MSPA Claims 1, LLC v. KMPR
Plaintiff / Appellant: MSPA CLAIMS 1, LLC, a Florida profit corporation
Defendant / Appellee: INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY, a Foreign profit corporation
Case Number: 19-10420
Filed: February 4, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2019 MOTION for extension of time to file appellant's brief to 04/15/2019 filed by MSPA Claims 1, LLC. Motion is Unopposed. [8737265-1] [19-10420] (ECF: Francesco Zincone) [Entered: 04/04/2019 12:52 PM]
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: The motion for extension of time to and including April 8, 2019 in which to file Appellants brief is GRANTED, with the appendix due seven (7) days from the filing of the brief. [ # 8712177-2 ] JP [Entered: 03/08/2019 09:50 AM]
March 6, 2019 MOTION for extension of time to file appellant's brief to 04/08/2019 filed by MSPA Claims 1, LLC. Motion is Unopposed. [8712177-1] [19-10420] (ECF: Francesco Zincone) [Entered: 03/06/2019 11:04 AM]
February 27, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Infinity Auto Insurance Co.. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-10420] (ECF: Joshua Lerner) [Entered: 02/27/2019 11:32 AM]
February 25, 2019 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Francesco Antonio Zincone for Appellant MSPA Claims 1, LLC. [Entered: 02/25/2019 03:42 PM]
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion for Leave to File Civil Appeal Statement Out of Time filed by Appellant MSPA Claims 1, LLC is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 8702449-2 ] [Entered: 02/25/2019 03:40 PM]
February 22, 2019 MOTION for leave to file Civil Appeal Statement out of time filed by MSPA Claims 1, LLC. Motion is Unopposed. [8702449-1] [19-10420] (ECF: Francesco Zincone) [Entered: 02/22/2019 04:14 PM]
February 21, 2019 Francesco Antonio Zincone has been notified that upon expiration of fourteen (14) days from this date, this appeal will be dismissed by the clerk without further notice unless the required Civil Appeal Statement has been received. A motion to file the Civil Appeal Statement out of time with the complete civil appeal statement attached to the motion as an exhibit must be filed. [Entered: 02/21/2019 02:26 PM]
February 19, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Francesco Antonio Zincone for Appellant MSPA Claims 1, LLC. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-10420] (ECF: Francesco Zincone) [Entered: 02/18/2019 03:43 PM]
February 19, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Francesco Zincone for MSPA Claims 1, LLC Francesco Antonio Zincone for MSPA Claims 1, LLC. [19-10420] (ECF: Francesco Zincone) [Entered: 02/18/2019 11:45 AM]
February 19, 2019 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Francesco Antonio Zincone for Appellant MSPA Claims 1, LLC. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [19-10420] (ECF: Francesco Zincone) [Entered: 02/18/2019 11:25 AM]
February 14, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Joshua D. Lerner for Infinity Auto Insurance Joshua D. Lerner for KMPR. [19-10420] (ECF: Joshua Lerner) [Entered: 02/14/2019 04:46 PM]
February 5, 2019 Appellate fee was paid on 02/04/2019 as to Appellant MSPA Claims 1, LLC. [Entered: 02/05/2019 12:02 PM]
February 4, 2019 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant MSPA Claims 1, LLC on 02/04/2019. Fee Status: Fee Paid. The appellant's brief is due on or before 03/18/2019. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 02/19/2019 as to Appellant MSPA Claims 1, LLC. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 03/04/2019 as to Appellee Infinity Auto Insurance Company [Entered: 02/05/2019 11:57 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: MSPA Claims 1, LLC v. KMPR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MSPA CLAIMS 1, LLC, a Florida profit corporation
Represented By: Natalia Marrero
Represented By: John H. Ruiz
Represented By: Frank Carlos Quesada
Represented By: Gustavo Javier Losa
Represented By: Francesco Antonio Zincone
Represented By: Eduardo Enrique Bertran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY, a Foreign profit corporation
Represented By: Joshua D. Lerner
Represented By: Jessica G. Lagos
Represented By: Nicole Sieb Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?