Randall Callahan, et al v. United States Dept. of HHS, et al
Defendant / Appellee: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, through ALEX M. AZAR II in his official capacity as Secretary of the United States Department of Health and Human Services and UNITED NETWORK FOR ORGAN SHARING
Plaintiff / Appellant: MICHAEL WINGATE, KATRYNA GRISSON, VANDERBILT UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, SAINT LUKE'S HOSPITAL OF KANSAS CITY, EMORY UNIVERSITY, d.b.a. Emory University Hospital, PIEDMONT HEALTHCARE, CANDICE SEAMAN, THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF MICHIGAN, on behalf of its academic medical center, Michigan Medicine, RANDALL CALLAHAN, UNIVERSITY OF IOWA, BARNES-JEWISH HOSPITAL, INDIANA UNIVERSITY HEALTH, HENRY FORD HEALTH SYSTEM, VIRGINIA COMMONWEALTH UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM AUTHORITY, UNIVERSITY OF KANSAS HOSPITAL AUTHORITY, a body politic and corporate and an independent instrumentality of the State of Kansas, THE RECTOR AND VISITORS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF VIRGINIA, on behalf of its Medical Center, OREGON HEALTH & SCIENCE UNIVERSITY, THE WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY and UNIVERSITY OF KENTUCKY
Intervenor / Appellee: CHARLES BENNETT and SUSAN JACKSON
Case Number: 19-11876
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
September 25, 2019 Summary Callahan v. U.S. Department of Health and Human Services

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2019 Response to Supplemental Authority (28J) filed by Appellants Barnes-Jewish Hospital, Randall Callahan, Emory University, Katryna Grisson, Henry Ford Health System, Indiana University Health, Oregon Health & Science University, Piedmont Healthcare, Saint Luke's Hospital of Kansas City, Candice Seaman, The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia, The Regents of the University of Michigan, The Washington University, University of Iowa, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, University of Kentucky, Vanderbilt University Medical Center, Virginia Commonwealth University Health System Authority and Michael Wingate. [19-11876] (ECF: Courtney Carrell) [Entered: 07/05/2019 03:19 PM]
July 2, 2019 Supplemental Authority filed by Appellee United States Department of Health and Human Services. [19-11876] (ECF: Martin Totaro) [Entered: 07/02/2019 04:15 PM]
July 1, 2019 Response to Supplemental Authority (28J) filed by Appellants Barnes-Jewish Hospital, Randall Callahan, Emory University, Katryna Grisson, Henry Ford Health System, Indiana University Health, Oregon Health & Science University, Piedmont Healthcare, Saint Luke's Hospital of Kansas City, Candice Seaman, The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia, The Regents of the University of Michigan, The Washington University, University of Iowa, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, University of Kentucky, Vanderbilt University Medical Center, Virginia Commonwealth University Health System Authority and Michael Wingate. [19-11876] (ECF: Courtney Carrell) [Entered: 07/01/2019 10:37 PM]
June 28, 2019 Received reply paper copies of EBrief filed by Appellants Barnes-Jewish Hospital, Randall Callahan, Emory University, Katryna Grisson, Henry Ford Health System, Indiana University Health, Oregon Health & Science University, Piedmont Healthcare, Saint Luke's Hospital of Kansas City, Candice Seaman, The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia, The Regents of the University of Michigan, The Washington University, University of Iowa, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, University of Kentucky, Vanderbilt University Medical Center, Virginia Commonwealth University Health System Authority and Michael Wingate. [Entered: 06/28/2019 04:14 PM]
June 28, 2019 Received paper copies of EAppendix filed by Appellee United States Department of Health and Human Services. 8 VOLUMES - 2 COPIES [Entered: 06/28/2019 03:09 PM]
June 28, 2019 Supplemental Authority filed by Appellee United Network for Organ Sharing. [19-11876] (ECF: Linda Coberly) [Entered: 06/28/2019 02:24 PM]
June 27, 2019 Reply Brief filed by Appellants Barnes-Jewish Hospital, Randall Callahan, Emory University, Katryna Grisson, Henry Ford Health System, Indiana University Health, Oregon Health & Science University, Piedmont Healthcare, Saint Luke's Hospital of Kansas City, Candice Seaman, The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia, The Regents of the University of Michigan, The Washington University, University of Iowa, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, University of Kentucky, Vanderbilt University Medical Center, Virginia Commonwealth University Health System Authority and Michael Wingate. [19-11876] (ECF: Courtney Carrell) [Entered: 06/27/2019 11:44 PM]
June 27, 2019 AMENDED Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Jennifer A. Bunting-Graden for Appellants Barnes-Jewish Hospital, Randall Callahan, Emory University, Katryna Grisson, Henry Ford Health System, Indiana University Health, Oregon Health & Science University, Piedmont Healthcare, Saint Luke's Hospital of Kansas City, Candice Seaman, The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia, The Regents of the University of Michigan, The Washington University, University of Iowa, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, University of Kentucky, Vanderbilt University Medical Center, Virginia Commonwealth University Health System Authority and Michael Wingate. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11876] (ECF: Jennifer Bunting-Graden) [Entered: 06/27/2019 09:46 PM]
June 27, 2019 Supplemental Appendix [8 VOLUMES] filed by Appellee United States Department of Health and Human Services. [19-11876] (ECF: Martin Totaro) [Entered: 06/27/2019 12:06 PM]
June 24, 2019 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Appellees Charles Bennett and Susan Jackson. [Entered: 06/26/2019 02:07 PM]
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion to file excess words/pages filed by Appellants Emory University, Randall Callahan, Katryna Grisson, Candice Seaman, Michael Wingate, Henry Ford Health System, Indiana University Health, Oregon Health & Science University, Piedmont Healthcare, The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia, The Regents of the University of Michigan, Saint Luke's Hospital of Kansas City, University of Iowa, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, University of Kentucky, Vanderbilt University Medical Center, Virginia Commonwealth University Health System Authority, The Washington University and Barnes-Jewish Hospital is GRANTED. [ # 8807059-2 ] EEC [Entered: 06/24/2019 03:10 PM]
June 21, 2019 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Appellee United Network for Organ Sharing. [Entered: 06/24/2019 01:09 PM]
June 21, 2019 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Appellee United States Department of Health and Human Services. [Entered: 06/24/2019 11:53 AM]
June 21, 2019 TIME SENSITIVE MOTION for excess words/pages filed by Barnes-Jewish Hospital, Randall Callahan, Emory University, Katryna Grisson, Henry Ford Health System, Indiana University Health, Oregon Health & Science University, Piedmont Healthcare, Saint Luke's Hospital of Kansas City, Candice Seaman, The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia, The Regents of the University of Michigan, The Washington University, University of Iowa, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, University of Kentucky, Vanderbilt University Medical Center, Virginia Commonwealth University Health System Authority and Michael Wingate. Opposing Counsel takes no Position. [8807059-1] [19-11876] (ECF: Courtney Carrell) [Entered: 06/21/2019 04:11 PM]
June 20, 2019 Appellees' Brief filed by Charles Bennett and Susan Jackson. [19-11876] (ECF: Mordechai Shulman) [Entered: 06/20/2019 10:43 PM]
June 20, 2019 Appellee's Brief filed by Appellee United Network for Organ Sharing. [19-11876] (ECF: Linda Coberly) [Entered: 06/20/2019 07:44 PM]
June 20, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Glenn Lorin Krinsky for Barnes-Jewish Hospital, Randall Callahan, Emory University, Katryna Grisson, Henry Ford Health System, Indiana University Health, Oregon Health & Science University, Piedmont Healthcare, Saint Luke's Hospital of Kansas City, Candice Seaman, The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia, The Regents of the University of Michigan, The Washington University, University of Iowa, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, University of Kentucky, Vanderbilt University Medical Center, Virginia Commonwealth University Health System Authority and Michael Wingate. [19-11876] (ECF: Glenn Krinsky) [Entered: 06/20/2019 04:41 PM]
June 20, 2019 Appellee's Brief filed by Appellee United States Department of Health and Human Services. [19-11876] (ECF: Martin Totaro) [Entered: 06/20/2019 12:40 PM]
June 20, 2019 AMENDED Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Linda T. Coberly for United Network for Organ Sharing Attorney Linda T. Coberly for Appellee United Network for Organ Sharing. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11876] (ECF: Linda Coberly) [Entered: 06/20/2019 12:19 PM]
June 19, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Lauren Gailey for United Network for Organ Sharing [19-11876] (ECF: Lauren Gailey) [Entered: 06/19/2019 04:03 PM]
June 19, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Melanie L. Lee for United Network for Organ Sharing [19-11876] (ECF: Melanie Lee) [Entered: 06/19/2019 03:58 PM]
June 19, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Sean H. Suber for United Network for Organ Sharing [19-11876] (ECF: Sean Suber) [Entered: 06/19/2019 03:55 PM]
June 19, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Thomas G. Weber for United Network for Organ Sharing [19-11876] (ECF: Thomas Weber) [Entered: 06/19/2019 03:51 PM]
June 19, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Daniel D. Rubinstein for United Network for Organ Sharing [19-11876] (ECF: Daniel Rubinstein) [Entered: 06/19/2019 03:45 PM]
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion to appear pro hac vice filed by Glenn Lorin Krinsky is GRANTED by clerk. [8803540-2] [Entered: 06/19/2019 09:14 AM]
June 18, 2019 MOTION to appear pro hac vice filed by Attorney Glenn Lorin Krinsky for Appellants Emory University, Randall Callahan, Katryna Grisson, Candice Seaman, Michael Wingate, Henry Ford Health System, Indiana University Health, Oregon Health & Science University, Piedmont Healthcare, The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia, The Regents of the University of Michigan, Saint Luke's Hospital of Kansas City, University of Iowa, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, University of Kentucky, Vanderbilt University Medical Center, Virginia Commonwealth University Health System Authority, The Washington University and Barnes-Jewish Hospital. [8803540-1] [Entered: 06/19/2019 09:09 AM]
June 17, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Josh Belinfante for Charles Bennett and Susan Jackson. [19-11876] (ECF: Josh Belinfante) [Entered: 06/17/2019 01:55 PM]
June 14, 2019 Received paper copies of EAppendix filed by Appellants Barnes-Jewish Hospital, Randall Callahan, Emory University, Katryna Grisson, Henry Ford Health System, Indiana University Health, Oregon Health & Science University, Piedmont Healthcare, Saint Luke's Hospital of Kansas City, Candice Seaman, The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia, The Regents of the University of Michigan, The Washington University, University of Iowa, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, University of Kentucky, Vanderbilt University Medical Center, Virginia Commonwealth University Health System Authority and Michael Wingate. 4 VOLUMES - 2 COPIES [Entered: 06/14/2019 04:03 PM]
June 14, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Mordechai Shulman for Charles Bennett and Susan Jackson. [19-11876] (ECF: Mordechai Shulman) [Entered: 06/14/2019 11:34 AM]
June 14, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Evelyn Fruchter for Charles Bennett and Susan Jackson. [19-11876] (ECF: Evelyn Fruchter) [Entered: 06/14/2019 11:32 AM]
June 13, 2019 Appendix filed [4 VOLUMES] by Appellants Barnes-Jewish Hospital, Randall Callahan, Emory University, Katryna Grisson, Henry Ford Health System, Indiana University Health, Oregon Health & Science University, Piedmont Healthcare, Saint Luke's Hospital of Kansas City, Candice Seaman, The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia, The Regents of the University of Michigan, The Washington University, University of Iowa, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, University of Kentucky, Vanderbilt University Medical Center, Virginia Commonwealth University Health System Authority and Michael Wingate. [19-11876] (ECF: Jennifer Bunting-Graden) [Entered: 06/13/2019 06:54 PM]
June 13, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Martin Totaro for Appellee United States Department of Health and Human Services. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11876] (ECF: Martin Totaro) [Entered: 06/13/2019 10:38 AM]
June 12, 2019 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Michael Drezner for United States Department of Health and Human Services, Bradley Hinshelwood for United States Department of Health and Human Services and Martin Totaro for United States Department of Health and Human Services. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 06/12/2019 04:11 PM]
June 12, 2019 Public Communication: The Notice of deficiency for appellant's brief is hereby rescinded.. [Entered: 06/12/2019 09:37 AM]
June 11, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Linda T. Coberly for Appellee United Network for Organ Sharing Attorney Linda T. Coberly for Appellee United Network for Organ Sharing. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11876] (ECF: Linda Coberly) [Entered: 06/11/2019 07:49 PM]
June 11, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Matthew T. Parrish for Charles Bennett and Susan Jackson. [19-11876] (ECF: Matthew Parrish) [Entered: 06/11/2019 02:27 PM]
June 11, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Linda T. Coberly for United Network for Organ Sharing [19-11876] (ECF: Linda Coberly) [Entered: 06/11/2019 02:20 PM]
June 11, 2019 Notice of deficient Appellant brief filed by Jennifer A. Bunting-Graden for Appellants Emory University, Randall Callahan, Katryna Grisson, Candice Seaman, Michael Wingate, Henry Ford Health System, Indiana University Health, Oregon Health & Science University, Piedmont Healthcare, The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia, The Regents of the University of Michigan, Saint Luke's Hospital of Kansas City, University of Iowa, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, University of Kentucky, Vanderbilt University Medical Center, Virginia Commonwealth University Health System Authority, The Washington University and Barnes-Jewish Hospital, Peter Canfield for Appellants Emory University, Randall Callahan, Katryna Grisson, Candice Seaman, Michael Wingate, Henry Ford Health System, Indiana University Health, Oregon Health & Science University, Piedmont Healthcare, The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia, The Regents of the University of Michigan, Saint Luke's Hospital of Kansas City, University of Iowa, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, University of Kentucky, Vanderbilt University Medical Center, Virginia Commonwealth University Health System Authority, The Washington University and Barnes-Jewish Hospital, Courtney A. Carrell for Appellants Emory University, Randall Callahan, Katryna Grisson, Candice Seaman, Michael Wingate, Henry Ford Health System, Indiana University Health, Oregon Health & Science University, Piedmont Healthcare, The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia, The Regents of the University of Michigan, Saint Luke's Hospital of Kansas City, University of Iowa, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, University of Kentucky, Vanderbilt University Medical Center, Virginia Commonwealth University Health System Authority, The Washington University and Barnes-Jewish Hospital, Glenn Lorin Krinsky for Appellants Emory University, Randall Callahan, Katryna Grisson, Candice Seaman, Michael Wingate, Henry Ford Health System, Indiana University Health, Oregon Health & Science University, Piedmont Healthcare, The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia, The Regents of the University of Michigan, Saint Luke's Hospital of Kansas City, University of Iowa, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, University of Kentucky, Vanderbilt University Medical Center, Virginia Commonwealth University Health System Authority, The Washington University and Barnes-Jewish Hospital, John M. Majoras for Appellants Emory University, Randall Callahan, Katryna Grisson, Candice Seaman, Michael Wingate, Henry Ford Health System, Indiana University Health, Oregon Health & Science University, Piedmont Healthcare, The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia, The Regents of the University of Michigan, Saint Luke's Hospital of Kansas City, University of Iowa, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, University of Kentucky, Vanderbilt University Medical Center, Virginia Commonwealth University Health System Authority, The Washington University and Barnes-Jewish Hospital and William Roquemore Taylor for Appellants Emory University, Randall Callahan, Katryna Grisson, Candice Seaman, Michael Wingate, Henry Ford Health System, Indiana University Health, Oregon Health & Science University, Piedmont Healthcare, The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia, The Regents of the University of Michigan, Saint Luke's Hospital of Kansas City, University of Iowa, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, University of Kentucky, Vanderbilt University Medical Center, Virginia Commonwealth University Health System Authority, The Washington University and Barnes-Jewish Hospital.Deficiencies: missing oral argument statement. [Entered: 06/11/2019 11:44 AM]
June 7, 2019 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Appellants Barnes-Jewish Hospital, Randall Callahan, Emory University, Katryna Grisson, Henry Ford Health System, Indiana University Health, Oregon Health & Science University, Piedmont Healthcare, Saint Luke's Hospital of Kansas City, Candice Seaman, The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia, The Regents of the University of Michigan, The Washington University, University of Iowa, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, University of Kentucky, Vanderbilt University Medical Center, Virginia Commonwealth University Health System Authority and Michael Wingate. [Entered: 06/11/2019 11:21 AM]
June 6, 2019 Appellant's brief filed by Barnes-Jewish Hospital, Randall Callahan, Emory University, Katryna Grisson, Henry Ford Health System, Indiana University Health, Oregon Health & Science University, Piedmont Healthcare, Saint Luke's Hospital of Kansas City, Candice Seaman, The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia, The Regents of the University of Michigan, The Washington University, University of Iowa, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, University of Kentucky, Vanderbilt University Medical Center, Virginia Commonwealth University Health System Authority and Michael Wingate. [19-11876] (ECF: Jennifer Bunting-Graden) [Entered: 06/06/2019 10:12 PM]
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion to appear pro hac vice filed by Motty Shulman is GRANTED by clerk. [8792828-2] [Entered: 06/06/2019 09:06 AM]
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion to appear pro hac vice filed by Evelyn Neel Fruchter is GRANTED by clerk. [8792780-2] [Entered: 06/06/2019 08:58 AM]
June 5, 2019 MOTION to appear pro hac vice filed by Attorney Motty Shulman for Intervenors Charles Bennett and Susan Jackson. [8792828-1] [Entered: 06/06/2019 09:05 AM]
June 5, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Martin Totaro for U.S. Department of Health and Human Services [19-11876] (ECF: Martin Totaro) [Entered: 06/05/2019 10:38 PM]
June 5, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Sara Anderson Frey for United Network for Organ Sharing. [19-11876] (ECF: Sara Frey) [Entered: 06/05/2019 02:01 PM]
June 4, 2019 MOTION to appear pro hac vice filed by Attorney Evelyn Neel Fruchter for Intervenors Charles Bennett and Susan Jackson. [8792780-1] [Entered: 06/06/2019 08:46 AM]
May 30, 2019 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Jennifer A. Bunting-Graden for Appellants Barnes-Jewish Hospital, Randall Callahan, Emory University, Katryna Grisson, Henry Ford Health System, Indiana University Health, Oregon Health & Science University, Piedmont Healthcare, Saint Luke's Hospital of Kansas City, Candice Seaman, The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia, The Regents of the University of Michigan, The Washington University, University of Iowa, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, University of Kentucky, Vanderbilt University Medical Center, Virginia Commonwealth University Health System Authority and Michael Wingate. [19-11876] (ECF: Jennifer Bunting-Graden) [Entered: 05/30/2019 05:39 PM]
May 28, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Courtney A. Carrell for Barnes-Jewish Hospital, Randall Callahan, Emory University, Katryna Grisson, Henry Ford Health System, Indiana University Health, Oregon Health & Science University, Piedmont Healthcare, Saint Luke's Hospital of Kansas City, Candice Seaman, The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia, The Regents of the University of Michigan, The Washington University, University of Iowa, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, University of Kentucky, Vanderbilt University Medical Center, Virginia Commonwealth University Health System Authority and Michael Wingate. [19-11876] (ECF: Courtney Carrell) [Entered: 05/28/2019 05:44 PM]
May 28, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Jennifer A. Bunting-Graden for Appellants Barnes-Jewish Hospital, Randall Callahan, Emory University, Katryna Grisson, Henry Ford Health System, Indiana University Health, Oregon Health & Science University, Piedmont Healthcare, Saint Luke's Hospital of Kansas City, Candice Seaman, The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia, The Regents of the University of Michigan, The Washington University, University of Iowa, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, University of Kentucky, Vanderbilt University Medical Center, Virginia Commonwealth University Health System Authority and Michael Wingate. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11876] (ECF: Jennifer Bunting-Graden) [Entered: 05/28/2019 07:19 AM]
May 24, 2019 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Jennifer A. Bunting-Graden for Appellants Barnes-Jewish Hospital, Randall Callahan, Emory University, Katryna Grisson, Henry Ford Health System, Indiana University Health, Oregon Health & Science University, Piedmont Healthcare, Saint Luke's Hospital of Kansas City, Candice Seaman, The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia, The Regents of the University of Michigan, The Washington University, University of Iowa, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, University of Kentucky, Vanderbilt University Medical Center, Virginia Commonwealth University Health System Authority and Michael Wingate. Transcript(s) ordered. [19-11876] (ECF: Jennifer Bunting-Graden) [Entered: 05/24/2019 03:57 PM]
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion to expedite the appeal filed by Appellees Charles Bennett and Susan Jackson is GRANTED as follows: The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to expedite the appeal for merits disposition purposes, including oral argument if the Court deems oral argument in this case is warranted. The Court takes no position at this time on the appropriateness of oral argument. The Court set the following briefing schedule: the initial brief is due 14 days after the date of this order, the response briefs are due 14 days after the initial brief is filed, and the reply brief is due 7 days after the response briefs are filed. To the extent Appellants have not filed a Transcript Information Form, they are directed to do so by the next business day after the date of this order. [ # 8777778-2 ]; [ # 8777778-3 ]; [ # 8777778-4 ]; [ # 8777778-5 ]. WHP [Entered: 05/23/2019 02:39 PM]
May 22, 2019 Appearance of counsel form has not been processed. According to our records, Jennifer A. Bunting-Graden for Emory University, Randall Callahan, Katryna Grisson, Candice Seaman, Michael Wingate, Henry Ford Health System, Indiana University Health, Oregon Health & Science University, Piedmont Healthcare, The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia, The Regents of the University of Michigan, Saint Luke's Hospital of Kansas City, University of Iowa, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, University of Kentucky, Vanderbilt University Medical Center, Virginia Commonwealth University Health System Authority, The Washington University and Barnes-Jewish Hospital is a member of the Eleventh Circuit bar in inactive status. Your appearance form will not be processed until your bar membership has been renewed. [Entered: 05/22/2019 09:47 AM]
May 21, 2019 RESPONSE to Motion to expedite filed by Appellees Charles Bennett, Susan Jackson and Intervenor Charles Bennett [ # 8777778-2 ], Motion to expedite briefing filed by Appellees Charles Bennett, Susan Jackson and Intervenor Charles Bennett [ # 8777778-3 ], Motion to expedite oral argument filed by Appellees Charles Bennett, Susan Jackson and Intervenor Charles Bennett [ # 8777778-4 ], Motion to expedite ruling on a motion filed by Appellees Charles Bennett, Susan Jackson and Intervenor Charles Bennett [ # 8777778-5 ], Motion to expedite disposition filed by Appellees Charles Bennett, Susan Jackson and Intervenor Charles Bennett [ # 8777778-6 ] filed by Attorney Bradley Hinshelwood for Appellee United States Department of Health and Human Services. [19-11876] (ECF: Bradley Hinshelwood) [Entered: 05/21/2019 05:10 PM]
May 21, 2019 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Appellees Charles Bennett, Susan Jackson and Intervenor Charles Bennett [ # 8777778-2 ], Motion filed by Appellees Charles Bennett, Susan Jackson and Intervenor Charles Bennett [ # 8777778-3 ], Motion filed by Appellees Charles Bennett, Susan Jackson and Intervenor Charles Bennett [ # 8777778-4 ], Motion filed by Appellees Charles Bennett, Susan Jackson and Intervenor Charles Bennett [ # 8777778-5 ], Motion filed by Appellees Charles Bennett, Susan Jackson and Intervenor Charles Bennett [ # 8777778-6 ] filed by Attorney Jennifer A. Bunting-Graden for Appellants Barnes-Jewish Hospital, Randall Callahan, Emory University, Katryna Grisson, Henry Ford Health System, Indiana University Health, Oregon Health & Science University, Piedmont Healthcare, Saint Luke's Hospital of Kansas City, Candice Seaman, The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia, The Regents of the University of Michigan, The Washington University, University of Iowa, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, University of Kentucky, Vanderbilt University Medical Center, Virginia Commonwealth University Health System Authority and Michael Wingate. [19-11876] (ECF: Jennifer Bunting-Graden) [Entered: 05/21/2019 04:48 PM]
May 21, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jennifer A. Bunting-Graden for Barnes-Jewish Hospital, Randall Callahan, Emory University, Katryna Grisson, Henry Ford Health System, Indiana University Health, Oregon Health & Science University, Piedmont Healthcare, Saint Luke's Hospital of Kansas City, Candice Seaman, The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia, The Regents of the University of Michigan, The Washington University, University of Iowa, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, University of Kentucky, Vanderbilt University Medical Center, Virginia Commonwealth University Health System Authority and Michael Wingate. [19-11876] (ECF: Jennifer Bunting-Graden) [Entered: 05/21/2019 04:37 PM]
May 21, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Peter Canfield for Barnes-Jewish Hospital, Randall Callahan, Emory University, Katryna Grisson, Henry Ford Health System, Indiana University Health, Oregon Health & Science University, Piedmont Healthcare, Saint Luke's Hospital of Kansas City, Candice Seaman, The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia, The Regents of the University of Michigan, The Washington University, University of Iowa, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, University of Kentucky, Vanderbilt University Medical Center, Virginia Commonwealth University Health System Authority and Michael Wingate. [19-11876] (ECF: Peter Canfield) [Entered: 05/21/2019 02:11 PM]
May 20, 2019 NOTIFICATION REFERENCE MOTION TO EXPEDITE [Entered: 05/20/2019 04:55 PM]
May 20, 2019 TIME SENSITIVE MOTION to expedite, to expedite briefing, to expedite oral argument, to expedite ruling on a motion, to expedite disposition filed by Charles Bennett and Susan Jackson. Motion is Opposed. [8777778-1] [19-11876] (ECF: Jason Alloy) [Entered: 05/20/2019 04:03 PM]
May 20, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jason S. Alloy, Intervenor [19-11876] (ECF: Jason Alloy) [Entered: 05/20/2019 01:02 PM]
May 20, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jay S. Blumenkopf for United Network for Organ Sharing. [19-11876] (ECF: Steven Flynn) [Entered: 05/20/2019 10:41 AM]
May 20, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Steven James Flynn for United Network for Organ Sharing. [19-11876] (ECF: Steven Flynn) [Entered: 05/20/2019 10:39 AM]
May 16, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Brad Hinshelwood for U.S. Department of Health & Human Services [19-11876] (ECF: Bradley Hinshelwood) [Entered: 05/16/2019 04:30 PM]
May 14, 2019 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants Barnes-Jewish Hospital, Randall Callahan, Emory University, Katryna Grisson, Henry Ford Health System, Indiana University Health, Oregon Health & Science University, Piedmont Healthcare, Saint Luke's Hospital of Kansas City, Candice Seaman, The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia, The Regents of the University of Michigan, The Washington University, University of Iowa, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, University of Kentucky, Vanderbilt University Medical Center, Virginia Commonwealth University Health System Authority and Michael Wingate on 05/14/2019. Fee Status: Fee Paid. USDC motion pending: Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (doc 83); Motion for Order to Show Cause (doc 85). Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/28/2019 as to Appellant Randall Callahan. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 06/11/2019 as to Appellee United States Department of Health and Human Services [Entered: 05/16/2019 04:02 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Randall Callahan, et al v. United States Dept. of HHS, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, through ALEX M. AZAR II in his official capacity as Secretary of the United States Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Bradley Hinshelwood
Represented By: Michael Drezner
Represented By: Martin Totaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED NETWORK FOR ORGAN SHARING
Represented By: Jay S. Blumenkopf
Represented By: Sara Anderson Frey
Represented By: Steven James Flynn
Represented By: Linda T. Coberly
Represented By: Sean H. Suber
Represented By: Thomas G. Weber
Represented By: Lauren Gailey
Represented By: Daniel D. Rubinstein
Represented By: Melanie Laiyee Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MICHAEL WINGATE
Represented By: Glenn Lorin Krinsky
Represented By: William Roquemore Taylor
Represented By: Jennifer A. Bunting-Graden
Represented By: Courtney A. Carrell
Represented By: Peter Canfield
Represented By: John M. Majoras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KATRYNA GRISSON
Represented By: Glenn Lorin Krinsky
Represented By: William Roquemore Taylor
Represented By: Jennifer A. Bunting-Graden
Represented By: Courtney A. Carrell
Represented By: Peter Canfield
Represented By: John M. Majoras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: VANDERBILT UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Glenn Lorin Krinsky
Represented By: William Roquemore Taylor
Represented By: Jennifer A. Bunting-Graden
Represented By: Courtney A. Carrell
Represented By: Peter Canfield
Represented By: John M. Majoras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SAINT LUKE'S HOSPITAL OF KANSAS CITY
Represented By: Glenn Lorin Krinsky
Represented By: William Roquemore Taylor
Represented By: Jennifer A. Bunting-Graden
Represented By: Courtney A. Carrell
Represented By: Peter Canfield
Represented By: John M. Majoras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: EMORY UNIVERSITY, d.b.a. Emory University Hospital
Represented By: Glenn Lorin Krinsky
Represented By: William Roquemore Taylor
Represented By: Jennifer A. Bunting-Graden
Represented By: Courtney A. Carrell
Represented By: Peter Canfield
Represented By: John M. Majoras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PIEDMONT HEALTHCARE
Represented By: Glenn Lorin Krinsky
Represented By: William Roquemore Taylor
Represented By: Jennifer A. Bunting-Graden
Represented By: Courtney A. Carrell
Represented By: Peter Canfield
Represented By: John M. Majoras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CANDICE SEAMAN
Represented By: Glenn Lorin Krinsky
Represented By: William Roquemore Taylor
Represented By: Jennifer A. Bunting-Graden
Represented By: Courtney A. Carrell
Represented By: Peter Canfield
Represented By: John M. Majoras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF MICHIGAN, on behalf of its academic medical center, Michigan Medicine
Represented By: Glenn Lorin Krinsky
Represented By: William Roquemore Taylor
Represented By: Jennifer A. Bunting-Graden
Represented By: Courtney A. Carrell
Represented By: Peter Canfield
Represented By: John M. Majoras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RANDALL CALLAHAN
Represented By: Glenn Lorin Krinsky
Represented By: William Roquemore Taylor
Represented By: Jennifer A. Bunting-Graden
Represented By: Courtney A. Carrell
Represented By: Peter Canfield
Represented By: John M. Majoras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: UNIVERSITY OF IOWA
Represented By: Glenn Lorin Krinsky
Represented By: William Roquemore Taylor
Represented By: Jennifer A. Bunting-Graden
Represented By: Courtney A. Carrell
Represented By: Peter Canfield
Represented By: John M. Majoras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BARNES-JEWISH HOSPITAL
Represented By: Glenn Lorin Krinsky
Represented By: William Roquemore Taylor
Represented By: Jennifer A. Bunting-Graden
Represented By: Courtney A. Carrell
Represented By: Peter Canfield
Represented By: John M. Majoras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: INDIANA UNIVERSITY HEALTH
Represented By: Glenn Lorin Krinsky
Represented By: William Roquemore Taylor
Represented By: Jennifer A. Bunting-Graden
Represented By: Courtney A. Carrell
Represented By: Peter Canfield
Represented By: John M. Majoras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: HENRY FORD HEALTH SYSTEM
Represented By: Glenn Lorin Krinsky
Represented By: William Roquemore Taylor
Represented By: Jennifer A. Bunting-Graden
Represented By: Courtney A. Carrell
Represented By: Peter Canfield
Represented By: John M. Majoras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: VIRGINIA COMMONWEALTH UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM AUTHORITY
Represented By: Glenn Lorin Krinsky
Represented By: William Roquemore Taylor
Represented By: Jennifer A. Bunting-Graden
Represented By: Courtney A. Carrell
Represented By: Peter Canfield
Represented By: John M. Majoras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: UNIVERSITY OF KANSAS HOSPITAL AUTHORITY, a body politic and corporate and an independent instrumentality of the State of Kansas
Represented By: Glenn Lorin Krinsky
Represented By: William Roquemore Taylor
Represented By: Jennifer A. Bunting-Graden
Represented By: Courtney A. Carrell
Represented By: Peter Canfield
Represented By: John M. Majoras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: THE RECTOR AND VISITORS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF VIRGINIA, on behalf of its Medical Center
Represented By: Glenn Lorin Krinsky
Represented By: William Roquemore Taylor
Represented By: Jennifer A. Bunting-Graden
Represented By: Courtney A. Carrell
Represented By: Peter Canfield
Represented By: John M. Majoras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: OREGON HEALTH & SCIENCE UNIVERSITY
Represented By: Glenn Lorin Krinsky
Represented By: William Roquemore Taylor
Represented By: Jennifer A. Bunting-Graden
Represented By: Courtney A. Carrell
Represented By: Peter Canfield
Represented By: John M. Majoras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: THE WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY
Represented By: Glenn Lorin Krinsky
Represented By: William Roquemore Taylor
Represented By: Jennifer A. Bunting-Graden
Represented By: Courtney A. Carrell
Represented By: Peter Canfield
Represented By: John M. Majoras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: UNIVERSITY OF KENTUCKY
Represented By: Glenn Lorin Krinsky
Represented By: William Roquemore Taylor
Represented By: Jennifer A. Bunting-Graden
Represented By: Courtney A. Carrell
Represented By: Peter Canfield
Represented By: John M. Majoras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor / appellee: CHARLES BENNETT
Represented By: Jason Scott Alloy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor / appellee: SUSAN JACKSON
Represented By: Jason Scott Alloy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?