USA v. Gorman Jenkins

Defendant / Appellant: GORMAN JENKINS
Plaintiff / Appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 19-11840
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 USDC order denying IFP as to Appellant Gorman Jenkins was filed on 07/03/2019. Docket Entry 117. [Entered: 07/08/2019 12:55 PM]
May 21, 2019 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Linda Julin McNamara for USA. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP) via the Court's public web-page. Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 05/21/2019 08:48 AM]
May 20, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Linda Julin McNamara for United States. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11840] (ECF: Linda McNamara) [Entered: 05/20/2019 10:57 AM]
May 20, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Linda Julin McNamara for United States [19-11840] (ECF: Linda McNamara) [Entered: 05/20/2019 10:48 AM]
May 13, 2019 CRIMINAL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Gorman Jenkins on 05/13/2019. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. [Entered: 05/14/2019 09:57 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Gorman Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: GORMAN JENKINS
Represented By: Gorman Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Middle District of Florida
Represented By: Linda Julin McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?