsie May Pye, Tasha Colleen Yates and Taranzo Lenard Pye. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 04/08/2024. Manner of Service: email [24-6053] [Entered: 04/08/2024 04:22 PM]
April 8, 2024 [11080491] Entry of appearance submitted by Robert J Wagner for Appellants Delsie May Pye, Taranzo Lenard Pye and Tasha Colleen Yates for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 04/08/2024. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 04/08/2024 by MLB to remove pdf from docket; entry filed on 04/08/24][24-6053] RJW [Entered: 04/08/2024 04:15 PM]
April 8, 2024 [11080490] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Alison B. Levine and Mr. Wellon B. Poe, Jr. for Larry Morris, Oklahoma Pardon and Parole Board, Mr. C. Allen McCall, Adam Luck and Kelly Doyle. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 04/08/2024. Manner of Service: email [24-6053] [Entered: 04/08/2024 04:14 PM]
April 8, 2024 [11080482] Entry of appearance submitted by Wellon B. Poe and Alison B. Levine for Appellees Kelly Doyle, Adam Luck, Mr. C. Allen McCall, Larry Morris and Oklahoma Pardon and Parole Board for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 04/08/2024. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 04/08/2024 by MLB to remove pdf from docket; entry filed on 04/08/24][24-6053] WBP [Entered: 04/08/2024 04:09 PM]
April 8, 2024 [11080459] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Dan L. Holloway for Delsie May Pye, Tasha Colleen Yates and Taranzo Lenard Pye. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 04/08/2024. Manner of Service: email [24-6053] [Entered: 04/08/2024 03:30 PM]
April 8, 2024 [11080418] Entry of appearance submitted by Dan Louise Holloway for Appellants Delsie May Pye, Taranzo Lenard Pye and Tasha Colleen Yates for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 04/08/2024. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 04/08/2024 by MLB to remove pdf from docket; entry filed on 04/08/24][24-6053] DLH [Entered: 04/08/2024 02:40 PM]
April 8, 2024 [11080177] Entry of appearance filed by Gerard Michael D'Emilio and Robert G. McCampbell for John Kevin Stitt. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 04/05/2024, 04/08/2024. Manner of Service: email [24-6053] [Entered: 04/08/2024 07:36 AM]
April 5, 2024 [11079919] Entry of appearance submitted by Kevin L. McClure for Appellees Mr. Scott Crow, Ross Fisher, Oklahoma Department of Corrections and Ms. Janna Morgan for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 04/05/2024. Manner of Service: email. [24-6053]--[Edited 04/05/2024 by ART to remove pdf as pleading was filed on 04/05/2024] KLM [Entered: 04/05/2024 11:06 AM]
April 5, 2024 [11080124] Entry of appearance submitted by Gerard M. D'Emilio, Robert G. McCampbell for Appellee John Kevin Stitt for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 04/05/2024. Manner of Service: email. [24-6053]--[Edited 04/08/2024 by ART to add filer]--[Edited 04/08/2024 by ART to remove pdf as pleading was filed on 04/08/2024] GMD [Entered: 04/05/2024 04:01 PM]
April 5, 2024 This entry has been removed from the docket as this is duplicate filing. [ART] [11080122] Entry of appearance submitted by Robert G. McCampbell, Gerard M. D'Emilio for Appellee John Kevin Stitt for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 04/05/2024. Manner of Service: email. [24-6053]--[Edited 04/08/2024 by ART to add filer] RGM [Entered: 04/05/2024 03:58 PM]
April 5, 2024 [11080016] Entry of appearance filed by Katie Ann Wilmes for Oklahoma Department of Corrections, Ms. Janna Morgan, Mr. Scott Crow and Ross Fisher. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 04/05/2024. Manner of Service: email [24-6053] [Entered: 04/05/2024 01:30 PM]
April 5, 2024 [11080012] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Kevin L. McClure for Oklahoma Department of Corrections, Ms. Janna Morgan, Mr. Scott Crow and Ross Fisher. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 04/05/2024. Manner of Service: email [24-6053] [Entered: 04/05/2024 01:26 PM]
April 5, 2024 [11079931] Entry of appearance submitted by Katie A. Wilmes for Appellees Oklahoma Department of Corrections, Mr. Scott Crow, Ross Fisher and Ms. Janna Morgan for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 04/05/2024. Manner of Service: email. [24-6053]--[Edited 04/05/2024 by ART to remove pdf as pleading was filed on 04/05/2024] KAW [Entered: 04/05/2024 11:22 AM]
March 25, 2024 [11076820] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 03/25/2024 Docketing statement, notice of appearance and transcript order form due 04/08/2024 for Haylee Blankenship, John Hayden Blankenship, Delsie May Pye, Taranzo Lenard Pye and Tasha Colleen Yates. Notice of appearance due on 04/08/2024 for Scott Crow, Kelly Doyle, Ross Fisher, Adam Luck, C. Allen McCall, Janna Morgan, Larry Morris, Oklahoma Department of Corrections, Oklahoma Pardon and Parole Board and John Kevin Stitt [24-6053] [Entered: 03/25/2024 12:25 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Blankenship, et al v. Stitt, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN HAYDEN BLANKENSHIP, as Co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Andrea Lynn Blankenship, deceased (DC Grady Co. PB-2021-43)
Represented By: Timothy D. Cain
Represented By: David B. Larimore
Represented By: Robert J. Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HAYLEE BLANKENSHIP, as Co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Andrea Lynn Blankenship, deceased (DC Grady Co. PB-2021-43)
Represented By: Timothy D. Cain
Represented By: David B. Larimore
Represented By: Robert J. Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DELSIE MAY PYE, individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Leon W Pye; (DC Grady Co. PB-2022-19)
Represented By: Kenyatta R. Bethea
Represented By: Timothy D. Cain
Represented By: Jon J. Gores
Represented By: Dan L. Holloway
Represented By: Robert J. Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TASHA COLLEEN YATES, as next friends of, with Delsie Mae Pye as Personal Representative of the Estate of K.W.R.P (a/k/a Yates)(DC Okla. Co. PB-2022-171)
Represented By: Kenyatta R. Bethea
Represented By: Timothy D. Cain
Represented By: Jon J. Gores
Represented By: Dan L. Holloway
Represented By: Robert J. Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TARANZO LENARD PYE, as next friends of, with Delsie Mae Pye as Personal Representative of the Estate of K.W.R.P (a/k/a Yates)(DC Okla. Co. PB-2022-17)
Represented By: Kenyatta R. Bethea
Represented By: Timothy D. Cain
Represented By: Jon J. Gores
Represented By: Dan L. Holloway
Represented By: Robert J. Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN KEVIN STITT
Represented By: Gerard Michael D'Emilio
Represented By: Robert G. McCampbell
Represented By: Trevor S. Pemberton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF OKLAHOMA, EX REL. OKLAHOMA PARDON AND PAROLE BOARD
Represented By: Alison B. Levine
Represented By: Wellon B. Poe Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADAM LUCK, individually and as former Board Member of Pardon and Parole Board
Represented By: Alison B. Levine
Represented By: Wellon B. Poe Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KELLY DOYLE, individually and as former Board Member of Pardon and Parole Board
Represented By: Alison B. Levine
Represented By: Wellon B. Poe Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. ALLEN MCCALL, individually and as former Board Member of Pardon and Parole Board
Represented By: Alison B. Levine
Represented By: Wellon B. Poe Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LARRY MORRIS, individually and as former Board Member of Pardon and Parole Board
Represented By: Alison B. Levine
Represented By: Wellon B. Poe Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF OKLAHOMA, EX REL. OKLAHOMA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Represented By: Kevin L. McClure
Represented By: Katie Ann Wilmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT CROW, as Director of Oklahoma Department of Corrections
Represented By: Kevin L. McClure
Represented By: Katie Ann Wilmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROSS FISHER, as Chief Medical Officer of the Oklahoma Department of Corrections
Represented By: Kevin L. McClure
Represented By: Katie Ann Wilmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANNA MORGAN, as Chief Mental Health Officer of the Oklahoma Department of Corrections
Represented By: Kevin L. McClure
Represented By: Katie Ann Wilmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOM BATES
Represented By: Tracy Ella Neel
Represented By: Devan Pederson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDWARD KONIECZNY
Represented By: Tracy Ella Neel
Represented By: Devan Pederson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT WILLIAMS
Represented By: Tracy Ella Neel
Represented By: Devan Pederson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CATHY STOCKER
Represented By: Tracy Ella Neel
Represented By: Devan Pederson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD SMOTHERMON
Represented By: Tracy Ella Neel
Represented By: Devan Pederson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE OKLAHOMA MENTAL HEALTH COUNCIL, INC., DBA Red Rock Behavioral Health Services
Represented By: Anita K. Anthony
Represented By: Steve E. Holden
Represented By: Caleb Shane McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIVIAN HASBROOK
Represented By: Caleb Shane McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAWRENCE PAUL ANDERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT GILLILAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN OR JANE DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?