Sabal Trail Transmission, LLC v. .981 Acres of Land in Levy Cou, et al
Defendant / Appellee: .981 ACRES OF LAND IN LEVY COUNTY FLORIDA, ROBERT B ANGLE, JR. and UNKNOWN OWNERS IF ANY
Not Classified By Court: SERVICE
Plaintiff / Appellant: SABAL TRAIL TRANSMISSION, LLC
Case Number: 19-11801
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 JURISDICTIONAL QUESTION issued as to Sabal Trail Transmission, LLC and.981 Acres of Land in Levy County Florida, Robert B Angle, Jr. and Unknown Owners if Any. [Entered: 07/01/2019 09:05 AM]
May 28, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Andrew Prince Brigham for Appellee Robert B Angle, Jr.. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11801] (ECF: Andrew Brigham) [Entered: 05/28/2019 12:05 PM]
May 23, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Andrew Prince Brigham for Robert B Angle, Jr. and Christopher Bucalo for Service, Edward Scott Copeland for Service and Trevor Shane Hutson for Service. [19-11801] (ECF: Andrew Brigham) [Entered: 05/23/2019 11:24 AM]
May 22, 2019 Briefing Notice issued to Appellant Sabal Trail Transmission, LLC. The appellant's brief is due on or before 06/18/2019. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 05/22/2019 04:35 PM]
May 22, 2019 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney Bruce McBrayer Harris for Appellant Sabal Trail Transmission, LLC. No hearings. [Entered: 05/22/2019 02:18 PM]
May 22, 2019 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Bruce McBrayer Harris for Appellant Sabal Trail Transmission, LLC. [19-11801] (ECF: Bruce Harris) [Entered: 05/22/2019 12:00 PM]
May 22, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Bruce McBrayer Harris for Appellant Sabal Trail Transmission, LLC. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11801] (ECF: Bruce Harris) [Entered: 05/22/2019 11:59 AM]
May 22, 2019 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Bruce McBrayer Harris for Appellant Sabal Trail Transmission, LLC. No hearings. [19-11801] (ECF: Bruce Harris) [Entered: 05/22/2019 11:58 AM]
May 22, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Kurtis T. Bauerle for Sabal Trail Transmission, LLC, Bruce McBrayer Harris for Sabal Trail Transmission, LLC, Gordon H. Harris for Sabal Trail Transmission, LLC, Edgar Lopez for Sabal Trail Transmission, LLC and Felecia G. Ziegler for Sabal Trail Transmission, LLC. [19-11801] (ECF: Bruce Harris) [Entered: 05/22/2019 11:57 AM]
May 9, 2019 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Sabal Trail Transmission, LLC on 05/08/2019. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/23/2019 as to Appellant Sabal Trail Transmission, LLC. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 06/06/2019 as to Appellee Robert B Angle Jr. [Entered: 05/10/2019 09:29 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sabal Trail Transmission, LLC v. .981 Acres of Land in Levy Cou, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: .981 ACRES OF LAND IN LEVY COUNTY FLORIDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROBERT B ANGLE, JR.
Represented By: Andrew Prince Brigham
Represented By: Edward Scott Copeland
Represented By: Christopher Bucalo
Represented By: Trevor Shane Hutson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNKNOWN OWNERS IF ANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SERVICE
Represented By: Edward Scott Copeland
Represented By: Christopher Bucalo
Represented By: Trevor Shane Hutson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SABAL TRAIL TRANSMISSION, LLC
Represented By: Kurtis T. Bauerle
Represented By: Gordon H. Harris
Represented By: Felecia G. Ziegler
Represented By: Edgar Lopez
Represented By: Bruce McBrayer Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?