Drew Adams v. School Board of St. Johns Co.
Amicus Curiae: WOMEN'S LAW PROJECT, CHAMPION WOMEN, AMERICAN COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS, THE SOUTHWEST WOMEN'S LAW CENTER, STATE OF MARYLAND, PFLAG, INC., CASA DE ESPERANZA: NATIONAL LATINA NETWORK FOR HEALTHY FAMILIES AND COMMUNITIES, NEVADA COALITION TO END DOMESTIC AND SEXUAL VIOLENCE, CENTER FOR CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS, COALITION OF BLACK TRADE UNIONISTS, LEGAL MOMENTUM, THE WOMEN'S LEGAL DEFENSE AND EDUCATION FUND, PLANNED PARENTHOOD OF SOUTH, EAST AND NORTH FLORIDA, UNION FOR REFORM JUDAISM, JACKSONVILLE AREA SEXUAL MINORITY YOUTH NETWORK, INC., CENTRAL CONFERENCE OF AMERICAN RABBIS, WOMEN'S BAR ASSOCIATION OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, GIRLS INC., CALIFORNIA WOMEN LAWYERS, NATIONAL CENTER FOR LAW AND ECONOMIC JUSTICE, STATE OF CALIFORNIA, CALIFORNIA WOMEN'S LAW CENTER, MICHAEL LAIDLAW, BUCKEYE REGION ANTI-VIOLENCE ORGANIZATION, A PROGRAM OF EQUITAS HEALTH, IN OUR OWN VOICE: NATIONAL BLACK WOMEN'S REPRODUCTIVE JUSTICE AGENDA, NATIONAL ORGANIZATION FOR WOMEN FOUNDATION, STATE OF MAINE, GENDER JUSTICE, STATE OF DELAWARE, A BETTER BALANCE, WALT HEYER, LOUISIANA FOUNDATION AGAINST SEXUAL ASSAULT, WOMEN'S BAR ASSOCIATION OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK, VIRGINIA SEXUAL & DOMESTIC VIOLENCE ACTION ALLIANCE, STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA, WOMEN'S CENTER FOR ADVANCEMENT, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SOCIAL WORKERS, BOSTON AREA RAPE CRISIS CENTER, STOP SEXUAL ASSAULT IN SCHOOLS, TERRY S. KOGAN, STATE OF NEW YORK, GLMA - HEALTH PROFESSIONALS ADVANCING LGBTQ EQUALITY, STATE OF ILLINOIS, WOMEN OF REFORM JUDAISM, AND MEN OF REFORM JUDAISM, THE IMPACT FUND, VERMONT NETWORK AGAINST DOMESTIC & SEXUAL VIOLENCE, LEGAL VOICE, EMPIRE JUSTICE CENTER, SCHOOL ADMINISTRATORS, STATE OF CONNECTICUT, WOMEN'S LIBERATION FRONT, NORTHERN MARIANAS COALITION AGAINST DOMESTIC & SEXUAL VIOLENCE, STATE OF NEW JERSEY, FAMILY VALUES @ WORK, WOMEN LAWYERS ON GUARD INC., NEBRASKA COALITION TO END DOMESTIC AND SEXUAL VIOLENCE, FORGE, INC., OHIO ALLIANCE TO END SEXUAL VIOLENCE, ATLANTA WOMEN FOR EQUALITY, NEW MEXICO COALITION OF SEXUAL ASSAULT PROGRAMS, INC., ADL, NEW YORK STATE COALITION AGAINST SEXUAL ASSAULT, PARENT-CHILD CENTER, QUENTIN VAN METER, CENTER FOR REPRODUCTIVE RIGHTS, STATE OF MINNESOTA, WYOMING COALITION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE AND SEXUAL ASSAULT, NATIONAL COALITION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE, EQUALITY CALIFORNIA, AMERICAN ACADEMY OF NURSING, NATIONAL RESOURCE CENTER ON DOMESTIC VIOLENCE, VOICES OF HOPE, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SCHOOL PSYCHOLOGISTS, LEGAL AID AT WORK, UNITEWOMEN.ORG, WISCONSIN COALITION AGAINST SEXUAL ASSAULT, OREGON COALITION AGAINST DOMESTIC & SEXUAL VIOLENCE, IOWA COALITION AGAINST SEXUAL ASSAULT, STATE OF RHODE ISLAND, STATE OF MICHIGAN, NEW HAMPSHIRE COALITION AGAINST DOMESTIC AND SEXUAL VIOLENCE, DISABILITY RIGHTS EDUCATION AND DEFENSE FUND, NATIONAL ASIAN PACIFIC AMERICAN WOMEN'S FORUM, GLSEN, STATE OF IOWA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF WOMEN LAWYERS, NATIONAL CRITTENTON, DC COALITION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE, YOUNG WOMEN UNITED, STATE OF OREGON, GIRLS FOR GENDER EQUITY, THE AMERICAN SCHOOL COUNSELOR ASSOCIATION, ANDRE VAN MOL, STATE OF NEW MEXICO, SASA CRISIS CENTER, STATE OF VERMONT, NAACP LEGAL DEFENSE & EDUCATIONAL FUND, INC., GENDER DIVERSITY, ILLINOIS ACCOUNTABILITY INITIATIVE, TRANS YOUTH EQUALITY FOUNDATION, AMERICAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, NATIONAL LGBTQ TASK FORCE, MIRIAM GROSSMAN, BETH CHAYIM CHADASHIM, STATE OF MASSACHUSETTS, STATE OF VIRGINIA, GENDER SPECTRUM, SCHOLARS WHO STUDY THE TRANSGENDER POPULATION, ADVOCATES FOR YOUTH, SURVJUSTICE, EQUAL RIGHTS ADVOCATES, MEDICAL, NURSING, MENTAL HEALTH, AND OTHER I HEALTH CARE ORGANIZATIONS, NATIONAL PTA, NATIONAL ALLIANCE TO END SEXUAL VIOLENCE, LATINOJUSTICE PRLDEF, STATE OF WASHINGTON, DAY ONE, PLANNED PARENTHOOD OF SOUTHWEST AND CENTRAL FLORIDA, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, THE WOMEN'S LAW CENTER OF MARYLAND, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF UNIVERSITY WOMEN, NATIONAL WOMEN'S LAW CENTER, AMERICAN MEDICAL WOMEN'S ASSOCIATION, LAWYERS CLUB OF SAN DIEGO, STATE OF HAWAII, MICHIGAN COALITION TO END DOMESTIC & SEXUAL VIOLENCE, OASIS LEGAL SERVICES, NATIONAL CENTER FOR TRANSGENDER EQUALITY, NATIONAL COUNCIL OF JEWISH WOMEN, SISTERREACH, AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS, RAPE/DOMESTIC ABUSE PROGRAM, STATE OF TENNESSEE, STATE OF ARIZONA, STATE OF ARKANSAS, STATE OF GEORGIA, STATE OF INDIANA, STATE OF KANSAS, STATE OF KENTUCKY, STATE OF LOUISIANA, STATE OF MISSISSIPPI, STATE OF MISSOURI, STATE OF MONTANA, STATE OF NEBRASKA, STATE OF OHIO, STATE OF OKLAHOMA, STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA, STATE OF SOUTH DAKOTA, STATE OF TEXAS, STATE OF WEST VIRGINIA, UNITED STATES, STATE OF COLORADO, STATE OF NEVADA, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, ACLU OF FLORIDA, HISTORIANS, CONSTITUTIONAL ACCOUNTABILITY CENTER, GLBTQ LEGAL ADVOCATES AND DEFENDERS, NATIONAL CENTER FOR LESBIAN RIGHTS, TRANSGENDER LEGAL DEFENSE & EDUCATION FUND, ANTI-SEXUAL ASSAULT, DOMESTIC VIOLENCE, GENDER-BASED VIOLENCE ORGANIZATIONS and THE TREVOR PROJECT
Not Classified By Court: REPLACEMENTS, LTD., TWITTER INC., YELP INC., DEUTSCHE BANK AG, MARIN SOFTWARE INCORPORATED, TUMBLR, INC., LEVI STRAUSS & CO., PATREON, INC., AIRBNB, INC., MICROSOFT CORPORATION, EBAY INC., XEROX CORPORATION, GLASSDOOR, INC., IBM CORPORATION, POSTMATES INC., LINDEN RESEARCH, INC. D/B/A LINDEN LAB, SHUTTERSTOCK, INC., ASANA, INC., CREDO MOBILE, INC., KNOTEL, INC., GITHUB, INC., NIO USA, INC., MASSACHUSETTS MUTUAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY "MASSMUTUAL", GENERAL ASSEMBLY SPACE, INC., GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC, GOOGLE LLC, APPLE, INC., SPOTIFY USA INC., INDIEGOGO, INC., KAISER PERMANENTE, MAPBOX, INC. and LYFT
Plaintiff / Appellee: DREW ADAMS, a minor, by and through his next friend and mother, Erica Adams Kasper
Defendant / Appellant: SCHOOL BOARD OF ST. JOHNS COUNTY, FLORIDA
Case Number: 18-13592
Filed: August 24, 2018
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER: The Motion to Withdraw Appearance of Mahogane D. Reed on Behalf of Amici Curiae NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc., and Columbia Law School Center for Gender & Sexuality Law is GRANTED. ENTERED FOR THE COURT - BY DIRECTION. [ # 9618090-2 ] (See attached order for complete text) [Entered: 04/13/2022 10:51 AM]
March 11, 2022 MOTION to withdraw as counsel filed by Attorney Mahogane D. Reed for Amicus Curiae NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc.. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [9618090-1] [18-13592] (ECF: Mahogane Reed) [Entered: 03/11/2022 03:24 PM]
February 22, 2022 Oral argument held this date. Oral Argument presented by Elizabeth Hecker for Amicus Curiae United States, Jeffrey Slanker for Appellant School Board of St. Johns County, Florida and Tara L. Borelli for Appellee Drew Adams. [Entered: 02/22/2022 03:12 PM]
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion to Allow the Use of Electronic Devices by Counsel at Oral Argument filed by Appellant School Board of St. Johns County, Florida is GRANTED. ENTERED FOR THE COURT - BY DIRECTION. [ # 9597289-2 ] (See attached order for complete text) [Entered: 02/15/2022 02:37 PM]
February 11, 2022 MOTION To Allow the Use of Electronic Devices by Counsel at Oral Argument filed by School Board of St. Johns County, Florida. Motion is Unopposed. [9597289-1] [18-13592] (ECF: Jeffrey Slanker) [Entered: 02/11/2022 06:05 PM]
January 20, 2022 Attorney Tara L. Borelli for Appellee Drew Adams hereby acknowledges receipt of a copy of the printed calendar for 02/22/2022. Tara L. Borelli (424-298-7911) will present argument. [18-13592] (ECF: Tara Borelli) [Entered: 01/20/2022 03:19 PM]
January 19, 2022 Attorney Elizabeth Hecker for Amicus Curiae United States hereby acknowledges receipt of a copy of the printed calendar for 02/22/2022. Elizabeth Hecker 917-715-3494 will present argument. [18-13592] (ECF: Elizabeth Hecker) [Entered: 01/19/2022 04:38 PM]
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion of the United States as Amicus Curiae to participate in oral argument is GRANTED. ENTERED FOR THE COURT - BY DIRECTION. [ # 9573592-2 ] (See attached order for complete text) [Entered: 01/18/2022 07:27 PM]
January 12, 2022 MOTION to participate in oral argument. filed by United States. Motion is Unopposed. [9573592-1] [18-13592] (ECF: Elizabeth Hecker) [Entered: 01/12/2022 02:18 PM]
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion to Withdaw Appearance of Chanakya A. Sethi as counsel for Amici Curiae Historianx is GRANTED. [ # 9569793-2 ] JP and BL (See attached order for complete text) [Entered: 01/11/2022 02:17 PM]
January 11, 2022 Calendar issued as to cases to be orally argued on 02/22/2022 in Atlanta, Georgia. Counsel are directed to electronically acknowledge receipt of this calendar by docketing the Calendar Receipt Acknowledged event in ECF (a document upload is not required). [Entered: 01/11/2022 03:22 PM]
January 11, 2022 Oral argument scheduled. Argument Date: Tuesday, 02/22/2022 Argument Location: Atlanta Courtroom: Atlanta 338. [Entered: 01/11/2022 04:02 PM]
January 11, 2022 Attorney Jeffrey Slanker for Appellant School Board of St. Johns County, Florida hereby acknowledges receipt of a copy of the printed calendar for 02/22/2022. Jeffrey D. Slanker (850) 205-1996 will present argument. [18-13592] (ECF: Jeffrey Slanker) [Entered: 01/11/2022 04:25 PM]
January 7, 2022 The Court has determined that oral argument will be necessary in this case. Please forward additional copies of the amici brief, which conform to all formatting requirements, filed by Attorney Dimitri Portnoi for Amici Curiae Gender Spectrum, Casa de Esperanza: National Latina Network for Healthy Families and Communities, National Alliance to End Sexual Violence, National Coalition Against Domestic Violence, National Resource Center on Domestic Violence, Buckeye Region Anti-Violence Organization, a Program of Equitas Health, DC Coalition Against Domestic Violence, Empire Justice Center, Illinois Accountability Initiative, Iowa Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Louisiana Foundation Against Sexual Assault, Michigan Coalition to End Domestic & Sexual Violence, Nebraska Coalition to End Domestic and Sexual Violence, Nevada Coalition to End Domestic and Sexual Violence, New Hampshire Coalition Against Domestic and Sexual Violence, New Mexico Coalition of Sexual Assault Programs, Inc., New York State Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Northern Marianas Coalition Against Domestic & Sexual Violence, Ohio Alliance to End Sexual Violence, Oregon Coalition Against Domestic & Sexual Violence, Vermont Network Against Domestic & Sexual Violence, Virginia Sexual & Domestic Violence Action Alliance, Wisconsin Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Wyoming Coalition Against Domestic Violence and Sexual Assault, Boston Area Rape Crisis Center, Day One, Oasis Legal Services, Parent-Child Center, Rape/Domestic Abuse Program, SASA Crisis Center, Voices of Hope and Women's Center for Advancement to the Clerk's Office. Your prompt attention to this matter is appreciated. [Entered: 01/07/2022 09:11 AM]
January 7, 2022 The Court has determined that oral argument will be necessary in this case. Please forward 7 additional copies of the amici brief, which conform to all formatting requirements, filed by Attorney Joshua A. Block for Amici Curiae ACLU of Florida and American Civil Liberties Union to the Clerk's Office. Your prompt attention to this matter is appreciated. [Entered: 01/07/2022 09:00 AM]
January 7, 2022 The Court has determined that oral argument will be necessary in this case. Please forward 7 additional copies of the amici brief, which conform to all formatting requirements, filed by Attorney Maureen P. Alger for Amici Curiae PFLAG, Inc., Trans Youth Equality Foundation, Gender Spectrum, Gender Diversity and Jacksonville Area Sexual Minority Youth Network, Inc. to the Clerk's Office. Your prompt attention to this matter is appreciated. [Entered: 01/07/2022 09:16 AM]
January 7, 2022 The Court has determined that oral argument will be necessary in this case. Please forward 7 additional copies of the amici brief, which conform to all formatting requirements, filed by Attorney Mahogane D. Reed for Amicus Curiae NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc. to the Clerk's Office. Your prompt attention to this matter is appreciated. [Entered: 01/07/2022 09:12 AM]
January 7, 2022 MOTION to withdraw as counsel filed by Attorney Rakesh Kilaru for Amicus Curiae Historians. Motion is Unopposed [9569793-1] [18-13592] (ECF: Rakesh Kilaru) [Entered: 01/07/2022 09:23 AM]
January 7, 2022 The Court has determined that oral argument will be necessary in this case. Please forward 7 paper copies of the amici brief, which conform to all formatting requirements, filed by Attorney Laura Ferguson for Amicus Curiae National Women's Law Center to the Clerk's Office. Your prompt attention to this matter is appreciated. [Entered: 01/07/2022 09:50 AM]
January 5, 2022 Amicus Brief filed by Amicus Curiae Constitutional Accountability Center. Service date: 11/23/2021 email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Alger, Amend, Anastasio, Anten, Barday, Baxter, Berlow, Bertschi, Binning, Block, Boccuzzi, Bursch, Campbell, Davis, Dwyer, Erchull, Ferguson, Generales, Gorod, Grossman, Grube, Harrington, Hecker, Ifill, Johnson, Kellum, Kilaru, Lee, McCaleb, Meerkamper, Mesa, Minter, Mott-Smith, Neal, Nelson, Orr, Palacios, Pierce, Pincus, Portnoi, Powell, Reed, Robin-Vergeer, Rothfeld, Sethi, Shaffer, Spital, Teufel, Tilley, Tysse, Weisel, Wong; Attorney for Appellants: Fountain, Harmon, Slanker, Sniffen, Spellman; Attorney for Appellees: Altman, Borelli, Castillo, Doolittle, Flynn, Gonzalez-Pagan, Kaplan, Lapointe, Rivaux, Robertson, Segal; Attorney for Not Parties: Jacobs, Stork, Wasick; US mail - Attorney for Amicus Curiae: Tyler; Attorney for Appellant: Barden; Attorney for Appellees: Miller, Smith. [Entered: 01/05/2022 02:07 PM]
January 5, 2022 Amicus Brief filed by Amici Curiae ACLU of Florida and American Civil Liberties Union. Service date: 11/19/2021 email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Alger, Amend, Anastasio, Anten, Barday, Baxter, Berlow, Bertschi, Binning, Block, Boccuzzi, Bursch, Campbell, Davis, Dwyer, Erchull, Ferguson, Generales, Gorod, Grossman, Grube, Harrington, Hecker, Ifill, Johnson, Kellum, Kilaru, Lee, McCaleb, Meerkamper, Mesa, Minter, Mott-Smith, Neal, Nelson, Orr, Palacios, Pierce, Pincus, Portnoi, Powell, Reed, Robin-Vergeer, Rothfeld, Sethi, Shaffer, Spital, Teufel, Tilley, Tysse, Weisel, Wong; Attorney for Appellants: Fountain, Harmon, Slanker, Sniffen, Spellman; Attorney for Appellees: Altman, Borelli, Castillo, Doolittle, Flynn, Gonzalez-Pagan, Kaplan, Lapointe, Rivaux, Robertson, Segal; Attorney for Not Parties: Jacobs, Stork, Wasick; US mail - Attorney for Amicus Curiae: Tyler; Attorney for Appellant: Barden; Attorney for Appellees: Miller, Smith.--[Edited 01/05/2022 by JLT] [Entered: 01/05/2022 02:08 PM]
January 5, 2022 Amicus Brief filed by Amicus Curiae National Women's Law Center. Service date: 11/23/2021 email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Alger, Amend, Anastasio, Anten, Barday, Baxter, Berlow, Bertschi, Binning, Block, Boccuzzi, Bursch, Campbell, Davis, Dwyer, Erchull, Ferguson, Generales, Gorod, Grossman, Grube, Harrington, Hecker, Ifill, Johnson, Kellum, Kilaru, Lee, McCaleb, Meerkamper, Mesa, Minter, Mott-Smith, Neal, Nelson, Orr, Palacios, Pierce, Pincus, Portnoi, Powell, Reed, Robin-Vergeer, Rothfeld, Sethi, Shaffer, Spital, Teufel, Tilley, Tysse, Weisel, Wong; Attorney for Appellants: Fountain, Harmon, Slanker, Sniffen, Spellman; Attorney for Appellees: Altman, Borelli, Castillo, Doolittle, Flynn, Gonzalez-Pagan, Kaplan, Lapointe, Rivaux, Robertson, Segal; Attorney for Not Parties: Jacobs, Stork, Wasick; US mail - Attorney for Amicus Curiae: Tyler; Attorney for Appellant: Barden; Attorney for Appellees: Miller, Smith. [Entered: 01/05/2022 02:05 PM]
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion for substitution of counsel filed by Amicus Curiae School Administrators is GRANTED. [ # 9542783-2 ], Motion for substitution of counsel filed by Amici Curiae National Alliance to End Sexual Violence, National Coalition Against Domestic Violence, National Resource Center on Domestic Violence, Illinois Accountability Initiative, Iowa Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Louisiana Foundation Against Sexual Assault, Nebraska Coalition to End Domestic and Sexual Violence, Nevada Coalition to End Domestic and Sexual Violence, New Hampshire Coalition Against Domestic and Sexual Violence, New York State Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Vermont Network Against Domestic & Sexual Violence, Virginia Sexual & Domestic Violence Action Alliance, Wisconsin Coalition Against Sexual Assault and Oasis Legal Services is GRANTED. [ # 9540198-2 ] substituted by; Motion for leave to file amicus brief is GRANTED. [ # 9540511-2 ], Motion for leave to file amicus brief is GRANTED. [ # 9540246-2 ], Motion for leave to file amicus brief is GRANTED. [ # 9540245-2 ], Motion for leave to file amicus brief is GRANTED. [ # 9540244-2 ], Motion for leave to file amicus brief is GRANTED. [ # 9540206-2 ], Motion for leave to file amicus brief is GRANTED. [ # 9540200-2 ], Motion for leave to file amicus brief is GRANTED. [ # 9539646-2 ], Motion for leave to file amicus brief is GRANTED. [ # 9538760-2 ], Motion for leave to file amicus brief is GRANTED. [ # 9538589-2 ], Motion for leave to file amicus brief is GRANTED. [ # 9538330-2 ], Motion for leave to file amicus brief is GRANTED. [ # 9536157-2 ] JP and BL (See attached order for complete text) [Entered: 01/05/2022 10:48 AM]
January 5, 2022 Amicus Brief filed by Amicus Curiae Historians. Service date: 11/23/2021 email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Alger, Amend, Anastasio, Anten, Barday, Baxter, Berlow, Bertschi, Binning, Block, Boccuzzi, Bursch, Campbell, Davis, Dwyer, Erchull, Ferguson, Generales, Gorod, Grossman, Grube, Harrington, Hecker, Ifill, Johnson, Kellum, Kilaru, Lee, McCaleb, Meerkamper, Mesa, Minter, Mott-Smith, Neal, Nelson, Orr, Palacios, Pierce, Pincus, Portnoi, Powell, Reed, Robin-Vergeer, Rothfeld, Sethi, Shaffer, Spital, Teufel, Tilley, Tysse, Weisel, Wong; Attorney for Appellants: Fountain, Harmon, Slanker, Sniffen, Spellman; Attorney for Appellees: Altman, Borelli, Castillo, Doolittle, Flynn, Gonzalez-Pagan, Kaplan, Lapointe, Rivaux, Robertson, Segal; Attorney for Not Parties: Jacobs, Stork, Wasick; US mail - Attorney for Amicus Curiae: Tyler; Attorney for Appellant: Barden; Attorney for Appellees: Miller, Smith. [Entered: 01/05/2022 02:10 PM]
January 5, 2022 Removed from case: Attorney Alexander Slavin for Amicus Curiaes Wyoming Coalition Against Domestic Violence and Sexual Assault, Women's Center for Advancement, Wisconsin Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Voices of Hope, Virginia Sexual & Domestic Violence Action Alliance, Vermont Network Against Domestic & Sexual Violence, SASA Crisis Center, Rape/Domestic Abuse Program, Parent-Child Center, Oregon Coalition Against Domestic & Sexual Violence, Ohio Alliance to End Sexual Violence, Oasis Legal Services, Northern Marianas Coalition Against Domestic & Sexual Violence, New York State Coalition Against Sexual Assault, New Mexico Coalition of Sexual Assault Programs, Inc., New Hampshire Coalition Against Domestic and Sexual Violence, Nevada Coalition to End Domestic and Sexual Violence, Nebraska Coalition to End Domestic and Sexual Violence, National Resource Center on Domestic Violence, National Coalition Against Domestic Violence, National Alliance to End Sexual Violence, Michigan Coalition to End Domestic & Sexual Violence, Louisiana Foundation Against Sexual Assault, Iowa Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Illinois Accountability Initiative, Gender Spectrum, Empire Justice Center, Day One, DC Coalition Against Domestic Violence, Casa de Esperanza: National Latina Network for Healthy Families and Communities, Buckeye Region Anti-Violence Organization, a Program of Equitas Health and Boston Area Rape Crisis Center in 18-13592. [Entered: 01/05/2022 10:51 AM]
January 5, 2022 Amicus Brief filed by Amicus Curiae NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc.. Service date: 11/24/2021 email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Alger, Amend, Anastasio, Anten, Barday, Baxter, Berlow, Bertschi, Binning, Block, Boccuzzi, Bursch, Campbell, Davis, Dwyer, Erchull, Ferguson, Generales, Gorod, Grossman, Grube, Harrington, Hecker, Ifill, Johnson, Kellum, Kilaru, Lee, McCaleb, Meerkamper, Mesa, Minter, Mott-Smith, Neal, Nelson, Orr, Palacios, Pierce, Pincus, Portnoi, Powell, Reed, Robin-Vergeer, Rothfeld, Sethi, Shaffer, Spital, Teufel, Tilley, Tysse, Weisel, Wong; Attorney for Appellants: Fountain, Harmon, Slanker, Sniffen, Spellman; Attorney for Appellees: Altman, Borelli, Castillo, Doolittle, Flynn, Gonzalez-Pagan, Kaplan, Lapointe, Rivaux, Robertson, Segal; Attorney for Not Parties: Jacobs, Stork, Wasick; US mail - Attorney for Amicus Curiae: Tyler; Attorney for Appellant: Barden; Attorney for Appellees: Miller, Smith. [Entered: 01/05/2022 02:13 PM]
January 5, 2022 Amicus Brief filed by Amicus Curiae Medical, Nursing, Mental Health, and Other I Health Care Organizations. Service date: 11/24/2021 email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Alger, Amend, Anastasio, Anten, Barday, Baxter, Berlow, Bertschi, Binning, Block, Boccuzzi, Bursch, Campbell, Davis, Dwyer, Erchull, Ferguson, Generales, Gorod, Grossman, Grube, Harrington, Hecker, Ifill, Johnson, Kellum, Kilaru, Lee, McCaleb, Meerkamper, Mesa, Minter, Mott-Smith, Neal, Nelson, Orr, Palacios, Pierce, Pincus, Portnoi, Powell, Reed, Robin-Vergeer, Rothfeld, Sethi, Shaffer, Spital, Teufel, Tilley, Tysse, Weisel, Wong; Attorney for Appellants: Fountain, Harmon, Slanker, Sniffen, Spellman; Attorney for Appellees: Altman, Borelli, Castillo, Doolittle, Flynn, Gonzalez-Pagan, Kaplan, Lapointe, Rivaux, Robertson, Segal; Attorney for Not Parties: Jacobs, Stork, Wasick; US mail - Attorney for Amicus Curiae: Tyler; Attorney for Appellant: Barden; Attorney for Appellees: Miller, Smith. [Entered: 01/05/2022 02:24 PM]
January 5, 2022 Amicus Brief filed by Amicus Curiae School Administrators. Service date: 11/26/2021 email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Alger, Amend, Anastasio, Anten, Barday, Baxter, Berlow, Bertschi, Binning, Block, Boccuzzi, Bursch, Campbell, Davis, Dwyer, Erchull, Ferguson, Generales, Gorod, Grossman, Grube, Harrington, Hecker, Ifill, Johnson, Kellum, Kilaru, Lee, McCaleb, Meerkamper, Mesa, Minter, Mott-Smith, Neal, Nelson, Orr, Palacios, Pierce, Pincus, Portnoi, Powell, Reed, Robin-Vergeer, Rothfeld, Sethi, Shaffer, Spital, Teufel, Tilley, Tysse, Weisel, Wong; Attorney for Appellants: Fountain, Harmon, Slanker, Sniffen, Spellman; Attorney for Appellees: Altman, Borelli, Castillo, Doolittle, Flynn, Gonzalez-Pagan, Kaplan, Lapointe, Rivaux, Robertson, Segal; Attorney for Not Parties: Jacobs, Stork, Wasick; US mail - Attorney for Amicus Curiae: Tyler; Attorney for Appellant: Barden; Attorney for Appellees: Miller, Smith. [Entered: 01/05/2022 02:25 PM]
January 5, 2022 Amicus Brief filed by Amicus Curiae The Trevor Project. Service date: 11/24/2021 email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Alger, Amend, Anastasio, Anten, Barday, Baxter, Berlow, Bertschi, Binning, Block, Boccuzzi, Bursch, Campbell, Davis, Dwyer, Erchull, Ferguson, Generales, Gorod, Grossman, Grube, Harrington, Hecker, Ifill, Johnson, Kellum, Kilaru, Lee, McCaleb, Meerkamper, Mesa, Minter, Mott-Smith, Neal, Nelson, Orr, Palacios, Pierce, Pincus, Portnoi, Powell, Reed, Robin-Vergeer, Rothfeld, Sethi, Shaffer, Spital, Teufel, Tilley, Tysse, Weisel, Wong; Attorney for Appellants: Fountain, Harmon, Slanker, Sniffen, Spellman; Attorney for Appellees: Altman, Borelli, Castillo, Doolittle, Flynn, Gonzalez-Pagan, Kaplan, Lapointe, Rivaux, Robertson, Segal; Attorney for Not Parties: Jacobs, Stork, Wasick; US mail - Attorney for Amicus Curiae: Tyler; Attorney for Appellant: Barden; Attorney for Appellees: Miller, Smith. [Entered: 01/05/2022 02:19 PM]
January 5, 2022 Amicus Brief as of right or by consent of the parties filed by Shannon Minter for GLBTQ Legal Advocates & Defenders, National Center for Lesbian Rights, National Center for Transgender Equality, Transgender Legal Defense & Education Fund, and National LGBTQ Task Force. [18-13592] (ECF: Shannon Minter) [Entered: 11/24/2021 01:44 PM]
January 5, 2022 Amicus Brief filed by Amici Curiae Anti-Sexual Assault, Domestic Violence and Gender-Based Violence Organizations. Service date: 11/24/2021 email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Alger, Amend, Anastasio, Anten, Barday, Baxter, Berlow, Bertschi, Binning, Block, Boccuzzi, Bursch, Campbell, Davis, Dwyer, Erchull, Ferguson, Generales, Gorod, Grossman, Grube, Harrington, Hecker, Ifill, Johnson, Kellum, Kilaru, Lee, McCaleb, Meerkamper, Mesa, Minter, Mott-Smith, Neal, Nelson, Orr, Palacios, Pierce, Pincus, Portnoi, Powell, Reed, Robin-Vergeer, Rothfeld, Sethi, Shaffer, Spital, Teufel, Tilley, Tysse, Weisel, Wong; Attorney for Appellants: Fountain, Harmon, Slanker, Sniffen, Spellman; Attorney for Appellees: Altman, Borelli, Castillo, Doolittle, Flynn, Gonzalez-Pagan, Kaplan, Lapointe, Rivaux, Robertson, Segal; Attorney for Not Parties: Jacobs, Stork, Wasick; US mail - Attorney for Amicus Curiae: Tyler; Attorney for Appellant: Barden; Attorney for Appellees: Miller, Smith. [Entered: 01/05/2022 02:18 PM]
January 5, 2022 Amicus Brief filed by Amici Curiae Gender Spectrum, Jacksonville Area Sexual Minority Youth Network, Inc., PFLAG, Inc. and Trans Youth Equality Foundation. Service date: 11/24/2021 email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Alger, Amend, Anastasio, Anten, Barday, Baxter, Berlow, Bertschi, Binning, Block, Boccuzzi, Bursch, Campbell, Davis, Dwyer, Erchull, Ferguson, Generales, Gorod, Grossman, Grube, Harrington, Hecker, Ifill, Johnson, Kellum, Kilaru, Lee, McCaleb, Meerkamper, Mesa, Minter, Mott-Smith, Neal, Nelson, Orr, Palacios, Pierce, Pincus, Portnoi, Powell, Reed, Robin-Vergeer, Rothfeld, Sethi, Shaffer, Spital, Teufel, Tilley, Tysse, Weisel, Wong; Attorney for Appellants: Fountain, Harmon, Slanker, Sniffen, Spellman; Attorney for Appellees: Altman, Borelli, Castillo, Doolittle, Flynn, Gonzalez-Pagan, Kaplan, Lapointe, Rivaux, Robertson, Segal; Attorney for Not Parties: Jacobs, Stork, Wasick; US mail - Attorney for Amicus Curiae: Tyler; Attorney for Appellant: Barden; Attorney for Appellees: Miller, Smith. [Entered: 01/05/2022 02:16 PM]
December 22, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Alexsis Johnson for NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc.. [18-13592] (ECF: Alexsis Johnson) [Entered: 12/22/2021 05:10 PM]
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion to appear pro hac vice filed by Alexsis Johnson is GRANTED.JP and BL [9559084-2] (See attached order for complete text) [Entered: 12/21/2021 11:33 AM]
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion to appear pro hac vice filed by Chris Erchull is GRANTED. JP and BL [9559088-2] (See attached order for complete text) [Entered: 12/21/2021 11:40 AM]
December 17, 2021 Reply Brief filed by Appellant School Board of St. Johns County, Florida. [18-13592] (ECF: Jeffrey Slanker) [Entered: 12/17/2021 02:21 PM]
November 30, 2021 MOTION to file substitution of counsel filed by School Administrators. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [9542783-1] [18-13592] (ECF: Carmine Boccuzzi) [Entered: 11/30/2021 08:32 PM]
November 29, 2021 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Appellee Drew Adams. [Entered: 11/30/2021 02:49 PM]
November 29, 2021 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Amici Curiae District of Columbia, State of California, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Massachusetts, State of Michigan, State of Minnesota, State of Nevada, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Pennsylvania, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont and State of Virginia. [Entered: 12/02/2021 03:19 PM]
November 29, 2021 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Amicus Curiae United States. [Entered: 12/02/2021 03:20 PM]
November 26, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Elizabeth P. Hecker for the United States [18-13592] (ECF: Elizabeth Hecker) [Entered: 11/26/2021 02:19 PM]
November 26, 2021 Appellee's Brief filed by Appellee Drew Adams. [18-13592] (ECF: Tara Borelli) [Entered: 11/26/2021 09:00 AM]
November 26, 2021 Amicus Brief as of right or by consent of the parties filed by Elizabeth P. Hecker for the United States. [18-13592] (ECF: Elizabeth Hecker) [Entered: 11/26/2021 02:21 PM]
November 26, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Bonnie I. Robin-Vergeer for the United States [18-13592] (ECF: Bonnie Robin-Vergeer) [Entered: 11/26/2021 02:17 PM]
November 26, 2021 Amicus Brief as of right or by consent of the parties filed by Mark Grube for New York, Washington, California, Colorado, Connecticut, Delaware, Hawaii, Illinois, Maine, Maryland, Massachusetts, Michigan, Minnesota, Nevada, NJ, New Mexico, North Carolina, Oregon, Pennsylvania, Rhode Island, Vermont, Virginia, and DC. [18-13592] (ECF: Mark Grube) [Entered: 11/26/2021 02:53 PM]
November 26, 2021 MOTION to file amicus brief pursuant to FRAP 29(a) filed by Carmine D. Boccuzzi Jr. for School Administrators. [9540511-1] [18-13592] (ECF: Carmine Boccuzzi) [Entered: 11/26/2021 07:03 PM]
November 26, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Carmine D. Boccuzzi Jr. for School Administrators [18-13592] (ECF: Carmine Boccuzzi) [Entered: 11/26/2021 06:38 PM]
November 24, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Shannon Minter for GLBTQ Legal Advocates & Defenders, National Center for Lesbian Rights, National Center for Transgender Equality, Transgender Legal Defense & Education Fund, and National LGBTQ Task Force [18-13592] (ECF: Shannon Minter) [Entered: 11/24/2021 01:32 PM]
November 24, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Kyle M. Grossman for Anti-Sexual Assault, Domestic Violence, and Gender-Based Violence Organizations [18-13592] (ECF: Kyle Grossman) [Entered: 11/24/2021 03:19 PM]
November 24, 2021 MOTION to file amicus brief pursuant to FRAP 29(a) filed by Mahogane D. Reed for NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc.. [9539646-1] [18-13592] (ECF: Mahogane Reed) [Entered: 11/24/2021 11:58 AM]
November 24, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Mark Grube for Washington, California, Colorado, Connecticut, Delaware, Hawaii, Illinois, Maine, Maryland, Massachusetts, Michigan, Minnesota, Nevada, New Jersey, New Mexico, North Carolina, Oregon, Pennsylvania, Rhode Island, Vermont, Virginia, and D.C. Mr. Mark Stephen Grube for State of New York. [18-13592] (ECF: Mark Grube) [Entered: 11/24/2021 03:58 PM]
November 24, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Samuel Spital for NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc. [18-13592] (ECF: Samuel Spital) [Entered: 11/24/2021 11:45 AM]
November 24, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Dimitri Portnoi for Boston Area Rape Crisis Center, Buckeye Region Anti-Violence Organization, a Program of Equitas Health, Casa de Esperanza: National Latina Network for Healthy Families and Communities, Day One, DC Coalition Against Domestic Violence, Empire Justice Center, Gender Spectrum, Illinois Accountability Initiative, Iowa Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Louisiana Foundation Against Sexual Assault, Michigan Coalition to End Domestic & Sexual Violence, National Alliance to End Sexual Violence, National Coalition Against Domestic Violence, National Resource Center on Domestic Violence, Nebraska Coalition to End Domestic and Sexual Violence, Nevada Coalition to End Domestic and Sexual Violence, New Hampshire Coalition Against Domestic and Sexual Violence, New Mexico Coalition of Sexual Assault Programs, Inc., New York State Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Northern Marianas Coalition Against Domestic & Sexual Violence, Oasis Legal Services, Ohio Alliance to End Sexual Violence, Oregon Coalition Against Domestic & Sexual Violence, Parent-Child Center, Rape/Domestic Abuse Program, SASA Crisis Center, Vermont Network Against Domestic & Sexual Violence, Virginia Sexual & Domestic Violence Action Alliance, Voices of Hope, Wisconsin Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Women's Center for Advancement and Wyoming Coalition Against Domestic Violence and Sexual Assault. [18-13592] (ECF: Dimitri Portnoi) [Entered: 11/24/2021 04:11 PM]
November 24, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Mahogane D. Reed for NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc. [18-13592] (ECF: Mahogane Reed) [Entered: 11/24/2021 11:41 AM]
November 24, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Janai S. Nelson for NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc. [18-13592] (ECF: Janai Nelson) [Entered: 11/24/2021 11:48 AM]
November 24, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Sherrilyn A. Ifill for NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc. [18-13592] (ECF: Sherrilyn Ifill) [Entered: 11/24/2021 11:51 AM]
November 24, 2021 MOTION to file substitution of counsel filed by Illinois Accountability Initiative, Iowa Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Louisiana Foundation Against Sexual Assault, National Alliance to End Sexual Violence, National Coalition Against Domestic Violence, National Resource Center on Domestic Violence, Nebraska Coalition to End Domestic and Sexual Violence, New Hampshire Coalition Against Domestic and Sexual Violence, New York State Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Oasis Legal Services, Vermont Network Against Domestic & Sexual Violence, Wisconsin Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Nevada Coalition to End Domestic and Sexual Violence and Virginia Sexual & Domestic Violence Action Alliance. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [9540198-1] [18-13592] (ECF: Dimitri Portnoi) [Entered: 11/24/2021 04:29 PM]
November 24, 2021 MOTION to file amicus brief pursuant to FRAP 29(a) filed by Clifford W. Berlow for the American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Physicians, AMA, American Medical Women's Association, Endocrine Society, Florida Chapter of the American Academy of Pediatrics, GLMA, Mental Health America, and WPATH. [9540246-1] [18-13592] (ECF: Clifford Berlow) [Entered: 11/24/2021 06:07 PM]
November 24, 2021 MOTION to appear pro hac vice filed by Attorney Chris Erchull for Not Party GLBTQ Legal Advocates and Defenders. [9559088-1] [Entered: 12/21/2021 11:29 AM]
November 24, 2021 MOTION to file amicus brief pursuant to FRAP 29(a) filed by Shireen Barday for The Trevor Project, Inc.. [9540244-1] [18-13592] (ECF: Shireen Barday) [Entered: 11/24/2021 05:41 PM]
November 24, 2021 MOTION to file amicus brief pursuant to FRAP 29(a) filed by Shannon Minter for GLBTQ Legal Advocates & Defenders, National Center for Lesbian Rights, National Center for Transgender Equality, Transgender Legal Defense & Education Fund, and National LGBTQ Task Force.. [9540245-1] [18-13592] (ECF: Shannon Minter) [Entered: 11/24/2021 05:59 PM]
November 24, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Shireen Barday for The Trevor Project, Inc. [18-13592] (ECF: Shireen Barday) [Entered: 11/24/2021 05:31 PM]
November 24, 2021 MOTION to file amicus brief pursuant to FRAP 29(a) filed by Dimitri D. Portnoi for Anti-Sexual Assault, Domestic Violence, and Gender-Based Violence Organizations. [9540206-1] [18-13592] (ECF: Dimitri Portnoi) [Entered: 11/24/2021 04:45 PM]
November 24, 2021 MOTION to file amicus brief pursuant to FRAP 29(a) filed by Maureen Alger for Amici Curiae PFLAG, Inc., Trans Youth Equality Foundation, Gender Spectrum, Gender Diversity, and Jacksonville Area Sexual Minority Youth Network, Inc.. [9540200-1] [18-13592] (ECF: Maureen Alger) [Entered: 11/24/2021 04:31 PM]
November 23, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Brianne Gorod for Constitutional Accountability Center [18-13592] (ECF: Brianne Gorod) [Entered: 11/23/2021 10:51 AM]
November 23, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Morgan L. Anastasio for the National Women's Law Center and 50 additional organizations as amici curiae [18-13592] (ECF: Morgan Anastasio) [Entered: 11/23/2021 10:48 AM]
November 23, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Todd Anten for the National Women's Law Center and 50 additional organizations as amici curiae [18-13592] (ECF: Todd Anten) [Entered: 11/23/2021 10:43 AM]
November 23, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Laura N. Ferguson for the National Women's Law Center and 50 additional organizations as amici curiae [18-13592] (ECF: Laura Ferguson) [Entered: 11/23/2021 10:41 AM]
November 23, 2021 MOTION to file amicus brief pursuant to FRAP 29(a) filed by Brianne Gorod for Constitutional Accountability Center. [9538330-1] [18-13592] (ECF: Brianne Gorod) [Entered: 11/23/2021 10:59 AM]
November 23, 2021 MOTION to appear pro hac vice filed by Attorney Alexsis Johnson for Amicus Curiae NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc.. [9559084-1] [Entered: 12/21/2021 11:28 AM]
November 23, 2021 MOTION to file amicus brief pursuant to FRAP 29(a) filed by Laura N. Ferguson for the National Women's Law Center and 50 additional organizations as amici curiae. [9538589-1] [18-13592] (ECF: Laura Ferguson) [Entered: 11/23/2021 12:32 PM]
November 23, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Audrey Mott-Smith for Trans Youth Equality Foundation, PFLAG, Inc., Gender Spectrum, Gender Diversity, and Jacksonville Area Sexual Minority Youth Network, Inc. [18-13592] (ECF: Audrey Mott-Smith) [Entered: 11/23/2021 02:54 PM]
November 23, 2021 MOTION to file amicus brief pursuant to FRAP 29(a) filed by Chanakya A. Sethi for Historians as amici curiae. [9538760-1] [18-13592] (ECF: Chanakya Sethi) [Entered: 11/23/2021 02:33 PM]
November 22, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Chanakya A. Sethi for Historians [18-13592] (ECF: Chanakya Sethi) [Entered: 11/22/2021 12:09 PM]
November 22, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Rakesh N. Kilaru for Historians [18-13592] (ECF: Rakesh Kilaru) [Entered: 11/22/2021 12:17 PM]
November 22, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Chelsea P. Shaffer for Historians [18-13592] (ECF: Chelsea Shaffer) [Entered: 11/22/2021 12:27 PM]
November 22, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Blake A. Neal for Historians [18-13592] (ECF: Blake Neal) [Entered: 11/22/2021 12:23 PM]
November 19, 2021 MOTION to file amicus brief pursuant to FRAP 29(a) filed by Daniel Tilley for American Civil Liberties Union and ACLU of Florida. [9536157-1] [18-13592] (ECF: Daniel Tilley) [Entered: 11/19/2021 12:26 PM]
November 18, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Joshua A. Block for ACLU and ACLU of Florida [18-13592] (ECF: Joshua Block) [Entered: 11/18/2021 03:30 PM]
November 18, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Daniel Tilley for American Civil Liberties Union and ACLU of Florida [18-13592] (ECF: Daniel Tilley) [Entered: 11/18/2021 01:09 PM]
November 8, 2021 Amicus Brief filed by Amici Curiae Doctor Miriam Grossman, Doctor Michael Laidlaw, Doctor Quentin Van Meter and Doctor Andre Van Mol. Service date: 10/26/2021 email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Alger, Amend, Baxter, Berlow, Bertschi, Binning, Bursch, Campbell, Davis, Dwyer, Generales, Grube, Harrington, Kellum, Lee, McCaleb, Meerkamper, Mesa, Minter, Orr, Palacios, Pierce, Pincus, Portnoi, Powell, Rothfeld, Slavin, Teufel, Tysse, Weisel, Wong; Attorney for Appellants: Fountain, Harmon, Slanker, Sniffen, Spellman; Attorney for Appellees: Altman, Borelli, Castillo, Doolittle, Flynn, Gonzalez-Pagan, Kaplan, Lapointe, Rivaux, Robertson, Segal; Attorney for Not Parties: Jacobs, Stork, Wasick; US mail - Attorney for Amicus Curiae: Tyler; Attorney for Appellant: Barden; Attorney for Appellees: Miller, Smith. [Entered: 11/08/2021 02:45 PM]
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion for leave to file amicus brief is GRANTED. JP and BL[ # 9516263-2 ] (See attached order for complete text) --[Edited 11/08/2021 by JLT] [Entered: 11/08/2021 02:38 PM]
October 26, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Mark S. Grube for the State of New York [18-13592] (ECF: Mark Grube) [Entered: 10/26/2021 03:03 PM]
October 26, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Sarah K. Campbell for State of Tennessee (filing an amicus brief on behalf of Arizona, Arkansas, Georgia, Indiana, Kansas, Kentucky, Louisiana, Mississippi, Missouri, Montana, Nebraska, Ohio, Oklahoma, South Carolina, South Dakota, Texas, West Virginia) [18-13592] (ECF: Sarah Campbell) [Entered: 10/26/2021 01:40 PM]
October 26, 2021 Amicus Brief as of right or by consent of the parties filed by Sarah K. Campbell for State of Tennessee (filing an amicus brief also for Arizona, Arkansas, Georgia, Indiana, Kansas, Kentucky, Louisiana, Mississippi, Missouri, Montana, Nebraska, Ohio, Oklahoma, South Carolina, South Dakota, Texas, and West Virginia). [18-13592] (ECF: Sarah Campbell) [Entered: 10/26/2021 04:33 PM]
October 26, 2021 MOTION to file amicus brief pursuant to FRAP 29(a) filed by John J. Bursch for Amici Curiae Miriam Grossman, Michael Laidlaw, Quentin Van Meter, Andre Van Mol, and Jeffery Hansen. [9516263-1] [18-13592] (ECF: John Bursch) [Entered: 10/26/2021 07:36 PM]
October 26, 2021 Appellant's brief filed by School Board of St. Johns County, Florida. [18-13592] (ECF: Jeffrey Slanker) [Entered: 10/26/2021 04:38 PM]
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion for substitution of counsel filed by Amicus Curium Doctor Miriam Grossman, Doctor Michael Laidlaw, Doctor Quentin Van Meter and Doctor Andre Van Mol is GRANTED. [ # 9509279-2 ] Attorney James A. Campbell in 18-13592 is substituted by Attorney John J. Bursch in 18-13592. JP and BL (See attached order for complete text) [Entered: 10/20/2021 03:02 PM]
October 18, 2021 MOTION to file substitution of counsel filed by Doctor Miriam Grossman, Doctor Michael Laidlaw, Doctor Quentin Van Meter and Doctor Andre Van Mol. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [9509279-1] [18-13592] (ECF: John Bursch) [Entered: 10/18/2021 05:33 PM]
October 15, 2021 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by John J. Bursch for Amici Curiae [18-13592] (ECF: John Bursch) [Entered: 10/15/2021 01:23 PM]
September 16, 2021 En Banc Briefing Notice issued to Appellant School Board of St. Johns County, Florida. The appellant's en banc brief is due on or before 10/26/2021; appellee's en banc brief is due on or before 11/26/2021; en banc reply brief is due on or before 12/17/2021. [Entered: 09/16/2021 10:30 AM]
August 23, 2021 Panel opinion of 07/14/2021 withdrawn/vacated by court.- Opinion vacated per 8/23/2021 order. [Entered: 08/23/2021 04:18 PM]
August 23, 2021 PUBLISHED ORDER: A petition for rehearing having been filed and a member of this Court in active service having requested a poll on whether this case should be reheard en banc, and a majority of the judges of this Court in active service who are not disqualified having voted in favor of granting rehearing en banc, IT IS ORDERED that this case will be reheard en banc. The panels opinion is VACATED. [9466802-1] [Entered: 08/23/2021 03:41 PM]
August 4, 2021 Petition for rehearing en banc (with panel rehearing) filed by Appellant School Board of St. Johns County, Florida. [18-13592] (ECF: Terry Harmon) [Entered: 08/04/2021 04:25 PM]
July 14, 2021 VACATED. See 8/23/2021 order***Opinion issued by court as to Appellant School Board of St. Johns County, Florida. Decision: Affirmed. Opinion type: Published. Opinion method: Signed. The opinion is also available through the Court's Opinions page at this link # http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/opinions .--[Edited 08/23/2021 by JRP] [Entered: 07/14/2021 09:17 AM]
July 14, 2021 VACATED***Judgment entered as to Appellant School Board of St. Johns County, Florida.--[Edited 08/23/2021 by JRP] [Entered: 07/14/2021 09:24 AM]
July 14, 2021 Panel opinion of 08/07/2020 withdrawn/vacated by court. New opinion issued on 7/14/2021. [Entered: 07/14/2021 09:31 AM]
September 2, 2020 Supplemental Authority filed by Appellee Drew Adams. [18-13592] (ECF: Tara Borelli) [Entered: 09/02/2020 11:22 AM]
August 28, 2020 Petition for rehearing en banc (with panel rehearing) filed by Appellant School Board of St. Johns County, Florida. [18-13592] (ECF: Terry Harmon) [Entered: 08/28/2020 05:14 PM]
August 28, 2020 **ERROR**Opinion not attached**Petition for rehearing en banc (with panel rehearing) filed by Appellant School Board of St. Johns County, Florida. [18-13592] (ECF: Terry Harmon) [Entered: 08/28/2020 02:59 PM]
August 21, 2020 Signed Approved Bill of costs filed by Attorney Tara L. Borelli for Appellee Drew Adams. [Entered: 08/21/2020 11:17 AM]
August 18, 2020 Bill of costs filed by Attorney Tara L. Borelli for Appellee Drew Adams. [18-13592] (ECF: Tara Borelli) [Entered: 08/18/2020 10:34 AM]
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER:A judge of this Court withholds issuance of the mandate in this appeal. ENTERED FOR THE COURT - BY DIRECTION -- [Entered: 08/10/2020 08:30 AM]
August 7, 2020 Judgment entered as to Appellant School Board of St. Johns County, Florida. [Entered: 08/07/2020 05:13 PM]
August 7, 2020 Opinion issued by court as to Appellant School Board of St. Johns County, Florida. Decision: Affirmed. Opinion type: Published. Opinion method: Signed. The opinion is also available through the Court's Opinions page at this link # http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/opinions . (Opinion corrected on 8/10/2020.)--[Edited 08/10/2020 by JRP] [Entered: 08/07/2020 05:01 PM]
July 27, 2020 Received paper copies of Supplemental Reply EBrief filed by Appellant School Board of St. Johns County, Florida. [Entered: 07/28/2020 02:11 PM]
July 24, 2020 Supplemental Reply Brief filed by Appellant School Board of St. Johns County, Florida. [18-13592] (ECF: Terry Harmon) [Entered: 07/24/2020 03:51 PM]
July 17, 2020 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Appellee Drew Adams. [Entered: 07/21/2020 10:01 AM]
July 14, 2020 Appellee's Supplemental Brief filed by Appellee Drew Adams. [18-13592] (ECF: Tara Borelli) [Entered: 07/14/2020 10:26 PM]
July 6, 2020 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Appellant School Board of St. Johns County, Florida. [Entered: 07/07/2020 09:27 AM]
July 2, 2020 Appellant's Supplemental Brief filed by Appellant School Board of St. Johns County, Florida. [18-13592] (ECF: Terry Harmon) [Entered: 07/02/2020 01:22 PM]
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: On its own motion, the parties are DIRECTED to file supplemental briefs advising this Court about the impact of Bostock v. Clayton County, 590 U.S. , S. Ct. , 2020 WL 3146686 (June 15, 2020), upon their arguments previously made in this case. The Appellants brief shall be filed within 15 days of entry of this Order, with the Appellees brief due 15 days later. Appellant may file a reply brief within 10 days of Appellees filing. No brief shall exceed 20 pages.. WHP, BBM and JP [Entered: 06/17/2020 09:10 AM]
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion to withdraw as counsel filed by Devi M. Rao is GRANTED. ENTERED FOR THE COURT-BY DIRECTION [ # 9108413-2 ] [Entered: 06/10/2020 03:03 PM]
June 10, 2020 MOTION to withdraw as counsel filed by Attorney Devi M. Rao for Amicus Curium American Academy of Nursing, American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Physicians, American Medical Association, American Medical Women's Association and GLMA - Health Professionals Advancing LGBTQ Equality. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [9108413-1] [18-13592] (ECF: Devi Rao) [Entered: 06/10/2020 09:54 AM]
June 9, 2020 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Clifford W. Berlow for the AMERICAN ACADEMY OF NURSING; AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS; AMERICAN COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS; AMERICAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION; AMERICAN MEDICAL WOMEN'S ASSOCIATION; GLMA - HEALTH PROFESSIONALS ADVANCING LGBTQ EQUALITY; [18-13592] (ECF: Clifford Berlow) [Entered: 06/09/2020 03:40 PM]
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion to withdraw as counsel filed by Meredith Taylor Brown is GRANTED. [ # 9029739-2 ] [Entered: 03/16/2020 03:23 PM]
March 9, 2020 MOTION to withdraw as counsel filed by Attorney Meredith Taylor Brown for Appellee Drew Adams. Motion is Unopposed [9029739-1] [18-13592] (ECF: Meredith Brown) [Entered: 03/09/2020 07:07 PM]
December 5, 2019 Oral argument held. Oral Argument participants were Jeffrey Slanker for Appellant School Board of St. Johns County, Florida and Tara L. Borelli for Appellee Drew Adams. [Entered: 12/05/2019 11:21 AM]
November 22, 2019 Attorney Terry Joseph Harmon for Appellant School Board of St. Johns County, Florida hereby acknowledges receipt of a copy of the printed calendar for 09/25/2019. Jeffrey D. Slanker, (850) 205-1996 will present argument. [18-13592] (ECF: Terry Harmon) [Entered: 11/22/2019 03:01 PM]
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion for Leave to Allow the Parties to Use Electronic Devices at Oral Argument filed by Appellant School Board of St. Johns County, Florida is GRANTED. ENTERED FOR THE COURT - BY DIRECTION. [ # 8934226-2 ] [Entered: 11/18/2019 03:52 PM]
November 15, 2019 MOTION for Leave to Allow the Parties to Use Electronic Devices at Oral Argument filed by School Board of St. Johns County, Florida. Motion is Unopposed. [8934226-1] [18-13592] (ECF: Terry Harmon) [Entered: 11/15/2019 04:28 PM]
October 18, 2019 Supplemental Authority filed by Appellant School Board of St. Johns County, Florida. [18-13592] (ECF: Terry Harmon) [Entered: 10/18/2019 04:14 PM]
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion to withdraw as counsel filed by Matthew M. Wallace is GRANTED. ENTERED FOR THE COURT - BY DIRECTION. [ # 8898473-2 ] [Entered: 10/09/2019 11:26 AM]
October 4, 2019 MOTION to withdraw as counsel filed by Attorney Matthew M. Wallace for Amicus Curium Boston Area Rape Crisis Center, Buckeye Region Anti-Violence Organization, a Program of Equitas Health, Casa de Esperanza: National Latina Network for Healthy Families and Communities, Day One, DC Coalition Against Domestic Violence, Empire Justice Center, Gender Spectrum, Illinois Accountability Initiative, Iowa Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Louisiana Foundation Against Sexual Assault, Michigan Coalition to End Domestic & Sexual Violence, National Alliance to End Sexual Violence, National Coalition Against Domestic Violence, National Resource Center on Domestic Violence, Nebraska Coalition to End Domestic and Sexual Violence, Nevada Coalition to End Domestic and Sexual Violence, New Hampshire Coalition Against Domestic and Sexual Violence, New Mexico Coalition of Sexual Assault Programs, Inc., New York State Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Northern Marianas Coalition Against Domestic & Sexual Violence, Oasis Legal Services, Ohio Alliance to End Sexual Violence, Oregon Coalition Against Domestic & Sexual Violence, Parent-Child Center, Rape/Domestic Abuse Program, SASA Crisis Center, Vermont Network Against Domestic & Sexual Violence, Virginia Sexual & Domestic Violence Action Alliance, Voices of Hope, Wisconsin Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Women's Center for Advancement and Wyoming Coalition Against Domestic Violence and Sexual Assault. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8898473-1] [18-13592] (ECF: Matthew Wallace) [Entered: 10/04/2019 12:41 PM]
September 26, 2019 Attorney Tara L. Borelli for Appellee Drew Adams hereby acknowledges receipt of a copy of the printed calendar for 12/05/2019. Tara L. Borelli; phone: 470-225-5341 will present argument. [18-13592] (ECF: Tara Borelli) [Entered: 09/26/2019 05:18 PM]
September 26, 2019 Oral argument scheduled. Argument Date: Thursday, 12/05/2019 Argument Location: Atlanta. [Entered: 09/26/2019 09:22 AM]
September 25, 2019 NOTE: Counsel must be logged into Eleventh Circuit CM/ECF before attempting to view the attached calendar. Calendar issued as to cases to be orally argued the week of 12/02/2019 in Atlanta, Georgia. Counsel are directed to electronically acknowledge receipt of this calendar by docketing the Calendar Receipt Acknowledged event in ECF. [Entered: 09/25/2019 09:28 AM]
August 28, 2019 Assigned to tentative calendar number 5 in Atlanta during the week of December 2, 2019. Counsel must be logged into CM/ECF in order to view the attached calendar. [Entered: 08/28/2019 02:27 PM]
August 16, 2019 This appeal has been removed from tentative calendar # 3 and will be reassigned at a later date. [Entered: 08/16/2019 03:37 PM]
August 16, 2019 Response to Supplemental Authority (28J) filed by Appellant School Board of St. Johns County, Florida. [18-13592] (ECF: Terry Harmon) [Entered: 08/16/2019 01:34 PM]
August 14, 2019 Supplemental Authority filed by Appellee Drew Adams. [18-13592] (ECF: Tara Borelli) [Entered: 08/14/2019 02:45 PM]
August 7, 2019 Assigned to tentative calendar number 3 in Atlanta during the week of November 18, 2019. Counsel must be logged into CM/ECF in order to view the attached calendar. [Entered: 08/07/2019 09:57 AM]
July 22, 2019 Response to Supplemental Authority (28J) filed by Appellant School Board of St. Johns County, Florida. [18-13592] (ECF: Terry Harmon) [Entered: 07/22/2019 05:43 PM]
June 21, 2019 This appeal has been removed from tentative calendar # 29 and will be reassigned at a later date. [Entered: 06/21/2019 03:44 PM]
June 18, 2019 Supplemental Authority filed by Appellee Drew Adams. [18-13592] (ECF: Tara Borelli) [Entered: 06/18/2019 10:19 AM]
June 18, 2019 Additional copies of Appendix received from Terry Joseph Harmon for School Board of St. Johns County, Florida and forwarded to the record room. [Entered: 06/18/2019 09:58 AM]
June 14, 2019 Additional (3) copies of Appendix received from Jennifer G. Altman for Drew Adams, Tara L. Borelli for Drew Adams and Kirsten Doolittle for Drew Adams and forwarded to the record room. [Entered: 06/14/2019 03:41 PM]
June 10, 2019 Supplemental Authority filed by Appellee Drew Adams. [18-13592] (ECF: Tara Borelli) [Entered: 06/10/2019 06:16 PM]
June 6, 2019 The Court has determined that oral argument will be necessary in this case. Please forward 3 additional copies of the 16 volumes of Appendix, which conform to all formatting requirements, filed 12/27/18 by Attorney Terry Joseph Harmon for Appellant School Board of St. Johns County, Florida to the Clerk's Office, Attention: Jenifer Tubbs. Your prompt attention to this matter is appreciated. [Entered: 06/06/2019 03:52 PM]
June 6, 2019 The Court has determined that oral argument will be necessary in this case. Please forward 3 additional copies of the 2 volumes of Supplemental Appendix, which conform to all formatting requirements, filed 2/21/19 by Attorney Tara L. Borelli for Appellee Drew Adams to the Clerk's Office, Attention: Jenifer Tubbs. Your prompt attention to this matter is appreciated. [Entered: 06/06/2019 03:53 PM]
June 6, 2019 Assigned to tentative calendar number 29 in Atlanta during the week of September 16, 2019. Counsel must be logged into CM/ECF in order to view the attached calendar. [Entered: 06/06/2019 03:56 PM]
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion to withdraw as counsel filed by Kevin Kostelnik is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 8744130-2 ] Attorney terminated: Attorney Kevin Kostelnik for Appellant School Board of St. Johns County, Florida in 18-13592. [Entered: 04/15/2019 03:01 PM]
April 12, 2019 MOTION to withdraw as counsel filed by Attorney Kevin Kostelnik for Appellant School Board of St. Johns County, Florida. Motion is Unopposed [8744130-1] [18-13592] (ECF: Kevin Kostelnik) [Entered: 04/12/2019 10:29 AM]
March 20, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Meredith Taylor Brown for Plaintiff-Appellee Drew Adams [18-13592] (ECF: Meredith Brown) [Entered: 03/20/2019 05:03 PM]
March 15, 2019 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Appellant School Board of St. Johns County, Florida. [Entered: 03/18/2019 11:21 AM]
March 14, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [18-13592] (ECF: Craig Bertschi) [Entered: 03/14/2019 09:03 AM]
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: The motion by Airbnb, Inc., Apple, Asana, Inc., CREDO Mobile, Inc., Deutsche Bank AG, eBay Inc., General Assembly Space, Inc., GitHub, Inc., Glassdoor, Inc., GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Google LLC, IBM Corporation, Indiegogo, Inc., Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., Knotel, Inc., Levi Strauss & Co., Linden Research, Inc., Lyft, Inc., Mapbox, Inc., Marin Software Incorporated, Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company, Microsoft Corporation, NIO USA, Inc., Patreon, Inc., Postmates Inc., Replacements, Ltd., Shutterstock, Inc., Spotify USA Inc., Tumblr, Inc., Twitter Inc., Xerox Corporation, and Yelp Inc. for leave to file a brief as amici curiae in support of Plaintiff-Appellee and affirmance is DENIED. See Fed. R. App. P. 29(a)(2) ([A] is court of appeals may prohibit the filing of or may strike an amicus brief that would result in a judge's disqualification."). [ # 8707170-2 ] CRW [Entered: 03/14/2019 01:12 PM]
March 14, 2019 Reply Brief filed by Appellant School Board of St. Johns County, Florida. [18-13592] (ECF: Terry Harmon) [Entered: 03/14/2019 02:49 PM]
March 13, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Dimitri Portnoi for Amicus Curium Boston Area Rape Crisis Center, Buckeye Region Anti-Violence Organization, a Program of Equitas Health, Casa de Esperanza: National Latina Network for Healthy Families and Communities, Day One, DC Coalition Against Domestic Violence, Empire Justice Center, Gender Spectrum, Illinois Accountability Initiative, Iowa Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Louisiana Foundation Against Sexual Assault, Michigan Coalition to End Domestic & Sexual Violence, National Alliance to End Sexual Violence, National Coalition Against Domestic Violence, National Resource Center on Domestic Violence, Nebraska Coalition to End Domestic and Sexual Violence, Nevada Coalition to End Domestic and Sexual Violence, New Hampshire Coalition Against Domestic and Sexual Violence, New Mexico Coalition of Sexual Assault Programs, Inc., New York State Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Northern Marianas Coalition Against Domestic & Sexual Violence, Oasis Legal Services, Ohio Alliance to End Sexual Violence, Oregon Coalition Against Domestic & Sexual Violence, Parent-Child Center, Rape/Domestic Abuse Program, SASA Crisis Center, Vermont Network Against Domestic & Sexual Violence, Virginia Sexual & Domestic Violence Action Alliance, Voices of Hope, Wisconsin Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Women's Center for Advancement and Wyoming Coalition Against Domestic Violence and Sexual Assault. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [18-13592] (ECF: Dimitri Portnoi) [Entered: 03/13/2019 05:33 PM]
March 13, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Devi M. Rao for Amicus Curium American Academy of Nursing, American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Physicians, American Medical Association, American Medical Women's Association and GLMA - Health Professionals Advancing LGBTQ Equality. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [18-13592] (ECF: Devi Rao) [Entered: 03/13/2019 04:11 PM]
March 13, 2019 SECOND NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Devi M. Rao for American Medical Association, American Academy of Pediatrics, American Academy of Nursing, American College of Physicians, American Medical Women's Association and GLMA - Health Professionals Advancing LGBTQ Equality. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP) via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 03/13/2019 11:30 AM]
March 13, 2019 SECOND NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Dimitri Portnoi for Gender Spectrum, Casa de Esperanza: National Latina Network for Healthy Families and Communities, National Alliance to End Sexual Violence, National Coalition Against Domestic Violence, National Resource Center on Domestic Violence, Buckeye Region Anti-Violence Organization, a Program of Equitas Health, DC Coalition Against Domestic Violence, Empire Justice Center, Illinois Accountability Initiative, Iowa Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Louisiana Foundation Against Sexual Assault, Michigan Coalition to End Domestic & Sexual Violence, Nebraska Coalition to End Domestic and Sexual Violence, Nevada Coalition to End Domestic and Sexual Violence, New Hampshire Coalition Against Domestic and Sexual Violence, New Mexico Coalition of Sexual Assault Programs, Inc., New York State Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Northern Marianas Coalition Against Domestic & Sexual Violence, Ohio Alliance to End Sexual Violence, Oregon Coalition Against Domestic & Sexual Violence, Vermont Network Against Domestic & Sexual Violence, Virginia Sexual & Domestic Violence Action Alliance, Wisconsin Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Wyoming Coalition Against Domestic Violence and Sexual Assault, Boston Area Rape Crisis Center, Day One, Oasis Legal Services, Parent-Child Center, Rape/Domestic Abuse Program, SASA Crisis Center, Voices of Hope and Women's Center for Advancement, Alexander Slavin for Gender Spectrum, Casa de Esperanza: National Latina Network for Healthy Families and Communities, National Alliance to End Sexual Violence, National Coalition Against Domestic Violence, National Resource Center on Domestic Violence, Buckeye Region Anti-Violence Organization, a Program of Equitas Health, DC Coalition Against Domestic Violence, Empire Justice Center, Illinois Accountability Initiative, Iowa Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Louisiana Foundation Against Sexual Assault, Michigan Coalition to End Domestic & Sexual Violence, Nebraska Coalition to End Domestic and Sexual Violence, Nevada Coalition to End Domestic and Sexual Violence, New Hampshire Coalition Against Domestic and Sexual Violence, New Mexico Coalition of Sexual Assault Programs, Inc., New York State Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Northern Marianas Coalition Against Domestic & Sexual Violence, Ohio Alliance to End Sexual Violence, Oregon Coalition Against Domestic & Sexual Violence, Vermont Network Against Domestic & Sexual Violence, Virginia Sexual & Domestic Violence Action Alliance, Wisconsin Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Wyoming Coalition Against Domestic Violence and Sexual Assault, Boston Area Rape Crisis Center, Day One, Oasis Legal Services, Parent-Child Center, Rape/Domestic Abuse Program, SASA Crisis Center, Voices of Hope and Women's Center for Advancement and Matthew M. Wallace for Gender Spectrum, Casa de Esperanza: National Latina Network for Healthy Families and Communities, National Alliance to End Sexual Violence, National Coalition Against Domestic Violence, National Resource Center on Domestic Violence, Buckeye Region Anti-Violence Organization, a Program of Equitas Health, DC Coalition Against Domestic Violence, Empire Justice Center, Illinois Accountability Initiative, Iowa Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Louisiana Foundation Against Sexual Assault, Michigan Coalition to End Domestic & Sexual Violence, Nebraska Coalition to End Domestic and Sexual Violence, Nevada Coalition to End Domestic and Sexual Violence, New Hampshire Coalition Against Domestic and Sexual Violence, New Mexico Coalition of Sexual Assault Programs, Inc., New York State Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Northern Marianas Coalition Against Domestic & Sexual Violence, Ohio Alliance to End Sexual Violence, Oregon Coalition Against Domestic & Sexual Violence, Vermont Network Against Domestic & Sexual Violence, Virginia Sexual & Domestic Violence Action Alliance, Wisconsin Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Wyoming Coalition Against Domestic Violence and Sexual Assault, Boston Area Rape Crisis Center, Day One, Oasis Legal Services, Parent-Child Center, Rape/Domestic Abuse Program, SASA Crisis Center, Voices of Hope and Women's Center for Advancement. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP) via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 03/13/2019 11:33 AM]
March 13, 2019 SECOND NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Craig Edward Bertschi for Women's Liberation Front. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP) via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 03/13/2019 11:39 AM]
March 13, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Nathan W. Kellum for Amicus Curiae WALT HEYER. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [18-13592] (ECF: Nathan Kellum) [Entered: 03/13/2019 02:05 PM]
March 13, 2019 SECOND NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Nathan W. Kellum for WALT HEYER. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 03/13/2019 11:26 AM]
March 11, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Charles Rothfeld for National Women's Law Center, et al. [18-13592] (ECF: Charles Rothfeld) [Entered: 03/11/2019 05:44 PM]
March 6, 2019 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Andrew W. Amend for State of Illinois, State of Michigan, State of Washington, State of Maine, State of Oregon, State of New York, State of New Mexico, State of New Jersey, State of Maryland, State of California, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Vermont, District of Columbia, State of Connecticut, State of Massachusetts, State of Pennsylvania, State of Virginia, State of Iowa, State of Minnesota and State of Rhode Island. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP) via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 03/06/2019 09:08 AM]
March 6, 2019 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Dimitri Portnoi for Gender Spectrum, Casa de Esperanza: National Latina Network for Healthy Families and Communities, National Alliance to End Sexual Violence, National Coalition Against Domestic Violence, National Resource Center on Domestic Violence, Buckeye Region Anti-Violence Organization, a Program of Equitas Health, DC Coalition Against Domestic Violence, Empire Justice Center, Illinois Accountability Initiative, Iowa Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Louisiana Foundation Against Sexual Assault, Michigan Coalition to End Domestic & Sexual Violence, Nebraska Coalition to End Domestic and Sexual Violence, Nevada Coalition to End Domestic and Sexual Violence, New Hampshire Coalition Against Domestic and Sexual Violence, New Mexico Coalition of Sexual Assault Programs, Inc., New York State Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Northern Marianas Coalition Against Domestic & Sexual Violence, Ohio Alliance to End Sexual Violence, Oregon Coalition Against Domestic & Sexual Violence, Vermont Network Against Domestic & Sexual Violence, Virginia Sexual & Domestic Violence Action Alliance, Wisconsin Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Wyoming Coalition Against Domestic Violence and Sexual Assault, Boston Area Rape Crisis Center, Day One, Oasis Legal Services, Parent-Child Center, Rape/Domestic Abuse Program, SASA Crisis Center, Voices of Hope and Women's Center for Advancement, Alexander Slavin for Gender Spectrum, Casa de Esperanza: National Latina Network for Healthy Families and Communities, National Alliance to End Sexual Violence, National Coalition Against Domestic Violence, National Resource Center on Domestic Violence, Buckeye Region Anti-Violence Organization, a Program of Equitas Health, DC Coalition Against Domestic Violence, Empire Justice Center, Illinois Accountability Initiative, Iowa Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Louisiana Foundation Against Sexual Assault, Michigan Coalition to End Domestic & Sexual Violence, Nebraska Coalition to End Domestic and Sexual Violence, Nevada Coalition to End Domestic and Sexual Violence, New Hampshire Coalition Against Domestic and Sexual Violence, New Mexico Coalition of Sexual Assault Programs, Inc., New York State Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Northern Marianas Coalition Against Domestic & Sexual Violence, Ohio Alliance to End Sexual Violence, Oregon Coalition Against Domestic & Sexual Violence, Vermont Network Against Domestic & Sexual Violence, Virginia Sexual & Domestic Violence Action Alliance, Wisconsin Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Wyoming Coalition Against Domestic Violence and Sexual Assault, Boston Area Rape Crisis Center, Day One, Oasis Legal Services, Parent-Child Center, Rape/Domestic Abuse Program, SASA Crisis Center, Voices of Hope and Women's Center for Advancement and Matthew M. Wallace for Gender Spectrum, Casa de Esperanza: National Latina Network for Healthy Families and Communities, National Alliance to End Sexual Violence, National Coalition Against Domestic Violence, National Resource Center on Domestic Violence, Buckeye Region Anti-Violence Organization, a Program of Equitas Health, DC Coalition Against Domestic Violence, Empire Justice Center, Illinois Accountability Initiative, Iowa Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Louisiana Foundation Against Sexual Assault, Michigan Coalition to End Domestic & Sexual Violence, Nebraska Coalition to End Domestic and Sexual Violence, Nevada Coalition to End Domestic and Sexual Violence, New Hampshire Coalition Against Domestic and Sexual Violence, New Mexico Coalition of Sexual Assault Programs, Inc., New York State Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Northern Marianas Coalition Against Domestic & Sexual Violence, Ohio Alliance to End Sexual Violence, Oregon Coalition Against Domestic & Sexual Violence, Vermont Network Against Domestic & Sexual Violence, Virginia Sexual & Domestic Violence Action Alliance, Wisconsin Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Wyoming Coalition Against Domestic Violence and Sexual Assault, Boston Area Rape Crisis Center, Day One, Oasis Legal Services, Parent-Child Center, Rape/Domestic Abuse Program, SASA Crisis Center, Voices of Hope and Women's Center for Advancement. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 03/06/2019 09:09 AM]
March 6, 2019 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Devi M. Rao for American Medical Association, American Academy of Pediatrics, American Academy of Nursing, American College of Physicians, American Medical Women's Association and GLMA - Health Professionals Advancing LGBTQ Equality. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 03/06/2019 09:13 AM]
March 6, 2019 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to James E. Tysse for Scholars Who Study The Transgender Population and Jessica Weisel for Scholars Who Study The Transgender Population. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP) via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 03/06/2019 09:05 AM]
March 6, 2019 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to David D. Mesa for Terry S. Kogan and Patricia B. Palacios for Terry S. Kogan. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP) via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 03/06/2019 09:04 AM]
March 6, 2019 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Edward John Jacobs for XRX, MSFT, AAPL, DB, GOOGL, Airbnb, Inc., Asana, Inc., Credo Mobile, Inc., EBAY, General Assembly Space, Inc., GitHub, Inc., Glassdoor, Inc., GlaxoSmithKline LLC, IBM Corporation, Indiegogo, Inc., Kaiser Permanente, Knotel, Inc., Levi Strauss & Co., Linden Research, Inc. d/b/a Linden Lab, Lyft, Mapbox, Inc., Marin Software Incorporated, Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company "MassMutual", NIO USA, Inc., Patreon, Inc., Postmates Inc., Replacements, Ltd., Shutterstock, Inc., Spotify USA Inc., Tumblr, Inc., Twitter Inc. and Yelp Inc., Victoria Lynn Stork for XRX, MSFT, AAPL, DB, GOOGL, Airbnb, Inc., Asana, Inc., Credo Mobile, Inc., EBAY, General Assembly Space, Inc., GitHub, Inc., Glassdoor, Inc., GlaxoSmithKline LLC, IBM Corporation, Indiegogo, Inc., Kaiser Permanente, Knotel, Inc., Levi Strauss & Co., Linden Research, Inc. d/b/a Linden Lab, Lyft, Mapbox, Inc., Marin Software Incorporated, Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company "MassMutual", NIO USA, Inc., Patreon, Inc., Postmates Inc., Replacements, Ltd., Shutterstock, Inc., Spotify USA Inc., Tumblr, Inc., Twitter Inc. and Yelp Inc. and Joanna F. Wasick for XRX, MSFT, AAPL, DB, GOOGL, Airbnb, Inc., Asana, Inc., Credo Mobile, Inc., EBAY, General Assembly Space, Inc., GitHub, Inc., Glassdoor, Inc., GlaxoSmithKline LLC, IBM Corporation, Indiegogo, Inc., Kaiser Permanente, Knotel, Inc., Levi Strauss & Co., Linden Research, Inc. d/b/a Linden Lab, Lyft, Mapbox, Inc., Marin Software Incorporated, Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company "MassMutual", NIO USA, Inc., Patreon, Inc., Postmates Inc., Replacements, Ltd., Shutterstock, Inc., Spotify USA Inc., Tumblr, Inc., Twitter Inc. and Yelp Inc.. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP) via the Court's public web-page. Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 03/06/2019 09:00 AM]
March 6, 2019 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Maureen P. Alger for PFLAG, Inc., Trans Youth Equality Foundation, Gender Spectrum, Gender Diversity and Jacksonville Area Sexual Minority Youth Network, Inc., Sarah Rebecca Binning for PFLAG, Inc., Trans Youth Equality Foundation, Gender Spectrum, Gender Diversity and Jacksonville Area Sexual Minority Youth Network, Inc., John Charles Dwyer for PFLAG, Inc., Trans Youth Equality Foundation, Gender Spectrum, Gender Diversity and Jacksonville Area Sexual Minority Youth Network, Inc., Emily Harrington for PFLAG, Inc., Trans Youth Equality Foundation, Gender Spectrum, Gender Diversity and Jacksonville Area Sexual Minority Youth Network, Inc., Shawn Thomas Meerkamper for PFLAG, Inc., Trans Youth Equality Foundation, Gender Spectrum, Gender Diversity and Jacksonville Area Sexual Minority Youth Network, Inc., Shannon Price Minter for PFLAG, Inc., Trans Youth Equality Foundation, Gender Spectrum, Gender Diversity and Jacksonville Area Sexual Minority Youth Network, Inc., Asaf Orr for PFLAG, Inc., Trans Youth Equality Foundation, Gender Spectrum, Gender Diversity and Jacksonville Area Sexual Minority Youth Network, Inc. and Kyle C. Wong for PFLAG, Inc., Trans Youth Equality Foundation, Gender Spectrum, Gender Diversity and Jacksonville Area Sexual Minority Youth Network, Inc.. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP) via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 03/06/2019 09:03 AM]
March 6, 2019 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Nathan W. Kellum for WALT HEYER. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 03/06/2019 12:26 PM]
March 6, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Andrew W. Amend for Amicus Curium District of Columbia, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Massachusetts, State of Michigan, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Pennsylvania, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Virginia and State of Washington. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [18-13592] (ECF: Andrew Amend) [Entered: 03/06/2019 09:23 AM]
March 6, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney James Andrew Campbell for Amicus Curium Doctor Miriam Grossman, Doctor Michael Laidlaw, Doctor Quentin Van Meter and Doctor Andre Van Mol. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [18-13592] (ECF: James Campbell) [Entered: 03/06/2019 05:24 PM]
March 6, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Markos C. Generales for Scholars Who Study The Transgender Population [18-13592] (ECF: Markos Generales) [Entered: 03/06/2019 07:28 PM]
March 6, 2019 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to James Andrew Campbell for Doctor Miriam Grossman, Doctor Michael Laidlaw, Doctor Quentin Van Meter and Doctor Andre Van Mol and Gary S. McCaleb for Doctor Miriam Grossman, Doctor Michael Laidlaw, Doctor Quentin Van Meter and Doctor Andre Van Mol. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 03/06/2019 12:26 PM]
March 6, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney James E. Tysse for Amicus Curiae Scholars Who Study The Transgender Population. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [18-13592] (ECF: James Tysse) [Entered: 03/06/2019 03:57 PM]
March 6, 2019 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Amicus Curium A Better Balance, ADL, Advocates for Youth, AAUW, Atlanta Women for Equality, BCC, California Women Lawyers, California Women's Law Center, Center for Constitutional Rights, Center for Reproductive Rights, Central Conference of American Rabbis, Champion Women, Coalition of Black Trade Unionists, DREDF, Equal Rights Advocates, Equality California, FORGE, Inc., Family Values @ Work, Gender Justice, Girls Inc., Girls for Gender Equity, In Our Own Voice: National Black Women's Reproductive Justice Agenda, LatinoJustice PRLDEF, Lawyers Club of San Diego, Legal Aid At Work, Legal Momentum, the Women's Legal Defense and Education Fund, Legal Voice, National Asian Pacific American Women's Forum, National Association of Social Workers, National Association of Women Lawyers, National Center for Law and Economic Justice, National Center for Transgender Equality, National Council of Jewish Women, National Crittenton, National LGBTQ Task Force, National Organization for Women Foundation, National Women's Law Center, Planned Parenthood of South, East and North Florida, Planned Parenthood of Southwest and Central Florida, SisterReach, SSAIS.org, SurvJustice, The Impact Fund, The Southwest Women's Law Center, The Women's Law Center of Maryland, Union for Reform Judaism, UniteWomen.org, "WLG", Women of Reform Judaism, and Men of Reform Judaism, Women's Bar Association of the District of Columbia, Women's Bar Association of the State of New York, Women's Law Project and Young Women United. [Entered: 03/12/2019 02:45 PM]
March 6, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Amicus Curiae Terry S. Kogan Attorney David D. Mesa for Amicus Curiae Terry S. Kogan. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [18-13592] (ECF: David Mesa) [Entered: 03/06/2019 02:23 PM]
March 6, 2019 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Craig Edward Bertschi for Women's Liberation Front. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP) via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 03/06/2019 12:27 PM]
March 6, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Maureen P. Alger for PFLAG, Inc., Trans Youth Equality Foundation, Gender Spectrum, Gender Diversity, and Jacksonville Area Sexual Minority Youth Network, Inc.. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [18-13592] (ECF: Maureen Alger) [Entered: 03/06/2019 12:32 PM]
March 5, 2019 AMENDED Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Andrew John Pincus for Amicus Curium A Better Balance, ADL, Advocates for Youth, AAUW, Atlanta Women for Equality, BCC, California Women Lawyers, California Women's Law Center, Center for Constitutional Rights, Center for Reproductive Rights, Central Conference of American Rabbis, Champion Women, Coalition of Black Trade Unionists, DREDF, Equal Rights Advocates, Equality California, Family Values @ Work, FORGE, Inc., Gender Justice, Girls for Gender Equity, Girls Inc., In Our Own Voice: National Black Women's Reproductive Justice Agenda, LatinoJustice PRLDEF, Lawyers Club of San Diego, Legal Aid At Work, Legal Momentum, the Women's Legal Defense and Education Fund, Legal Voice, National Asian Pacific American Women's Forum, National Association of Social Workers, National Association of Women Lawyers, National Center for Law and Economic Justice, National Center for Transgender Equality, National Council of Jewish Women, National Crittenton, National LGBTQ Task Force, National Organization for Women Foundation, National Women's Law Center, Planned Parenthood of South, East and North Florida, Planned Parenthood of Southwest and Central Florida, SisterReach, SSAIS.org, SurvJustice, The Impact Fund, The Southwest Women's Law Center, The Women's Law Center of Maryland, Union for Reform Judaism, UniteWomen.org, "WLG", Women of Reform Judaism, and Men of Reform Judaism, Women's Bar Association of the District of Columbia, Women's Bar Association of the State of New York, Women's Law Project and Young Women United. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [18-13592] (ECF: Andrew Pincus) [Entered: 03/05/2019 05:12 PM]
March 4, 2019 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Amicus Curiae Scholars Who Study The Transgender Population. [Entered: 03/06/2019 10:27 AM]
March 4, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Andrew Amend for New York, Washington, California, Connecticut, Delaware, Hawaii, Illinois, Iowa, Maine, Maryland, Massachusetts, Michigan, Minnesota, New Jersey, New Mexico, Oregon, Pennsylvania, Rhode Island, Vermont, Virginia, and District of Columbia [18-13592] (ECF: Andrew Amend) [Entered: 03/04/2019 04:35 PM]
March 4, 2019 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Amicus Curium State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Massachusetts, State of Michigan, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Pennsylvania, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Virginia and State of Washington. [Entered: 03/06/2019 11:17 AM]
March 4, 2019 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Amicus Curiae Terry S. Kogan. [Entered: 03/06/2019 11:43 AM]
March 4, 2019 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Amicus Curium District of Columbia, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Massachusetts, State of Michigan, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Pennsylvania, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Virginia and State of Washington. [Entered: 03/06/2019 11:51 AM]
March 1, 2019 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Not Party NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc.. [Entered: 03/01/2019 03:05 PM]
March 1, 2019 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Not Party School Administrators. [Entered: 03/01/2019 02:34 PM]
March 1, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Alexander Slavin for Amici Curiae Anti-Sexual Assault, Domestic Violence, and Gender Based Violence Organizations [18-13592] (ECF: Alexander Slavin) [Entered: 03/01/2019 12:54 PM]
March 1, 2019 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Amicus Curium National Association of School Psychologists, National PTA and The American School Counselor Association, et al.. [Entered: 03/01/2019 03:46 PM]
March 1, 2019 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Not Parties Airbnb, Inc., AAPL, Asana, Inc., Credo Mobile, Inc., DB, General Assembly Space, Inc., GitHub, Inc., Glassdoor, Inc., GlaxoSmithKline LLC, GOOGL, IBM Corporation, Indiegogo, Inc., Kaiser Permanente and Knotel, Inc. et al.. [Entered: 03/01/2019 03:28 PM]
March 1, 2019 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Amicus Curium Boston Area Rape Crisis Center, Buckeye Region Anti-Violence Organization, a Program of Equitas Health, Casa de Esperanza: National Latina Network for Healthy Families and Communities, DC Coalition Against Domestic Violence, Day One, Empire Justice Center, Gender Spectrum, Illinois Accountability Initiative, Iowa Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Louisiana Foundation Against Sexual Assault, Michigan Coalition to End Domestic & Sexual Violence, National Alliance to End Sexual Violence, National Coalition Against Domestic Violence, National Resource Center on Domestic Violence, Nebraska Coalition to End Domestic and Sexual Violence, Nevada Coalition to End Domestic and Sexual Violence, New Hampshire Coalition Against Domestic and Sexual Violence, New Mexico Coalition of Sexual Assault Programs, Inc., New York State Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Northern Marianas Coalition Against Domestic & Sexual Violence, Oasis Legal Services, Ohio Alliance to End Sexual Violence, Oregon Coalition Against Domestic & Sexual Violence, Parent-Child Center, Rape/Domestic Abuse Program, SASA Crisis Center, Vermont Network Against Domestic & Sexual Violence, Virginia Sexual & Domestic Violence Action Alliance, Voices of Hope, Wisconsin Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Women's Center for Advancement and Wyoming Coalition Against Domestic Violence and Sexual Assault. [Entered: 03/06/2019 10:59 AM]
March 1, 2019 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Amicus Curium Gender Diversity, Gender Spectrum, Jacksonville Area Sexual Minority Youth Network, Inc., PFLAG, Inc. and Trans Youth Equality Foundation. [Entered: 03/06/2019 11:10 AM]
March 1, 2019 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Amicus Curium American Academy of Nursing, American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Physicians, American Medical Association, American Medical Women's Association and GLMA - Health Professionals Advancing LGBTQ Equality. [Entered: 03/06/2019 10:42 AM]
February 28, 2019 Amicus Brief as of right or by consent of the parties filed by Wesley R. Powell for Amici Curiae National PTA, GLSEN, American School Counselor Association, and National Association of School Psychologists. [18-13592] (ECF: Wesley Powell) [Entered: 02/28/2019 02:05 PM]
February 28, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Wesley R. Powell for Amicus Curium GLSEN, National Association of School Psychologists, National PTA and The American School Counselor Association. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [18-13592] (ECF: Wesley Powell) [Entered: 02/28/2019 02:27 PM]
February 28, 2019 Amicus Brief as of right or by consent of the parties filed by Devi M. Rao for American Academy of Child & Adolescent Psychiatry (AACAP), American Academy of Nursing, American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Physicians, American Medical Association, American Medical Women's Association, et al. [18-13592] (ECF: Devi Rao) [Entered: 02/28/2019 04:19 PM]
February 28, 2019 Amicus Brief as of right or by consent of the parties filed by Maureen P. Alger for PFLAG, Inc., Trans Youth Equality Foundation, Gender Spectrum, Gender Diversity, and Jacksonville Area Sexual Minority Youth Network, Inc.. [18-13592] (ECF: Maureen Alger) [Entered: 02/28/2019 12:46 PM]
February 28, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Jin Hee Lee for Amicus Curiae NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc.. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [18-13592] (ECF: Jin Lee) [Entered: 02/28/2019 02:51 PM]
February 28, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Edward John Jacobs for Not Parties Airbnb, Inc., AAPL, Asana, Inc., Credo Mobile, Inc., DB, EBAY, General Assembly Space, Inc., GitHub, Inc., Glassdoor, Inc., GlaxoSmithKline LLC, GOOGL, IBM Corporation, Indiegogo, Inc., Kaiser Permanente, Knotel, Inc., Levi Strauss & Co., Linden Research, Inc. d/b/a Linden Lab, Lyft, Mapbox, Inc., Marin Software Incorporated, Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company "MassMutual", MSFT, NIO USA, Inc., Patreon, Inc., Postmates Inc., Replacements, Ltd., Shutterstock, Inc., Spotify USA Inc., Tumblr, Inc., Twitter Inc., XRX and Yelp Inc.. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [18-13592] (ECF: Edward Jacobs) [Entered: 02/28/2019 11:07 AM]
February 28, 2019 Amicus Brief as of right or by consent of the parties filed by Steven W. Davis for School Administrators. [18-13592] (ECF: Steven Davis) [Entered: 02/28/2019 10:50 AM]
February 28, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Steven W. Davis for School Administrators Attorney Steven W. Davis for Not Party School Administrators. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [18-13592] (ECF: Steven Davis) [Entered: 02/28/2019 10:57 AM]
February 28, 2019 Amicus Brief as of right or by consent of the parties filed by David D. Mesa, Esq., Counsel for Terry S. Kogan, Amicus Curiae. [18-13592] (ECF: David Mesa) [Entered: 02/28/2019 04:27 PM]
February 28, 2019 MOTION to file amicus brief pursuant to FRAP 29(a) filed by AIRBNB, INC., APPLE, ASANA, INC., CREDO MOBILE INC., DEUTSCHE BANK AG, EBAY INC., GENERAL ASSEMBLY SPACE, INC., GITHUB, INC., GLASSDOOR, INC., GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC, GOOGLE LLC, IBM CORPORATION, INDIEGOGO INC., KAISER PERMANENTE, KNOTEL INC., et al.. [8707170-1] [18-13592] (ECF: Edward Jacobs) [Entered: 02/28/2019 11:26 AM]
February 28, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Rosanne C. Baxter for School Administrators. [18-13592] (ECF: Rosanne Baxter) [Entered: 02/28/2019 12:23 PM]
February 28, 2019 Amicus Brief as of right or by consent of the parties filed by Jin Hee Lee for Amicus Curiae NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc.. [18-13592] (ECF: Jin Lee) [Entered: 02/28/2019 02:46 PM]
February 28, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Dimitri D. Portnoi for Amici Curiae Anti-Sexual Assault, Domestic Violence, and Gender Based Violence Organizations [18-13592] (ECF: Dimitri Portnoi) [Entered: 02/28/2019 07:24 PM]
February 28, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Matthew Wallace for Amici Curiae Anti-Sexual Assault, Domestic Violence, and Gender Based Violence Organizations [18-13592] (ECF: Matthew Wallace) [Entered: 02/28/2019 07:44 PM]
February 28, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Andrew J. Pincus for National Women's Law Center, et al. [18-13592] (ECF: Andrew Pincus) [Entered: 02/28/2019 06:48 PM]
February 28, 2019 Amicus Brief as of right or by consent of the parties filed by Andrew W. Amend for Amici Curiae States of New York et al.. [18-13592] (ECF: Andrew Amend) [Entered: 02/28/2019 08:26 PM]
February 28, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Andrew J. Pincus for National Women's Law Center, et al.. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [18-13592] (ECF: Andrew Pincus) [Entered: 02/28/2019 07:05 PM]
February 28, 2019 Amicus Brief as of right or by consent of the parties filed by Dimitri Portnoi for Amici Curiae Anti-Sexual Assault, Domestic Violence, and Gender Based Violence Organizations. [18-13592] (ECF: Dimitri Portnoi) [Entered: 02/28/2019 08:09 PM]
February 28, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by James E. Tysse for Amicus Curiae Scholars Who Study The Transgender Population [18-13592] (ECF: James Tysse) [Entered: 02/28/2019 06:51 PM]
February 28, 2019 Amicus Brief as of right or by consent of the parties filed by Andrew J. Pincus for National Women's Law Center, et al.. [18-13592] (ECF: Andrew Pincus) [Entered: 02/28/2019 07:01 PM]
February 28, 2019 Amicus Brief as of right or by consent of the parties filed by James E. Tysse for Scholars Who Study The Transgender Population. [18-13592] (ECF: James Tysse) [Entered: 02/28/2019 06:54 PM]
February 28, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jessica M. Weisel for Amici Curiae Scholars Who Study The Transgender Population [18-13592] (ECF: Jessica Weisel) [Entered: 02/28/2019 06:58 PM]
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion to appear pro hac vice filed by Rosanne C. Baxter is GRANTED by clerk. [8705790-2] [Entered: 02/27/2019 11:50 AM]
February 27, 2019 ***ERROR*** APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Andrew W. Amend for Amici Curiae States of New York et al. [18-13592]--[Edited 03/04/2019 by CJ] AOC does not specify all parties represented...new AOC Form filed on 03/04/2019. (ECF: Andrew Amend) [Entered: 02/27/2019 03:46 PM]
February 27, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Wesley R. Powell for Amici Curiae National PTA, GLSEN, American School Counselor Association, and National Association of School Psychologists [18-13592] (ECF: Wesley Powell) [Entered: 02/27/2019 04:17 PM]
February 26, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by John C. Dwyer for Amici Curiae PFLAG, Inc., Trans Youth Equality Foundation, Gender Spectrum, Gender Diversity, and Jacksonville Area Sexual Minority Youth Network, Inc. [18-13592] (ECF: Sarah Binning) [Entered: 02/26/2019 02:09 PM]
February 26, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Kyle Wong for Amici Curiae PFLAG, Inc., Trans Youth Equality Foundation, Gender Spectrum, Gender Diversity, and Jacksonville Area Sexual Minority Youth Network, Inc. [18-13592] (ECF: Sarah Binning) [Entered: 02/26/2019 02:10 PM]
February 26, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Steven W. Davis for Amicus Curiae School Administrators [18-13592] (ECF: Steven Davis) [Entered: 02/26/2019 12:47 PM]
February 26, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Joanna Wasick for Airbnb, Inc, Apple Inc., Asana, Inc., Credo Mobile, Inc., Deutsche Bank AG, eBay Inc., General Assembly Space, Inc., GitHub, Inc., Glassdoor, Inc., GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Google LLC, IBM Corporation, Indiegogo, Inc., Kaiser Permanente, [18-13592] (ECF: Joanna Wasick) [Entered: 02/26/2019 09:18 AM]
February 26, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Sarah R. Binning for Amici Curiae PFLAG, Inc., Trans Youth Equality Foundation, Gender Spectrum, Gender Diversity, and Jacksonville Area Sexual Minority Youth Network, Inc. [18-13592] (ECF: Sarah Binning) [Entered: 02/26/2019 02:11 PM]
February 26, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Edward J. Jacobs for Airbnb, Inc, Apple Inc., Asana, Inc., Credo Mobile, Inc., Deutsche Bank AG, eBay Inc., General Assembly Space, Inc., GitHub, Inc., Glassdoor, Inc., GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Google LLC, IBM Corporation, Indiegogo, Inc., Kaiser Permanente, [18-13592] (ECF: Edward Jacobs) [Entered: 02/26/2019 09:12 AM]
February 26, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Victoria Lynn Stork for Airbnb, Inc, Apple Inc., Asana, Inc., Credo Mobile, Inc., Deutsche Bank AG, eBay Inc., General Assembly Space, Inc., GitHub, Inc., Glassdoor, Inc., GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Google LLC, IBM Corporation, Indiegogo, Inc., Kaiser Permanent [18-13592] (ECF: Victoria Stork) [Entered: 02/26/2019 09:22 AM]
February 26, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Maureen P. Alger for Amici Curiae PFLAG, Inc., Trans Youth Equality Foundation, Gender Spectrum, Gender Diversity, and Jacksonville Area Sexual Minority Youth Network, Inc. [18-13592] (ECF: Sarah Binning) [Entered: 02/26/2019 02:08 PM]
February 26, 2019 Notice of Mandatory ECF sent to Emily Brooke Harrington & Shawn Thomas Meerkamper. [Entered: 02/26/2019 04:24 PM]
February 26, 2019 MOTION to appear pro hac vice filed by Attorney Rosanne C. Baxter for Not Party School Administrators. [8705790-1] [Entered: 02/27/2019 11:48 AM]
February 26, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Attorney Devi M. Rao for Amicus Curiae GLMA - Health Professionals Advancing LGBTQ Equality in 18-13592, Attorney Devi M. Rao for Amicus Curiae American Medical Women's Association in 18-13592, Attorney Devi M. Rao for Amicus Curiae American Medical Association in 18-13592, Attorney Devi M. Rao for Amicus Curiae American College of Physicians in 18-13592, Attorney Devi M. Rao for Amicus Curiae American Academy of Pediatrics in 18-13592, Attorney Devi M. Rao for Amicus Curiae American Academy of Nursing in 18-13592. [Entered: 03/05/2019 03:28 PM]
February 26, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Shawn Meerkamper for Amici Curiae PFLAG, Inc., Trans Youth Equality Foundation, Gender Spectrum, Gender Diversity, and Jacksonville Area Sexual Minority Youth Network, Inc. [18-13592] (ECF: Sarah Binning) [Entered: 02/26/2019 02:15 PM]
February 26, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Emily Harrington for Amici Curiae PFLAG, Inc., Trans Youth Equality Foundation, Gender Spectrum, Gender Diversity, and Jacksonville Area Sexual Minority Youth Network, Inc. [18-13592] (ECF: Sarah Binning) [Entered: 02/26/2019 02:12 PM]
February 26, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Shannon Minter for Amici Curiae PFLAG, Inc., Trans Youth Equality Foundation, Gender Spectrum, Gender Diversity, and Jacksonville Area Sexual Minority Youth Network, Inc. [18-13592] (ECF: Sarah Binning) [Entered: 02/26/2019 02:13 PM]
February 26, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Asaf Orr for Amici Curiae PFLAG, Inc., Trans Youth Equality Foundation, Gender Spectrum, Gender Diversity, and Jacksonville Area Sexual Minority Youth Network, Inc. [18-13592] (ECF: Sarah Binning) [Entered: 02/26/2019 02:14 PM]
February 25, 2019 Received paper copies of EAppendix filed by Appellee Drew Adams. 2 VOLUMES - 7 COPIES [Entered: 02/25/2019 11:38 AM]
February 25, 2019 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Appellee Drew Adams. [Entered: 02/25/2019 11:39 AM]
February 25, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jin Hee Lee for Amicus Curiae NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc. [18-13592] (ECF: Jin Lee) [Entered: 02/25/2019 04:37 PM]
February 21, 2019 Appellee's Brief filed by Appellee Drew Adams. [18-13592] (ECF: Tara Borelli) [Entered: 02/21/2019 07:13 PM]
February 21, 2019 Supplemental Appendix [2 VOLUMES] filed by Appellee Drew Adams. [18-13592] (ECF: Tara Borelli) [Entered: 02/21/2019 07:41 PM]
January 28, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Kevin Kostelnik for School Board of St. Johns County, Florida. [18-13592] (ECF: Kevin Kostelnik) [Entered: 01/28/2019 03:56 PM]
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion to appear pro hac vice filed by Gregory H. Teufel is GRANTED by clerk. [8677734-2], ORDER: Motion to appear pro hac vice filed by Robert H. Tyler is GRANTED by clerk. [8677731-2] [Entered: 01/24/2019 02:45 PM]
January 23, 2019 MOTION to appear pro hac vice filed by Attorney Gregory H. Teufel for Amicus Curiae WALT HEYER. [8677734-1] [Entered: 01/24/2019 02:41 PM]
January 22, 2019 MOTION to appear pro hac vice filed by Attorney Robert H. Tyler for Amicus Curiae WALT HEYER. [8677731-1] [Entered: 01/24/2019 02:41 PM]
January 17, 2019 Certificate of Readiness filed as to Appellant School Board of St. Johns County, Florida. [Entered: 01/17/2019 03:20 PM]
January 17, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by David D. Mesa for Terry S. Kogan. [18-13592] (ECF: David Mesa) [Entered: 01/17/2019 07:14 PM]
January 15, 2019 Record on Appeal filed. Pleadings, 1 volumes [Entered: 01/17/2019 03:17 PM]
January 10, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Patricia B. Palacios for Terry S. Kogan. [18-13592] (ECF: Patricia Palacios) [Entered: 01/10/2019 05:20 PM]
January 10, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jerome Pierce for Terry S. Kogan. [18-13592] (ECF: Patricia Palacios) [Entered: 01/10/2019 07:08 PM]
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: The motion to appear pro hac vice filed by David D. Mesa is GRANTED. (CK) [8664784-2] [Entered: 01/09/2019 02:37 PM]
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: The motion to appear pro hac vice filed by Patricia B. Palacios is GRANTED. (CK) [8664789-2] [Entered: 01/09/2019 02:41 PM]
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: The motion to appear pro hac vice filed by Jerome Pierce is GRANTED. (CK) [8664800-2] [Entered: 01/09/2019 02:45 PM]
January 7, 2019 MOTION to appear pro hac vice filed by Attorney David D. Mesa for Terry S. Kogan. [8664784-1] [Entered: 01/09/2019 02:35 PM]
January 7, 2019 MOTION to appear pro hac vice filed by Attorney Patricia B. Palacios for Terry S. Kogan. [8664789-1] [Entered: 01/09/2019 02:40 PM]
January 7, 2019 MOTION to appear pro hac vice filed by Attorney Jerome Pierce for Terry S. Kogan. [8664800-1] [Entered: 01/09/2019 02:44 PM]
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion for extension to file appellee brief filed by Appellee Drew Adams is GRANTED. [ # 8655828-2 ] Appellees brief due on 02/21/2019. KCN [Entered: 01/03/2019 11:13 AM]
January 2, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Gary S. McCaleb for Doctor Miriam Grossman, Doctor Michael Laidlaw, Doctor Quentin Van Meter and Doctor Andre Van Mol. [18-13592] (ECF: Gary McCaleb) [Entered: 01/02/2019 12:58 PM]
December 31, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion to appear pro hac vice filed by Gary S. McCaleb is GRANTED by clerk. [8656154-2] [Entered: 12/31/2018 09:57 AM]
December 31, 2018 Received paper copies of EAppendix filed by Appellant School Board of St. Johns County, Florida. 16 VOLUMES - 2 COPIES [Entered: 12/31/2018 02:43 PM]
December 31, 2018 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Amicus Curiae WALT HEYER. [Entered: 03/13/2019 10:58 AM]
December 28, 2018 Appearance of counsel form has not been processed. According to our records, James Andrew Campbell for Doctor Miriam Grossman, Doctor Michael Laidlaw, Doctor Quentin Van Meter and Doctor Andre Van Mol is a member of the Eleventh Circuit bar in inactive status. Your appearance form will not be processed until your bar membership has been renewed. [Entered: 12/28/2018 11:07 AM]
December 28, 2018 MOTION to appear pro hac vice filed by Attorney Gary S. McCaleb for Amicus Curium Doctor Miriam Grossman, Doctor Michael Laidlaw, Doctor Quentin Van Meter and Doctor Andre Van Mol. [8656154-1] [Entered: 12/31/2018 09:54 AM]
December 28, 2018 MOTION for extension of time to file appellee's brief to 02/21/2019 filed by Drew Adams. Motion is Unopposed. [8655828-1] [18-13592] (ECF: Tara Borelli) [Entered: 12/28/2018 04:34 PM]
December 28, 2018 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Amicus Curium Doctor Miriam Grossman, Doctor Michael Laidlaw, Doctor Quentin Van Meter, Doctor Andre Van Mol and Women's Liberation Front. [Entered: 01/02/2019 05:38 PM]
December 28, 2018 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Amicus Curiae Women's Liberation Front. [Entered: 03/13/2019 11:10 AM]
December 27, 2018 Appendix filed [16 VOLUMES] by Appellant School Board of St. Johns County, Florida. [18-13592] (ECF: Terry Harmon) [Entered: 12/27/2018 03:02 PM]
December 27, 2018 Amicus Brief as of right or by consent of the parties filed by Women's Liberation Front. [18-13592] (ECF: Craig Bertschi) [Entered: 12/27/2018 02:50 PM]
December 27, 2018 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Craig E. Bertschi for Women's Liberation Front [18-13592] (ECF: Craig Bertschi) [Entered: 12/27/2018 11:51 AM]
December 27, 2018 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by James A. Campbell for Amici Curiae Grossman, Laidlaw, Van Meter and Van Mol [18-13592] (ECF: James Campbell) [Entered: 12/27/2018 05:09 PM]
December 27, 2018 Amicus Brief as of right or by consent of the parties filed by Nathan W. Kellum for Amicus Curiae Walt Heyer. [18-13592] (ECF: Nathan Kellum) [Entered: 12/27/2018 07:47 PM]
December 27, 2018 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Nathan W. Kellum for Amicus Curiae Walt Heyer [18-13592] (ECF: Nathan Kellum) [Entered: 12/27/2018 07:43 PM]
December 27, 2018 Amicus Brief as of right or by consent of the parties filed by James A. Campbell for Amici Curiae Grossman, Laidlaw, Van Meter and Van Mol. [18-13592] (ECF: James Campbell) [Entered: 12/27/2018 05:11 PM]
December 21, 2018 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Appellant School Board of St. Johns County, Florida. [Entered: 12/21/2018 03:35 PM]
December 20, 2018 Appellant's brief filed by School Board of St. Johns County, Florida. [18-13592] (ECF: Terry Harmon) [Entered: 12/20/2018 03:22 PM]
December 20, 2018 ERROR --[Edited 12/21/2018 by MM - ENTERED IN ERROR]--[Edited 12/21/2018 by MM - ENTERED IN ERROR]PSI for the Electronic ROA Program filed by Attorney Terry Joseph Harmon for Appellant School Board of St. Johns County, Florida. [Entered: 12/21/2018 03:42 PM]
December 20, 2018 ERROR --[Edited 12/21/2018 by MM ENTERED IN ERROR]--[Edited 12/21/2018 by MM ENTERED IN ERROR]Public Communication:. Received SEALED Transcript of Sentencing Hearing [Entered: 12/21/2018 03:45 PM]
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion for extension to file appellant brief filed by Appellant School Board of St. Johns County, Florida is GRANTED. [ # 8594339-2 ] Appellants brief due on 12/20/2018. ELB [Entered: 10/25/2018 04:05 PM]
October 17, 2018 MOTION for extension of time to file appellant's brief to 12/20/2018 filed by School Board of St. Johns County, Florida. Motion is Unopposed. [8594339-1] [18-13592] (ECF: Terry Harmon) [Entered: 10/17/2018 04:34 PM]
September 27, 2018 TRANSCRIPTS FILED. Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Shannon Bishop, Filer: Drew Adams, Dt. all Trans. Filed: 09/26/2018, Proceeding Type and Date: Pre-Trial Proceedings 12/01/2017. [Entered: 09/27/2018 12:25 PM]
September 27, 2018 Briefing Notice issued to Appellant School Board of St. Johns County, Florida. The appellant's brief is due on or before 11/05/2018. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 09/27/2018 12:27 PM]
September 21, 2018 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Cynthia Cook Robertson for Drew Adams, Appellee [18-13592] (ECF: Cynthia Robertson) [Entered: 09/21/2018 12:24 AM]
September 21, 2018 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Paul David Castillo for Drew Adams. [18-13592] (ECF: Paul Castillo) [Entered: 09/21/2018 10:13 AM]
September 21, 2018 Response to Civil Appeal Statement form filed by Attorney Tara L. Borelli for Appellee Drew Adams. [18-13592] (ECF: Tara Borelli) [Entered: 09/21/2018 10:32 AM]
September 21, 2018 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Tara L. Borelli for Appellee Drew Adams. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [18-13592] (ECF: Tara Borelli) [Entered: 09/21/2018 11:51 AM]
September 19, 2018 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM PROCESSED. Transcript Order: Filer: School Board, Court Reporter: Shannon Bishop, Proceeding Type and Date: Pre-Trial Proceedings 12/01/2017.--[Edited 09/19/2018 by RAV] [Entered: 09/19/2018 04:01 PM]
September 19, 2018 The briefing schedule issued to Appellant School Board of St. Johns County, Florida is hereby rescinded for the following reason(s): Transcript has not been filed-12/1/17. When the above matter(s) is resolved, the clerk will issue a notice advising counsel and the parties of the new schedule for filing briefs in this appeal. [Entered: 09/19/2018 04:05 PM]
September 12, 2018 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Shani Rivaux for Drew Adams. (ECF: Shani Rivaux) [Entered: 09/12/2018 11:57 AM]
September 12, 2018 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Markenzy Lapointe for Drew Adams. (ECF: Markenzy Lapointe) [Entered: 09/12/2018 12:03 PM]
September 12, 2018 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Aryeh Lev Kaplan for Drew Adams. (ECF: Aryeh Kaplan) [Entered: 09/12/2018 12:05 PM]
September 11, 2018 TRANSCRIPTS FILED. Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Shannon Bishop, Filer: Drew Adams, Dt. all Trans. Filed: 09/10/2018, Proceeding Type and Date: Pre-Trial Proceedings 12/01/2017. [Entered: 09/11/2018 10:54 AM]
September 11, 2018 Briefing Notice issued to Appellant School Board of St. Johns County, Florida. The appellant's brief is due on or before 10/22/2018. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 09/11/2018 04:19 PM]
September 11, 2018 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Richard M. Segal for Drew Adams. (ECF: Richard Segal) [Entered: 09/11/2018 03:21 PM]
September 11, 2018 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Terry Joseph Harmon for Appellant School Board of St. Johns County, Florida. (ECF: Terry Harmon) [Entered: 09/11/2018 05:36 PM]
September 7, 2018 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Terry Joseph Harmon for Appellant School Board of St. Johns County, Florida. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). (ECF: Terry Harmon) [Entered: 09/07/2018 04:58 PM]
September 6, 2018 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Terry Joseph Harmon for School Board of St. Johns County, Florida. (ECF: Terry Harmon) [Entered: 09/06/2018 09:00 AM]
September 6, 2018 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Robert Sniffen for School Board of St. Johns County, Florida. (ECF: Robert Sniffen) [Entered: 09/06/2018 09:08 AM]
September 6, 2018 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Michael P. Spellman for School Board of St. Johns County, Florida. (ECF: Michael Spellman) [Entered: 09/06/2018 10:00 AM]
September 6, 2018 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM PROCESSED. Transcript Order: Filer: Drew Adams, Court Reporter: Shannon Bishop, Proceeding Type and Date: Pre-Trial Proceedings 12/01/2017. *requested December 11, 12, 13, 2017 - filed 01/17/2018; requested February 16,2018 - filed 03/21/2018* [Entered: 09/06/2018 03:15 PM]
September 6, 2018 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Terry Joseph Harmon for Appellant School Board of St. Johns County, Florida. Transcript(s) ordered. (ECF: Terry Harmon) [Entered: 09/06/2018 02:51 PM]
September 5, 2018 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Kirsten Doolittle for Drew Adams. (ECF: Kirsten Doolittle) [Entered: 09/05/2018 10:16 AM]
August 30, 2018 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jeffrey D. Slanker, The School Board of St. Johns County, Florida (ECF: Jeffrey Slanker) [Entered: 08/30/2018 10:29 AM]
August 30, 2018 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Diana Flynn for Appellee (ECF: Diana Flynn) [Entered: 08/30/2018 05:23 PM]
August 29, 2018 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Omar Gonzalez-Pagan for Drew Adams. (ECF: Omar Gonzalez-Pagan) [Entered: 08/29/2018 11:02 AM]
August 29, 2018 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jennifer G. Altman for Drew Adams. (ECF: Jennifer Altman) [Entered: 08/29/2018 03:13 PM]
August 28, 2018 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Tara L. Borelli for Drew Adams. (ECF: Tara Borelli) [Entered: 08/28/2018 09:55 PM]
August 24, 2018 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant School Board of St. Johns County, Florida on 08/23/2018. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 09/07/2018 as to Appellant School Board of St. Johns County, Florida. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 09/21/2018 as to Appellee Drew Adams [Entered: 08/28/2018 01:01 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Drew Adams v. School Board of St. Johns Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: WOMEN'S LAW PROJECT
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Represented By: Charles Alan Rothfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CHAMPION WOMEN
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Represented By: Charles Alan Rothfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: THE SOUTHWEST WOMEN'S LAW CENTER
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Represented By: Charles Alan Rothfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF MARYLAND
Represented By: Andrew W. Amend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: PFLAG, INC.
Represented By: Sarah Rebecca Binning
Represented By: Asaf Orr
Represented By: Shawn Thomas Meerkamper
Represented By: Kyle C. Wong
Represented By: Shannon Price Minter
Represented By: Maureen P. Alger
Represented By: John Charles Dwyer
Represented By: Emily Harrington
Represented By: John Dwyer
Represented By: Audrey J. Mott-Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CASA DE ESPERANZA: NATIONAL LATINA NETWORK FOR HEALTHY FAMILIES AND COMMUNITIES
Represented By: Alexander Slavin
Represented By: Dimitri Portnoi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NEVADA COALITION TO END DOMESTIC AND SEXUAL VIOLENCE
Represented By: Alexander Slavin
Represented By: Dimitri Portnoi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CENTER FOR CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Represented By: Charles Alan Rothfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: COALITION OF BLACK TRADE UNIONISTS
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Represented By: Charles Alan Rothfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LEGAL MOMENTUM, THE WOMEN'S LEGAL DEFENSE AND EDUCATION FUND
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Represented By: Charles Alan Rothfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: PLANNED PARENTHOOD OF SOUTH, EAST AND NORTH FLORIDA
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Represented By: Charles Alan Rothfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: UNION FOR REFORM JUDAISM
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Represented By: Charles Alan Rothfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JACKSONVILLE AREA SEXUAL MINORITY YOUTH NETWORK, INC.
Represented By: Sarah Rebecca Binning
Represented By: Asaf Orr
Represented By: Shawn Thomas Meerkamper
Represented By: Kyle C. Wong
Represented By: Shannon Price Minter
Represented By: Maureen P. Alger
Represented By: John Charles Dwyer
Represented By: Emily Harrington
Represented By: John Dwyer
Represented By: Audrey J. Mott-Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CENTRAL CONFERENCE OF AMERICAN RABBIS
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Represented By: Charles Alan Rothfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: WOMEN'S BAR ASSOCIATION OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Represented By: Charles Alan Rothfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GIRLS INC.
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Represented By: Charles Alan Rothfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CALIFORNIA WOMEN LAWYERS
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Represented By: Charles Alan Rothfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL CENTER FOR LAW AND ECONOMIC JUSTICE
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Represented By: Charles Alan Rothfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF CALIFORNIA
Represented By: Andrew W. Amend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CALIFORNIA WOMEN'S LAW CENTER
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Represented By: Charles Alan Rothfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MICHAEL LAIDLAW
Represented By: James A. Campbell
Represented By: Gary S. McCaleb
Represented By: John J. Bursch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BUCKEYE REGION ANTI-VIOLENCE ORGANIZATION, A PROGRAM OF EQUITAS HEALTH
Represented By: Alexander Slavin
Represented By: Dimitri Portnoi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: IN OUR OWN VOICE: NATIONAL BLACK WOMEN'S REPRODUCTIVE JUSTICE AGENDA
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Represented By: Charles Alan Rothfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL ORGANIZATION FOR WOMEN FOUNDATION
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Represented By: Charles Alan Rothfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF MAINE
Represented By: Andrew W. Amend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GENDER JUSTICE
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Represented By: Charles Alan Rothfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF DELAWARE
Represented By: Andrew W. Amend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: A BETTER BALANCE
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Represented By: Charles Alan Rothfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: WALT HEYER
Represented By: Robert H. Tyler
Represented By: Gregory H. Teufel
Represented By: Nathan W. Kellum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LOUISIANA FOUNDATION AGAINST SEXUAL ASSAULT
Represented By: Alexander Slavin
Represented By: Dimitri Portnoi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: WOMEN'S BAR ASSOCIATION OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Represented By: Charles Alan Rothfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: VIRGINIA SEXUAL & DOMESTIC VIOLENCE ACTION ALLIANCE
Represented By: Alexander Slavin
Represented By: Dimitri Portnoi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA
Represented By: Andrew W. Amend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: WOMEN'S CENTER FOR ADVANCEMENT
Represented By: Alexander Slavin
Represented By: Dimitri Portnoi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SOCIAL WORKERS
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Represented By: Charles Alan Rothfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BOSTON AREA RAPE CRISIS CENTER
Represented By: Alexander Slavin
Represented By: Dimitri Portnoi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STOP SEXUAL ASSAULT IN SCHOOLS
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Represented By: Charles Alan Rothfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: TERRY S. KOGAN
Represented By: Jerome Pierce
Represented By: Patricia B. Palacios
Represented By: David D. Mesa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF NEW YORK
Represented By: Andrew W. Amend
Represented By: Mark Stephen Grube
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GLMA - HEALTH PROFESSIONALS ADVANCING LGBTQ EQUALITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF ILLINOIS
Represented By: Andrew W. Amend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: WOMEN OF REFORM JUDAISM, AND MEN OF REFORM JUDAISM
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Represented By: Charles Alan Rothfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: THE IMPACT FUND
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Represented By: Charles Alan Rothfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: VERMONT NETWORK AGAINST DOMESTIC & SEXUAL VIOLENCE
Represented By: Alexander Slavin
Represented By: Dimitri Portnoi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LEGAL VOICE
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Represented By: Charles Alan Rothfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: EMPIRE JUSTICE CENTER
Represented By: Alexander Slavin
Represented By: Dimitri Portnoi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SCHOOL ADMINISTRATORS
Represented By: Steven W. Davis
Represented By: Rosanne C. Baxter
Represented By: Carmine D. Boccuzzi Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF CONNECTICUT
Represented By: Andrew W. Amend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: WOMEN'S LIBERATION FRONT
Represented By: Craig Edward Bertschi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NORTHERN MARIANAS COALITION AGAINST DOMESTIC & SEXUAL VIOLENCE
Represented By: Alexander Slavin
Represented By: Dimitri Portnoi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF NEW JERSEY
Represented By: Andrew W. Amend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: FAMILY VALUES @ WORK
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Represented By: Charles Alan Rothfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: WOMEN LAWYERS ON GUARD INC.
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Represented By: Charles Alan Rothfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NEBRASKA COALITION TO END DOMESTIC AND SEXUAL VIOLENCE
Represented By: Alexander Slavin
Represented By: Dimitri Portnoi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: FORGE, INC.
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Represented By: Charles Alan Rothfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: OHIO ALLIANCE TO END SEXUAL VIOLENCE
Represented By: Alexander Slavin
Represented By: Dimitri Portnoi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ATLANTA WOMEN FOR EQUALITY
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Represented By: Charles Alan Rothfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NEW MEXICO COALITION OF SEXUAL ASSAULT PROGRAMS, INC.
Represented By: Alexander Slavin
Represented By: Dimitri Portnoi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ADL
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Represented By: Charles Alan Rothfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NEW YORK STATE COALITION AGAINST SEXUAL ASSAULT
Represented By: Alexander Slavin
Represented By: Dimitri Portnoi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: PARENT-CHILD CENTER
Represented By: Alexander Slavin
Represented By: Dimitri Portnoi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: QUENTIN VAN METER
Represented By: James A. Campbell
Represented By: Gary S. McCaleb
Represented By: John J. Bursch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CENTER FOR REPRODUCTIVE RIGHTS
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Represented By: Charles Alan Rothfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF MINNESOTA
Represented By: Andrew W. Amend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: WYOMING COALITION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE AND SEXUAL ASSAULT
Represented By: Alexander Slavin
Represented By: Dimitri Portnoi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL COALITION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE
Represented By: Alexander Slavin
Represented By: Dimitri Portnoi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: EQUALITY CALIFORNIA
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Represented By: Charles Alan Rothfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN ACADEMY OF NURSING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL RESOURCE CENTER ON DOMESTIC VIOLENCE
Represented By: Alexander Slavin
Represented By: Dimitri Portnoi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: VOICES OF HOPE
Represented By: Alexander Slavin
Represented By: Dimitri Portnoi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SCHOOL PSYCHOLOGISTS
Represented By: Wesley R. Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LEGAL AID AT WORK
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Represented By: Charles Alan Rothfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: UNITEWOMEN.ORG
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Represented By: Charles Alan Rothfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: WISCONSIN COALITION AGAINST SEXUAL ASSAULT
Represented By: Alexander Slavin
Represented By: Dimitri Portnoi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: OREGON COALITION AGAINST DOMESTIC & SEXUAL VIOLENCE
Represented By: Alexander Slavin
Represented By: Dimitri Portnoi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: IOWA COALITION AGAINST SEXUAL ASSAULT
Represented By: Alexander Slavin
Represented By: Dimitri Portnoi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF RHODE ISLAND
Represented By: Andrew W. Amend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF MICHIGAN
Represented By: Andrew W. Amend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NEW HAMPSHIRE COALITION AGAINST DOMESTIC AND SEXUAL VIOLENCE
Represented By: Alexander Slavin
Represented By: Dimitri Portnoi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DISABILITY RIGHTS EDUCATION AND DEFENSE FUND
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Represented By: Charles Alan Rothfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL ASIAN PACIFIC AMERICAN WOMEN'S FORUM
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Represented By: Charles Alan Rothfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GLSEN
Represented By: Wesley R. Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF IOWA
Represented By: Andrew W. Amend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF WOMEN LAWYERS
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Represented By: Charles Alan Rothfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL CRITTENTON
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Represented By: Charles Alan Rothfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DC COALITION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE
Represented By: Alexander Slavin
Represented By: Dimitri Portnoi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: YOUNG WOMEN UNITED
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Represented By: Charles Alan Rothfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF OREGON
Represented By: Andrew W. Amend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GIRLS FOR GENDER EQUITY
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Represented By: Charles Alan Rothfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: THE AMERICAN SCHOOL COUNSELOR ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Wesley R. Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ANDRE VAN MOL
Represented By: James A. Campbell
Represented By: Gary S. McCaleb
Represented By: John J. Bursch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF NEW MEXICO
Represented By: Andrew W. Amend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SASA CRISIS CENTER
Represented By: Alexander Slavin
Represented By: Dimitri Portnoi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF VERMONT
Represented By: Andrew W. Amend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NAACP LEGAL DEFENSE & EDUCATIONAL FUND, INC.
Represented By: Jin Hee Lee
Represented By: Sherrilyn Ann Ifill
Represented By: Alexsis Johnson
Represented By: Janai S. Nelson
Represented By: Mahogane D. Reed
Represented By: Samuel Spital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GENDER DIVERSITY
Represented By: Sarah Rebecca Binning
Represented By: Asaf Orr
Represented By: Shawn Thomas Meerkamper
Represented By: Kyle C. Wong
Represented By: Shannon Price Minter
Represented By: Maureen P. Alger
Represented By: John Charles Dwyer
Represented By: Emily Harrington
Represented By: John Dwyer
Represented By: Audrey J. Mott-Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ILLINOIS ACCOUNTABILITY INITIATIVE
Represented By: Alexander Slavin
Represented By: Dimitri Portnoi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: TRANS YOUTH EQUALITY FOUNDATION
Represented By: Sarah Rebecca Binning
Represented By: Asaf Orr
Represented By: Shawn Thomas Meerkamper
Represented By: Kyle C. Wong
Represented By: Shannon Price Minter
Represented By: Maureen P. Alger
Represented By: John Charles Dwyer
Represented By: Emily Harrington
Represented By: John Dwyer
Represented By: Audrey J. Mott-Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL LGBTQ TASK FORCE
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Represented By: Charles Alan Rothfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MIRIAM GROSSMAN
Represented By: James A. Campbell
Represented By: Gary S. McCaleb
Represented By: John J. Bursch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BETH CHAYIM CHADASHIM
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Represented By: Charles Alan Rothfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF MASSACHUSETTS
Represented By: Andrew W. Amend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF VIRGINIA
Represented By: Andrew W. Amend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GENDER SPECTRUM
Represented By: Sarah Rebecca Binning
Represented By: Asaf Orr
Represented By: Shawn Thomas Meerkamper
Represented By: Alexander Slavin
Represented By: Kyle C. Wong
Represented By: Shannon Price Minter
Represented By: Dimitri Portnoi
Represented By: Maureen P. Alger
Represented By: John Charles Dwyer
Represented By: Emily Harrington
Represented By: John Dwyer
Represented By: Audrey J. Mott-Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SCHOLARS WHO STUDY THE TRANSGENDER POPULATION
Represented By: Jessica Weisel
Represented By: James E. Tysse
Represented By: Markos Cleomenes Generales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ADVOCATES FOR YOUTH
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Represented By: Charles Alan Rothfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SURVJUSTICE
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Represented By: Charles Alan Rothfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: EQUAL RIGHTS ADVOCATES
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Represented By: Charles Alan Rothfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MEDICAL, NURSING, MENTAL HEALTH, AND OTHER I HEALTH CARE ORGANIZATIONS
Represented By: Clifford Warren Berlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL PTA
Represented By: Wesley R. Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL ALLIANCE TO END SEXUAL VIOLENCE
Represented By: Alexander Slavin
Represented By: Dimitri Portnoi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LATINOJUSTICE PRLDEF
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Represented By: Charles Alan Rothfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF WASHINGTON
Represented By: Andrew W. Amend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DAY ONE
Represented By: Alexander Slavin
Represented By: Dimitri Portnoi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: PLANNED PARENTHOOD OF SOUTHWEST AND CENTRAL FLORIDA
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Represented By: Charles Alan Rothfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Represented By: Andrew W. Amend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: THE WOMEN'S LAW CENTER OF MARYLAND
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Represented By: Charles Alan Rothfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF UNIVERSITY WOMEN
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Represented By: Charles Alan Rothfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL WOMEN'S LAW CENTER
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Represented By: Charles Alan Rothfeld
Represented By: Morgan Lindsay Anastasio
Represented By: Todd Anten
Represented By: Laura Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN MEDICAL WOMEN'S ASSOCIATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LAWYERS CLUB OF SAN DIEGO
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Represented By: Charles Alan Rothfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF HAWAII
Represented By: Andrew W. Amend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MICHIGAN COALITION TO END DOMESTIC & SEXUAL VIOLENCE
Represented By: Alexander Slavin
Represented By: Dimitri Portnoi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: OASIS LEGAL SERVICES
Represented By: Alexander Slavin
Represented By: Dimitri Portnoi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL CENTER FOR TRANSGENDER EQUALITY
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Represented By: Charles Alan Rothfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL COUNCIL OF JEWISH WOMEN
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Represented By: Charles Alan Rothfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SISTERREACH
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Represented By: Charles Alan Rothfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: RAPE/DOMESTIC ABUSE PROGRAM
Represented By: Alexander Slavin
Represented By: Dimitri Portnoi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF TENNESSEE
Represented By: Sarah Keeton Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF ARIZONA
Represented By: Sarah Keeton Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF ARKANSAS
Represented By: Sarah Keeton Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF GEORGIA
Represented By: Sarah Keeton Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF INDIANA
Represented By: Sarah Keeton Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF KANSAS
Represented By: Sarah Keeton Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF KENTUCKY
Represented By: Sarah Keeton Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF LOUISIANA
Represented By: Sarah Keeton Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF MISSISSIPPI
Represented By: Sarah Keeton Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF MISSOURI
Represented By: Sarah Keeton Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF MONTANA
Represented By: Sarah Keeton Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF NEBRASKA
Represented By: Sarah Keeton Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF OHIO
Represented By: Sarah Keeton Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF OKLAHOMA
Represented By: Sarah Keeton Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA
Represented By: Sarah Keeton Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF SOUTH DAKOTA
Represented By: Sarah Keeton Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF TEXAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF WEST VIRGINIA
Represented By: Sarah Keeton Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: UNITED STATES
Represented By: Elizabeth Hecker
Represented By: Bonnie I. Robin-Vergeer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF COLORADO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF NEVADA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION
Represented By: Joshua A. Block
Represented By: Daniel Boaz Tilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ACLU OF FLORIDA
Represented By: Joshua A. Block
Represented By: Daniel Boaz Tilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: HISTORIANS
Represented By: Rakesh Kilaru
Represented By: Blake Neal
Represented By: Chanakya A. Sethi
Represented By: Chelsea Shaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CONSTITUTIONAL ACCOUNTABILITY CENTER
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GLBTQ LEGAL ADVOCATES AND DEFENDERS
Represented By: Chris Erchull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL CENTER FOR LESBIAN RIGHTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: TRANSGENDER LEGAL DEFENSE & EDUCATION FUND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ANTI-SEXUAL ASSAULT
Represented By: Kyle Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE
Represented By: Kyle Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GENDER-BASED VIOLENCE ORGANIZATIONS
Represented By: Kyle Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: THE TREVOR PROJECT
Represented By: Shireen Barday
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: REPLACEMENTS, LTD.
Represented By: Victoria Lynn Stork
Represented By: Joanna F. Wasick
Represented By: Edward John Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: TWITTER INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: YELP INC.
Represented By: Victoria Lynn Stork
Represented By: Joanna F. Wasick
Represented By: Edward John Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: DEUTSCHE BANK AG
Represented By: Victoria Lynn Stork
Represented By: Joanna F. Wasick
Represented By: Edward John Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: MARIN SOFTWARE INCORPORATED
Represented By: Victoria Lynn Stork
Represented By: Joanna F. Wasick
Represented By: Edward John Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: TUMBLR, INC.
Represented By: Victoria Lynn Stork
Represented By: Joanna F. Wasick
Represented By: Edward John Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: LEVI STRAUSS & CO.
Represented By: Victoria Lynn Stork
Represented By: Joanna F. Wasick
Represented By: Edward John Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: PATREON, INC.
Represented By: Victoria Lynn Stork
Represented By: Joanna F. Wasick
Represented By: Edward John Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: AIRBNB, INC.
Represented By: Victoria Lynn Stork
Represented By: Joanna F. Wasick
Represented By: Edward John Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: MICROSOFT CORPORATION
Represented By: Victoria Lynn Stork
Represented By: Joanna F. Wasick
Represented By: Edward John Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: EBAY INC.
Represented By: Victoria Lynn Stork
Represented By: Joanna F. Wasick
Represented By: Edward John Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: XEROX CORPORATION
Represented By: Victoria Lynn Stork
Represented By: Joanna F. Wasick
Represented By: Edward John Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: GLASSDOOR, INC.
Represented By: Victoria Lynn Stork
Represented By: Joanna F. Wasick
Represented By: Edward John Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: IBM CORPORATION
Represented By: Victoria Lynn Stork
Represented By: Joanna F. Wasick
Represented By: Edward John Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: POSTMATES INC.
Represented By: Victoria Lynn Stork
Represented By: Joanna F. Wasick
Represented By: Edward John Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: LINDEN RESEARCH, INC. D/B/A LINDEN LAB
Represented By: Victoria Lynn Stork
Represented By: Joanna F. Wasick
Represented By: Edward John Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SHUTTERSTOCK, INC.
Represented By: Victoria Lynn Stork
Represented By: Joanna F. Wasick
Represented By: Edward John Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: ASANA, INC.
Represented By: Victoria Lynn Stork
Represented By: Joanna F. Wasick
Represented By: Edward John Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: CREDO MOBILE, INC.
Represented By: Victoria Lynn Stork
Represented By: Joanna F. Wasick
Represented By: Edward John Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: KNOTEL, INC.
Represented By: Victoria Lynn Stork
Represented By: Joanna F. Wasick
Represented By: Edward John Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: GITHUB, INC.
Represented By: Victoria Lynn Stork
Represented By: Joanna F. Wasick
Represented By: Edward John Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: NIO USA, INC.
Represented By: Victoria Lynn Stork
Represented By: Joanna F. Wasick
Represented By: Edward John Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: MASSACHUSETTS MUTUAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY "MASSMUTUAL"
Represented By: Victoria Lynn Stork
Represented By: Joanna F. Wasick
Represented By: Edward John Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: GENERAL ASSEMBLY SPACE, INC.
Represented By: Victoria Lynn Stork
Represented By: Joanna F. Wasick
Represented By: Edward John Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC
Represented By: Victoria Lynn Stork
Represented By: Joanna F. Wasick
Represented By: Edward John Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: GOOGLE LLC
Represented By: Victoria Lynn Stork
Represented By: Joanna F. Wasick
Represented By: Edward John Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: APPLE, INC.
Represented By: Victoria Lynn Stork
Represented By: Joanna F. Wasick
Represented By: Edward John Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SPOTIFY USA INC.
Represented By: Victoria Lynn Stork
Represented By: Joanna F. Wasick
Represented By: Edward John Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: INDIEGOGO, INC.