Mathis Wright, Jr. v. Sumter Co. Board of Elections
Plaintiff / Appellee: MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR., P O BOX 304 217 FORREST ST AMERICUS, GA 31709 229-924-0880
Defendant / Appellant: SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION
Case Number: 18-11510
Filed: April 12, 2018
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2020 Public Communication: Notice to counsel that in light of the COVID-19 pandemic the oral arguments scheduled for the week of September 21, 2020 will be telephonically argued. [18-11510, 18-13510, 20-10394] [Entered: 08/24/2020 01:43 PM]
June 29, 2020 Oral argument scheduled. Argument Date: Wednesday, 09/23/2020 Argument Location: Atlanta. [18-11510, 18-13510, 20-10394] [Entered: 06/28/2020 02:51 PM]
June 29, 2020 Oral argument scheduled. Argument Date: Wednesday, 09/23/2020 Argument Location: Atlanta. [18-11510, 18-13510, 20-10394] [Entered: 06/28/2020 02:51 PM]
June 24, 2020 Attorney E. Mark Braden for Appellant Sumter County Board of Elections and Registration hereby acknowledges receipt of a copy of the printed calendar for 09/21/2020. E. Mark Braden, 202-820-1504; Richard Raile, 202-820-1711 will present argument. [18-11510] (ECF: E. Mark Braden) [Entered: 06/24/2020 06:39 PM]
June 24, 2020 Attorney Bryan L. Sells for Appellee Mathis Kearse Wright, Jr. hereby acknowledges receipt of a copy of the printed calendar for 09/23/2020. Bryan Sells 404-480-4212 will present argument. [18-11510] (ECF: Bryan Sells) [Entered: 06/24/2020 01:53 PM]
June 24, 2020 Calendar issued as to cases to be orally argued the week of 09/21/2020 in Atlanta, Georgia. Counsel are directed to electronically acknowledge receipt of this calendar by docketing the Calendar Receipt Acknowledged event in ECF. [18-11510, 18-13510, 20-10394] [Entered: 06/24/2020 01:27 PM]
June 9, 2020 Letter to Clerk of Court re placing cases on next available argument calendar filed by Attorney Katherine McKnight for Appellant Sumter County Board of Elections and Registration. [18-11510] (ECF: Katherine McKnight) [Entered: 06/09/2020 11:29 AM]
June 4, 2020 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Appellant Sumter County Board of Elections and Registration in 18-11510, 18-13510, 20-10394. [18-11510, 18-13510, 20-10394] [Entered: 06/10/2020 10:14 AM]
June 1, 2020 Appellant's Supplemental Brief filed by Appellant Sumter County Board of Elections and Registration. [18-11510] (ECF: E. Mark Braden) [Entered: 06/01/2020 05:41 PM]
May 27, 2020 Notice of deficient Brief filed by Bryan L. Sells for Mathis Kearse Wright, Jr. in 18-11510, 18-13510, 20-10394. The supplemental brief was only filed in one appeal. Please file in the other two appeals.. [18-11510, 18-13510, 20-10394] [Entered: 05/27/2020 10:22 AM]
May 26, 2020 Received paper copies of EAppendix filed by Appellee Mathis Kearse Wright, Jr. in 18-11510, 18-13510, 20-10394. 2 VOLUMES - 5 COPIES [18-11510, 18-13510, 20-10394] [Entered: 05/29/2020 11:41 AM]
May 26, 2020 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Appellee Mathis Kearse Wright, Jr. in 18-11510, 18-13510, 20-10394. [18-11510, 18-13510, 20-10394] [Entered: 05/29/2020 11:41 AM]
May 21, 2020 Supplemental Appendix [2 VOLUMES] filed by Appellee Mathis Kearse Wright, Jr.. [18-11510] (ECF: Bryan Sells) [Entered: 05/21/2020 02:52 PM]
May 21, 2020 Appellee's Supplemental Brief filed by Appellee Mathis Kearse Wright, Jr.. [18-11510] (ECF: Bryan Sells) [Entered: 05/21/2020 02:32 PM]
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion to withdraw as counsel filed by Aklima Khondoker is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 9079230-2 ] in 18-11510, ORDER: Motion to withdraw as counsel filed by Aklima Khondoker is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 9079240-2 ] in 18-13510 Attorney terminated: Attorney Aklima Khondoker for Appellee Mathis Kearse Wright Jr. in 18-11510 and Appellee Mathis Kearse Wright Jr. in 18-13510. [18-11510, 18-13510] [Entered: 05/07/2020 02:03 PM]
May 6, 2020 MOTION to withdraw as counsel filed by Attorney Aklima Khondoker for Appellee Mathis Kearse Wright, Jr.. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [9079230-1] [18-11510] (ECF: Aklima Khondoker) [Entered: 05/06/2020 08:53 AM]
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: Before the Court is Appellants Time-Sensitive Renewed and Amended Motion to Consolidate and Expedite and for Other Relief. The motion is GRANTED, IN PART, to the extent the Court consolidates case no. 20-10394 with consolidated case nos. 18-11510 and 18-13510 for merits disposition. The motion is DENIED, IN PART, to the extent it asks the Court to dispense with the briefing requirement in case no. 20-10394 entirely. Instead, the Court DIRECTS that: (1) within 21 days after the date of this order, Wright file a supplemental brief, containing no more than 20 pages, concerning the relevance, if any, of the remedial proceedings underlying case no. 20-10394 to the merits of the consolidated cases; and (2) within 21 days after the deadline for Wrights supplemental brief, the County file a response brief, containing no more than 20 pages. By the filing date of each partys supplemental brief, each party may file supplemental appendices, as necessary, with materials not included in appendices filed in case nos. 18-11510 and 18-13510. The motion is DENIED, IN PART, to the extent it requests that the cases be resolved without oral argument, and the motion is GRANTED, IN PART, to the extent it requests expedited oral argument. The Clerk is DIRECTED to place these cases on the next available argument calendar following the completion of supplemental briefing. [ # 9057748-2 ] [ # 9057751-2 ] [ # 9057741-2 ] [ # 9057748-3 ] [ # 9057751-3 ] [ # 9057741-3 ]. BBM, ELB and BL [18-11510, 18-13510, 20-10394] [Entered: 04/30/2020 11:01 AM]
April 20, 2020 Reply to response filed by Appellant Sumter County Board of Elections and Registration. [18-11510]--[Edited 04/23/2020 by CB] (ECF: E. Mark Braden) [Entered: 04/20/2020 10:44 AM]
April 17, 2020 RESPONSE to Motion to consolidate appeals filed by Appellant Sumter County Board of Elections and Registration [ # 9057748-2 ], Motion to expedite disposition filed by Appellant Sumter County Board of Elections and Registration [ # 9057748-3 ] filed by Attorney Bryan L. Sells for Appellee Mathis Kearse Wright, Jr.. [18-11510] (ECF: Bryan Sells) [Entered: 04/17/2020 03:50 PM]
April 9, 2020 USDC order on limited remand as to Appellant Sumter County Board of Elections and Registration in 18-11510, 18-13510 filed on 04/08/2020. Docket Entry 303. [18-11510, 18-13510] [Entered: 04/09/2020 02:02 PM]
April 9, 2020 TIME SENSITIVE MOTION to consolidate appeals 18-11510, 18-13510 and 20-10394, to expedite disposition filed by Sumter County Board of Elections and Registration. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [9057748-1] [18-11510] (ECF: E. Mark Braden) [Entered: 04/09/2020 01:17 PM]
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion to withdraw as counsel filed by Laughlin McDonald is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 9019699-2 ] in 18-11510, ORDER: Motion to withdraw as counsel filed by Appellee Mathis Kearse Wright, Jr. is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 9019972-2 ] in 18-13510 Attorney terminated: Attorney Laughlin McDonald for Appellee Mathis Kearse Wright Jr. in 18-11510 and Appellee Mathis Kearse Wright Jr. in 18-13510. [18-11510, 18-13510] [Entered: 03/03/2020 01:25 PM]
February 26, 2020 MOTION to withdraw as counsel filed by Attorney Laughlin McDonald for Appellee Mathis Kearse Wright, Jr.. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [9019699-1] [18-11510] (ECF: Laughlin McDonald) [Entered: 02/26/2020 05:50 PM]
February 24, 2020 Reply to response filed by Appellant Sumter County Board of Elections and Registration. [18-11510] (ECF: E. Mark Braden) [Entered: 02/24/2020 04:36 PM]
February 18, 2020 RESPONSE to Motion to consolidate appeals filed by Appellant Sumter County Board of Elections and Registration [ # 9001809-2 ], Motion to expedite oral argument filed by Appellant Sumter County Board of Elections and Registration [ # 9001809-3 ] filed by Attorney Bryan L. Sells for Appellee Mathis Kearse Wright, Jr.. [18-11510] (ECF: Bryan Sells) [Entered: 02/17/2020 04:24 PM]
February 12, 2020 Response to Supplemental Authority (28J) filed by Appellee Mathis Kearse Wright, Jr.. [18-11510] (ECF: Bryan Sells) [Entered: 02/12/2020 06:28 PM]
February 5, 2020 Supplemental Authority filed by Appellant Sumter County Board of Elections and Registration. [18-11510] (ECF: E. Mark Braden) [Entered: 02/05/2020 04:45 PM]
February 5, 2020 MOTION to consolidate appeals 18-11510, 18-13510, and 20-10394, to expedite oral argument filed by Sumter County Board of Elections and Registration. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [9001809-1] [18-11510] (ECF: E. Mark Braden) [Entered: 02/05/2020 03:54 PM]
May 21, 2019 Oral argument continued. To be rescheduled for a future date. [18-11510, 18-13510] [Entered: 05/21/2019 09:54 AM]
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Plaintiff-Appellees Motion for a Limited Remand is GRANTED. [ # 8757315-2 ] [ # 8746828-2 ] - ENTERED FOR THE COURT - BY DIRECTION [18-11510, 18-13510] [Entered: 05/16/2019 02:24 PM]
May 13, 2019 Oral argument scheduled. Argument Date: Wednesday, 07/24/2019 Argument Location: Atlanta Courtroom: Atlanta 338. [Entered: 05/13/2019 10:23 AM]
May 10, 2019 Attorney Laughlin McDonald for Appellee Mathis Kearse Wright, Jr. hereby acknowledges receipt of a copy of the printed calendar for 07/24/2019. Bryan L. Sells, 404-480-4212 will present argument. [18-11510] (ECF: Laughlin McDonald) [Entered: 05/10/2019 12:32 PM]
May 10, 2019 Attorney Bryan L. Sells for Appellee Mathis Kearse Wright, Jr. hereby acknowledges receipt of a copy of the printed calendar for 07/24/2019. Bryan L. Sells, 404-480-4212 will present argument. [18-11510] (ECF: Bryan Sells) [Entered: 05/10/2019 11:27 AM]
May 10, 2019 Calendar issued as to cases to be orally argued the week of 07/22/2019 in Atlanta, Georgia. Counsel are directed to electronically acknowledge receipt of this calendar by docketing the Calendar Receipt Acknowledged event in ECF. Counsel must be logged into CM/ECF in order to view the attached calendar. [18-11510, 18-13510] [Entered: 05/10/2019 09:25 AM]
April 30, 2019 Reply to response filed by Appellee Mathis Kearse Wright, Jr.. [18-11510] (ECF: Bryan Sells) [Entered: 04/30/2019 02:42 PM]
April 26, 2019 RESPONSE to Motion to remand on a limited basis filed by Appellee Mathis Kearse Wright, Jr. [ # 8757315-2 ] filed by Attorney E. Mark Braden for Appellant Sumter County Board of Elections and Registration. [18-11510] (ECF: E. Mark Braden) [Entered: 04/26/2019 02:56 PM]
April 26, 2019 MOTION to remand this appeal on a limited basis to the district court. filed by Mathis Kearse Wright, Jr.. Motion is Opposed. [8757315-1] [18-11510] (ECF: Bryan Sells) [Entered: 04/26/2019 02:44 PM]
March 29, 2019 Assigned to tentative calendar number 25 in Atlanta during the week of July 22, 2019. Counsel must be logged into CM/ECF in order to view the attached calendar. [18-11510, 18-13510] [Entered: 03/29/2019 04:17 PM]
March 28, 2019 Additional copies of Appendix received from Bryan L. Sells for Mathis Kearse Wright, Jr. in 18-11510 and forwarded to the record room. [18-11510, 18-13510] [Entered: 03/28/2019 04:13 PM]
March 26, 2019 The Court has determined that oral argument will be necessary in this case. Please forward 3 additional copies of the 1 volumes of Supplemental Appendix, which conform to all formatting requirements, filed 2/6/19 by Attorney Bryan L. Sells for Appellee Mathis Kearse Wright, Jr. in 18-11510 to the Clerk's Office, Attention: Jenifer Tubbs. Your prompt attention to this matter is appreciated. [18-11510, 18-13510] [Entered: 03/26/2019 05:08 PM]
February 25, 2019 Received reply paper copies of EBrief filed by Appellant Sumter County Board of Elections and Registration in 18-11510, 18-13510. [18-11510, 18-13510] [Entered: 02/26/2019 11:15 AM]
February 22, 2019 Reply Brief filed by Appellant Sumter County Board of Elections and Registration. [18-11510] (ECF: E. Mark Braden) [Entered: 02/22/2019 03:25 PM]
February 7, 2019 Received paper copies of EAppendix filed by Appellee Mathis Kearse Wright, Jr. in 18-11510, 18-13510. 1 VOLUMES - 2 COPIES [18-11510, 18-13510] [Entered: 02/07/2019 02:37 PM]
February 6, 2019 Supplemental Appendix [1 VOLUMES - 2 sets] filed by Attorney Bryan L. Sells for Appellee Mathis Kearse Wright, Jr.. Service date: 02/06/2019 email - Attorney for Appellants: Braden, McKnight, Raile, Reid; Attorney for Appellees: Khondoker, McDonald, Sells; US mail - Attorney for Appellant: Stanley. [Entered: 02/26/2019 11:11 AM]
February 4, 2019 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Appellee Mathis Kearse Wright, Jr. in 18-13510, 18-11510. [18-13510, 18-11510] [Entered: 02/05/2019 09:46 AM]
February 1, 2019 Appellee's Brief filed by Appellee Mathis Kearse Wright, Jr.. Service date: 02/01/2019 email - Attorney for Appellants: Braden, McKnight, Raile, Reid; Attorney for Appellees: Khondoker, McDonald, Sells; US mail - Attorney for Appellant: Stanley. [Entered: 02/26/2019 11:05 AM]
January 9, 2019 Briefing Notice issued to Appellee Mathis Kearse Wright, Jr. in 18-11510, 18-13510. Appellee's brief is due on or before 02/08/2019. [18-11510, 18-13510] [Entered: 01/09/2019 01:43 PM]
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Before the Court is "Plaintiff-Appellee's Motion for a Limited Remand or, in the Alternative, to Strike Portions of the Appellant's Brief that Rely on Evidence Outside the Record." The motion is, DENIED, IN PART, to the extent Appellee seeks a limited remand. Appellee's request that the Court strike portions of Appellant's Brief in case no. 18-13510 is CARRIED WITH THE CASE. [ # 8664681-2 ]. [ # 8631036-2 ]. [ # 8631036-3 ] CRW and JP [18-11510, 18-13510] [Entered: 01/09/2019 01:39 PM]
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER: Appellee's motion to stay the briefing schedule pending the resolution of his motion for a limited remand is GRANTED. Appellee's brief is due thirty days from the date of the Court's order addressing his motion or a limited remand. [ # 8632991-2 ]. RSR [18-11510, 18-13510] [Entered: 12/26/2018 03:17 PM]
November 28, 2018 TIME SENSITIVE MOTION to remand this appeal on a limited basis to the district court, strikes portions of the appellant's brief that rely on evidence outside the record filed by Mathis Kearse Wright, Jr.. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [8664681-1] [Entered: 01/09/2019 01:32 PM]
November 27, 2018 Briefing Notice issued to Appellee Mathis Kearse Wright, Jr.. Appellee's brief is due on or before 12/26/2018. [Entered: 11/27/2018 02:40 PM]
October 31, 2018 The briefing schedule issued to Appellee Mathis Kearse Wright, Jr. is hereby rescinded for the following reason(s): Appellee's briefing schedule rescinded, awaiting appellant's brief in 18-13510.. When the above matter(s) is resolved, the clerk will issue a notice advising counsel and the parties of the new schedule for filing briefs in this appeal. [Entered: 10/31/2018 11:07 AM]
October 30, 2018 PROBABLE JURISDICTION noted after issuance of a Jurisdictional Question as to Appellant Sumter County Board of Elections and Registration. [Entered: 10/30/2018 01:58 PM]
October 11, 2018 Absent objection filed within 14 days of this letter, this appeal will be consolidated by the Clerk with 18-13510 pursuant to FRAP 3(b)(2) and 11th Cir. R. 12-2. [18-11510, 18-13510] [Entered: 10/11/2018 03:32 PM]
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER: Before the Court is Appellants August 21, 2018, Renewed Emergency Motion to Vacate or Stay Injunction Pending Appeal and to Consolidate, which incorporates Appellants August 20, 2018, Emergency Motion to Vacate or Stay Injunction Pending Appeal. To the extent Appellant seeks a stay or vacatur of the district courts injunction, the motion is DENIED. To the extent Appellant seeks consolidation of case nos. 18-11510 and 18-13510, the motion is GRANTED. [ # 8541431-2 ],. [ # 8542634-2 ]. [ # 8541431-3 ]. [ # 8542634-3 ]. [ # 8542634-4 ] GBT, RSR and KCN [18-11510, 18-13510] [Entered: 08/24/2018 08:36 AM]
August 23, 2018 Response filed by Bryan L. Sells for Mathis Kearse Wright, Jr. pursuant to court order dated 08/21/2018. (ECF: Bryan Sells) [Entered: 08/23/2018 09:59 AM]
August 22, 2018 Reply to response filed by Appellant Sumter County Board of Elections and Registration. (ECF: E. Mark Braden) [Entered: 08/22/2018 05:55 PM]
August 22, 2018 RESPONSE to Motion to vacate lower court order filed by Appellant Sumter County Board of Elections and Registration in 18-11510 [ # 8541431-2 ], Motion for stay of injunction filed by Appellant Sumter County Board of Elections and Registration in 18-11510 [ # 8541431-3 ] filed by Attorney Bryan L. Sells for Appellee Mathis Kearse Wright, Jr.. (ECF: Bryan Sells) [Entered: 08/22/2018 02:00 PM]
August 21, 2018 EMERGENCY MOTION vacate lower court order, for stay of injunction filed by Sumter County Board of Elections and Registration. Motion is Opposed. [8542634-1] (ECF: E. Mark Braden) [Entered: 08/21/2018 12:47 PM]
August 21, 2018 JURISDICTIONAL QUESTION issued as to Sumter County Board of Elections and Registration and Mathis Kearse Wright, Jr.. [Entered: 08/21/2018 11:07 AM]
August 20, 2018 USDC order on limited remand as to Appellant Sumter County Board of Elections and Registration filed on 08/20/2018. Docket Entry 239. [Entered: 09/12/2018 03:19 PM]
August 20, 2018 EMERGENCY MOTION vacate lower court order, for stay of injunction filed by Sumter County Board of Elections and Registration. Motion is Opposed. [8541431-1] (ECF: E. Mark Braden) [Entered: 08/20/2018 12:59 PM]
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER: Mathis Wrights renewed motion to dismiss this appeal from the district courts March 30, 2018 entry of a permanent injunction is DENIED... We construe these orders as equivalent to indicative rulings under Fed. R. Civ. P. 62.1(a)(3), and we sua sponte REMAND this appeal to the district court. (see order for complete text). [ # 8492227-2 ]; [ # 8492227-3 ]; SM, WHP and AJ [Entered: 08/09/2018 01:45 PM]
August 2, 2018 Notice of iling of a motion in the district court for an injunction pending appeal filed by Attorney Bryan L. Sells for Appellee Mathis Kearse Wright, Jr.. (ECF: Bryan Sells) [Entered: 08/02/2018 01:16 PM]
July 5, 2018 Reply to response filed by Appellee Mathis Kearse Wright, Jr.. (ECF: Bryan Sells) [Entered: 07/04/2018 04:53 PM]
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER: Plaintiff Appellees motion to hold appeal in abeyance and to stay the briefing schedule pending the jurisdictional issue is GRANTED. Plaintiff - Appellees brief is due thirty (30) days from the resolution of the jurisdictional issue. [ # 8493470-2 ]; [ # 8493470-3 ]. CRW [Entered: 07/02/2018 11:21 AM]
June 29, 2018 RESPONSE to Motion to dismiss appeal for lack of jurisdiction filed by Appellee Mathis Kearse Wright, Jr. in 18-11510 [ # 8492227-2 ], Motion to dismiss appeal as moot filed by Appellee Mathis Kearse Wright, Jr. in 18-11510 [ # 8492227-3 ] filed by Attorney E. Mark Braden for Appellant Sumter County Board of Elections and Registration. (ECF: E. Mark Braden) [Entered: 06/29/2018 04:26 PM]
June 25, 2018 MOTION to hold appeal in abeyance, to stay the briefing schedule filed by Mathis Kearse Wright, Jr.. Motion is Unopposed. [8493470-1] (ECF: Bryan Sells) [Entered: 06/25/2018 05:14 PM]
June 22, 2018 MOTION to dismiss appeal for lack of appellate jurisdiction, to dismiss appeal as moot filed by Mathis Kearse Wright, Jr.. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [8492227-1] (ECF: Bryan Sells) [Entered: 06/22/2018 08:33 PM]
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion for extension to file appellee brief filed by Appellee Mathis Kearse Wright, Jr. is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 8480030-2 ] Appellees brief due on 07/05/2018. [Entered: 06/11/2018 09:27 AM]
June 11, 2018 MOTION for extension of time to file appellees brief to 07/05/2018 filed by Mathis Kearse Wright, Jr.. Motion is Unopposed. [8480030-1] (ECF: Bryan Sells) [Entered: 06/09/2018 11:50 AM]
May 29, 2018 Received paper copies of EAppendix filed by Appellant Sumter County Board of Elections and Registration. 7 VOLUMES - 5 COPIES [Entered: 05/31/2018 07:43 AM]
May 25, 2018 Appendix filed [7 VOLUMES] by Appellant Sumter County Board of Elections and Registration. (ECF: E. Mark Braden) [Entered: 05/25/2018 03:37 PM]
May 23, 2018 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Appellant Sumter County Board of Elections and Registration. [Entered: 05/24/2018 02:20 PM]
May 22, 2018 Appellant's brief filed by Sumter County Board of Elections and Registration. (ECF: E. Mark Braden) [Entered: 05/22/2018 04:39 PM]
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER: Mathis Wright's motion to dismiss appeal from the district court's March 30, 2018 entry of a permanent injunction is DENIED. [ # 8434105-2 ] GBT, SM and JP [Entered: 05/09/2018 03:50 PM]
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion to expedite briefing filed by Appellant Sumter County Board of Elections and Registration is DENIED. [ # 8430472-2 ]; Motion to expedite ruling on a motion filed by Appellant Sumter County Board of Elections and Registration is DENIED. [ # 8430472-3 ]; Motion to expedite filed by Appellant Sumter County Board of Elections and Registration is DENIED. [ # 8430472-4 ]; Motion to expedite oral argument filed by Appellant Sumter County Board of Elections and Registration is DENIED. [ # 8430472-5 ] JP [Entered: 05/04/2018 02:02 PM]
April 30, 2018 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Katherine McKnight for Appellant Sumter County Board of Elections and Registration. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). (ECF: Katherine McKnight) [Entered: 04/30/2018 04:29 PM]
April 30, 2018 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to E. Mark Braden for Sumter County Board of Elections and Registration, Katherine McKnight for Sumter County Board of Elections and Registration, Richard Raile for Sumter County Board of Elections and Registration and Kimberly A. Reid for Sumter County Board of Elections and Registration. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP) via the Court's public web-page. Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 04/30/2018 03:18 PM]
April 26, 2018 Reply to response filed by Appellee Mathis Kearse Wright, Jr.. (ECF: Bryan Sells) [Entered: 04/26/2018 10:07 PM]
April 26, 2018 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by E. Mark Braden for Sumter County Board of Elections and Registration. (ECF: E. Mark Braden) [Entered: 04/26/2018 12:30 PM]
April 25, 2018 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Mark Braden for Appellant Sumter County Board of Elections and Registration, Katherine McKnight for Appellant Sumter County Board of Elections and Registration, Richard Raile for Appellant Sumter County Board of Elections and Registration, Kimberly A. Reid for Appellant Sumter County Board of Elections and Registration and Trevor M. Stanley for Appellant Sumter County Board of Elections and Registration. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [Entered: 04/25/2018 10:39 AM]
April 24, 2018 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Richard Raile for Sumter County Board of Elections and Registration. (ECF: Richard Raile) [Entered: 04/24/2018 06:24 PM]
April 20, 2018 Reply to response filed by Appellant Sumter County Board of Elections and Registration. (ECF: Katherine McKnight) [Entered: 04/20/2018 05:38 PM]
April 20, 2018 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Katherine McKnight for Appellant Sumter County Board of Elections and Registration. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. (ECF: Katherine McKnight) [Entered: 04/20/2018 05:06 PM]
April 18, 2018 RESPONSE to Motion to expedite briefing [ # 8430472-2 ], Motion to expedite ruling on a motion [ # 8430472-3 ], Motion to expedite [ # 8430472-4 ], Motion to expedite oral argument [ # 8430472-5 ] with incorporated MOTION to dismiss appeal as moot filed by Appellee Mathis Kearse Wright, Jr.. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [8434105-1] (ECF: Bryan Sells) [Entered: 04/18/2018 05:05 PM]
April 18, 2018 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Bryan L. Sells for Appellee Mathis Kearse Wright, Jr.. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). (ECF: Bryan Sells) [Entered: 04/18/2018 04:57 PM]
April 18, 2018 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Laughlin McDonald for Mathis Kearse Wright, Jr.. (ECF: Aklima Khondoker) [Entered: 04/18/2018 03:59 PM]
April 18, 2018 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Aklima Khondoker for Mathis Kearse Wright, Jr.. (ECF: Aklima Khondoker) [Entered: 04/18/2018 03:49 PM]
April 16, 2018 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Bryan L. Sells for Mathis Kearse Wright, Jr.. (ECF: Bryan Sells) [Entered: 04/16/2018 03:13 PM]
April 13, 2018 TIME SENSITIVE MOTION to expedite briefing, to expedite ruling on a motion, to expedite, to expedite oral argument filed by Sumter County Board of Elections and Registration. Motion is Opposed. [8430472-1] (ECF: Katherine McKnight) [Entered: 04/13/2018 10:57 PM]
April 13, 2018 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Katherine McKnight for Appellant Sumter County Board of Elections and Registration. (ECF: Katherine McKnight) [Entered: 04/13/2018 07:52 PM]
April 13, 2018 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Katherine McKnight for Sumter County Board of Elections and Registration. (ECF: Katherine McKnight) [Entered: 04/13/2018 07:48 PM]
April 12, 2018 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Sumter County Board of Elections and Registration on 04/11/2018. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 04/26/2018 as to Appellant Sumter County Board of Elections and Registration. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/10/2018 as to Appellee Mathis Kearse Wright Jr. [Entered: 04/12/2018 02:56 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Mathis Wright, Jr. v. Sumter Co. Board of Elections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MATHIS KEARSE WRIGHT, JR., P O BOX 304 217 FORREST ST AMERICUS, GA 31709 229-924-0880
Represented By: Bryan L. Sells
Represented By: Aklima Khondoker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: SUMTER COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS AND REGISTRATION
Represented By: Trevor M. Stanley
Represented By: Katherine McKnight
Represented By: Richard Raile
Represented By: E. Mark Braden
Represented By: Kimberly A. Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?