MSP Recovery Claims, Series, et al v. Northland Insurance Company, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: MSPA CLAIMS 1, LLC, MSP RECOVERY CLAIMS, SERIES LLC and SERIES PMPI, a designated series of MAO-MSO RECOVERY II LLC
Defendant / Appellee: NORTHLAND CASUALTY COMPANY and NORTHLAND INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 19-12092
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 MOTION to consolidate appeals 19-12029, 19-12091, 19-12085, 19-12092, 19-12358 and 19-12357 filed by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC and Series PMPI. Motion is Unopposed. [8815760-1] [19-12092] (ECF: Arlenys Perdomo) [Entered: 07/02/2019 02:47 PM]
June 26, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Bryce L. Friedman for Appellees-Cross Appellants Northland Casualty Company and Northland Insurance Company. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12092] (ECF: Bryce Friedman) [Entered: 06/26/2019 04:47 PM]
June 18, 2019 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Laura E. Besvinick for Appellees-Cross Appellants Northland Insurance Company and Northland Casualty Company and Bryce L. Friedman for Appellees-Cross Appellants Northland Insurance Company and Northland Casualty Company. No hearings. [Entered: 06/18/2019 11:27 AM]
June 13, 2019 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Laura E. Besvinick for Appellees Northland Casualty Company and Northland Insurance Company. No hearings. [19-12092] (ECF: Laura Besvinick) [Entered: 06/13/2019 12:54 PM]
June 12, 2019 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellees-Cross Appellants Northland Casualty Company and Northland Insurance Company on 06/11/2019. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. [Entered: 06/18/2019 11:20 AM]
June 12, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12092] (ECF: Arlenys Perdomo) [Entered: 06/12/2019 05:08 PM]
June 12, 2019 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Bryce L. Friedman for Appellees Northland Casualty Company and Northland Insurance Company. [19-12092] (ECF: Bryce Friedman) [Entered: 06/12/2019 01:41 PM]
June 11, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Bryce L. Friedman for Appellees Northland Insurance Company, Northland Casualty Company [19-12092] (ECF: Bryce Friedman) [Entered: 06/11/2019 06:21 PM]
June 11, 2019 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Arlenys Perdomo for Appellants MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC and Series PMPI. [19-12092] (ECF: Arlenys Perdomo) [Entered: 06/11/2019 05:32 PM]
June 11, 2019 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Arlenys Perdomo for Appellants MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC and Series PMPI. No hearings. [19-12092] (ECF: Arlenys Perdomo) [Entered: 06/11/2019 05:31 PM]
June 10, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Arlenys Perdomo for Appellants MSP Recovery Claims Series, LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC, and Series PMPI [19-12092] (ECF: Arlenys Perdomo) [Entered: 06/08/2019 01:55 PM]
May 29, 2019 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC and MSPA Claims 1, LLC on 05/28/2019. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 07/08/2019. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 06/12/2019 as to Appellant MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 06/26/2019 as to Appellee Northland Insurance Company [Entered: 06/03/2019 05:06 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MSP Recovery Claims, Series, et al v. Northland Insurance Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MSPA CLAIMS 1, LLC
Represented By: John H. Ruiz
Represented By: Christine M. Lugo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MSP RECOVERY CLAIMS, SERIES LLC
Represented By: John H. Ruiz
Represented By: Christine M. Lugo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SERIES PMPI, a designated series of MAO-MSO RECOVERY II LLC
Represented By: John H. Ruiz
Represented By: Christine M. Lugo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NORTHLAND CASUALTY COMPANY
Represented By: Laura E. Besvinick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NORTHLAND INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Laura E. Besvinick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?