Meunier Carlin & Curfman, LLC v. Scidera, Inc.
Defendant / Appellant: SCIDERA, INC.
Plaintiff / Appellee: MEUNIER CARLIN & CURFMAN, LLC, f.k.a. McKeon Meunier Carlin & Curfman LLC
Case Number: 19-11852
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Briefing Notice issued to Appellant-Cross Appellee Scidera, Inc.. The appellant's brief is due on or before 08/19/2019. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 07/11/2019 02:44 PM]
July 11, 2019 TRANSCRIPTS FILED. Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Amanda Lohnaas, Filer: Scidera, Inc., Dt. all Trans. Filed: 07/09/2019, Proceeding Type and Date: Trial 01/07/2019 - 01/09/2019, Pre-Trial Proceedings 12/19/2018. [Entered: 07/11/2019 02:09 PM]
July 2, 2019 **DOCKETED IN ERROR**Exhibit which did not upload with original filing on June 28, 2019 filed by Attorney Stuart M. Mones for Appellant-Cross Appellee Scidera, Inc.. [19-11852]--[Edited 07/03/2019 by GMP] (ECF: Stuart Mones) [Entered: 07/02/2019 03:02 PM]
June 28, 2019 Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellant-Cross Appellee Scidera, Inc. [19-11852] (ECF: Stuart Mones) [Entered: 06/28/2019 06:10 PM]
June 27, 2019 Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellee-Cross Appellant Meunier Carlin & Curfman, LLC [19-11852] (ECF: Adam Rubenfield) [Entered: 06/27/2019 07:44 PM]
June 14, 2019 JURISDICTIONAL QUESTION issued as to Scidera, Inc. and Meunier Carlin & Curfman, LLC. [Entered: 06/14/2019 09:07 AM]
June 12, 2019 Court Reporter Acknowledgment filed. Transcript Order: Amanda Lohnaas, 05/29/2019, Scidera, Inc., Trial 01/07/2019 - 01/09/2019, Pre-Trial Proceedings 12/19/2018. [Entered: 06/12/2019 10:31 AM]
June 7, 2019 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney Adam Scott Rubenfield for Appellee-Cross Appellant Meunier Carlin & Curfman, LLC. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [Entered: 06/11/2019 12:19 PM]
June 7, 2019 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Adam Scott Rubenfield for Appellee-Cross Appellant Meunier Carlin & Curfman, LLC. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [19-11852] (ECF: Adam Rubenfield) [Entered: 06/07/2019 04:59 PM]
June 7, 2019 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Adam Scott Rubenfield for Appellee-Cross Appellant Meunier Carlin & Curfman, LLC. [19-11852] (ECF: Adam Rubenfield) [Entered: 06/07/2019 04:59 PM]
June 7, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by David John Hungeling for Meunier Carlin & Curfman, LLC. [19-11852] (ECF: Adam Rubenfield) [Entered: 06/07/2019 04:58 PM]
June 7, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Adam Scott Rubenfield for Meunier Carlin & Curfman, LLC. [19-11852] (ECF: Adam Rubenfield) [Entered: 06/07/2019 04:55 PM]
June 7, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Adam S. Rubenfield for Meunier Carlin & Curfman, LLC. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11852] (ECF: Adam Rubenfield) [Entered: 06/07/2019 04:51 PM]
May 29, 2019 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM PROCESSED. Transcript Order: Filer: Scidera, Inc., Court Reporter: Amanda Lohnaas, Proceeding Type and Date: Pre-Trial Proceedings 12/19/2018 , Trial 01/07/2019 - 01/09/2019. [Entered: 05/29/2019 08:39 AM]
May 28, 2019 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Stuart M. Mones for Appellant-Cross Appellee Scidera, Inc.. [19-11852] (ECF: Stuart Mones) [Entered: 05/28/2019 05:00 PM]
May 28, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Stuart M. Mones for Appellant-Cross Appellee Scidera, Inc.. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11852] (ECF: Stuart Mones) [Entered: 05/28/2019 04:59 PM]
May 28, 2019 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Stuart M. Mones for Appellant-Cross Appellee Scidera, Inc.. Transcript(s) ordered. [19-11852] (ECF: Stuart Mones) [Entered: 05/28/2019 04:41 PM]
May 28, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Stuart M. Mones for Scidera, Inc.. [19-11852] (ECF: Stuart Mones) [Entered: 05/28/2019 12:16 PM]
May 28, 2019 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellee-Cross Appellant Meunier Carlin & Curfman, LLC on 05/24/2019. Fee Status: Fee Paid. [Entered: 05/28/2019 12:08 PM]
May 14, 2019 Notice of Appeal filed by Attorney Stuart M. Mones for Appellant Scidera, Inc. - attorney is not a member of the 11th circuit bar - failed to pay renewal - must reapply for admission. [Entered: 05/14/2019 03:24 PM]
May 13, 2019 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Scidera, Inc. on 05/11/2019. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/28/2019 as to Appellant Scidera, Inc.. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 06/10/2019 as to Appellee Meunier Carlin & Curfman, LLC [Entered: 05/14/2019 03:19 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meunier Carlin & Curfman, LLC v. Scidera, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: SCIDERA, INC.
Represented By: T. Michael Guiffre
Represented By: Stuart M. Mones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MEUNIER CARLIN & CURFMAN, LLC, f.k.a. McKeon Meunier Carlin & Curfman LLC
Represented By: David John Hungeling
Represented By: Adam Scott Rubenfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?