Warren Senior, Jr. v. State of Florida, et al Featured Case
Plaintiff - Appellant: WARREN R. SENIOR, JR.
Defendant - Appellee: STATE OF FLORIDA, ORANGE COUNTY, CITY OF ORLANDO, ORANGE COUNTY LIBRARY SYSTEM and ORANGE COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Case Number: 10-11390
Filed: March 29, 2010
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2010 Filing 6 ENTRY OF DISMISSAL: Pursuant to the 11th Cir.R.42-1(b), this appeal is DISMISSED for want of prosecution because the appellant Warren R. Senior, Jr. failed to pay the filing and docketing fees to the district court, or alternatively, file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis in the district court within the time fixed by the rules
May 20, 2010 Filing 5 This APPELLANT has been notified that upon expiration of fourteen (14) days from this date, this appeal will be dismissed by the clerk without further notice unless the required filing fee has been received in District Court.
April 14, 2010 Filing 4 USDC order denying IFP as to Appellant Warren R. Senior, Jr. was filed on 04/08/2010. Docket Entry 37.
March 31, 2010 Report and Recommendation for dismissal of IFP motion as to Appellant Warren R. Senior, Jr. was filed on 03/26/2010. Docket Entry 35.
March 31, 2010 The Transcript Order Form has not been filed as to Appellant Warren R. Senior, Jr.. There are no hearings to be transcribed.
March 29, 2010 Filing 1 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Warren R. Senior, Jr. on 03/24/2010. USDC motion pending: MOTION for leave to appeal in forma pauperis, DE#34 filed on 03/24/2010. Fee Status: IFP Pending.

Search for this case: Warren Senior, Jr. v. State of Florida, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: WARREN R. SENIOR, JR.
Represented By: Warren R. Senior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: STATE OF FLORIDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: ORANGE COUNTY
Represented By: William C. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: CITY OF ORLANDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: ORANGE COUNTY LIBRARY SYSTEM
Represented By: William C. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: ORANGE COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Represented By: William C. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?