Antoine Leonard, et al v. Swissport SA, LLC
Plaintiff / Appellant: DUPERVAL RENE, others similarly situated, RODRIGUE SYLVESTRE, others similarly situated, EVENS SAEL, others similarly situated, TIMOTHY GREEN, others similarly situated, MARC H. PIERRE, others similarly situated, OMAR PHILLIPS, others similarly situated, FEDNER CHARLES ASEMY, others similarly situated, JUNIOR SPENCER, others similarly situated, FUMILAYO FADIPE, others similarly situated, ROBERSON PIERRE, others similarly situated, JEAN D. CHRISTIAN, others similarly situated, TVAUGHN RIGBY, others similarly situated, JOHN DARREL, others similarly situated, VILNES JUSMA, others similarly situated, JOVANNY F. SANQUINTIN CHECO, others similarly situated, JUANY JEAN LOUIS, others similarly situated, LESLY JOSEPH, others similarly situated, BERGILIN JEAN LOUIS, others similarly situated, ERIC GAMARRA, others similarly situated, DIEUVERSON FANFAN, others similarly situated, JERMAINE FINLEY, others similarly situated, YVNER SIDO, others similarly situated, JEAN G. LOUIS, others similarly situated, CHRISTOPHER DIAZ, others similarly situated, JULES MAKENLY, others similarly situated, FRED JOSEPH, others similarly situated, JONATHAN SILVA, others similarly situated, LEEKING MADOO, others similarly situated, CARLOS NEIRA, others similarly situated, FRANCISCO MORALES, others similarly situated and ANTOINE LEONARD, others similarly situated
Defendant / Appellee: SWISSPORT SA, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company doing business as Servisair LLC
Case Number: 17-12147
Filed: May 10, 2017
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2018 ENTRY OF DISMISSAL: Pursuant to Appellants Fedner Charles Asemy, Jovanny F. Sanquintin Checo, Jean D. Christian, John Darrel, Christopher Diaz, Fumilayo Fadipe, Dieuverson Fanfan, Jermaine Finley, Eric Gamarra, Timothy Green, Fred Joseph, Lesly Joseph, Vilnes Jusma, Antoine Leonard, Bergilin Jean Louis, Jean G. Louis, Juany Jean Louis, Leeking Madoo, Jules Makenly, Francisco Morales, Carlos Neira, Omar Phillips, Marc H. Pierre, Roberson Pierre, Duperval Rene, Tvaughn Rigby, Evens Sael, Yvner Sido, Jonathan Silva, Junior Spencer, Rodrigue Sylvestre and Appellee Swissport SA, LLC's motion for voluntary dismissal, FRAP Rule 42 and 11th Cir. R. 42-1(a), the above referenced appeal was duly entered dismissed on this date [Entered: 01/11/2018 10:00 AM]
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion to voluntarily dismiss appeal filed by Appellee Swissport SA, LLC is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 8342657-2 ] [Entered: 01/11/2018 09:58 AM]
January 5, 2018 MOTION to voluntarily dismiss appeal filed by Swissport SA, LLC. Joint Stipulation of Parties. [8342657-1] (ECF: Patrick Muldowney) [Entered: 01/05/2018 02:15 PM]
June 19, 2017 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Christopher Francisco Zacarias for Appellants Antoine Leonard, Bergilin Jean Louis, Carlos Neira, Dieuverson Fanfan, Duperval Rene, Evens Sael, Fedner Charles Asemy, Francisco Morales, Fred Joseph, Jean D. Christian, Jean G. Louis, Jermaine Finley, Jonathan Silva, Jovanny F. Sanquintin Checo, Juany Jean Louis, Jules Makenly, Junior Spencer, Lesly Joseph, Marc H. Pierre, Roberson Pierre, Rodrigue Sylvestre, Tvaughn Rigby, Vilnes Jusma, Yvner Sido, Christopher Diaz, Omar Phillips, John Darrel, Timothy Green, Fumilayo Fadipe, Eric Gamarra and Leeking Madoo. [Entered: 06/19/2017 02:47 PM]
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion for Leave to File Civil Appeal Statement out of time filed by Appellants Antoine Leonard, Bergilin Jean Louis, Carlos Neira, Dieuverson Fanfan, Duperval Rene, Evens Sael, Fedner Charles Asemy, Francisco Morales, Fred Joseph, Jean D. Christian, Jean G. Louis, Jermaine Finley, Jonathan Silva, Jovanny F. Sanquintin Checo, Juany Jean Louis, Jules Makenly, Junior Spencer, Lesly Joseph, Marc H. Pierre, Roberson Pierre, Rodrigue Sylvestre, Tvaughn Rigby, Vilnes Jusma, Yvner Sido, Christopher Diaz, Omar Phillips, John Darrel, Timothy Green, Fumilayo Fadipe, Eric Gamarra and Leeking Madoo is GRANTED by Clerk. [ # 8160914-2 ] [Entered: 06/19/2017 02:44 PM]
June 15, 2017 MOTION for leave to file Civil Appeal Statement out of time filed by Fedner Charles Asemy, Jovanny F. Sanquintin Checo, Jean D. Christian, John Darrel, Christopher Diaz, Fumilayo Fadipe, Dieuverson Fanfan, Jermaine Finley, Eric Gamarra, Timothy Green, Fred Joseph, Lesly Joseph, Vilnes Jusma, Antoine Leonard, Bergilin Jean Louis, Jean G. Louis, Juany Jean Louis, Leeking Madoo, Jules Makenly, Francisco Morales, Carlos Neira, Omar Phillips, Marc H. Pierre, Roberson Pierre, Duperval Rene, Tvaughn Rigby, Evens Sael, Yvner Sido, Jonathan Silva, Junior Spencer and Rodrigue Sylvestre. Motion is Unopposed. [8160914-1] (ECF: Christopher Zacarias) [Entered: 06/15/2017 06:57 PM]
June 13, 2017 The briefing schedule issued to Appellant Fedner Charles Asemy is hereby rescinded for the following reason(s): FRAP 4 pending in District Court. When the above matter(s) is resolved, the clerk will issue a notice advising counsel and the parties of the new schedule for filing briefs in this appeal. [Entered: 06/13/2017 08:34 AM]
June 13, 2017 Jurisdiction: FRAP 4 or Restitution motion pending in district court as to Appellant Fedner Charles Asemy DE #: (Doc. 20) [Entered: 06/13/2017 08:32 AM]
June 13, 2017 Attorney Christopher Francisco Zacarias for Appellants Antoine Leonard, Bergilin Jean Louis, Carlos Neira, Dieuverson Fanfan, Duperval Rene, Evens Sael, Fedner Charles Asemy, Francisco Morales, Fred Joseph, Jean D. Christian, Jean G. Louis, Jermaine Finley, Jonathan Silva, Jovanny F. Sanquintin Checo, Juany Jean Louis, Jules Makenly, Junior Spencer, Lesly Joseph, Marc H. Pierre, Roberson Pierre, Rodrigue Sylvestre, Tvaughn Rigby, Vilnes Jusma, Yvner Sido, Christopher Diaz, Omar Phillips, John Darrel, Timothy Green, Fumilayo Fadipe, Eric Gamarra and Leeking Madoo has been notified that upon expiration of fourteen (14) days from this date, this appeal will be dismissed by the clerk without further notice unless the required Civil Appeal Statement has been received. A motion to file the Civil Appeal Statement out of time should also be filed at this time. [Entered: 06/13/2017 08:30 AM]
June 7, 2017 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Patrick Muldowney for Appellee Swissport SA, LLC. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). (ECF: Patrick Muldowney) [Entered: 06/07/2017 03:47 PM]
May 30, 2017 E-filed Appearance of Counsel processed for Attorney Patrick Muldowney for Appellee Swissport SA, LLC in 17-12147. [Entered: 05/30/2017 09:52 AM]
May 25, 2017 E-filed Appearance of Counsel processed for Attorney Meagan Leigh Martin for Appellee Swissport SA, LLC in 17-12147. [Entered: 05/25/2017 01:38 PM]
May 25, 2017 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Meagan Leigh Martin for Swissport SA, LLC. (ECF: Meagan Martin) [Entered: 05/25/2017 11:44 AM]
May 25, 2017 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Patrick Muldowney for Swissport SA, LLC. (ECF: Patrick Muldowney) [Entered: 05/25/2017 09:38 AM]
May 25, 2017 E-filed Appearance of Counsel processed for Attorney Christopher Francisco Zacarias for Appellant Rodrigue Sylvestre in 17-12147, Attorney Christopher Francisco Zacarias for Appellant Junior Spencer in 17-12147, Attorney Christopher Francisco Zacarias for Appellant Jonathan Silva in 17-12147. [Entered: 05/25/2017 07:43 AM]
May 24, 2017 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Christopher Francisco Zacarias for Antoine Leonard, Bergilin Jean Louis, Carlos Neira, Dieuverson Fanfan, Duperval Rene, Evens Sael, Fedner Charles Asemy, Francisco Morales, Fred Joseph, Jean D. Christian, Jean G. Louis, Jermaine Finley, Jonathan Silva, Jovanny F. Sanquintin Checo, Juany Jean Louis, Jules Makenly, Junior Spencer, Lesly Joseph, Marc H. Pierre, Roberson Pierre, Rodrigue Sylvestre, Tvaughn Rigby, Vilnes Jusma, Yvner Sido, Christopher Diaz, Omar Phillips, John Darrel, Timothy Green, Fumilayo Fadipe, Eric Gamarra and Leeking Madoo. (ECF: Christopher Zacarias) [Entered: 05/24/2017 11:29 PM]
May 24, 2017 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). (ECF: Christopher Zacarias) [Entered: 05/24/2017 11:20 PM]
May 15, 2017 Appellate fee was paid on 05/09/2017 as to Appellant Fedner Charles Asemy. [Entered: 05/15/2017 08:28 AM]
May 10, 2017 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants Fedner Charles Asemy, Jovanny F. Sanquintin Checo, Jean D. Christian, John Darrel, Christopher Diaz, Fumilayo Fadipe, Dieuverson Fanfan, Jermaine Finley, Eric Gamarra, Timothy Green, Fred Joseph, Lesly Joseph, Vilnes Jusma, Antoine Leonard, Bergilin Jean Louis, Jean G. Louis, Juany Jean Louis, Leeking Madoo, Jules Makenly, Francisco Morales, Carlos Neira, Omar Phillips, Roberson Piere, Marc H. Pierre, Duperval Rene, Tvaughn Rigby, Evens Sael, Yvner Sido, Jonathan Silva, Junior Spencer and Rodrigue Sylvestre on 05/09/2017. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 06/19/2017. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/24/2017 as to Appellant Fedner Charles Asemy. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 06/07/2017 as to Appellee Swissport SA, LLC [Entered: 05/15/2017 08:25 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Antoine Leonard, et al v. Swissport SA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DUPERVAL RENE, others similarly situated
Represented By: Christopher Francisco Zacarias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RODRIGUE SYLVESTRE, others similarly situated
Represented By: Christopher Francisco Zacarias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: EVENS SAEL, others similarly situated
Represented By: Christopher Francisco Zacarias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TIMOTHY GREEN, others similarly situated
Represented By: Christopher Francisco Zacarias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARC H. PIERRE, others similarly situated
Represented By: Christopher Francisco Zacarias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: OMAR PHILLIPS, others similarly situated
Represented By: Christopher Francisco Zacarias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: FEDNER CHARLES ASEMY, others similarly situated
Represented By: Christopher Francisco Zacarias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JUNIOR SPENCER, others similarly situated
Represented By: Christopher Francisco Zacarias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: FUMILAYO FADIPE, others similarly situated
Represented By: Christopher Francisco Zacarias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROBERSON PIERRE, others similarly situated
Represented By: Christopher Francisco Zacarias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JEAN D. CHRISTIAN, others similarly situated
Represented By: Christopher Francisco Zacarias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TVAUGHN RIGBY, others similarly situated
Represented By: Christopher Francisco Zacarias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOHN DARREL, others similarly situated
Represented By: Christopher Francisco Zacarias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: VILNES JUSMA, others similarly situated
Represented By: Christopher Francisco Zacarias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOVANNY F. SANQUINTIN CHECO, others similarly situated
Represented By: Christopher Francisco Zacarias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JUANY JEAN LOUIS, others similarly situated
Represented By: Christopher Francisco Zacarias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LESLY JOSEPH, others similarly situated
Represented By: Christopher Francisco Zacarias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BERGILIN JEAN LOUIS, others similarly situated
Represented By: Christopher Francisco Zacarias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ERIC GAMARRA, others similarly situated
Represented By: Christopher Francisco Zacarias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DIEUVERSON FANFAN, others similarly situated
Represented By: Christopher Francisco Zacarias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JERMAINE FINLEY, others similarly situated
Represented By: Christopher Francisco Zacarias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: YVNER SIDO, others similarly situated
Represented By: Christopher Francisco Zacarias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JEAN G. LOUIS, others similarly situated
Represented By: Christopher Francisco Zacarias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CHRISTOPHER DIAZ, others similarly situated
Represented By: Christopher Francisco Zacarias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JULES MAKENLY, others similarly situated
Represented By: Christopher Francisco Zacarias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: FRED JOSEPH, others similarly situated
Represented By: Christopher Francisco Zacarias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JONATHAN SILVA, others similarly situated
Represented By: Christopher Francisco Zacarias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LEEKING MADOO, others similarly situated
Represented By: Christopher Francisco Zacarias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CARLOS NEIRA, others similarly situated
Represented By: Christopher Francisco Zacarias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: FRANCISCO MORALES, others similarly situated
Represented By: Christopher Francisco Zacarias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ANTOINE LEONARD, others similarly situated
Represented By: Christopher Francisco Zacarias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SWISSPORT SA, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company doing business as Servisair LLC
Represented By: Patrick Muldowney
Represented By: Meagan Leigh Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?