Benjamin Dubay v. Stephen King, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: BENJAMIN MICHAEL DUBAY
Defendant / Appellee: IMAGINE ENTERTAINMENT, LLC, MEDIA RIGHTS CAPITAL, STEPHEN KING, SONY PICTURES ENTERTAINMENT INC, MARVEL ENTERTAINMENT, LLC and SIMON & SCHUSTER
Case Number: 19-11224
Filed: April 1, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2019 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Louis Peter Petrich for Stephen King. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP) via the Court's public web-page. Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. **** Attorneys who wish to participate in this appeal must complete and return an appearance of counsel form. Appearance of Counsel Forms are available on the Internet at www.ca11.uscourts.gov. The clerk may not process filings from an attorney until that attorney files an appearance form. See 11th Cir. R. 46-6. [Entered: 04/30/2019 09:26 AM]
April 30, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Scott Daniel Ponce for Imagine Entertainment, LLC, Stephen King, Marvel Entertainment, LLC, Media Rights Capital and Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc. [19-11224] (ECF: Scott Ponce) [Entered: 04/30/2019 08:31 AM]
April 29, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Louis P. Petrich, Attorney for Appellees Stephen King, MRC II Distribution Company L.P., Imagine Entertainment, Marvel Entertainment, Simon & Schuster, and Sony Pictures Entertainment Attorney Louis Peter Petrich for Appellee Stephen King. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11224] (ECF: Louis Petrich) [Entered: 04/29/2019 07:03 PM]
April 22, 2019 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Robby T. Cook for Appellant Benjamin Michael Dubay. [19-11224] (ECF: Robby Cook) [Entered: 04/22/2019 11:15 AM]
April 19, 2019 RETURNED UNFILED: Motion for extension to file appellant brief [8749396-2] received from Attorney Robby T. Cook for Appellant Benjamin Michael Dubay is returned unfiled because the briefing schedule has been rescinded. [Entered: 04/19/2019 09:34 AM]
April 19, 2019 The briefing schedule issued to Appellant Benjamin Michael Dubay is hereby rescinded for the following reason(s): FRAP 4 pending in District Court. When the above matter(s) is resolved, the clerk will issue a notice advising counsel and the parties of the new schedule for filing briefs in this appeal. [Entered: 04/19/2019 09:17 AM]
April 18, 2019 RETURNED UNFILED - MOTION for extension of time to file appellant's brief to 07/17/2019 filed by Benjamin Michael Dubay. Joint Stipulation of Parties. [8749396-1] [19-11224]--[Edited 04/19/2019 by CJ] (ECF: Robby Cook) [Entered: 04/18/2019 10:30 AM]
April 16, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Robby T. Cook for Appellant Benjamin Michael Dubay. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11224] (ECF: Robby Cook) [Entered: 04/16/2019 08:21 PM]
April 16, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Robby T. Cook for Benjamin Michael Dubay. [19-11224] (ECF: Robby Cook) [Entered: 04/16/2019 06:48 PM]
April 16, 2019 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Robby T. Cook for Benjamin Michael Dubay. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. **** Attorneys who wish to participate in this appeal must complete and return an appearance form. Appearance of Counsel Forms are available on the Internet at www.ca11.uscourts.gov. The clerk may not process filings from an attorney until that attorney files an appearance form. See 11th Cir. R. 46-6. [Entered: 04/16/2019 04:06 PM]
April 3, 2019 Appellate fee was paid on 04/02/2019 as to Appellant Benjamin Michael Dubay. [Entered: 04/03/2019 03:31 PM]
April 1, 2019 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Benjamin Michael Dubay on 03/29/2019. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 05/13/2019. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 04/15/2019 as to Appellant Benjamin Michael Dubay. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 04/29/2019 as to Appellee Imagine Entertainment, LLC [Entered: 04/03/2019 03:29 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benjamin Dubay v. Stephen King, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BENJAMIN MICHAEL DUBAY
Represented By: Robert Richard Fredeking
Represented By: Robby Thomas Cook
Represented By: Robby T. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: IMAGINE ENTERTAINMENT, LLC
Represented By: Michael Manuel Gropper
Represented By: Raymond F. Treadwell
Represented By: Vincent Cox
Represented By: Scott Daniel Ponce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MEDIA RIGHTS CAPITAL
Represented By: Michael Manuel Gropper
Represented By: Raymond F. Treadwell
Represented By: Vincent Cox
Represented By: Scott Daniel Ponce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STEPHEN KING
Represented By: Louis Peter Petrich
Represented By: Michael Manuel Gropper
Represented By: Sanford L. Bohrer
Represented By: Raymond F. Treadwell
Represented By: Vincent Cox
Represented By: Scott Daniel Ponce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SONY PICTURES ENTERTAINMENT INC
Represented By: Michael Manuel Gropper
Represented By: Raymond F. Treadwell
Represented By: Vincent Cox
Represented By: Scott Daniel Ponce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARVEL ENTERTAINMENT, LLC
Represented By: Michael Manuel Gropper
Represented By: Raymond F. Treadwell
Represented By: Vincent Cox
Represented By: Scott Daniel Ponce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SIMON & SCHUSTER
Represented By: Scott Daniel Ponce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?