Hani Ajaj v. U.S. Attorney General

Petitioner: HANI AJAJ
Respondent: U.S. ATTORNEY GENERAL
Case Number: 19-11848
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Appendix filed [0 VOLUMES] by Petitioner Hani Ajaj. [19-11848] (ECF: Shannon Shepherd) [Entered: 07/09/2019 04:40 PM]
July 9, 2019 Appellant's brief filed by Hani Ajaj. [19-11848] (ECF: Shannon Shepherd) [Entered: 07/09/2019 04:39 PM]
May 31, 2019 Briefing Notice issued to Petitioner Hani Ajaj. The petitioner's brief is due on or before 07/10/2019. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the petitioner's brief. [Entered: 05/31/2019 10:18 AM]
May 31, 2019 Letter regarding inactive status and bar membership renewal issued to attorney Attorney Shannon Marie Shepherd for Petitioner Hani Ajaj. [Entered: 05/31/2019 10:16 AM]
May 30, 2019 BIA Record on Appeal Filed [19-11848] (ECF: DOJ Executive Office Of Immigration Review) [Entered: 05/30/2019 02:07 PM]
May 20, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Shannon Marie Shepherd for Petitioner Hani Ajaj. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11848] (ECF: Shannon Shepherd) [Entered: 05/20/2019 02:04 PM]
May 17, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Sherease Rosalyn Pratt for Respondent U.S. Attorney General. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11848] (ECF: Sherease Pratt) [Entered: 05/17/2019 11:20 AM]
May 16, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Shannon Marie Shepherd for Hani Ajaj. [19-11848] (ECF: Shannon Shepherd) [Entered: 05/16/2019 12:26 PM]
May 16, 2019 Notice to Appear -- Exhibit 2 filed by Attorney Shannon Marie Shepherd for Petitioner Hani Ajaj. [19-11848] (ECF: Shannon Shepherd) [Entered: 05/16/2019 12:13 PM]
May 15, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Sherease Rosalyn Pratt, Respondent [19-11848] (ECF: Sherease Pratt) [Entered: 05/15/2019 09:46 AM]
May 13, 2019 AGENCY PETITION / APPLICATION DOCKETED. Filed by Petitioner Hani Ajaj. Additional Documents Needed: Notice to Appear. Fee Status: Fee Paid. [Entered: 05/14/2019 03:50 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hani Ajaj v. U.S. Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. ATTORNEY GENERAL
Represented By: Michelle Ressler
Represented By: Sherease Rosalyn Pratt
Represented By: OIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: HANI AJAJ
Represented By: Shannon Marie Shepherd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?