T.J. Jacobs v. U.S. Department of Labor
Petitioner: T.J. JACOBS
Respondent: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR
Case Number: 19-11832
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Briefing Notice issued to Petitioner T.J. Jacobs. The petitioner's brief is due on or before 08/05/2019. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the petitioner's brief. [Entered: 06/26/2019 02:17 PM]
June 24, 2019 Certified Agency List filed as to Attorney Mr. Joseph G. Gilliland for Respondent U.S. Department of Labor. [19-11832] (ECF: Joseph Gilliland) [Entered: 06/24/2019 03:50 PM]
May 23, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Joseph Gilliland for the Secretary of Labor Attorney Mr. Joseph G. Gilliland for Respondent U.S. Department of Labor. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11832] (ECF: Joseph Gilliland) [Entered: 05/23/2019 02:03 PM]
May 20, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Joseph Gilliland for Respondent, U.S. Department of Labor Deputy Associate Solicitor for U.S. Department of Labor and Regional Administrator for U.S. Department of Labor. [19-11832] (ECF: Joseph Gilliland) [Entered: 05/20/2019 04:54 PM]
May 14, 2019 Appellate fee was paid on 05/13/2019 as to Petitioner T.J. Jacobs. [Entered: 05/14/2019 11:09 AM]
May 13, 2019 Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Petitioner T.J. Jacobs. [Entered: 05/14/2019 11:11 AM]
May 13, 2019 AGENCY PETITION / APPLICATION DOCKETED. Filed by Petitioner T.J. Jacobs. Fee Status: Fee Paid. [Entered: 05/14/2019 11:06 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: T.J. Jacobs v. U.S. Department of Labor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: T.J. JACOBS
Represented By: T.J. Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR
Represented By: Joseph G. Gilliland
Represented By: Regional Administrator
Represented By: Deputy Associate Solicitor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?