USA v. Patrice Anderson
Defendant / Appellant: PATRICE ANDERSON
Plaintiff / Appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 19-11856
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Briefing Notice issued to Appellant Patrice Anderson. The appellant's brief is due on or before 08/19/2019. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 07/09/2019 02:48 PM]
July 9, 2019 TRANSCRIPTS FILED. Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Leah Sharp Turner, Filer: Patrice Anderson, Dt. all Trans. Filed: 06/26/2019 and 07/08/2019, Proceeding Type and Date: Pre-Trial Proceedings 09/12/2017 , Pre-Trial Proceedings 09/18/2017 - 09/22/2017, Sentencing 07/09/2018. [Entered: 07/09/2019 12:58 PM]
July 8, 2019 TRANSCRIPTS FILED. Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Teresa Roberson, Filer: Patrice Anderson, Dt. all Trans. Filed: 06/28/2019, Proceeding Type and Date: Motion Hearing 08/23/2017. [Entered: 07/08/2019 10:32 AM]
June 11, 2019 Court Reporter Acknowledgment filed. Transcript Order: Leah Sharp Turner, 06/03/2019, Patrice Anderson, Pre-Trial Proceedings 09/12/2017 , Pre-Trial Proceedings 09/18/2017 - 09/22/2017, Sentencing 07/09/2018. [Entered: 06/11/2019 02:54 PM]
June 11, 2019 Court Reporter Acknowledgment filed. Transcript Order: Teresa Roberson, 06/03/2019, Patrice Anderson, Motion Hearing 08/23/2017. [Entered: 06/11/2019 02:52 PM]
June 7, 2019 TRANSCRIPTS FILED..06/06/2019 106 Transcript of Motion Hearing filed as to dft Patrice Anderson for dates of 1/4/2018 before Judge John E. Ott, re 99 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment Court Reporter/Transcriber Margaret Wasmun, Telephone number 601-329-6113. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. a copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript% 20Redaction%20Policy.pdf See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 6/27/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/7/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/4/2019. (KBB) [Entered: 06/07/2019 12:47 PM]
June 7, 2019 TRANSCRIPTS FILED.. 06/06/2019 106 Transcript of Motion Hearing filed as to dft Patrice Anderson for dates of 1/4/2018 before Judge John E. Ott, re 99 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment Court Reporter/Transcriber Margaret Wasmun, Telephone number 601-329-6113. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. a copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript% 20Redaction%20Policy.pdf See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 6/27/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/7/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/4/2019. (KBB) [Entered: 06/07/2019 12:45 PM]
June 4, 2019 USDC order Denying appointment of counsel as to Appellant Patrice Anderson was filed on 05/21/2019. Docket Entry 102. [Entered: 06/04/2019 02:45 PM]
June 4, 2019 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM PROCESSED. Transcript Order: Filer: Patrice Anderson, Court Reporter: Margaret Wasmund. [Entered: 06/04/2019 11:13 AM]
June 4, 2019 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM PROCESSED. Transcript Order: Filer: Patrice Anderson, Court Reporter: Teresa Roberson, Proceeding Type and Date: Motion Hearing 08/23/2017. [Entered: 06/04/2019 11:12 AM]
June 4, 2019 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM PROCESSED. Transcript Order: Filer: Patrice Anderson, Court Reporter: Leah Sharp Turner, Proceeding Type and Date: Pre-Trial Proceedings 09/12/2017 , Pre-Trial Proceedings 09/18/2017 - 09/22/2017, Sentencing 07/09/2018. [Entered: 06/04/2019 10:58 AM]
June 3, 2019 Removed from case: Attorney Ebony Glenn Howard for Appellant Patrice Anderson in 19-11856. [Entered: 06/03/2019 02:05 PM]
June 3, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Michael B. Billingsley for Appellee USA. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11856] (ECF: Michael Billingsley) [Entered: 06/03/2019 10:39 AM]
May 31, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Michael Billingsley for USA U.S. Attorney Service - Northern District of Alabama for USA. [19-11856] (ECF: Michael Billingsley) [Entered: 05/31/2019 03:57 PM]
May 31, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Deanna Lee Oswald for Patrice Anderson. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11856] (ECF: Deanna Oswald) [Entered: 05/31/2019 03:43 PM]
May 31, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Deanna Lee Oswald for Patrice Anderson [19-11856] (ECF: Deanna Oswald) [Entered: 05/31/2019 03:38 PM]
May 30, 2019 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Kevin L. Butler for Patrice Anderson, Ebony Glenn Howard for Patrice Anderson and Glennon Fletcher Threatt, Jr. for Patrice Anderson. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 05/30/2019 03:44 PM]
May 28, 2019 Notice of filing: Letter sent to the district court as to Appellant Patrice Anderson. [Entered: 06/19/2019 03:12 PM]
May 14, 2019 USDC Motion regarding appellant's attorney as to Appellant Patrice Anderson was filed on 05/10/2019. Docket Entry 99. [Entered: 05/14/2019 02:59 PM]
May 13, 2019 CRIMINAL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Patrice Anderson on 05/10/2019. Fee Status: IFP Granted. USDC motion pending: Motion to appoint counsel DE #99 filed on 05/10/2019. [Entered: 05/14/2019 02:56 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Patrice Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: PATRICE ANDERSON
Represented By: Glennon Fletcher Threatt Jr.
Represented By: Kevin L. Butler
Represented By: Ebony Glenn Howard
Represented By: Patrice Anderson
Represented By: Deanna Lee Oswald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Michael B. Billingsley
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Northern District of Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?