D. Leeds, et al v. Adolphus Jackson, et al
Defendant / Appellant: STEPHEN R. STRICKLIN, T. GERALD WALKER, KEVIN M. SIMS, SHERRY S. CAMPBELL, individually and in their official capacities as Members of the Board of Dental Examiners of Alabama, MARK R. MCILWAIN, DOUGLAS BECKHAM and ADOLPHUS M. JACKSON
Not Classified By Court: SERVICE
Plaintiff / Appellee: SMILEDIRECTCLUB, LLC and D. BLAINE LEEDS
Case Number: 19-11502
Filed: April 17, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: The motion to dismiss this appeal for lack of jurisdiction, filed by D. Blaine Leeds and SmileDirectClub, LLC, is CARRIED WITH THE CASE. (See order for complete text). [ # 8753869-2 ] CRW and JP [Entered: 06/11/2019 08:35 AM]
May 28, 2019 Response to Civil Appeal Statement form filed by Attorney Matthew Howard Lembke for Appellees-Cross Appellants D. Blaine Leeds and SmileDirectClub, LLC. [19-11502] (ECF: Matthew Lembke) [Entered: 05/28/2019 02:55 PM]
May 28, 2019 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Matthew Howard Lembke for Appellees-Cross Appellants D. Blaine Leeds and SmileDirectClub, LLC. [19-11502] (ECF: Matthew Lembke) [Entered: 05/28/2019 02:53 PM]
May 23, 2019 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney Matthew Howard Lembke for Appellees-Cross Appellants D. Blaine Leeds and SmileDirectClub, LLC. No transcript is required for appeal purposes. [Entered: 05/23/2019 08:46 AM]
May 22, 2019 Briefing Notice issued to Appellants-Cross Appellees Douglas Beckham, Sherry S. Campbell, Adolphus M. Jackson, Mark R. McIlwain, Kevin M. Sims, Stephen R. Stricklin and T. Gerald Walker. The appellant's brief is due on or before 06/24/2019. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 05/22/2019 05:49 PM]
May 22, 2019 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Matthew Howard Lembke for Appellees-Cross Appellants D. Blaine Leeds and SmileDirectClub, LLC. No transcript is required for appeal purposes. [19-11502] (ECF: Matthew Lembke) [Entered: 05/22/2019 12:52 PM]
May 21, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Matthew Howard Lembke for Appellees-Cross Appellants D. Blaine Leeds and SmileDirectClub, LLC. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11502] (ECF: Matthew Lembke) [Entered: 05/21/2019 10:50 AM]
May 21, 2019 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Stanley Blackmon for D. Blaine Leeds and SmileDirectClub, LLC, Hillary Lynn Chinigo for D. Blaine Leeds, David Glenn Hymer for D. Blaine Leeds, Matthew Howard Lembke for D. Blaine Leeds and SmileDirectClub, LLC, Michael R. Pennington for D. Blaine Leeds and James Bradley Robertson for D. Blaine Leeds. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP) via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 05/21/2019 10:17 AM]
May 17, 2019 Amended Notice of Appeal filed by Attorney Robert Ashby Pate for Appellants Adolphus M. Jackson, T. Gerald Walker, Douglas Beckham, Stephen R. Stricklin, Mark R. McIlwain, Kevin M. Sims and Sherry S. Campbell. [Entered: 05/17/2019 09:09 AM]
May 16, 2019 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Robert Ashby Pate for Appellants Adolphus M. Jackson, T. Gerald Walker, Douglas Beckham, Stephen R. Stricklin, Mark R. McIlwain, Kevin M. Sims and Sherry S. Campbell. [Entered: 05/16/2019 12:45 PM]
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion for Leave to File Civil Appeal Statement Out of Time filed by Appellants Adolphus M. Jackson, T. Gerald Walker, Douglas Beckham, Stephen R. Stricklin, Mark R. McIlwain, Kevin M. Sims and Sherry S. Campbell is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 8770212-2 ] [Entered: 05/16/2019 12:24 PM]
May 15, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Robert Ashby Pate for Appellants Douglas Beckham, Sherry S. Campbell, Adolphus M. Jackson, Mark R. McIlwain, Kevin M. Sims, Stephen R. Stricklin and T. Gerald Walker. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11502] (ECF: Robert Pate) [Entered: 05/15/2019 11:09 AM]
May 14, 2019 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellees-Cross Appellants D. Blaine Leeds and SmileDirectClub, LLC on 04/30/2019. Fee Status: Fee Paid. [Entered: 05/17/2019 12:35 PM]
May 14, 2019 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney Robert Ashby Pate for Appellants Adolphus M. Jackson, T. Gerald Walker, Douglas Beckham, Stephen R. Stricklin, Mark R. McIlwain, Kevin M. Sims and Sherry S. Campbell. No transcript is required for appeal purposes. [Entered: 05/14/2019 04:16 PM]
May 13, 2019 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Robert Ashby Pate for Appellants Douglas Beckham, Sherry S. Campbell, Adolphus M. Jackson, Mark R. McIlwain, Kevin M. Sims, Stephen R. Stricklin and T. Gerald Walker. No transcript is required for appeal purposes. [19-11502] (ECF: Robert Pate) [Entered: 05/13/2019 05:20 PM]
May 10, 2019 MOTION for leave to file Civil Appeal Statement out of time filed by Douglas Beckham, Sherry S. Campbell, Adolphus M. Jackson, Mark R. McIlwain, Kevin M. Sims, Stephen R. Stricklin and T. Gerald Walker. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [8770212-1] [19-11502] (ECF: Robert Pate) [Entered: 05/10/2019 06:01 PM]
May 10, 2019 Attorney Samuel H. Franklin for Appellants Adolphus M. Jackson, T. Gerald Walker, Douglas Beckham, Stephen R. Stricklin, Mark R. McIlwain, Kevin M. Sims and Sherry S. Campbell has been notified that upon expiration of fourteen (14) days from this date, this appeal will be dismissed by the clerk without further notice unless the required Civil Appeal Statement has been received. A motion to file the Civil Appeal Statement out of time should also be filed at this time. [Entered: 05/10/2019 03:22 PM]
May 6, 2019 Reply to response filed by Appellees D. Blaine Leeds and SmileDirectClub, LLC. [19-11502] (ECF: Matthew Lembke) [Entered: 05/06/2019 12:27 PM]
May 1, 2019 RESPONSE to Motion to dismiss appeal for lack of jurisdiction filed by Appellees D. Blaine Leeds and SmileDirectClub, LLC [ # 8753869-2 ] filed by Attorney Robert Ashby Pate for Appellants Douglas Beckham, Sherry S. Campbell, Adolphus M. Jackson, Mark R. McIlwain, Kevin M. Sims, Stephen R. Stricklin and T. Gerald Walker. [19-11502] (ECF: Robert Pate) [Entered: 05/01/2019 03:13 PM]
May 1, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Robert Ashby Pate for Douglas Beckham, Sherry S. Campbell, Adolphus M. Jackson, Mark R. McIlwain, Kevin M. Sims, Stephen R. Stricklin and T. Gerald Walker. [19-11502] (ECF: Robert Pate) [Entered: 05/01/2019 02:46 PM]
May 1, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Samuel H. Franklin for Appellants Dr. A. Jackson, Dr. G. Walker, Dr. D. Beckham, Dr. S. Stricklin, Dr. M. McIlwain, Dr. K. Sims, Dr. S. Campbell [19-11502] (ECF: Samuel Franklin) [Entered: 05/01/2019 02:42 PM]
May 1, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Logan T. Matthews for Douglas Beckham, Sherry S. Campbell, Adolphus M. Jackson, Mark R. McIlwain, Kevin M. Sims, Stephen R. Stricklin and T. Gerald Walker. [19-11502] (ECF: Logan Matthews) [Entered: 05/01/2019 02:39 PM]
April 23, 2019 MOTION to dismiss appeal for lack of appellate jurisdiction filed by D. Blaine Leeds and SmileDirectClub, LLC. Motion is Opposed. [8753869-1] [19-11502] (ECF: Matthew Lembke) [Entered: 04/23/2019 06:39 PM]
April 23, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Matthew Howard Lembke for D. Blaine Leeds and SmileDirectClub, LLC. [19-11502] (ECF: Matthew Lembke) [Entered: 04/23/2019 06:01 PM]
April 23, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Stanley E. Blackmon for D.Blaine Leeds, DDS; SmileDirect Club, LLC [19-11502] (ECF: Stanley Blackmon) [Entered: 04/23/2019 05:30 PM]
April 23, 2019 Appellate fee was paid on 04/16/2019 as to Appellant Douglas Beckham. [Entered: 04/23/2019 12:11 PM]
April 17, 2019 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants Douglas Beckham, Sherry S. Campbell, Adolphus M. Jackson, Mark R. McIlwain, Kevin M. Sims, Stephen R. Stricklin and T. Gerald Walker on 04/16/2019. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/01/2019 as to Appellant Douglas Beckham. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/15/2019 as to Appellee D. Blaine Leeds [Entered: 04/23/2019 12:08 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: D. Leeds, et al v. Adolphus Jackson, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: STEPHEN R. STRICKLIN
Represented By: Robert Ashby Pate
Represented By: Logan T. Matthews
Represented By: Lana Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: T. GERALD WALKER
Represented By: Robert Ashby Pate
Represented By: Logan T. Matthews
Represented By: Lana Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: KEVIN M. SIMS
Represented By: Robert Ashby Pate
Represented By: Logan T. Matthews
Represented By: Lana Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: SHERRY S. CAMPBELL, individually and in their official capacities as Members of the Board of Dental Examiners of Alabama
Represented By: Robert Ashby Pate
Represented By: Logan T. Matthews
Represented By: Lana Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MARK R. MCILWAIN
Represented By: Robert Ashby Pate
Represented By: Logan T. Matthews
Represented By: Lana Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: DOUGLAS BECKHAM
Represented By: Robert Ashby Pate
Represented By: Logan T. Matthews
Represented By: Lana Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ADOLPHUS M. JACKSON
Represented By: Robert Ashby Pate
Represented By: Logan T. Matthews
Represented By: Lana Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SERVICE
Represented By: Clark R. Hammond
Represented By: Michael Leon Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SMILEDIRECTCLUB, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Howard Lembke
Represented By: Stanley Blackmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: D. BLAINE LEEDS
Represented By: David Glenn Hymer
Represented By: James Bradley Robertson
Represented By: Matthew Howard Lembke
Represented By: Hillary Lynn Chinigo
Represented By: Michael R. Pennington
Represented By: Stanley Blackmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?