Taylor Investment Partners II,, et al v. Moe's Southwest Grill, LLC, et al
Defendant / Appellee: RAVING BRANDS, INC., H. MARTIN SPROCK, III, MOE'S SOUTHWEST GRILL, LLC, CORPORATE JOHN DOE'S X, Y, Z and RAVING BRAND HOLDINGS, INC.
Plaintiff / Appellant: TIP II ANSLEY, LLC, TIP II-SUBURBAN, LLC and TAYLOR INVESTMENT PARTNERS II, LLC
Case Number: 15-15759
Filed: December 23, 2015
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2017 Mandate issued as to Appellants Barco Grills, LLC, CCM Restaurants, LLC, Robert Dreesch, Brad Dunning, Steven Egan-Fowler, Neil Griffeth, Gryphmore Foodservices of Kentucky, Inc., JFM Restaurants, LLC, JSW Cascade, LLC, JSW Embry Village, LLC, Moe's Chattanooga, LLC, Elizabeth M Orgera, Ray Orgera, Parde Roswell, LLC, Parde, LLC, Rounding Third, LLC, SMI Restaurants, LLC, TIP II Ansley, LLC, TIP II-Suburban, LLC, Taylor Investment Partners II, LLC and Edward Tronis in 15-14872, Appellants TIP II Ansley, LLC, TIP II-Suburban, LLC and Taylor Investment Partners II, LLC in 15-15759. [15-14872, 15-15759] [Entered: 01/12/2017 10:03 AM]
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER: Petition for panel rehearing only filed by Appellees H. Martin Sprock, III, Raving Brands, Inc., Moe's Southwest Grill, LLC and Raving Brand Holdings, Inc. is DENIED. [8002780-1] [Entered: 01/04/2017 12:47 PM]
December 7, 2016 Received paper copies of E-PFR filed by Appellees Moe's Southwest Grill, LLC, Raving Brand Holdings, Inc, Raving Brands, Inc and H Martin Sprock, III in 15-14872. [15-14872, 15-15759] [Entered: 12/08/2016 11:49 AM]
December 6, 2016 Petition for panel rehearing only filed by Appellees Moe's Southwest Grill, LLC, Raving Brand Holdings, Inc., Raving Brands, Inc. and H. Martin Sprock, III. [Entered: 12/08/2016 11:47 AM]
November 15, 2016 Opinion issued by court as to Appellant Barco Grills, LLC, et al. in 15-14872, Appellant TIP II Ansley, LLC, et al. in 15-15759. Decision: Affirmed in part and Reversed in part. Opinion type: Non-Published. Opinion method: Per Curiam. The opinion is also available through the Court's Opinions page at this link # http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/opinions . [15-14872, 15-15759] [Entered: 11/15/2016 03:33 PM]
November 15, 2016 Judgment entered as to Appellant Barco Grills, LLC, et al. in 15-14872, Appellant TIP II Ansley, LLC, et al. in 15-15759. [15-14872, 15-15759] [Entered: 11/15/2016 03:39 PM]
September 20, 2016 Oral Argument CD sent to Elliot Daniel Morrison (by FedEx env he provided) for Rounding Third, LLC, Moe's Chattanooga, LLC, Barco Grills, LLC, Ray Orgera, Elizabeth M Orgera, Parde Roswell, LLC, Parde, LLC, JSW Embry Village, LLC, JSW Cascade, LLC, TIP II Ansley, LLC, TIP II-Suburban, LLC, CCM Restaurants, LLC, JFM Restaurants, LLC, SMI Restaurants, LLC, Gryphmore Foodservices of Kentucky, Inc., Neil Griffeth, Steven Egan-Fowler, Robert Dreesch and Brad Dunning in 15-14872. [15-14872, 15-15759] [Entered: 09/20/2016 02:10 PM]
September 20, 2016 Oral argument CD requested by Elliot Daniel Morrison for Taylor Investment Partners II, LLC, TIP II Ansley, LLC and TIP II-Suburban, LLC in 15-15759. [15-14872, 15-15759] [Entered: 09/20/2016 01:42 PM]
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER: After hearing oral argument in thes consolidated appeals, the Court is of the opnion that the case can and should be settled. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 33 and Eleventh Circuit Rule 33-1, the case is referred to the Kinnard Mediation Center for mediation. All provisions of Eleventh Circuit Rule 33-1(c), (d), (f) & (g) apply to the mediation. The parties and their counsel are directed to telephone the mediators at (404) 335-6260 in order to schedule and complete mediation in this matter no later than October 7, 2016. The Court will not enter any decision in the consolidated appeals until the expiration of the deadline, unless it is advised by the mediators before then that there will be not settlement. (RSR, JEC and UU) [15-14872, 15-15759] [Entered: 09/16/2016 11:52 AM]
September 14, 2016 Oral argument held. Oral Argument participants were Elliot Daniel Morrison for Appellants Rounding Third, LLC, Moe's Chattanooga, LLC, Barco Grills, LLC, Ray Orgera, Elizabeth M Orgera, Parde Roswell, LLC, Parde, LLC, JSW Embry Village, LLC, JSW Cascade, LLC, TIP II Ansley, LLC, TIP II-Suburban, LLC, CCM Restaurants, LLC, JFM Restaurants, LLC, SMI Restaurants, LLC, Gryphmore Foodservices of Kentucky, Inc., Neil Griffeth, Steven Egan-Fowler, Robert Dreesch and Brad Dunning and Steven G. Hill for Appellees Moe's Southwest Grill, LLC, Raving Brand Holdings, Inc, Raving Brands, Inc, H Martin Sprock, III and Corporate John Does X,Y,Z in 15-14872. [15-14872, 15-15759] [Entered: 09/14/2016 11:56 AM]
July 22, 2016 Calendar issued as to cases to be orally argued the week of 09/12/2016 in Atlanta, Georgia. Counsel are directed to electronically acknowledge receipt of this calendar by docketing the Calendar Receipt Acknowledged event in ECF. Counsel must be logged into CM/ECF in order to view the attached calendar. [15-14872, 15-15759] [Entered: 07/22/2016 09:13 AM]
July 22, 2016 Oral argument scheduled. Argument Date: Wednesday, 09/14/2016 Argument Location: Atlanta. [15-14872, 15-15759] [Entered: 07/22/2016 11:39 AM]
July 22, 2016 Attorney Elliot Daniel Morrison for Appellants Rounding Third, LLC, Moe's Chattanooga, LLC, Barco Grills, LLC, Ray Orgera, Elizabeth M Orgera, Parde Roswell, LLC, Parde, LLC, JSW Embry Village, LLC, JSW Cascade, LLC, TIP II Ansley, LLC, TIP II-Suburban, LLC, CCM Restaurants, LLC, JFM Restaurants, LLC, SMI Restaurants, LLC, Gryphmore Foodservices of Kentucky, Inc., Neil Griffeth, Steven Egan-Fowler, Robert Dreesch and Brad Dunning in 15-14872, Attorney Elliot Daniel Morrison for Appellants Taylor Investment Partners II, LLC, TIP II Ansley, LLC and TIP II-Suburban, LLC in 15-15759 hereby acknowledges receipt of a copy of the printed calendar for 9/14/2016. Elliot D. Morrison 216-861-7353 will present argument. [15-14872, 15-15759]--[Edited 07/25/2016 by JLT] (ECF: Elliot Morrison) [Entered: 07/22/2016 01:29 PM]
July 1, 2016 Additional copies of Appendix (3 sets - 4 vols ea) received from Steven G. Hill for Moe's Southwest Grill, LLC, Raving Brand Holdings, Inc, Raving Brands, Inc, H Martin Sprock, III and Corporate John Does X,Y,Z in 15-14872 and forwarded to the record room. [15-14872, 15-15759] [Entered: 07/01/2016 11:34 AM]
June 29, 2016 Notice of withdrawal and substitution of counsel filed by Attorney Scott Korzenowski for Appellants Taylor Investment Partners II, LLC, TIP II Ansley, LLC and TIP II-Suburban, LLC. (ECF: Scott Korzenowski) [Entered: 06/29/2016 03:09 PM]
June 28, 2016 The Court has determined that oral argument will be necessary in this case. Please forward 3 additional copies of the 4 volumes of Supplemental Appendix filed 5/19/16 by Attorney Steven G. Hill for Appellees Moe's Southwest Grill, LLC, Raving Brand Holdings, Inc, Raving Brands, Inc, H Martin Sprock, III and Corporate John Does X,Y,Z in 15-14872 to the Clerk's Office, Attention: Jenifer Tubbs. Your prompt attention to this matter is appreciated. [15-14872, 15-15759] [Entered: 06/28/2016 11:41 AM]
June 28, 2016 The Court has determined that oral argument will be necessary in this case. Please forward 3 additional copies of the 12 volumes of Appendix filed 4/6/16 by Attorney Scott Korzenowski for Appellants Rounding Third, LLC, Taylor Investment Partners II, LLC, Moe's Chattanooga, LLC, Barco Grills, LLC, Ray Orgera, Elizabeth M Orgera, Edward Tronis, Parde Roswell, LLC, Parde, LLC, JSW Embry Village, LLC, JSW Cascade, LLC, TIP II Ansley, LLC, TIP II-Suburban, LLC, CCM Restaurants, LLC, JFM Restaurants, LLC, SMI Restaurants, LLC, Gryphmore Foodservices of Kentucky, Inc., Neil Griffeth, Steven Egan-Fowler, Robert Dreesch and Brad Dunning in 15-14872 to the Clerk's Office, Attention: Jenifer Tubbs. Your prompt attention to this matter is appreciated. [15-14872, 15-15759] [Entered: 06/28/2016 11:40 AM]
June 28, 2016 Assigned to tentative calendar number 30 in Atlanta during the week of September 12, 2016. Counsel must be logged into CM/ECF in order to view the attached calendar. [15-14872, 15-15759] [Entered: 06/28/2016 02:09 PM]
June 20, 2016 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Appellants TIP II Ansley, LLC, TIP II-Suburban, LLC and Taylor Investment Partners II, LLC. [Entered: 06/22/2016 08:47 AM]
June 16, 2016 Added Attorney Elliot Daniel Morrison for Appellant Taylor Investment Partners II, LLC Appellant TIP II Ansley, LLC Appellant TIP II-Suburban, LLC, in case 15-15759 Attorney(s) Elliot Daniel Morrison for party(s) Appellant Gryphmore Foodservices of Kentucky, Inc. Appellant Parde Roswell, LLC Appellant Parde, LLC Appellant TIP II Ansley, LLC Appellant Rounding Third, LLC Appellant Neil Griffeth Appellant Ray Orgera Appellant JFM Restaurants, LLC Appellant Robert Dreesch Appellant Brad Dunning Appellant CCM Restaurants, LLC Appellant SMI Restaurants, LLC Appellant Barco Grills, LLC Appellant JSW Embry Village, LLC Appellant JSW Cascade, LLC Appellant Moe's Chattanooga, LLC Appellant Elizabeth M Orgera Appellant Steven Egan-Fowler Appellant TIP II-Suburban, LLC, in case 15-14872. [15-14872, 15-15759] [Entered: 06/16/2016 03:02 PM]
June 16, 2016 E-filed Appearance of Counsel processed for Attorney Elliot Daniel Morrison for Appellant TIP II-Suburban, LLC in 15-14872, Attorney Elliot Daniel Morrison for Appellant TIP II Ansley, LLC in 15-14872, Attorney Elliot Daniel Morrison for Appellant SMI Restaurants, LLC in 15-14872, Attorney Elliot Daniel Morrison for Appellant Rounding Third, LLC in 15-14872, Attorney Elliot Daniel Morrison for Appellant Parde, LLC in 15-14872, Attorney Elliot Daniel Morrison for Appellant Parde Roswell, LLC in 15-14872, Attorney Elliot Daniel Morrison for Appellant Ray Orgera in 15-14872, Attorney Elliot Daniel Morrison for Appellant Elizabeth M Orgera in 15-14872, Attorney Elliot Daniel Morrison for Appellant Moe's Chattanooga, LLC in 15-14872, Attorney Elliot Daniel Morrison for Appellant JSW Embry Village, LLC in 15-14872, Attorney Elliot Daniel Morrison for Appellant JSW Cascade, LLC in 15-14872, Attorney Elliot Daniel Morrison for Appellant JFM Restaurants, LLC in 15-14872, Attorney Elliot Daniel Morrison for Appellant Gryphmore Foodservices of Kentucky, Inc. in 15-14872, Attorney Elliot Daniel Morrison for Appellant Neil Griffeth in 15-14872, Attorney Elliot Daniel Morrison for Appellant Steven Egan-Fowler in 15-14872, Attorney Elliot Daniel Morrison for Appellant Brad Dunning in 15-14872, Attorney Elliot Daniel Morrison for Appellant Robert Dreesch in 15-14872, Attorney Elliot Daniel Morrison for Appellant Barco Grills, LLC in 15-14872. [15-14872, 15-15759] [Entered: 06/16/2016 03:07 PM]
June 16, 2016 Added Attorney Thomas D. Warren for Appellant Taylor Investment Partners II, LLC Appellant TIP II Ansley, LLC Appellant TIP II-Suburban, LLC, in case 15-15759 Attorney(s) Thomas D. Warren for party(s) Appellant Gryphmore Foodservices of Kentucky, Inc. Appellant Parde Roswell, LLC Appellant Parde, LLC Appellant Taylor Investment Partners II, LLC Appellant TIP II Ansley, LLC Appellant Rounding Third, LLC Appellant Neil Griffeth Appellant Ray Orgera Appellant JFM Restaurants, LLC Appellant Robert Dreesch Appellant Brad Dunning Appellant Edward Tronis Appellant CCM Restaurants, LLC Appellant SMI Restaurants, LLC Appellant Barco Grills, LLC Appellant JSW Embry Village, LLC Appellant JSW Cascade, LLC Appellant Moe's Chattanooga, LLC Appellant Elizabeth M Orgera Appellant Steven Egan-Fowler Appellant TIP II-Suburban, LLC, in case 15-14872. [15-14872, 15-15759] [Entered: 06/16/2016 03:09 PM]
June 16, 2016 Added Attorney Katrina M. Quicker for Appellant Taylor Investment Partners II, LLC Appellant TIP II Ansley, LLC Appellant TIP II-Suburban, LLC, in case 15-15759 Attorney(s) Katrina M. Quicker for party(s) Appellant Gryphmore Foodservices of Kentucky, Inc. Appellant Parde Roswell, LLC Appellant Parde, LLC Appellant Taylor Investment Partners II, LLC Appellant TIP II Ansley, LLC Appellant Rounding Third, LLC Appellant Neil Griffeth Appellant Ray Orgera Appellant JFM Restaurants, LLC Appellant Robert Dreesch Appellant Brad Dunning Appellant Edward Tronis Appellant CCM Restaurants, LLC Appellant SMI Restaurants, LLC Appellant Barco Grills, LLC Appellant JSW Embry Village, LLC Appellant JSW Cascade, LLC Appellant Moe's Chattanooga, LLC Appellant Elizabeth M Orgera Appellant Steven Egan-Fowler Appellant TIP II-Suburban, LLC, in case 15-14872. [15-14872, 15-15759] [Entered: 06/16/2016 03:26 PM]
June 16, 2016 E-filed Appearance of Counsel processed for Attorney Thomas D. Warren for Appellant Edward Tronis in 15-14872, Attorney Thomas D. Warren for Appellant Taylor Investment Partners II, LLC in 15-14872, Attorney Thomas D. Warren for Appellant TIP II-Suburban, LLC in 15-14872, Attorney Thomas D. Warren for Appellant TIP II Ansley, LLC in 15-14872, Attorney Thomas D. Warren for Appellant SMI Restaurants, LLC in 15-14872, Attorney Thomas D. Warren for Appellant Rounding Third, LLC in 15-14872, Attorney Thomas D. Warren for Appellant Parde, LLC in 15-14872, Attorney Thomas D. Warren for Appellant Parde Roswell, LLC in 15-14872, Attorney Thomas D. Warren for Appellant Ray Orgera in 15-14872, Attorney Thomas D. Warren for Appellant Elizabeth M Orgera in 15-14872, Attorney Thomas D. Warren for Appellant Moe's Chattanooga, LLC in 15-14872, Attorney Thomas D. Warren for Appellant JSW Embry Village, LLC in 15-14872, Attorney Thomas D. Warren for Appellant JSW Cascade, LLC in 15-14872, Attorney Thomas D. Warren for Appellant JFM Restaurants, LLC in 15-14872, Attorney Thomas D. Warren for Appellant Gryphmore Foodservices of Kentucky, Inc. in 15-14872, Attorney Thomas D. Warren for Appellant Neil Griffeth in 15-14872, Attorney Thomas D. Warren for Appellant Steven Egan-Fowler in 15-14872, Attorney Thomas D. Warren for Appellant Brad Dunning in 15-14872, Attorney Thomas D. Warren for Appellant Robert Dreesch in 15-14872, Attorney Thomas D. Warren for Appellant CCM Restaurants, LLC in 15-14872, Attorney Thomas D. Warren for Appellant Barco Grills, LLC in 15-14872. [15-14872, 15-15759] [Entered: 06/16/2016 03:11 PM]
June 16, 2016 E-filed Appearance of Counsel processed for Attorney Katrina M. Quicker for Appellant Edward Tronis in 15-14872, Attorney Katrina M. Quicker for Appellant Taylor Investment Partners II, LLC in 15-14872, Attorney Katrina M. Quicker for Appellant TIP II-Suburban, LLC in 15-14872, Attorney Katrina M. Quicker for Appellant TIP II Ansley, LLC in 15-14872, Attorney Katrina M. Quicker for Appellant SMI Restaurants, LLC in 15-14872, Attorney Katrina M. Quicker for Appellant Rounding Third, LLC in 15-14872, Attorney Katrina M. Quicker for Appellant Parde, LLC in 15-14872, Attorney Katrina M. Quicker for Appellant Parde Roswell, LLC in 15-14872, Attorney Katrina M. Quicker for Appellant Ray Orgera in 15-14872, Attorney Katrina M. Quicker for Appellant Elizabeth M Orgera in 15-14872, Attorney Katrina M. Quicker for Appellant Moe's Chattanooga, LLC in 15-14872, Attorney Katrina M. Quicker for Appellant JSW Embry Village, LLC in 15-14872, Attorney Katrina M. Quicker for Appellant JSW Cascade, LLC in 15-14872, Attorney Katrina M. Quicker for Appellant JFM Restaurants, LLC in 15-14872, Attorney Katrina M. Quicker for Appellant Gryphmore Foodservices of Kentucky, Inc. in 15-14872, Attorney Katrina M. Quicker for Appellant Neil Griffeth in 15-14872, Attorney Katrina M. Quicker for Appellant Steven Egan-Fowler in 15-14872, Attorney Katrina M. Quicker for Appellant Brad Dunning in 15-14872, Attorney Katrina M. Quicker for Appellant Robert Dreesch in 15-14872, Attorney Katrina M. Quicker for Appellant CCM Restaurants, LLC in 15-14872, Attorney Katrina M. Quicker for Appellant Barco Grills, LLC in 15-14872. [15-14872, 15-15759] [Entered: 06/16/2016 03:28 PM]
May 20, 2016 Received paper copies of EAppendix filed by Appellees Corporate John Doe's X, Y, Z, Moe's Southwest Grill, LLC, Raving Brand Holdings, Inc., Raving Brands, Inc. and H. Martin Sprock, III. 4 VOLUMES - 2 SETS [Entered: 05/20/2016 01:59 PM]
May 19, 2016 Supplemental Appendix [4 VOLUMES] filed by Appellees Corporate John Does X,Y,Z, Moe's Southwest Grill, LLC, Raving Brand Holdings, Inc, Raving Brands, Inc and H Martin Sprock, III in 15-14872, Appellees Corporate John Doe's X, Y, Z, Moe's Southwest Grill, LLC, Raving Brand Holdings, Inc., Raving Brands, Inc. and H. Martin Sprock, III in 15-15759. [15-14872, 15-15759] (ECF: Steven Hill) [Entered: 05/19/2016 11:07 AM]
May 17, 2016 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Appellees Corporate John Does X,Y,Z, Moe's Southwest Grill, LLC, Raving Brand Holdings, Inc and H Martin Sprock, III in 15-14872, Appellees Moe's Southwest Grill, LLC, Raving Brand Holdings, Inc. and H. Martin Sprock, III in 15-15759. [15-14872, 15-15759] [Entered: 05/17/2016 04:00 PM]
April 7, 2016 Received paper copies of EAppendix filed by Appellants Barco Grills, LLC, CCM Restaurants, LLC, Robert Dreesch, Brad Dunning, Steven Egan-Fowler, Neil Griffeth, Gryphmore Foodservices of Kentucky, Inc., JFM Restaurants, LLC, JSW Cascade, LLC, JSW Embry Village, LLC, Moe's Chattanooga, LLC, Elizabeth M Orgera, Ray Orgera, Parde Roswell, LLC, Parde, LLC, Rounding Third, LLC, SMI Restaurants, LLC, TIP II Ansley, LLC, TIP II-Suburban, LLC, Taylor Investment Partners II, LLC and Edward Tronis in 15-14872. 12 VOLUMES - 2 SETS [15-14872, 15-15759] [Entered: 04/12/2016 07:47 AM]
April 6, 2016 Corrected Appellants' brief filed. Service date: 03/30/2016 by CM/ECF to Attorneys for Appellees: Decker, Frye, Hill. [15-14872, 15-15759] [Entered: 04/06/2016 10:14 AM]
April 6, 2016 Over the phone extension granted by clerk. Appellees' Brief due on 05/16/2016. [15-14872, 15-15759] [Entered: 04/06/2016 04:24 PM]
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER: "Plaintiffs-Appellants' Unopposed Motion to Amend Brief" is GRANTED. (AGW) [ # 7743817-2 ] [15-14872, 15-15759] [Entered: 04/06/2016 10:08 AM]
April 5, 2016 MOTION to file amended brief filed by TIP II Ansley, LLC, TIP II-Suburban, LLC and Taylor Investment Partners II, LLC. Motion is Unopposed. [7743817-1] --[Edited 04/05/2016 by JC] (ECF: Scott Korzenowski) [Entered: 04/05/2016 04:51 PM]
March 31, 2016 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Appellants Barco Grills, LLC, CCM Restaurants, LLC, Robert Dreesch, Brad Dunning, Steven Egan-Fowler, Neil Griffeth, Gryphmore Foodservices of Kentucky, Inc., JFM Restaurants, LLC, JSW Cascade, LLC, JSW Embry Village, LLC, Moe's Chattanooga, LLC, Elizabeth M Orgera, Ray Orgera, Parde Roswell, LLC, Parde, LLC, Rounding Third, LLC, SMI Restaurants, LLC, TIP II Ansley, LLC, TIP II-Suburban, LLC, Taylor Investment Partners II, LLC and Edward Tronis in 15-14872. [15-14872, 15-15759] [Entered: 04/01/2016 07:49 AM]
February 19, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER: The motion to consolidate appeals 15-14872 and 15-15759 is granted. (AGW) [ # 7668249-2 ] [ # 7668249-3 ] [15-14872, 15-15759] [Entered: 02/19/2016 11:22 AM]
January 20, 2016 Added Attorney(s) Blake H. Frye for party(s) Appellee H. Martin Sprock III Appellee Raving Brand Holdings, Inc. Appellee Raving Brands, Inc. Appellee Moe's Southwest Grill, LLC, in case 15-15759. [Entered: 01/20/2016 10:42 AM]
January 20, 2016 Removed from case: Attorney Blakely Holloway Frye for Appellees H. Martin Sprock III, Raving Brands, Inc., Raving Brand Holdings, Inc., Moe's Southwest Grill, LLC and Corporate John Doe's X, Y, Z in 15-15759. [Entered: 01/20/2016 10:43 AM]
January 19, 2016 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Moe's Southwest Grill, LLC; Moe's Southwest Holdings, LLC; Raving Brands Holdings, Inc.; and H. Martin Sprock, III Blakely Holloway Frye for H. Martin Sprock, III, Raving Brands, Inc., Moe's Southwest Grill, LLC, Raving Brand Holdings, Inc. and Corporate John Doe's X, Y, Z. (ECF: Blake Frye) [Entered: 01/18/2016 01:10 PM]
January 19, 2016 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Moe's Southwest Grill, LLC; Moe's Southwest Holdings, LLC; Raving Brands Holdings, Inc.; and H. Martin Sprock, III Martha Logan Decker for H. Martin Sprock, III, Raving Brands, Inc., Moe's Southwest Grill, LLC, Raving Brand Holdings, Inc. and Corporate John Doe's X, Y, Z. (ECF: Martha Decker) [Entered: 01/18/2016 01:08 PM]
January 19, 2016 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Moe's Southwest Grill, LLC; Moe's Southwest Holdings, LLC; Raving Brands Holdings, Inc.; and H. Martin Sprock, III Steven G. Hill for H. Martin Sprock, III, Raving Brands, Inc., Moe's Southwest Grill, LLC, Raving Brand Holdings, Inc. and Corporate John Doe's X, Y, Z. (ECF: Steven Hill) [Entered: 01/18/2016 01:13 PM]
January 19, 2016 E-filed Appearance of Counsel processed for Attorney Martha Logan Decker for Appellee H. Martin Sprock III in 15-15759, Attorney Martha Logan Decker for Appellee Raving Brand Holdings, Inc. in 15-15759, Attorney Martha Logan Decker for Appellee Moe's Southwest Grill, LLC in 15-15759.--[Edited 01/19/2016 by JC] [Entered: 01/19/2016 09:30 AM]
January 19, 2016 E-filed Appearance of Counsel processed for Attorney Steven G. Hill for Appellee H. Martin Sprock III in 15-15759, Attorney Steven G. Hill for Appellee Raving Brands, Inc. in 15-15759, Attorney Steven G. Hill for Appellee Raving Brand Holdings, Inc. in 15-15759, Attorney Steven G. Hill for Appellee Moe's Southwest Grill, LLC in 15-15759. [Entered: 01/20/2016 10:08 AM]
January 19, 2016 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). (ECF: Steven Hill) [Entered: 01/18/2016 01:16 PM]
January 7, 2016 Briefing Notice issued. The appellants' brief is due on or before 02/01/2016. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellants' brief. [Entered: 01/07/2016 02:26 PM]
January 7, 2016 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Robert M. Einhorn for Appellants Taylor Investment Partners II, LLC, TIP II Ansley, LLC and TIP II-Suburban, LLC, Leon Hirzel for Appellants Taylor Investment Partners II, LLC, TIP II Ansley, LLC and TIP II-Suburban, LLC, Scott Korzenowski for Appellants Taylor Investment Partners II, LLC, TIP II Ansley, LLC and TIP II-Suburban, LLC and K. Brian Roller for Appellants Taylor Investment Partners II, LLC, TIP II Ansley, LLC and TIP II-Suburban, LLC. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [Entered: 01/07/2016 11:29 AM]
January 7, 2016 MOTION to consolidate appeals 15-15759 and 15-14872, to consolidate briefing schedule filed by TIP II Ansley, LLC, TIP II-Suburban, LLC and Taylor Investment Partners II, LLC. Joint Stipulation of Parties. [7668256-1] (ECF: Scott Korzenowski) [Entered: 01/07/2016 03:20 PM]
January 6, 2016 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Scott Korzenowski for Appellants Taylor Investment Partners II, LLC, TIP II Ansley, LLC and TIP II-Suburban, LLC. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). (ECF: Scott Korzenowski) [Entered: 01/06/2016 03:23 PM]
January 6, 2016 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Scott Korzenowski for Taylor Investment Partners II, LLC, TIP II Ansley, LLC and TIP II-Suburban, LLC. (ECF: Scott Korzenowski) [Entered: 01/06/2016 12:48 PM]
January 6, 2016 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Scott Korzenowski for Appellants Taylor Investment Partners II, LLC, TIP II Ansley, LLC and TIP II-Suburban, LLC. Transcript(s) ordered. (ECF: Scott Korzenowski) [Entered: 01/06/2016 03:26 PM]
January 6, 2016 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Scott Korzenowski for Appellants Taylor Investment Partners II, LLC, TIP II Ansley, LLC and TIP II-Suburban, LLC. (ECF: Scott Korzenowski) [Entered: 01/06/2016 03:33 PM]
January 6, 2016 E-filed Appearance of Counsel processed for Attorney Scott Korzenowski for Appellant Taylor Investment Partners II, LLC in 15-15759, Attorney Scott Korzenowski for Appellant TIP II-Suburban, LLC in 15-15759, Attorney Scott Korzenowski for Appellant TIP II Ansley, LLC in 15-15759. [Entered: 01/07/2016 02:32 PM]
December 23, 2015 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants TIP II Ansley, LLC, TIP II-Suburban, LLC and Taylor Investment Partners II, LLC on 12/22/2015. Fee Status: Fee Paid. [Entered: 01/04/2016 11:31 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Taylor Investment Partners II,, et al v. Moe's Southwest Grill, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RAVING BRANDS, INC.
Represented By: John L. North
Represented By: Douglas R. Kertscher
Represented By: Steven G. Hill
Represented By: Martha Logan Decker
Represented By: Blake H. Frye
Represented By: Jennifer Calvert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: H. MARTIN SPROCK, III
Represented By: John L. North
Represented By: Douglas R. Kertscher
Represented By: Steven G. Hill
Represented By: Martha Logan Decker
Represented By: Blake H. Frye
Represented By: Jennifer Calvert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MOE'S SOUTHWEST GRILL, LLC
Represented By: John L. North
Represented By: Douglas R. Kertscher
Represented By: Steven G. Hill
Represented By: Martha Logan Decker
Represented By: Blake H. Frye
Represented By: Jennifer Calvert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CORPORATE JOHN DOE'S X, Y, Z
Represented By: John L. North
Represented By: Douglas R. Kertscher
Represented By: Steven G. Hill
Represented By: Jennifer Calvert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RAVING BRAND HOLDINGS, INC.
Represented By: John L. North
Represented By: Douglas R. Kertscher
Represented By: Steven G. Hill
Represented By: Martha Logan Decker
Represented By: Blake H. Frye
Represented By: Jennifer Calvert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TIP II ANSLEY, LLC
Represented By: Glenn Christopher Tornillo
Represented By: Robert M. Einhorn
Represented By: Katrina M. Quicker
Represented By: Roberto Zarco
Represented By: Scott Korzenowski
Represented By: Leon Francisco Hirzel IV
Represented By: Elliot Daniel Morrison
Represented By: Thomas D. Warren
Represented By: K. Brian Roller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TIP II-SUBURBAN, LLC
Represented By: Glenn Christopher Tornillo
Represented By: Robert M. Einhorn
Represented By: Katrina M. Quicker
Represented By: Roberto Zarco
Represented By: Scott Korzenowski
Represented By: Leon Francisco Hirzel IV
Represented By: Elliot Daniel Morrison
Represented By: Thomas D. Warren
Represented By: K. Brian Roller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TAYLOR INVESTMENT PARTNERS II, LLC
Represented By: Glenn Christopher Tornillo
Represented By: Robert M. Einhorn
Represented By: Katrina M. Quicker
Represented By: Roberto Zarco
Represented By: Scott Korzenowski
Represented By: Leon Francisco Hirzel IV
Represented By: Elliot Daniel Morrison
Represented By: Thomas D. Warren
Represented By: K. Brian Roller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?