Balthazar Management, LLC v. Beale Street Blues Company, et al
Plaintiff / Appellee: BALTHAZAR MANAGEMENT, LLC, a Florida Limited Liability Company
Defendant / Appellant: ELIZABETH PETERS, an individual, BEALE STREET BLUES COMPANY, INC., a Tennessee-for-profit Corporation, TODD BECKER, an individual, BEALE STREET BLUES COMPANY-WEST PALM BEACH, LLC, a Florida Limited Liability Company and STEWART THOMAS PETERS, an individual
Case Number: 19-11826
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Removed from case: Attorney Lauri Waldman Ross for Appellee Balthazar Management, LLC in 19-11826. [Entered: 06/24/2019 08:58 AM]
June 19, 2019 Appearance of counsel form has not been processed. According to our records, Lauri Waldman Ross for Balthazar Management, LLC is not a member of the Eleventh Circuit bar. The appearance of counsel form has not been processed allowing fourteen days to complete and return the required application for admission. [Entered: 06/19/2019 08:12 AM]
June 18, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Lauri Waldman Ross for Balthazar Management, LLC [19-11826] (ECF: Lauri Waldman Ross) [Entered: 06/18/2019 01:23 PM]
June 6, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Mr. Joseph Isaiah Pardo for Appellee Balthazar Management, LLC. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11826] (ECF: Joseph Pardo) [Entered: 06/06/2019 05:20 PM]
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion for extension to file appellant brief filed by Appellants Beale Street Blues Company, Inc., Beale Street Blues Company-West Palm Beach, LLC, Stewart Thomas Peters, Elizabeth Peters and Todd Becker is GRANTED. [ # 8786637-2 ] Appellants brief due on 07/18/2019. WHP [Entered: 06/04/2019 08:14 AM]
May 30, 2019 Amended Motion for extension to file appellant brief [ # 8786637-2 ] filed by Appellants Beale Street Blues Company, Inc., Beale Street Blues Company-West Palm Beach, LLC, Todd Becker, Elizabeth Peters and Stewart Thomas Peters. [19-11826] (ECF: Amy Pepke) [Entered: 05/30/2019 04:13 PM]
May 30, 2019 MOTION for extension of time to file appellant's brief to 07/18/2019 filed by Beale Street Blues Company, Inc., Beale Street Blues Company-West Palm Beach, LLC, Todd Becker, Elizabeth Peters and Stewart Thomas Peters. Motion is Unopposed. [8786637-1] [19-11826] (ECF: Amy Pepke) [Entered: 05/30/2019 02:37 PM]
May 24, 2019 Briefing Notice issued to Appellant Beale Street Blues Company, Inc.. The appellant's brief is due on or before 06/18/2019. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 05/24/2019 05:00 PM]
May 24, 2019 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney Diana M. Comes for Appellants Beale Street Blues Company, Inc., Beale Street Blues Company-West Palm Beach, LLC, Stewart Thomas Peters, Elizabeth Peters and Todd Becker. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [Entered: 05/24/2019 04:56 PM]
May 24, 2019 Notice of deficient Appearance of Counsel filed by Diana M. Comes for Beale Street Blues Company, Inc., Beale Street Blues Company-West Palm Beach, LLC, Stewart Thomas Peters, Elizabeth Peters and Todd Becker. Incorrect Document Attached to Event [Entered: 05/24/2019 12:24 PM]
May 24, 2019 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Diana M. Comes for Appellants Beale Street Blues Company, Inc., Beale Street Blues Company-West Palm Beach, LLC, Todd Becker, Elizabeth Peters and Stewart Thomas Peters. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [19-11826] (ECF: Diana Comes) [Entered: 05/24/2019 11:49 AM]
May 24, 2019 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Diana M. Comes for Appellants Beale Street Blues Company, Inc., Beale Street Blues Company-West Palm Beach, LLC, Todd Becker, Elizabeth Peters and Stewart Thomas Peters. [19-11826] (ECF: Diana Comes) [Entered: 05/24/2019 11:48 AM]
May 24, 2019 Notice of deficient Transcript Order Form filed by Diana M. Comes for Beale Street Blues Company, Inc., Beale Street Blues Company-West Palm Beach, LLC, Stewart Thomas Peters, Elizabeth Peters and Todd Becker. Incorrect Event used to file a document [Entered: 05/24/2019 11:46 AM]
May 24, 2019 Notice of deficient Civil Appeal Statement filed by Diana M. Comes for Beale Street Blues Company, Inc., Beale Street Blues Company-West Palm Beach, LLC, Stewart Thomas Peters, Elizabeth Peters and Todd Becker. Incorrect Document Attached to Event [Entered: 05/24/2019 11:29 AM]
May 24, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Ms. Deana D. Falce for Balthazar Management, LLC, Mark Edward Grafton for Balthazar Management, LLC, Mr. Joseph Isaiah Pardo for Balthazar Management, LLC and John Kressfield Shubin for Balthazar Management, LLC. [19-11826] (ECF: Joseph Pardo) [Entered: 05/24/2019 10:39 AM]
May 23, 2019 RETURNED UNFILED***APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Diana Comes filing Transcript Information Form [19-11826]--[Edited 05/24/2019 by GBF] (ECF: Diana Comes) [Entered: 05/23/2019 09:52 PM]
May 23, 2019 RETURNED UNFILED***APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Diana Comes filing Civil Appeal Statement [19-11826]--[Edited 05/24/2019 by GBF] (ECF: Diana Comes) [Entered: 05/23/2019 09:51 PM]
May 23, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Diana M. Comes for Appellants Beale Street Blues Company, Inc.. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11826] (ECF: Diana Comes) [Entered: 05/23/2019 06:24 PM]
May 23, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Diana M. Comes for Appellants Beale Street Blues Company, Inc. et al [19-11826] (ECF: Diana Comes) [Entered: 05/23/2019 05:53 PM]
May 23, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Amy M. Pepke for Appellants Beale Street Blues Company, Inc. et al [19-11826] (ECF: Amy Pepke) [Entered: 05/23/2019 05:48 PM]
May 15, 2019 Appellate fee was paid on 05/08/2019 as to Appellant Beale Street Blues Company, Inc.. [Entered: 05/15/2019 11:46 AM]
May 9, 2019 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants Beale Street Blues Company, Inc., Beale Street Blues Company-West Palm Beach, LLC, Todd Becker, Elizabeth Peters and Stewart Thomas Peters on 05/08/2019. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/23/2019 as to Appellant Beale Street Blues Company, Inc.. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 06/06/2019 as to Appellee Balthazar Management, LLC [Entered: 05/15/2019 11:44 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Balthazar Management, LLC v. Beale Street Blues Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BALTHAZAR MANAGEMENT, LLC, a Florida Limited Liability Company
Represented By: Mark Edward Grafton
Represented By: John Kressfield Shubin
Represented By: Joseph Isaiah Pardo
Represented By: Lauren Gina Brunswick
Represented By: Deana D. Falce
Represented By: Lauri Waldman Ross
Represented By: Mark E. Grafton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ELIZABETH PETERS, an individual
Represented By: Jamie Alan Sasson
Represented By: Peter David Ticktin
Represented By: Thomas Justin Cunningham
Represented By: Michael Peter De Simone
Represented By: Kendrick Almaguer
Represented By: Amy M. Pepke
Represented By: Diana M. Comes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: BEALE STREET BLUES COMPANY, INC., a Tennessee-for-profit Corporation
Represented By: Jamie Alan Sasson
Represented By: Peter David Ticktin
Represented By: Thomas Justin Cunningham
Represented By: Michael Peter De Simone
Represented By: Kendrick Almaguer
Represented By: Amy M. Pepke
Represented By: Diana M. Comes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: TODD BECKER, an individual
Represented By: Jamie Alan Sasson
Represented By: Peter David Ticktin
Represented By: Thomas Justin Cunningham
Represented By: Michael Peter De Simone
Represented By: Kendrick Almaguer
Represented By: Amy M. Pepke
Represented By: Diana M. Comes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: BEALE STREET BLUES COMPANY-WEST PALM BEACH, LLC, a Florida Limited Liability Company
Represented By: Jamie Alan Sasson
Represented By: Peter David Ticktin
Represented By: Thomas Justin Cunningham
Represented By: Michael Peter De Simone
Represented By: Kendrick Almaguer
Represented By: Amy M. Pepke
Represented By: Diana M. Comes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: STEWART THOMAS PETERS, an individual
Represented By: Jamie Alan Sasson
Represented By: Peter David Ticktin
Represented By: Thomas Justin Cunningham
Represented By: Michael Peter De Simone
Represented By: Kendrick Almaguer
Represented By: Amy M. Pepke
Represented By: Diana M. Comes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?