Aaron Shaw v. Secretary, Florida Department
Respondent / Appellee: SECRETARY, FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CHILDREN AND FAMILY SERVICES
Petitioner / Appellant: AARON RAMON SHAW
Case Number: 19-12233
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 MOTION to proceed IFP filed by Appellant Aaron Ramon Shaw. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8836496-1] [Entered: 07/26/2019 10:24 AM]
July 11, 2019 USDC order denying COA as to Appellant Aaron Ramon Shaw was filed on 07/10/2019. Docket Entry 26. [Entered: 07/11/2019 02:28 PM]
July 11, 2019 USDC order denying IFP as to Appellant Aaron Ramon Shaw was filed on 07/10/2019. Docket Entry 25. [Entered: 07/11/2019 02:27 PM]
July 1, 2019 Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Aaron Ramon Shaw. [Entered: 07/03/2019 09:20 AM]
June 21, 2019 Notice of filing: Petitioner's Notice of Good-Faith Compliance as to Appellant Aaron Ramon Shaw. [Entered: 06/27/2019 10:14 AM]
June 21, 2019 USDC MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis as to Appellant Aaron Ramon Shaw was filed on 06/21/2019. Docket Entry 20. [Entered: 06/24/2019 03:43 PM]
June 11, 2019 USDC motion for certificate of appealability as to Appellant Aaron Ramon Shaw was filed on 06/07/2019. Docket Entry 18. [Entered: 06/11/2019 01:51 PM]
June 11, 2019 HABEAS APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Aaron Ramon Shaw on 06/07/2019 06/07/2019. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. [Entered: 06/11/2019 01:49 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aaron Shaw v. Secretary, Florida Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: SECRETARY, FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CHILDREN AND FAMILY SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: AARON RAMON SHAW
Represented By: Aaron Ramon Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?