Automotive Alignment & Body Se, et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile I, et al
Not Classified By Court: SERVICE
Defendant / Appellee: PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE CO., SHELTER GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, NATIONWIDE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, ALLSTATE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS, PROGRESSIVE GULF INSURANCE COMPANY, STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY, STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY and ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff / Appellant: BOLDEN BODY SHOP, LLC, CANTON COLLISION, LLC, SMITH BROTHERS COLLISION CENTER, INC., GEORGE CARR BUICK PONTIAC CADILLAC GMC, INC., PROTOUCH COLLISION, LLC, d/b/a Boler-Phillips Body Shop, LAKESHORE BODY SHOP, INC., CLINTON BODY SHOP OF RICHLAND, INC., PATRIOT AUTO BODY, LLC, BARRY LEWIS, Individually and d/b/a European Coachworks, LTD., RIDGELAND BODY SHOP, INC., CRYSTAL CAR CARE, INC., AUTOMOTIVE ALIGNMENT & BODY SERVICE, INC., d.b.a. Pitalo Auto Paint & Body, MARK COOK, Individually and d/b/a European Coachworks, LTD., BILL FOWLER'S BODYWORKS, LLC, ALEXANDER BODY SHOP, LLC, HYPERCOLOR AUTOMOTIVE RECONDITIONING, INC., d.b.a. Autoworks Collision Specialist, PORTER'S BODY SHOP, INC., EAST MCCOMB BODY SHOP, INC., B & W BODY SHOP, INC, CLINTON BODY SHOP, INC., WALKER COLLISION CENTER, INC., SMITH BROTHERS BODY SHOP, INC. and ROY ROGERS BODY SHOP, INC.
Case Number: 16-13596
Filed: June 15, 2016
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2020 Returned Mail was received for Attorney William C. Brabec for Appellees Progressive Casualty Insurance Company and Progressive Gulf Insurance Company. Address has Not been verified and updated, and mail has Not been re-sent. IN RE: June 09, 2020, Order Petition for rehearing. [Entered: 06/26/2020 03:58 PM]
June 17, 2020 Mandate issued as to Appellants Alexander Body Shop, LLC, Automotive Alignment & Body Service, Inc., B & W Body Shop, Inc, Bill Fowler's Bodyworks, lLC, Bolden Body Shop, LLC, Canton Collision, lLC, Clinton Body Shop of Richland, Inc., Clinton Body Shop, Inc., Mark Cook, Crystal Car Care, Inc., East McComb Body Shop, Inc., George Carr Buick Pontiac Cadillac GMC, Inc., Hypercolor Automotive Reconditioning, Inc., Lakeshore Body Shop, Inc., Barry Lewis, Patriot Auto Body, LLC, Protouch Collision, LLC, Ridgeland Body Shop, Inc., Roy Rogers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Collision Center, Inc. and Walker Collision Center, Inc.. [Entered: 06/17/2020 09:18 AM]
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: Petition for panel rehearing only filed by Appellants Automotive Alignment & Body Service, Inc., Alexander Body Shop, LLC, Bill Fowler's Bodyworks, lLC, Bolden Body Shop, LLC, Clinton Body Shop, Inc., Clinton Body Shop of Richland, Inc., Crystal Car Care, Inc., Hypercolor Automotive Reconditioning, Inc., Lakeshore Body Shop, Inc., Patriot Auto Body, LLC, Protouch Collision, LLC, Ridgeland Body Shop, Inc., Roy Rogers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Collision Center, Inc., Walker Collision Center, Inc., Mark Cook, Barry Lewis, Canton Collision, lLC, East McComb Body Shop, Inc., George Carr Buick Pontiac Cadillac GMC, Inc. and B & W Body Shop, Inc is DENIED, Petition for panel rehearing only filed by Appellants Automotive Alignment & Body Service, Inc., Alexander Body Shop, LLC, Bill Fowler's Bodyworks, lLC, Bolden Body Shop, LLC, Clinton Body Shop, Inc., Clinton Body Shop of Richland, Inc., Crystal Car Care, Inc., Hypercolor Automotive Reconditioning, Inc., Lakeshore Body Shop, Inc., Patriot Auto Body, LLC, Protouch Collision, LLC, Ridgeland Body Shop, Inc., Roy Rogers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Collision Center, Inc., Walker Collision Center, Inc., Mark Cook, Barry Lewis, Canton Collision, lLC, East McComb Body Shop, Inc., George Carr Buick Pontiac Cadillac GMC, Inc. and B & W Body Shop, Inc is DENIED. [9107648-1] [Entered: 06/09/2020 02:09 PM]
May 22, 2020 Petition for panel rehearing only filed by Appellants Alexander Body Shop, LLC, Automotive Alignment & Body Service, Inc., B & W Body Shop, Inc, Bill Fowler's Bodyworks, lLC, Bolden Body Shop, LLC, Canton Collision, lLC, Clinton Body Shop of Richland, Inc., Clinton Body Shop, Inc., Mark Cook, Crystal Car Care, Inc., East McComb Body Shop, Inc., George Carr Buick Pontiac Cadillac GMC, Inc., Hypercolor Automotive Reconditioning, Inc., Lakeshore Body Shop, Inc., Barry Lewis, Patriot Auto Body, LLC, Protouch Collision, LLC, Ridgeland Body Shop, Inc., Roy Rogers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Collision Center, Inc. and Walker Collision Center, Inc.. [16-13596] (ECF: Mark Shurtleff) [Entered: 05/22/2020 04:23 PM]
May 21, 2020 SECOND Notice of deficient Rehearing filed by Mark L. Shurtleff for Automotive Alignment & Body Service, Inc., Alexander Body Shop, LLC, Bill Fowler's Bodyworks, lLC, Bolden Body Shop, LLC, Clinton Body Shop, Inc., Clinton Body Shop of Richland, Inc., Crystal Car Care, Inc., Hypercolor Automotive Reconditioning, Inc., Lakeshore Body Shop, Inc., Patriot Auto Body, LLC, Protouch Collision, LLC, Ridgeland Body Shop, Inc., Roy Rogers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Collision Center, Inc., Walker Collision Center, Inc., Mark Cook, Barry Lewis, Canton Collision, lLC, East McComb Body Shop, Inc., George Carr Buick Pontiac Cadillac GMC, Inc. and B & W Body Shop, Inc. Document does not contain a Certificate of Interested Persons. See 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-5. Counsel must refile Petition for rehearing with a complete Certificate within 3 days or no action will be taken on the rehearing. Please also update your contact number. [Entered: 05/21/2020 10:58 AM]
May 12, 2020 Notice of deficient Rehearing filed by Mark L. Shurtleff for Automotive Alignment & Body Service, Inc., Alexander Body Shop, LLC, Bill Fowler's Bodyworks, lLC, Bolden Body Shop, LLC, Clinton Body Shop, Inc., Clinton Body Shop of Richland, Inc., Crystal Car Care, Inc., Hypercolor Automotive Reconditioning, Inc., Lakeshore Body Shop, Inc., Patriot Auto Body, LLC, Protouch Collision, LLC, Ridgeland Body Shop, Inc., Roy Rogers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Collision Center, Inc., Walker Collision Center, Inc., Mark Cook, Barry Lewis, Canton Collision, lLC, East McComb Body Shop, Inc., George Carr Buick Pontiac Cadillac GMC, Inc. and B & W Body Shop, Inc. Document does not contain a Certificate of Interested Persons. See 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-5. Counsel must refile Petition for Rehearing with a complete Certificate of Interested Persons within 3 days. [Entered: 05/12/2020 10:58 AM]
May 8, 2020 Petition for panel rehearing only filed by Appellants Alexander Body Shop, LLC, Automotive Alignment & Body Service, Inc., B & W Body Shop, Inc, Bill Fowler's Bodyworks, lLC, Bolden Body Shop, LLC, Canton Collision, lLC, Clinton Body Shop of Richland, Inc., Clinton Body Shop, Inc., Mark Cook, Crystal Car Care, Inc., East McComb Body Shop, Inc., George Carr Buick Pontiac Cadillac GMC, Inc., Hypercolor Automotive Reconditioning, Inc., Lakeshore Body Shop, Inc., Barry Lewis, Patriot Auto Body, LLC, Protouch Collision, LLC, Ridgeland Body Shop, Inc., Roy Rogers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Collision Center, Inc. and Walker Collision Center, Inc.. [16-13596] (ECF: Mark Shurtleff) [Entered: 05/08/2020 11:42 PM]
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: Appellants motion for an extension of time to file petition for rehearing is GRANTED. Appellants petition for rehearing is due May 8, 2020. ENTERED FOR THE COURT - BY DIRECTION. [ # 9062136-2 ] [ # 9062130-2 ] [ # 9062141-2 ] [16-13601, 16-13596, 16-15467] [Entered: 04/16/2020 10:10 AM]
April 15, 2020 TIME SENSITIVE MOTION for extension of time to file request for rehearing to 05/08/2020 filed by Alexander Body Shop, LLC, Automotive Alignment & Body Service, Inc., B & W Body Shop, Inc, Bill Fowler's Bodyworks, lLC, Bolden Body Shop, LLC, Canton Collision, lLC, Clinton Body Shop of Richland, Inc., Clinton Body Shop, Inc., Mark Cook, Crystal Car Care, Inc., East McComb Body Shop, Inc., George Carr Buick Pontiac Cadillac GMC, Inc., Hypercolor Automotive Reconditioning, Inc., Lakeshore Body Shop, Inc., Barry Lewis, Patriot Auto Body, LLC, Protouch Collision, LLC, Ridgeland Body Shop, Inc., Roy Rogers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Collision Center, Inc. and Walker Collision Center, Inc.. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [9062130-1] [16-13596] (ECF: Mark Shurtleff) [Entered: 04/15/2020 11:44 AM]
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: Appellants motion for an extension of time to file petition for rehearing is GRANTED. Appellants petition for rehearing is due April 17, 2020. ENTERED FOR THE COURT - BY DIRECTION. [ # 9047156-2 ] [ # 9047166-2 ] [ # 9047172-2 ] [16-13596, 16-13601, 16-15467] [Entered: 03/31/2020 08:11 AM]
March 27, 2020 TIME SENSITIVE MOTION for extension of time to file request for rehearing to 04/17/2020 filed by Alexander Body Shop, LLC, Automotive Alignment & Body Service, Inc., B & W Body Shop, Inc, Bill Fowler's Bodyworks, lLC, Bolden Body Shop, LLC, Canton Collision, lLC, Clinton Body Shop of Richland, Inc., Clinton Body Shop, Inc., Mark Cook, Crystal Car Care, Inc., East McComb Body Shop, Inc., George Carr Buick Pontiac Cadillac GMC, Inc., Hypercolor Automotive Reconditioning, Inc., Lakeshore Body Shop, Inc., Barry Lewis, Patriot Auto Body, LLC, Protouch Collision, LLC, Ridgeland Body Shop, Inc., Roy Rogers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Collision Center, Inc. and Walker Collision Center, Inc.. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [9047156-1] [16-13596] (ECF: Mark Shurtleff) [Entered: 03/27/2020 04:49 PM]
March 6, 2020 Opinion issued by court as to Appellants Alexander Body Shop, LLC, Automotive Alignment & Body Service, Inc., B & W Body Shop, Inc, Bill Fowler's Bodyworks, lLC, Bolden Body Shop, LLC, Canton Collision, lLC, Clinton Body Shop of Richland, Inc., Clinton Body Shop, Inc., Mark Cook, Crystal Car Care, Inc., East McComb Body Shop, Inc., George Carr Buick Pontiac Cadillac GMC, Inc., Hypercolor Automotive Reconditioning, Inc., Lakeshore Body Shop, Inc., Barry Lewis, Patriot Auto Body, LLC, Protouch Collision, LLC, Ridgeland Body Shop, Inc., Roy Rogers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Collision Center, Inc. and Walker Collision Center, Inc. in 16-13596, Appellants Auto Body Specialties of Lafayette, Inc., Brothers Body and Paint of Morgan County, Inc., Clark Automotive, Inc., Clarksville Collision Center, Inc., Cross Paint & Body Shop, Incorporated, DanT. Gratz Body Shop, Inc., Enneking's Auto Body, Inc., Excel Auto Body, Inc., Gary Conns Collision Center, Inc., Generations Custom Auto & Collision, Inc., Harwood Collision Repair, LLC, Jon's Body Shop, Inc., Jonkman Garage, Inc., Main Street Body Shop, Inc., Martin's Body Shop, Inc., Mattingly Collision Center, Inc., Minton Body Shop, Inc., Prestige Auto Body Repair, Inc., Southlake Collision Center, Inc., Team 150, Inc., Carl Thurman, Voelz Body Shop, Inc., Kevin Wells and Wilkerson Body and Frame, Inc. in 16-13601, Appellants A.F. Collision Repair, Inc., Alpine Straightening Systems, B&B Auto Body & Paint, Inc., Chris Body & Paint, Inc., Dave's Body Shop, Inc., J.P.'s Custom Body & Paint, Inc., Jenson Enterprises, Inc., Lindon Collision Center, L.L.C. and Perks Auto Repair, Inc. in 16-15467. Decision: Affirmed, Vacated and Remanded. Opinion type: Published. Opinion method: Signed. The opinion is also available through the Court's Opinions page at this link # http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/opinions . [16-13596, 16-13601, 16-15467] [Entered: 03/06/2020 02:13 PM]
March 6, 2020 Judgment entered as to Appellants Alexander Body Shop, LLC, Automotive Alignment & Body Service, Inc., B & W Body Shop, Inc, Bill Fowler's Bodyworks, lLC, Bolden Body Shop, LLC, Canton Collision, lLC, Clinton Body Shop of Richland, Inc., Clinton Body Shop, Inc., Mark Cook, Crystal Car Care, Inc., East McComb Body Shop, Inc., George Carr Buick Pontiac Cadillac GMC, Inc., Hypercolor Automotive Reconditioning, Inc., Lakeshore Body Shop, Inc., Barry Lewis, Patriot Auto Body, LLC, Protouch Collision, LLC, Ridgeland Body Shop, Inc., Roy Rogers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Collision Center, Inc. and Walker Collision Center, Inc. in 16-13596, Appellants Auto Body Specialties of Lafayette, Inc., Brothers Body and Paint of Morgan County, Inc., Clark Automotive, Inc., Clarksville Collision Center, Inc., Cross Paint & Body Shop, Incorporated, DanT. Gratz Body Shop, Inc., Enneking's Auto Body, Inc., Excel Auto Body, Inc., Gary Conns Collision Center, Inc., Generations Custom Auto & Collision, Inc., Harwood Collision Repair, LLC, Jon's Body Shop, Inc., Jonkman Garage, Inc., Main Street Body Shop, Inc., Martin's Body Shop, Inc., Mattingly Collision Center, Inc., Minton Body Shop, Inc., Prestige Auto Body Repair, Inc., Southlake Collision Center, Inc., Team 150, Inc., Carl Thurman, Voelz Body Shop, Inc., Kevin Wells and Wilkerson Body and Frame, Inc. in 16-13601, Appellants A.F. Collision Repair, Inc., Alpine Straightening Systems, B&B Auto Body & Paint, Inc., Chris Body & Paint, Inc., Dave's Body Shop, Inc., J.P.'s Custom Body & Paint, Inc., Jenson Enterprises, Inc., Lindon Collision Center, L.L.C. and Perks Auto Repair, Inc. in 16-15467. [16-13596, 16-13601, 16-15467] [Entered: 03/06/2020 12:36 PM]
December 4, 2019 Oral argument held. Oral Argument participants were Mark L. Shurtleff for Appellants Automotive Alignment & Body Service, Inc., Alexander Body Shop, LLC, Bill Fowler's Bodyworks, lLC, Bolden Body Shop, LLC, Clinton Body Shop, Inc., Clinton Body Shop of Richland, Inc., Crystal Car Care, Inc., Hypercolor Automotive Reconditioning, Inc., Lakeshore Body Shop, Inc., Patriot Auto Body, LLC, Protouch Collision, LLC, Ridgeland Body Shop, Inc., Roy Rogers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Collision Center, Inc., Walker Collision Center, Inc., Mark Cook, Barry Lewis, Canton Collision, lLC, East McComb Body Shop, Inc., George Carr Buick Pontiac Cadillac GMC, Inc. and B & W Body Shop, Inc, Jeffrey S. Cashdan for Appellees Progressive Casualty Insurance Company and Progressive Gulf Insurance Company, Dan W. Goldfine for Appellees GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company and Not Party Service and Michael P. Kenny for Appellees State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company and State Farm Fire & Casualty Company in 16-13596. [16-13596, 16-13601] [Entered: 12/04/2019 04:19 PM]
December 2, 2019 Attorney Mark L. Shurtleff for Appellants Alexander Body Shop, LLC, Automotive Alignment & Body Service, Inc., B & W Body Shop, Inc, Bill Fowler's Bodyworks, lLC, Bolden Body Shop, LLC, Canton Collision, lLC, Clinton Body Shop of Richland, Inc., Clinton Body Shop, Inc., Mark Cook, Crystal Car Care, Inc., East McComb Body Shop, Inc., George Carr Buick Pontiac Cadillac GMC, Inc., Hypercolor Automotive Reconditioning, Inc., Lakeshore Body Shop, Inc., Barry Lewis, Patriot Auto Body, LLC, Protouch Collision, LLC, Ridgeland Body Shop, Inc., Roy Rogers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Collision Center, Inc. and Walker Collision Center, Inc. hereby acknowledges receipt of a copy of the printed calendar for 12/04/2019. Mark L. Shurtleff, 801-441-9625 will present argument. [16-13596] (ECF: Mark Shurtleff) [Entered: 12/02/2019 10:18 AM]
November 26, 2019 Notice re Clinton Body Shop Claims filed by Attorney Dan W. Goldfine for Appellees GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company and Not Party Service. [16-13596] (ECF: Dan Goldfine) [Entered: 11/26/2019 03:44 PM]
November 12, 2019 Supplemental Appellant's Letter Brief filed by Appellants Alexander Body Shop, LLC, Automotive Alignment & Body Service, Inc., B & W Body Shop, Inc, Bill Fowler's Bodyworks, lLC, Bolden Body Shop, LLC, Canton Collision, lLC, Clinton Body Shop of Richland, Inc., Clinton Body Shop, Inc., Mark Cook, Crystal Car Care, Inc., East McComb Body Shop, Inc., George Carr Buick Pontiac Cadillac GMC, Inc., Hypercolor Automotive Reconditioning, Inc., Lakeshore Body Shop, Inc., Barry Lewis, Patriot Auto Body, LLC, Protouch Collision, LLC, Ridgeland Body Shop, Inc., Roy Rogers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Collision Center, Inc. and Walker Collision Center, Inc.. [16-13596] (ECF: Mark Shurtleff) [Entered: 11/12/2019 11:51 PM]
November 8, 2019 Supplemental Appellee's Letter Brief filed by Appellees GEICO General Insurance Company and GEICO Indemnity Company. [16-13596] (ECF: Dan Goldfine) [Entered: 11/08/2019 09:16 PM]
November 8, 2019 Supplemental Appellee's Letter Brief filed by Appellees State Farm Fire & Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company and Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. [16-13596] (ECF: Johanna Clark) [Entered: 11/08/2019 09:06 PM]
November 7, 2019 Attorney Dan W. Goldfine for Appellees GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company and Not Party Service hereby acknowledges receipt of a copy of the printed calendar for 12/04/2019. Dan W. Goldfine; 480.824.7887 will present argument. [16-13596] (ECF: Dan Goldfine) [Entered: 11/07/2019 04:01 PM]
October 9, 2019 The Court directs counsel for the parties in these consolidated appeals to file supplemental briefs about how the en banc decision in Quality Auto Painting Ctr. of Roselle, Inc. v. State Farm Indem. Co., 917 F.3d 1249 (11th Cir. 2019), affects our resolution of these appeals. The parties must file simultaneous letter briefs, not to exceed 10 pages, within 30 days of this order. [16-13596, 16-13601, 16-15467] [Entered: 10/09/2019 05:07 PM]
September 26, 2019 Attorney Jeffrey S. Cashdan for Appellees Progressive Casualty Insurance Company and Progressive Gulf Insurance Company hereby acknowledges receipt of a copy of the printed calendar for 12/04/2019. Jeffrey S. Cashdan 404-572-4818 will present argument. [16-13596] (ECF: Jeffrey Cashdan) [Entered: 09/26/2019 01:49 PM]
September 26, 2019 Oral argument scheduled. Argument Date: Wednesday, 12/04/2019 Argument Location: Atlanta. [Entered: 09/26/2019 08:52 AM]
September 25, 2019 Attorney John Arthur Eaves, Jr. for Appellants Alexander Body Shop, LLC, Automotive Alignment & Body Service, Inc., B & W Body Shop, Inc, Bill Fowler's Bodyworks, lLC, Bolden Body Shop, LLC, Canton Collision, lLC, Clinton Body Shop of Richland, Inc., Clinton Body Shop, Inc., Mark Cook, Crystal Car Care, Inc., East McComb Body Shop, Inc., George Carr Buick Pontiac Cadillac GMC, Inc., Hypercolor Automotive Reconditioning, Inc., Lakeshore Body Shop, Inc., Barry Lewis, Patriot Auto Body, LLC, Protouch Collision, LLC, Ridgeland Body Shop, Inc., Roy Rogers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Collision Center, Inc. and Walker Collision Center, Inc. hereby acknowledges receipt of a copy of the printed calendar for 09/25/2019. Mark Shurtleff (801) 655-5577 will present argument. [16-13596] (ECF: John Eaves) [Entered: 09/25/2019 12:18 PM]
September 25, 2019 NOTE: Counsel must be logged into Eleventh Circuit CM/ECF before attempting to view the attached calendar. Calendar issued as to cases to be orally argued the week of 12/02/2019 in Atlanta, Georgia. Counsel are directed to electronically acknowledge receipt of this calendar by docketing the Calendar Receipt Acknowledged event in ECF. [16-13596, 16-13601, 16-15467] [Entered: 09/25/2019 09:18 AM]
August 28, 2019 Assigned to tentative calendar number 5 in Atlanta during the week of December 2, 2019. Counsel must be logged into CM/ECF in order to view the attached calendar. [16-13596, 16-13601, 16-15467] [Entered: 08/28/2019 02:18 PM]
August 14, 2019 This appeal has been removed from tentative calendar # 2 and will be reassigned at a later date. [16-13596, 16-13601, 16-15467] [Entered: 08/14/2019 01:50 PM]
August 2, 2019 Assigned to tentative calendar number 2 in Jacksonville during the week of November 4, 2019. Counsel must be logged into CM/ECF in order to view the attached calendar. [16-13596, 16-13601, 16-15467] [Entered: 08/02/2019 09:30 AM]
June 26, 2019 This appeal has been removed from tentative calendar # 29 and will be reassigned at a later date. [16-13596, 16-13601, 16-15467] [Entered: 06/26/2019 01:44 PM]
June 6, 2019 Assigned to tentative calendar number 29 in Atlanta during the week of September 16, 2019. Counsel must be logged into CM/ECF in order to view the attached calendar. [16-13596, 16-13601, 16-15467] [Entered: 06/06/2019 04:03 PM]
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Defendants-Appellees' joint motion to consolidate appeal nos. 16-13596, 16-13601 and 16-15467, is GRANTED by Supervisor. [ # 8744917-2 ] [ # 8744921-2 ] [ # 8744924-2 ] 16-13596, 16-13601, 16-15467] [Entered: 04/19/2019 02:26 PM]
April 12, 2019 MOTION to consolidate appeals 16-13596, 16-13601 and 16-15467 filed by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company and State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Joint Stipulation of Parties. [8744917-1] [16-13596] (ECF: Michael McCluggage) [Entered: 04/12/2019 04:53 PM]
March 29, 2019 Supplemental Authority filed by Appellees State Farm Fire & Casualty Company and State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. [16-13596] (ECF: Michael McCluggage) [Entered: 03/29/2019 05:31 PM]
June 11, 2018 RETURNED UNFILED: Motion for substitution of counsel filed by John Arthur Eaves, Jr. is returned unfiled because the motion has not been corrected to include the signature of the withdrawing attorney. [Entered: 06/11/2018 02:48 PM]
June 1, 2018 Notice of deficient Motion filed by John Arthur Eaves, Jr. for Appellants. The motion must be signed by the withdrawing attorney. Counsel must file a corrected motion using the Amend, Correct, or Supplement Motion event within 3 days. [Entered: 06/01/2018 02:15 PM]
May 31, 2018 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by John Arthur Eaves, Jr. for Automotive Alignment & Body Service, Inc., Alexander Body Shop, LLC, Bill Fowler's Bodyworks, lLC, Bolden Body Shop, LLC, Clinton Body Shop, Inc., Clinton Body Shop of Richland, Inc., Crystal Car Care, Inc., Hypercolor Automotive Reconditioning, Inc., Lakeshore Body Shop, Inc., Patriot Auto Body, LLC, Protouch Collision, LLC, Ridgeland Body Shop, Inc., Roy Rogers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Collision Center, Inc., Walker Collision Center, Inc., Mark Cook, Barry Lewis, Canton Collision, lLC, East McComb Body Shop, Inc., George Carr Buick Pontiac Cadillac GMC, Inc. and B & W Body Shop, Inc. (ECF: John Eaves) [Entered: 05/31/2018 03:49 PM]
May 31, 2018 *** RETURNED UNFILED *** MOTION for substitution of counsel filed by Attorney John Arthur Eaves, Jr. for Appellants Automotive Alignment & Body Service, Inc., Alexander Body Shop, LLC, Bill Fowler's Bodyworks, lLC, Bolden Body Shop, LLC, Clinton Body Shop, Inc., Clinton Body Shop of Richland, Inc., Crystal Car Care, Inc., Hypercolor Automotive Reconditioning, Inc., Lakeshore Body Shop, Inc., Patriot Auto Body, LLC, Protouch Collision, LLC, Ridgeland Body Shop, Inc., Roy Rogers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Collision Center, Inc., Walker Collision Center, Inc., Mark Cook, Barry Lewis, Canton Collision, lLC, East McComb Body Shop, Inc., George Carr Buick Pontiac Cadillac GMC, Inc. and B & W Body Shop, Inc. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8471671-1]--[Edited 06/01/2018 by JFC to correct relief]--[Edited 06/11/2018 by JFC] (ECF: John Eaves) [Entered: 05/31/2018 03:22 PM]
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER: Defendants-Appellees' unopposed joint motion to postpone oral argument pending this Court's en banc determination in consolidated appeal nos. 15-14160, 15-14162, 15-14178, 15-14179, and 15-14180 is GRANTED. The cases shall be placed back on track to be calendared after the issuance of the mandate in the consolidated appeals. [ # 8434152-2 ] [ # 8434151-2 ] [ # 8434150-2 ] [ # 8434153-2 ] KCN [16-13596, 16-13601, 16-15467, 17-12583] [Entered: 04/30/2018 10:40 AM]
April 27, 2018 ENTRY OF DISMISSAL: Pursuant to Appellant Porter's Body Shop, Inc.'s motion for voluntary dismissal, FRAP Rule 42 and 11th Cir. R. 42-1(a), the above referenced appeal was duly entered dismissed on this date as to Porter's Body Shop, Inc. ONLY [Entered: 04/27/2018 02:16 PM]
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion to voluntarily dismiss appeal AS TO Porter's Body Shop, Inc. ONLY is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 8434881-2 ] [Entered: 04/24/2018 11:33 AM]
April 19, 2018 MOTION to voluntarily dismiss appeal filed by Porter's Body Shop, Inc.. Motion is Unopposed. [8434881-1] (ECF: Mark Shurtleff) [Entered: 04/19/2018 01:43 PM]
April 18, 2018 MOTION (JOINT) Postponement of Oral Argument Pending En Banc Determination filed by Allstate Insurance Company and Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Motion is Unopposed. [8434152-1] (ECF: Richard Fenton) [Entered: 04/18/2018 06:52 PM]
April 17, 2018 Additional copies of Appendix (3 sets - 2 vols ea) received from Allison P. Fry for Automotive Alignment & Body Service, Inc., Alexander Body Shop, LLC, Bill Fowler's Bodyworks, lLC, Bolden Body Shop, LLC, Clinton Body Shop, Inc., Clinton Body Shop of Richland, Inc., Crystal Car Care, Inc., Hypercolor Automotive Reconditioning, Inc., Lakeshore Body Shop, Inc., Patriot Auto Body, LLC, Porter's Body Shop, Inc., Protouch Collision, LLC, Ridgeland Body Shop, Inc., Roy Rogers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Collision Center, Inc., Walker Collision Center, Inc., Mark Cook, Barry Lewis, Canton Collision, lLC, East McComb Body Shop, Inc., George Carr Buick Pontiac Cadillac GMC, Inc. and B & W Body Shop, Inc and forwarded to the record room. [Entered: 04/17/2018 02:18 PM]
April 3, 2018 Additional copies of Appendix (3 sets - 1 vol ea) received from Michael Hiram Carpenter for Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company and NWIDE and forwarded to the record room. [Entered: 04/03/2018 02:11 PM]
March 29, 2018 Assigned to tentative calendar number 25 in Atlanta during the week of July 23, 2018. Counsel must be logged into CM/ECF in order to view the attached calendar. [Entered: 03/29/2018 03:27 PM]
March 29, 2018 The Court has determined that oral argument will be necessary in this case. Please forward 3 additional copies of the 1 volumes of Supplemental Appendix, which conform to all formatting requirements, filed 8/29/16 by Attorney Michael Hiram Carpenter for Appellees Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company and NWIDE to the Clerk's Office, Attention: Jenifer Tubbs. Your prompt attention to this matter is appreciated. [Entered: 03/29/2018 02:28 PM]
March 29, 2018 The Court has determined that oral argument will be necessary in this case. Please forward 3 additional copies of the 2 volumes of Appendix, which conform to all formatting requirements, filed 8/1/16 by Attorney Allison P. Fry for Appellants Automotive Alignment & Body Service, Inc., Alexander Body Shop, LLC, Bill Fowler's Bodyworks, lLC, Bolden Body Shop, LLC, Clinton Body Shop, Inc., Clinton Body Shop of Richland, Inc., Crystal Car Care, Inc., Hypercolor Automotive Reconditioning, Inc., Lakeshore Body Shop, Inc., Patriot Auto Body, LLC, Porter's Body Shop, Inc., Protouch Collision, LLC, Ridgeland Body Shop, Inc., Roy Rogers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Collision Center, Inc., Walker Collision Center, Inc., Mark Cook, Barry Lewis, Canton Collision, lLC, East McComb Body Shop, Inc., George Carr Buick Pontiac Cadillac GMC, Inc. and B & W Body Shop, Inc to the Clerk's Office, Attention: Jenifer Tubbs. Your prompt attention to this matter is appreciated. [Entered: 03/29/2018 02:27 PM]
March 27, 2018 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Mark L. Shurtleff for Automotive Alignment & Body Service Inc., et al. (ECF: Mark Shurtleff) [Entered: 03/27/2018 05:12 PM]
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion to withdraw as counsel filed by Jonathon James Korinko is GRANTED. [ # 8153453-2 ] in 16-13596 and [ # 8153632-2 ] in 16-13601 RLA [16-13596, 16-13601] [Entered: 06/23/2017 04:21 PM]
June 8, 2017 Amended Motion to withdraw as counsel [ # 8153453-2 ] filed by Appellee Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (ECF: Jonathon Korinko) [Entered: 06/08/2017 03:53 PM]
June 8, 2017 MOTION to withdraw as counsel filed by Attorney Jonathon James Korinko for Appellee Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8153453-1] (ECF: Jonathon Korinko) [Entered: 06/08/2017 02:59 PM]
March 15, 2017 Supplemental Authority filed by Appellees GEICO General Insurance Company and GEICO Indemnity Company. (ECF: Dan Goldfine) [Entered: 03/15/2017 07:09 PM]
September 9, 2016 Over the phone extension granted by clerk. Updated Reply Brief. Due on 09/29/2016 as to Appellant Automotive Alignment & Body Service, Inc.. [Entered: 09/09/2016 09:55 AM]
September 1, 2016 E-filed Appearance of Counsel processed for Attorney Richard L. Fenton for Appellee Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company in 16-13596, Attorney Richard L. Fenton for Appellee Allstate Insurance Company in 16-13596. [Entered: 09/01/2016 02:30 PM]
August 30, 2016 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Appellees GEICO General Insurance Company and GEICO Indemnity Company. [Entered: 09/09/2016 10:42 AM]
August 30, 2016 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Appellees State Farm Fire & Casualty Company and State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. [Entered: 08/30/2016 04:41 PM]
August 30, 2016 Received paper copies of EAppendix filed by Appellees NWIDE and Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company. 1 VOLUMES - 2 SETS [Entered: 08/30/2016 01:58 PM]
August 30, 2016 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Appellees NWIDE and Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company. [Entered: 08/30/2016 01:57 PM]
August 29, 2016 Appellee's brief filed by Dan W. Goldfine for GEICO General Insurance Company and GEICO Indemnity Company. [7894812-1] --[Edited 08/30/2016 by RAV] (ECF: Dan Goldfine) [Entered: 08/29/2016 08:02 PM]
August 29, 2016 ***ERROR***MOTION to intervene filed by Dan W. Goldfine for GEICO General Insurance Company and GEICO Indemnity Company. [7894801-1] --[Edited 08/30/2016 by RAV] (ECF: Dan Goldfine) [Entered: 08/29/2016 07:00 PM]
August 29, 2016 Appellee's Brief filed by Appellees State Farm Fire & Casualty Company and State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (ECF: Johanna Clark) [Entered: 08/29/2016 04:32 PM]
August 29, 2016 Supplemental Appendix [1 VOLUMES] filed by Appellees NWIDE and Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (ECF: Michael Carpenter) [Entered: 08/29/2016 02:49 PM]
August 29, 2016 Appellee's Brief filed by Appellees NWIDE and Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (ECF: Michael Carpenter) [Entered: 08/29/2016 02:01 PM]
August 17, 2016 Received CORRECTED paper copies of EAppendix filed by Appellants Alexander Body Shop, LLC, Automotive Alignment & Body Service, Inc., B & W Body Shop, Inc, Bill Fowler's Bodyworks, lLC, Bolden Body Shop, LLC, Canton Collision, lLC, Clinton Body Shop of Richland, Inc., Clinton Body Shop, Inc., Mark Cook, Crystal Car Care, Inc., East McComb Body Shop, Inc., George Carr Buick Pontiac Cadillac GMC, Inc., Hypercolor Automotive Reconditioning, Inc., Lakeshore Body Shop, Inc., Barry Lewis, Patriot Auto Body, LLC, Porter's Body Shop, Inc., Protouch Collision, LLC, Ridgeland Body Shop, Inc., Roy Rogers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Collision Center, Inc. and Walker Collision Center, Inc.. 2 VOLUMES - 2 SETS. All deficiencies have been corrected [Entered: 08/18/2016 11:59 AM]
August 2, 2016 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Appellants Alexander Body Shop, LLC, Automotive Alignment & Body Service, Inc., B & W Body Shop, Inc, Bill Fowler's Bodyworks, lLC, Bolden Body Shop, LLC, Canton Collision, lLC, Clinton Body Shop of Richland, Inc., Clinton Body Shop, Inc., Mark Cook, Crystal Car Care, Inc., East McComb Body Shop, Inc., George Carr Buick Pontiac Cadillac GMC, Inc., Hypercolor Automotive Reconditioning, Inc., Lakeshore Body Shop, Inc., Barry Lewis, Patriot Auto Body, LLC, Porter's Body Shop, Inc., Protouch Collision, LLC, Ridgeland Body Shop, Inc., Roy Rogers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Collision Center, Inc. and Walker Collision Center, Inc.. [Entered: 08/02/2016 02:07 PM]
August 1, 2016 Notice of deficient Appellant appendix filed by Attorney Allison P. Fry for Appellants Automotive Alignment & Body Service, Inc., Alexander Body Shop, LLC, Bill Fowler's Bodyworks, lLC, Bolden Body Shop, LLC, Clinton Body Shop, Inc., Clinton Body Shop of Richland, Inc., Crystal Car Care, Inc., Hypercolor Automotive Reconditioning, Inc., Lakeshore Body Shop, Inc., Patriot Auto Body, LLC, Porter's Body Shop, Inc., Protouch Collision, LLC, Ridgeland Body Shop, Inc., Roy Rogers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Collision Center, Inc., Walker Collision Center, Inc., Mark Cook, Barry Lewis, Canton Collision, lLC, East McComb Body Shop, Inc., George Carr Buick Pontiac Cadillac GMC, Inc. and B & W Body Shop, Inc. Deficiencies: Incorrect Cover Color, Needs to be properly secured at the top. [Entered: 08/01/2016 01:16 PM]
August 1, 2016 Received paper copies of EAppendix filed by Appellants Alexander Body Shop, LLC, Automotive Alignment & Body Service, Inc., B & W Body Shop, Inc, Bill Fowler's Bodyworks, lLC, Bolden Body Shop, LLC, Canton Collision, lLC, Clinton Body Shop of Richland, Inc., Clinton Body Shop, Inc., Mark Cook, Crystal Car Care, Inc., East McComb Body Shop, Inc., George Carr Buick Pontiac Cadillac GMC, Inc., Hypercolor Automotive Reconditioning, Inc., Lakeshore Body Shop, Inc., Barry Lewis, Patriot Auto Body, LLC, Porter's Body Shop, Inc., Protouch Collision, LLC, Ridgeland Body Shop, Inc., Roy Rogers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Collision Center, Inc. and Walker Collision Center, Inc.. 2 VOLUMES - 2 SETS [Entered: 08/01/2016 01:07 PM]
August 1, 2016 Appendix filed [Two VOLUMES] by Appellants Alexander Body Shop, LLC, Automotive Alignment & Body Service, Inc., B & W Body Shop, Inc, Bill Fowler's Bodyworks, lLC, Bolden Body Shop, LLC, Canton Collision, lLC, Clinton Body Shop of Richland, Inc., Clinton Body Shop, Inc., Mark Cook, Crystal Car Care, Inc., East McComb Body Shop, Inc., George Carr Buick Pontiac Cadillac GMC, Inc., Hypercolor Automotive Reconditioning, Inc., Lakeshore Body Shop, Inc., Barry Lewis, Patriot Auto Body, LLC, Porter's Body Shop, Inc., Protouch Collision, LLC, Ridgeland Body Shop, Inc., Roy Rogers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Collision Center, Inc. and Walker Collision Center, Inc.. (ECF: Allison Fry) [Entered: 07/31/2016 08:26 PM]
July 26, 2016 Added Attorney(s) Emily Shoemaker Newton for party(s) Appellee Progressive Casualty Insurance Company Appellee Progressive Gulf Insurance Company, in case 16-13596. [Entered: 07/26/2016 08:03 AM]
July 26, 2016 Appellant's brief filed by Alexander Body Shop, LLC, Automotive Alignment & Body Service, Inc., B & W Body Shop, Inc, Bill Fowler's Bodyworks, lLC, Bolden Body Shop, LLC, Canton Collision, lLC, Clinton Body Shop of Richland, Inc., Clinton Body Shop, Inc., Mark Cook, Crystal Car Care, Inc., East McComb Body Shop, Inc., George Carr Buick Pontiac Cadillac GMC, Inc., Hypercolor Automotive Reconditioning, Inc., Lakeshore Body Shop, Inc., Barry Lewis, Patriot Auto Body, LLC, Porter's Body Shop, Inc., Protouch Collision, LLC, Ridgeland Body Shop, Inc., Roy Rogers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Collision Center, Inc. and Walker Collision Center, Inc.. (ECF: Allison Fry) [Entered: 07/26/2016 12:03 AM]
July 25, 2016 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Emily Newton for Progressive Gulf Insurance Company and Progressive Casualty Insurance Company (ECF: Emily Newton) [Entered: 07/25/2016 02:10 PM]
July 21, 2016 E-filed Appearance of Counsel processed for Attorney Michael R. Nelson for Appellee Progressive Gulf Insurance Company in 16-13596, Attorney Michael R. Nelson for Appellee Progressive Casualty Insurance Company in 16-13596. [Entered: 07/21/2016 10:20 AM]
July 21, 2016 E-filed Appearance of Counsel processed for Attorney Johanna W. Clark for Appellee State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company in 16-13596, Attorney Johanna W. Clark for Appellee State Farm Fire & Casualty Company in 16-13596. [Entered: 07/21/2016 10:16 AM]
July 21, 2016 Added Attorney(s) Jonathon James Korinko for party(s) Appellee Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, in case 16-13596. [Entered: 07/21/2016 10:13 AM]
July 21, 2016 E-filed Appearance of Counsel processed for Attorney Ernest Eugene Vargo for Appellee Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois in 16-13596. [Entered: 07/21/2016 10:09 AM]
July 21, 2016 E-filed Appearance of Counsel processed for Attorney Michael Edward Mumford for Appellee Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois in 16-13596. [Entered: 07/21/2016 09:01 AM]
July 21, 2016 E-filed Appearance of Counsel processed for Attorney Jeffrey S. Cashdan for Appellee Progressive Gulf Insurance Company in 16-13596, Attorney Jeffrey S. Cashdan for Appellee Progressive Casualty Insurance Company in 16-13596. [Entered: 07/21/2016 08:21 AM]
July 20, 2016 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jonathan S. Masters for Shelter Mutual Insurance Company (ECF: Jonathan Masters) [Entered: 07/20/2016 05:13 PM]
July 20, 2016 AMENDED Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Robert Bradley Best for Shelter General Insurance Company and Shelter Mutual Insurance Company. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). (ECF: Robert Best) [Entered: 07/20/2016 05:09 PM]
July 20, 2016 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Robert Bradley Best for Shelter Mutual Insurance Company (ECF: Robert Best) [Entered: 07/20/2016 05:07 PM]
July 20, 2016 AMENDED Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Jeffrey S. Cashdan for Appellees Progressive Casualty Insurance Company and Progressive Gulf Insurance Company. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). (ECF: Jeffrey Cashdan) [Entered: 07/20/2016 05:02 PM]
July 20, 2016 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jeffrey S. Cashdan for Progressive Casualty Insurance Company and Progressive Gulf Insurance Company. (ECF: Jeffrey Cashdan) [Entered: 07/20/2016 05:01 PM]
July 20, 2016 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Hal Kemp Litchford for Appellees State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, State Farm Fire & Casualty Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company and Progressive Gulf Insurance Company. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). (ECF: Hal Litchford) [Entered: 07/20/2016 04:40 PM]
July 20, 2016 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Michael Edward Mumford for Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). (ECF: Michael Mumford) [Entered: 07/20/2016 04:35 PM]
July 20, 2016 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Michael Hiram Carpenter for Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company and Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company Attorney Michael Hiram Carpenter for Not Party Service. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). (ECF: Michael Carpenter) [Entered: 07/20/2016 03:57 PM]
July 20, 2016 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Robert Bradley Best for Appellee Shelter General Insurance Company and Not Party Service. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). (ECF: Robert Best) [Entered: 07/20/2016 03:51 PM]
July 20, 2016 AMENDED Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Johanna W. Clark for Appellees State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company and State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). (ECF: Johanna Clark) [Entered: 07/20/2016 03:13 PM]
July 20, 2016 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Michael R. Nelson for Progressive Casualty Insurance Company and Progressive Gulf Insurance Company. (ECF: Michael Nelson) [Entered: 07/20/2016 03:07 PM]
July 20, 2016 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by GEICO General Insurance Company GEICO Indemnity Company Attorney Dan W. Goldfine for Not Party Service. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). (ECF: Dan Goldfine) [Entered: 07/20/2016 12:41 PM]
July 20, 2016 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Richard L. Fenton on behalf of Appellees Allstate Insurance Company and Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). (ECF: Richard Fenton) [Entered: 07/20/2016 12:36 PM]
July 20, 2016 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Johanna W. Clark for State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company and State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. (ECF: Johanna Clark) [Entered: 07/20/2016 11:55 AM]
July 20, 2016 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jonathon James Korinko for Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (ECF: Jonathon Korinko) [Entered: 07/20/2016 11:11 AM]
July 20, 2016 MOTION MOOT: Motion to amend/excess words is MOOT, Attorney Fry will refile her motion to amend with a corrected reply brief. [ # 7828466-2 ]. [Entered: 07/20/2016 11:08 AM]
July 20, 2016 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Ernest Eugene Vargo for Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (ECF: Ernest Vargo) [Entered: 07/20/2016 11:05 AM]
July 20, 2016 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Michael Edward Mumford for Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (ECF: Michael Mumford) [Entered: 07/20/2016 10:51 AM]
July 20, 2016 E-filed Appearance of Counsel processed for Attorney Elizabeth Helmer for Appellee State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company in 16-13596, Attorney Elizabeth Helmer for Appellee State Farm Fire & Casualty Company in 16-13596. [Entered: 07/20/2016 10:45 AM]
July 20, 2016 E-filed Appearance of Counsel processed for Attorney Michael P. Kenny for Appellee State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company in 16-13596, Attorney Michael P. Kenny for Appellee State Farm Fire & Casualty Company in 16-13596. [Entered: 07/20/2016 10:40 AM]
July 19, 2016 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Elizabeth Helmer for State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company and State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. (ECF: Elizabeth Helmer) [Entered: 07/19/2016 07:04 PM]
July 19, 2016 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Michael P. Kenny for State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company and State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (ECF: Michael Kenny) [Entered: 07/19/2016 06:54 PM]
July 19, 2016 E-filed Appearance of Counsel processed for Attorney Michael L. McCluggage for Appellee State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company in 16-13596, Attorney Michael L. McCluggage for Appellee State Farm Fire & Casualty Company in 16-13596. [Entered: 07/19/2016 02:22 PM]
July 19, 2016 Added Attorney(s) Daniel D. Birk for party(s) Appellee State Farm Fire & Casualty Company Appellee State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, in case 16-13596. [Entered: 07/19/2016 02:18 PM]
July 19, 2016 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Michael L. McCluggage for State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company and State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. (ECF: Michael McCluggage) [Entered: 07/19/2016 11:17 AM]
July 19, 2016 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Daniel D. Birk for State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company and State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (ECF: Daniel Birk) [Entered: 07/19/2016 11:07 AM]
July 18, 2016 Added Attorney(s) Lori J. Caldwell for party(s) Not Party Service, in case 16-13596. [Entered: 07/18/2016 09:24 AM]
July 18, 2016 E-filed Appearance of Counsel processed for Attorney Joshua Grabel for Not Party Service in 16-13596. [Entered: 07/18/2016 09:19 AM]
July 18, 2016 E-filed Appearance of Counsel processed for Attorney Jamie L. Halavais for Not Party Service in 16-13596. [Entered: 07/18/2016 09:15 AM]
July 18, 2016 E-filed Appearance of Counsel processed for Attorney Dan W. Goldfine for Not Party Service in 16-13596. [Entered: 07/18/2016 09:12 AM]
July 18, 2016 E-filed Appearance of Counsel processed for Attorney Ian M. Fischer for Not Party Service in 16-13596. [Entered: 07/18/2016 09:04 AM]
July 15, 2016 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Caldwell, Lori J. Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company and Allstate Insurance Company (ECF: Lori Caldwell) [Entered: 07/15/2016 05:30 PM]
July 14, 2016 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Joshua Grabel for Service. (ECF: Joshua Grabel) [Entered: 07/14/2016 05:17 PM]
July 14, 2016 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jamie L. Halavais for Service. (ECF: Jamie Halavais) [Entered: 07/14/2016 05:15 PM]
July 14, 2016 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Dan W. Goldfine for Service. (ECF: Dan Goldfine) [Entered: 07/14/2016 05:12 PM]
July 14, 2016 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Ian M. Fischer for Service. (ECF: Ian Fischer) [Entered: 07/14/2016 05:09 PM]
July 14, 2016 E-filed Appearance of Counsel processed for Attorney Jonathan Stuart Masters for Appellee Shelter General Insurance Company in 16-13596. [Entered: 07/14/2016 12:24 PM]
July 14, 2016 E-filed Appearance of Counsel processed for Attorney Robert Bradley Best for Appellee Shelter General Insurance Company in 16-13596. [Entered: 07/14/2016 12:22 PM]
July 14, 2016 E-filed Appearance of Counsel processed for Attorney Richard L. Fenton for Appellee Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company in 16-13596. [Entered: 07/14/2016 12:13 PM]
July 14, 2016 E-filed Appearance of Counsel processed for Attorney Bonnie Lau for Appellee Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company in 16-13596. [Entered: 07/14/2016 11:32 AM]
July 14, 2016 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jonathan S. Masters for Shelter General Insurance Company (ECF: Jonathan Masters) [Entered: 07/14/2016 10:56 AM]
July 14, 2016 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Robert Bradley Best for Shelter General Insurance Company (ECF: Robert Best) [Entered: 07/14/2016 10:51 AM]
July 12, 2016 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Richard L. Fenton for Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (ECF: Richard Fenton) [Entered: 07/12/2016 07:18 PM]
July 12, 2016 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Bonnie Lau for Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (ECF: Bonnie Lau) [Entered: 07/12/2016 07:11 PM]
July 11, 2016 E-filed Appearance of Counsel processed for Attorney Kyle Allen Diamantas for Not Party Service in 16-13596. [Entered: 07/09/2016 01:00 PM]
July 9, 2016 E-filed Appearance of Counsel processed for Attorney Hal Kemp Litchford for Appellee State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company in 16-13596, Attorney Hal Kemp Litchford for Appellee State Farm Fire & Casualty Company in 16-13596, Attorney Hal Kemp Litchford for Appellee Progressive Gulf Insurance Company in 16-13596, Attorney Hal Kemp Litchford for Appellee Progressive Casualty Insurance Company in 16-13596, Attorney Hal Kemp Litchford for Appellee Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company in 16-13596. [Entered: 07/09/2016 12:58 PM]
July 9, 2016 E-filed Appearance of Counsel processed for Attorney Amelia W. Koch for Not Party Service in 16-13596. [Entered: 07/09/2016 12:54 PM]
July 9, 2016 E-filed Appearance of Counsel processed for Attorney Michael Hiram Carpenter for Not Party Service in 16-13596. [Entered: 07/09/2016 12:38 PM]
July 9, 2016 E-filed Appearance of Counsel processed for Attorney Allison P. Fry for Appellant Walker Collision Center, Inc. in 16-13596, Attorney Allison P. Fry for Appellant Smith Brothers Collision Center, Inc. in 16-13596, Attorney Allison P. Fry for Appellant Smith Brothers Body Shop, Inc. in 16-13596, Attorney Allison P. Fry for Appellant Roy Rogers Body Shop, Inc. in 16-13596, Attorney Allison P. Fry for Appellant Ridgeland Body Shop, Inc. in 16-13596, Attorney Allison P. Fry for Appellant Protouch Collision, LLC in 16-13596, Attorney Allison P. Fry for Appellant Porter's Body Shop, Inc. in 16-13596, Attorney Allison P. Fry for Appellant Patriot Auto Body, LLC in 16-13596, Attorney Allison P. Fry for Appellant Barry Lewis in 16-13596, Attorney Allison P. Fry for Appellant Lakeshore Body Shop, Inc. in 16-13596, Attorney Allison P. Fry for Appellant Hypercolor Automotive Reconditioning, Inc. in 16-13596, Attorney Allison P. Fry for Appellant George Carr Buick Pontiac Cadillac GMC, Inc. in 16-13596, Attorney Allison P. Fry for Appellant East McComb Body Shop, Inc. in 16-13596, Attorney Allison P. Fry for Appellant Crystal Car Care, Inc. in 16-13596, Attorney Allison P. Fry for Appellant Mark Cook in 16-13596, Attorney Allison P. Fry for Appellant Clinton Body Shop, Inc. in 16-13596, Attorney Allison P. Fry for Appellant Clinton Body Shop of Richland, Inc. in 16-13596, Attorney Allison P. Fry for Appellant Canton Collision, lLC in 16-13596, Attorney Allison P. Fry for Appellant Bolden Body Shop, LLC in 16-13596, Attorney Allison P. Fry for Appellant Bill Fowler's Bodyworks, lLC in 16-13596, Attorney Allison P. Fry for Appellant B & W Body Shop, Inc in 16-13596, Attorney Allison P. Fry for Appellant Automotive Alignment & Body Service, Inc. in 16-13596, Attorney Allison P. Fry for Appellant Alexander Body Shop, LLC in 16-13596. [Entered: 07/09/2016 12:29 PM]
July 7, 2016 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Kyle Allen Diamantas for Service. (ECF: Kyle Diamantas) [Entered: 07/07/2016 01:59 PM]
July 7, 2016 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Hal Kemp Litchford for State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, State Farm Fire & Casualty Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company and Allstae property and Casualty Company. (ECF: Hal Litchford) [Entered: 07/07/2016 01:51 PM]
July 7, 2016 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Amelia W. Koch for Service. (ECF: Amelia Koch) [Entered: 07/07/2016 01:29 PM]
July 6, 2016 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Michael Hiram Carpenter for Service. (ECF: Michael Carpenter) [Entered: 07/06/2016 04:10 PM]
July 6, 2016 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Allison P. Fry for Appellants Automotive Alignment & Body Service, Inc., Alexander Body Shop, LLC, Bill Fowler's Bodyworks, lLC, Bolden Body Shop, LLC, Clinton Body Shop, Inc., Clinton Body Shop of Richland, Inc., Crystal Car Care, Inc., Hypercolor Automotive Reconditioning, Inc., Lakeshore Body Shop, Inc., Patriot Auto Body, LLC, Porter's Body Shop, Inc., Protouch Collision, LLC, Ridgeland Body Shop, Inc., Roy Rogers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Collision Center, Inc., Walker Collision Center, Inc., Mark Cook, Barry Lewis, Canton Collision, lLC, East McComb Body Shop, Inc., George Carr Buick Pontiac Cadillac GMC, Inc. and B & W Body Shop, Inc. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). (ECF: Allison Fry) [Entered: 07/06/2016 12:45 PM]
July 6, 2016 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Allison P. Fry for Appellants Automotive Alignment & Body Service, Inc., Alexander Body Shop, LLC, Bill Fowler's Bodyworks, lLC, Bolden Body Shop, LLC, Clinton Body Shop, Inc., Clinton Body Shop of Richland, Inc., Crystal Car Care, Inc., Hypercolor Automotive Reconditioning, Inc., Lakeshore Body Shop, Inc., Patriot Auto Body, LLC, Porter's Body Shop, Inc., Protouch Collision, LLC, Ridgeland Body Shop, Inc., Roy Rogers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Collision Center, Inc., Walker Collision Center, Inc., Mark Cook, Barry Lewis, Canton Collision, lLC, East McComb Body Shop, Inc., George Carr Buick Pontiac Cadillac GMC, Inc. and B & W Body Shop, Inc. No transcript is required for appeal purposes. (ECF: Allison Fry) [Entered: 07/06/2016 12:35 PM]
July 6, 2016 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Allison P. Fry for Appellants Automotive Alignment & Body Service, Inc., Alexander Body Shop, LLC, Bill Fowler's Bodyworks, lLC, Bolden Body Shop, LLC, Clinton Body Shop, Inc., Clinton Body Shop of Richland, Inc., Crystal Car Care, Inc., Hypercolor Automotive Reconditioning, Inc., Lakeshore Body Shop, Inc., Patriot Auto Body, LLC, Porter's Body Shop, Inc., Protouch Collision, LLC, Ridgeland Body Shop, Inc., Roy Rogers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Collision Center, Inc., Walker Collision Center, Inc., Mark Cook, Barry Lewis, Canton Collision, lLC, East McComb Body Shop, Inc., George Carr Buick Pontiac Cadillac GMC, Inc. and B & W Body Shop, Inc. (ECF: Allison Fry) [Entered: 07/06/2016 12:34 PM]
July 6, 2016 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Allison P. Fry for Automotive Alignment & Body Service, Inc., Alexander Body Shop, LLC, Bill Fowler's Bodyworks, lLC, Bolden Body Shop, LLC, Clinton Body Shop, Inc., Clinton Body Shop of Richland, Inc., Crystal Car Care, Inc., Hypercolor Automotive Reconditioning, Inc., Lakeshore Body Shop, Inc., Patriot Auto Body, LLC, Porter's Body Shop, Inc., Protouch Collision, LLC, Ridgeland Body Shop, Inc., Roy Rogers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Collision Center, Inc., Walker Collision Center, Inc., Mark Cook, Barry Lewis, Canton Collision, lLC, East McComb Body Shop, Inc., George Carr Buick Pontiac Cadillac GMC, Inc. and B & W Body Shop, Inc. (ECF: Allison Fry) [Entered: 07/06/2016 12:31 PM]
July 5, 2016 Appellate fee was paid on 06/21/2016, $ 505 receipt number ORL054484 re 132 Notice of appeal filed by Hypercolor Automotive Reconditioning, Inc., Bolden Body Shop, LLC, Bill Fowler's Bodyworks, LLC, Barry Lewis, George Carr Buick Pontiac Cadillac GMC, Inc., Smith Brothers Collision Center, Inc., B & W Body Shop, Inc., Canton Collision, LLC, East McComb Body Shop, Inc., Alexander Body Shop, LLC, Mark Cook, Clinton Body Shop of Richland, Inc., Crystal Car Care, Inc., Ridgeland Body Shop, Inc., Porter's Body Shop, Inc., Protouch Collision, LLC, Automotive Alignment & Body Service, Inc., Clinton Body Shop, Inc., Patriot Auto Body, LLC, Smith Brothers Body Shop, Inc., Walkers Collision Center, Inc., Lakeshore Body Shop, Inc., Roy Rogers Body Shop, Inc. [Entered: 07/05/2016 01:57 PM]
June 15, 2016 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants Alexander Body Shop, LLC, Automotive Alignment & Body Service, Inc., B & W Body Shop, Inc, Bill Fowler's Bodyworks, lLC, Bolden Body Shop, LLC, Canton Collision, lLC, Clinton Body Shop of Richland, Inc., Clinton Body Shop, Inc., Mark Cook, Crystal Car Care, Inc., East McComb Body Shop, Inc., George Carr Buick Pontiac Cadillac GMC, Inc., Hypercolor Automotive Reconditioning, Inc., Lakeshore Body Shop, Inc., Barry Lewis, Patriot Auto Body, LLC, Porter's Body Shop, Inc., Protouch Collision, LLC, Ridgeland Body Shop, Inc., Roy Rogers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Collision Center, Inc. and Walker Collision Center, Inc. on 06/14/2016. Fee Status: Fee Paid. The appellant's brief is due on or before 07/25/2016. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's CIP Due on or before 07/19/2016 as to Appellant Alexander Body Shop, LLC [Entered: 07/05/2016 01:46 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Automotive Alignment & Body Se, et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile I, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SERVICE
Represented By: Amelia W. Koch
Represented By: Lori J. Caldwell
Represented By: Keith R. Raulston
Represented By: Walker Reece Gibson
Represented By: Jamie L. Halavais
Represented By: Mark J. Botti
Represented By: David Friederich Maron
Represented By: Robert Bradley Best
Represented By: Dan W. Goldfine
Represented By: David John Barthel
Represented By: Ernest Eugene Vargo
Represented By: Kyle Allen Diamantas
Represented By: Steven F. Griffith Jr.
Represented By: Ian M. Fischer
Represented By: James R. Moore
Represented By: Clifford K. Bailey
Represented By: Neville H. Boschert
Represented By: Jackson Henderson Ables II
Represented By: Michael Beekhuizen
Represented By: Michael Edward Mumford
Represented By: Joshua Grabel
Represented By: Charles G. Copeland
Represented By: Jonathan Stuart Masters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Claire Carothers Oates
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Cashdan
Represented By: William C. Brabec
Represented By: Emily Shoemaker Newton
Represented By: Francis X. Nolan IV
Represented By: Kymberly Kochis
Represented By: Benjamin B. Morgan
Represented By: Michael R. Nelson
Represented By: Joseph T. Kissane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE CO.
Represented By: Michael Hiram Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SHELTER GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Robert Bradley Best
Represented By: Jonathan Stuart Masters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NATIONWIDE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Michael Hiram Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALLSTATE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Mark L. Hanover
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Bonnie Lau
Represented By: William C. Griffin
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Jamie L. Halavais
Represented By: Dan W. Goldfine
Represented By: Ian M. Fischer
Represented By: Joshua Grabel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS
Represented By: Ernest Eugene Vargo
Represented By: Michael Edward Mumford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PROGRESSIVE GULF INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Claire Carothers Oates
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Cashdan
Represented By: William C. Brabec
Represented By: Emily Shoemaker Newton
Represented By: Francis X. Nolan IV
Represented By: Kymberly Kochis
Represented By: Benjamin B. Morgan
Represented By: Michael R. Nelson
Represented By: Joseph T. Kissane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY COMPANY
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Daniel D. Birk
Represented By: Tiffany Lynne Powers
Represented By: Michael L. McCluggage
Represented By: Emerson Barney Robinson III
Represented By: Johanna W. Clark
Represented By: Elizabeth Helmer
Represented By: Michael P. Kenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY
Represented By: Jamie L. Halavais
Represented By: Dan W. Goldfine
Represented By: Ian M. Fischer
Represented By: Joshua Grabel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Hal Kemp Litchford
Represented By: Daniel D. Birk
Represented By: Tiffany Lynne Powers
Represented By: Michael L. McCluggage
Represented By: Emerson Barney Robinson III
Represented By: Johanna W. Clark
Represented By: Elizabeth Helmer
Represented By: Michael P. Kenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BOLDEN BODY SHOP, LLC
Represented By: Mark L. Shurtleff
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves Jr.
Represented By: Ellie F. Turnage
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Halbert Edwin Dockins Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CANTON COLLISION, LLC
Represented By: Mark L. Shurtleff
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves Jr.
Represented By: Ellie F. Turnage
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Halbert Edwin Dockins Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SMITH BROTHERS COLLISION CENTER, INC.
Represented By: Mark L. Shurtleff
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves Jr.
Represented By: Ellie F. Turnage
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Halbert Edwin Dockins Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GEORGE CARR BUICK PONTIAC CADILLAC GMC, INC.
Represented By: Mark L. Shurtleff
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves Jr.
Represented By: Ellie F. Turnage
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Halbert Edwin Dockins Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PROTOUCH COLLISION, LLC, d/b/a Boler-Phillips Body Shop
Represented By: Mark L. Shurtleff
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves Jr.
Represented By: Ellie F. Turnage
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Halbert Edwin Dockins Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LAKESHORE BODY SHOP, INC.
Represented By: Mark L. Shurtleff
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves Jr.
Represented By: Ellie F. Turnage
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Halbert Edwin Dockins Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CLINTON BODY SHOP OF RICHLAND, INC.
Represented By: Mark L. Shurtleff
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves Jr.
Represented By: Ellie F. Turnage
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Halbert Edwin Dockins Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PATRIOT AUTO BODY, LLC
Represented By: Mark L. Shurtleff
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves Jr.
Represented By: Ellie F. Turnage
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Halbert Edwin Dockins Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BARRY LEWIS, Individually and d/b/a European Coachworks, LTD.
Represented By: Mark L. Shurtleff
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves Jr.
Represented By: Ellie F. Turnage
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Halbert Edwin Dockins Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RIDGELAND BODY SHOP, INC.
Represented By: Mark L. Shurtleff
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves Jr.
Represented By: Ellie F. Turnage
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Halbert Edwin Dockins Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CRYSTAL CAR CARE, INC.
Represented By: Mark L. Shurtleff
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves Jr.
Represented By: Ellie F. Turnage
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Halbert Edwin Dockins Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: AUTOMOTIVE ALIGNMENT & BODY SERVICE, INC., d.b.a. Pitalo Auto Paint & Body
Represented By: Mark L. Shurtleff
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves Jr.
Represented By: Ellie F. Turnage
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Halbert Edwin Dockins Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARK COOK, Individually and d/b/a European Coachworks, LTD.
Represented By: Mark L. Shurtleff
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves Jr.
Represented By: Ellie F. Turnage
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Halbert Edwin Dockins Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BILL FOWLER'S BODYWORKS, LLC
Represented By: Mark L. Shurtleff
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves Jr.
Represented By: Ellie F. Turnage
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Halbert Edwin Dockins Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ALEXANDER BODY SHOP, LLC
Represented By: Mark L. Shurtleff
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves Jr.
Represented By: Ellie F. Turnage
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Halbert Edwin Dockins Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: HYPERCOLOR AUTOMOTIVE RECONDITIONING, INC., d.b.a. Autoworks Collision Specialist
Represented By: Mark L. Shurtleff
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves Jr.
Represented By: Ellie F. Turnage
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Halbert Edwin Dockins Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PORTER'S BODY SHOP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: EAST MCCOMB BODY SHOP, INC.
Represented By: Mark L. Shurtleff
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves Jr.
Represented By: Ellie F. Turnage
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Halbert Edwin Dockins Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: B & W BODY SHOP, INC
Represented By: Mark L. Shurtleff
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves Jr.
Represented By: Ellie F. Turnage
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Halbert Edwin Dockins Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CLINTON BODY SHOP, INC.
Represented By: Mark L. Shurtleff
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves Jr.
Represented By: Ellie F. Turnage
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Halbert Edwin Dockins Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WALKER COLLISION CENTER, INC.
Represented By: Mark L. Shurtleff
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves Jr.
Represented By: Ellie F. Turnage
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Halbert Edwin Dockins Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SMITH BROTHERS BODY SHOP, INC.
Represented By: Mark L. Shurtleff
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves Jr.
Represented By: Ellie F. Turnage
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Halbert Edwin Dockins Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROY ROGERS BODY SHOP, INC.
Represented By: Mark L. Shurtleff
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves Jr.
Represented By: Ellie F. Turnage
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Halbert Edwin Dockins Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?