Alan Ginsburg v. USA

Plaintiff / Appellant: ALAN H. GINSBURG
Defendant / Appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 19-11836
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Briefing Notice re- issued to Appellant Alan H. Ginsburg due to the FRAP 4 Order entered 6/10/2019. The appellant's brief is due on or before 07/22/2019. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 06/26/2019 12:12 PM]
June 12, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Ivan Clay Dale for Appellee USA. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11836] (ECF: Ivan Dale) [Entered: 06/12/2019 03:39 PM]
June 11, 2019 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Ivan Clay Dale for USA and U.S. Attorney Service - Middle District of Florida for USA. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page AND have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 06/11/2019 11:46 AM]
June 10, 2019 USDC FRAP 4 Order as to Appellant Alan H. Ginsburg was filed on 06/10/2019. Docket Entry 96. [Entered: 06/12/2019 11:58 AM]
June 6, 2019 Jurisdiction: FRAP 4 motion pending in district court as to Appellant Alan H. Ginsburg DE #: 90 [Entered: 06/06/2019 02:54 PM]
June 6, 2019 Jurisdiction: FRAP 4 motion pending in district court as to Appellant Alan H. Ginsburg DE #: 90 [Entered: 06/06/2019 02:44 PM]
June 3, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Ivan C. Dale for USA [19-11836] (ECF: Ivan Dale) [Entered: 06/03/2019 03:30 PM]
May 24, 2019 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Daniel Graham Strickland for Appellant Alan H. Ginsburg. [19-11836] (ECF: Daniel Strickland) [Entered: 05/24/2019 07:33 PM]
May 24, 2019 Briefing Notice issued to Appellant Alan H. Ginsburg. The appellant's brief is due on or before 07/03/2019. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 05/24/2019 02:08 PM]
May 24, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Ms. Susan E. Seabrook for Alan H. Ginsburg. [19-11836] (ECF: Susan Seabrook) [Entered: 05/24/2019 11:29 AM]
May 23, 2019 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney James N. Mastracchio for Appellant Alan H. Ginsburg. No hearings. [Entered: 05/23/2019 02:49 PM]
May 23, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney James N. Mastracchio for Appellant Alan H. Ginsburg. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11836] (ECF: James Mastracchio) [Entered: 05/23/2019 01:38 PM]
May 23, 2019 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney James N. Mastracchio for Appellant Alan H. Ginsburg. No hearings. [19-11836] (ECF: James Mastracchio) [Entered: 05/23/2019 10:57 AM]
May 22, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Daniel G. Strickland, representing Alan Ginsburg [19-11836] (ECF: Daniel Strickland) [Entered: 05/22/2019 05:57 PM]
May 22, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by James N. Mastracchio for Alan H. Ginsburg. [19-11836] (ECF: James Mastracchio) [Entered: 05/22/2019 05:53 PM]
May 14, 2019 Appellate fee was paid on 05/14/2019 as to Appellant Alan H. Ginsburg. [Entered: 05/14/2019 03:56 PM]
May 13, 2019 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Alan H. Ginsburg on 05/10/2019. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/28/2019 as to Appellant Alan H. Ginsburg. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 06/10/2019 as to Appellee United States of America [Entered: 05/14/2019 03:54 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alan Ginsburg v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ALAN H. GINSBURG
Represented By: Meghana D. Shah
Represented By: Susan E. Seabrook
Represented By: Melissa Lorraine Fox
Represented By: James N. Mastracchio
Represented By: Rebecca M. Stork
Represented By: Rebecca E. Rhoden
Represented By: Daniel Graham Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Middle District of Florida
Represented By: Ivan Clay Dale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?